Holloman v. Maine, et al
Defendant: HAROLD W. CLARKE, Commissioner, Department of Corrections, in his official and individual capacities, BRUCE GELB, Superintendent, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities, JEFFREY P. DAIGNEAULT, Correctional Officer, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities, LOIS A. RUSSO, Deputy Superintendant, MCI Concord, in his official and individual capacities, PAMELA M. O'DELL, Grievance Coordinator, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in her official and individual capacities, MR. WENDOVER, Corrections Officer, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities, JORMA MAENPAA, Director of Security, MCI Concord, in his official and individual capacities, ANTHONY M. MENDOSA, Deputy Superintendant, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities, JOHN BRODBECK, Director of Security, MCI Concord, in his official and individual capacities, DONALD FERRARA, Corrections Lieutenant, Souza Baranoswski Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities, THOMAS FEDEL, Disciplinary Hearing Officer, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities, KRISTIE LADOUCEUR, Administrative Resolutions Coordinator, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in her official and individual capacities, SHELLY WILLIAMS, Captain Shift Commander, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in her official and individual capacities, MICHAEL L. RODRIGUES, Deputy of Operations, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities, GREGORY A. BERDARD, Corrections Lieutenant, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities, HOLLY FASOLI, Corrections Sergeant, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in her official and individual capacities, JAMES R. BENDER, Deputy Commissioner, Department of Corrections, in his official and individual capacities, AMY OWENS, Treasurer, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in her official and individual capacities, LUIS S. SPENCER, Commisioner, Department of Corrections, in his official and individual capacities, THOMAS M. TOCCI, Grievance Coordinator, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities, BRIAN MCDONALD, Deputy of Security, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities, JAMES C. THORNTON, Corrections Supervisor, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities, DAVID DEAKIN, Commissioner, Department of Corrections, in his official and individual capacities, NICK PALODIAN, Mail Clerk, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities and BRUCE GELB, Superintendant, MCI Concord, in his official and individual capacities
Defendant / Appellee: AARON GILL, Sergeant Corrections Officer, Souza Baranowki Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities and FRANK MAINE, Correctional Officer, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities
Plaintiff / Appellant: TAJUAN HOLLOMAN
Case Number: 19-1037
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 LETTER filed by Appellant Tajuan Holloman requesting status of transcript report/order. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1037] (AL) [Entered: 03/15/2019 02:12 PM]
March 11, 2019 PLRA RESPONSE, Form 2, filed by Appellant Tajuan Holloman. [19-1037] (AL) [Entered: 03/12/2019 09:10 AM]
March 11, 2019 PLRA RESPONSE filed by Appellant Tajuan Holloman. [19-1037] (AL) [Entered: 03/12/2019 09:09 AM]
March 5, 2019 PLRA RESPONSE filed by Appellant Tajuan Holloman. [19-1037] (AL) [Entered: 03/05/2019 04:11 PM]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered. On February 15, 2019, this court received appellant Tajuan Holloman's Prison Litigation Reform Act (PLRA) Form 1 and prisoner trust account report. We note that that the prisoner trust account report is deficient in that the report does not span the full six months preceding appellant's notice of appeal dated January 2, 2019, which would include the period beginning July 2, 2018 and ending on January 2, 2019. Accordingly, the time to file PLRA Form 1 and compliant certified prisoner trust account report is enlarged to March 13, 2019. Upon appellants motion to extend the time for filing PLRA Form 2, it is ordered that the time for filing PLRA Form 2 is also enlarged to and including March 13, 2019. PLRA Forms 1 and 2 are enclosed with this order. [19-1037] (GK) [Entered: 02/27/2019 12:08 PM]
February 15, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file PLRA response filed by Appellant Tajuan Holloman. [19-1037] (GRC) [Entered: 02/20/2019 10:23 AM]
February 15, 2019 PLRA RESPONSE filed by Appellant Tajuan Holloman. [19-1037]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (KC) [Entered: 02/15/2019 04:30 PM]
February 12, 2019 DOCKET sheet sent to appellant. [19-1037] (AL) [Entered: 02/12/2019 09:53 AM]
February 12, 2019 LETTER sent to Appellant Tajuan Holloman addressing his correspondence docketed February 6, 2019 enclosing a copy of the requested docket sheet. [19-1037] (AL) [Entered: 02/12/2019 09:52 AM]
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file opening forms filed by Appellant Tajuan Holloman. Transcript report/order form due 03/18/2019. We are disinclined to grant a request for further enlargement of this deadline. [19-1037] (AL) [Entered: 02/07/2019 05:16 PM]
February 6, 2019 LETTER filed by Appellant Tajuan Holloman requesting a copy of docket sheet. [19-1037] (AL) [Entered: 02/06/2019 04:48 PM]
February 6, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file a transcript report/order form filed by Appellant Tajuan Holloman. Certificate of service dated 01/31/2019. [19-1037] (AL) [Entered: 02/06/2019 04:47 PM]
January 30, 2019 PLRA LETTER issued. IFP was granted in district court. PLRA forms sent. PLRA response due 02/13/2019. [19-1037] (AL) [Entered: 01/30/2019 05:15 PM]
January 16, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #245) filed by Appellant Tajuan Holloman. Transcript Report/Order form due 02/01/2019. Fee due 02/01/2019. [19-1037] (AL) [Entered: 01/18/2019 03:26 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Holloman v. Maine, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAROLD W. CLARKE, Commissioner, Department of Corrections, in his official and individual capacities
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCE GELB, Superintendent, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY P. DAIGNEAULT, Correctional Officer, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOIS A. RUSSO, Deputy Superintendant, MCI Concord, in his official and individual capacities
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAMELA M. O'DELL, Grievance Coordinator, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in her official and individual capacities
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. WENDOVER, Corrections Officer, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JORMA MAENPAA, Director of Security, MCI Concord, in his official and individual capacities
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY M. MENDOSA, Deputy Superintendant, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN BRODBECK, Director of Security, MCI Concord, in his official and individual capacities
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD FERRARA, Corrections Lieutenant, Souza Baranoswski Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS FEDEL, Disciplinary Hearing Officer, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRISTIE LADOUCEUR, Administrative Resolutions Coordinator, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in her official and individual capacities
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHELLY WILLIAMS, Captain Shift Commander, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in her official and individual capacities
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL L. RODRIGUES, Deputy of Operations, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY A. BERDARD, Corrections Lieutenant, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLLY FASOLI, Corrections Sergeant, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in her official and individual capacities
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES R. BENDER, Deputy Commissioner, Department of Corrections, in his official and individual capacities
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMY OWENS, Treasurer, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in her official and individual capacities
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUIS S. SPENCER, Commisioner, Department of Corrections, in his official and individual capacities
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS M. TOCCI, Grievance Coordinator, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN MCDONALD, Deputy of Security, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES C. THORNTON, Corrections Supervisor, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID DEAKIN, Commissioner, Department of Corrections, in his official and individual capacities
Represented By: Ryan Edmund Ferch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICK PALODIAN, Mail Clerk, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCE GELB, Superintendant, MCI Concord, in his official and individual capacities
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AARON GILL, Sergeant Corrections Officer, Souza Baranowki Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Represented By: Timothy M. Pomarole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRANK MAINE, Correctional Officer, Souza Baranowski Correctional Center, in his official and individual capacities
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Represented By: Timothy M. Pomarole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TAJUAN HOLLOMAN
Represented By: Tajuan Holloman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?