Spencer Yachts, Inc. v. Alonzo, et al
Plaintiff: AFUNDAY CHARTERS, INC.
Defendant: JOSEPH DANIEL SPENCER, ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, CHUBB CORPORATION, ABC INSURANCE COMPANY, CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES, f/k/a Ace American Insurance Company, TRINIDAD AND TOBAGO INSURANCE LTD and CHUBB INSURANCE COMPANY, f/k/a ACE American Insurance Company
Defendant / Appellee: ANTHONY SABGA and SEAN ALONZO
Defendant / Appellant: SPENCER YACHTS, INC.
Undetermined: ANTHONY NORMAN SABGA
Case Number: 19-1114
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 RESPONSE filed by Appellant Spencer Yachts, Inc. to order for lack of jurisdiction [ # 6239331-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1114] CLERK'S NOTE: The ECF filer did not select the option that best describes the document. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. [19-1114] (DYL) [Entered: 03/27/2019 06:01 PM]
March 27, 2019 NOTICE in Compliance with Order to Show Cause why Appeal Should not be Dismissed for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Appellant Spencer Yachts, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1114] CLERK'S NOTE: It appears the document was scanned rather than created by converting the original word processing document into a PDF file. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS (03/29/2019). (DYL) [Entered: 03/27/2019 04:58 PM]
March 22, 2019 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Thomas S. Berkley for Spencer Yachts, Inc., Michel O. Weisz for Sean Alonzo, Anthony Norman Sabga and Afunday Charters, Inc., Lars Altman for Afunday Charters, Inc., Jules Massee for ACE American Insurance Company, Michael T. Moore for Afunday Charters, Inc., Stacey L. Papp for ACE American Insurance Company, Kyle A. Quintana for Afunday Charters, Inc. and Michel O. Weisz for Afunday Charters, Inc.. [19-1114] (GRC) [Entered: 03/22/2019 11:08 AM]
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER to Show Cause entered directing appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Show cause response due 03/27/2019. [19-1114] (GRC) [Entered: 03/13/2019 04:47 PM]
March 7, 2019 NOTICE issued. After 03/21/2019, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Thomas S. Berkley for Spencer Yachts, Inc., Michel O. Weisz for Sean Alonzo and Afunday Charters, Inc., Lars Altman for Afunday Charters, Inc., Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira for Afunday Charters, Inc., Jules Massee for Ace American Insurance Company, Michael T. Moore for Afunday Charters, Inc., Stacey L. Papp for Ace American Insurance Company, Kyle A. Quintana for Afunday Charters, Inc. and Michel O. Weisz for Afunday Charters, Inc.. [19-1114] (GRC) [Entered: 03/07/2019 05:02 PM]
February 27, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Sean Alonzo and Anthony Sabga filed by Attorney Clay M. Naughton. Certificate of service dated 02/27/2019. [19-1114] (CMN) [Entered: 02/27/2019 04:05 PM]
February 21, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Spencer Yachts, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 02/21/2019. [19-1114] (DYL) [Entered: 02/21/2019 03:06 PM]
February 21, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Spencer Yachts, Inc. filed by Attorney David Y. Loh. Certificate of service dated 02/21/2019. [19-1114] (DYL) [Entered: 02/21/2019 02:47 PM]
February 18, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Anthony Sabga and Sean Alonzo filed by Attorney Paul E. Calvesbert. Certificate of service dated 02/18/2019. [19-1114] (PEC) [Entered: 02/18/2019 01:30 PM]
February 14, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #190) filed by Appellant Spencer Yachts, Inc.. Appearance and Docketing Statement due 02/28/2019. [19-1114] (GRC) [Entered: 02/14/2019 11:57 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Spencer Yachts, Inc. v. Alonzo, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH DANIEL SPENCER
Represented By: James Weller Stroup
Represented By: Alberto J. Castaner-Padro III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Stacey L. Papp
Represented By: Jolieann Brooks-Guzman
Represented By: Jules Massee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHUBB CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES, f/k/a Ace American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRINIDAD AND TOBAGO INSURANCE LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHUBB INSURANCE COMPANY, f/k/a ACE American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANTHONY SABGA
Represented By: Paul E. Calvesbert-Borgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SEAN ALONZO
Represented By: Michel O. Weisz
Represented By: Paul E. Calvesbert-Borgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SPENCER YACHTS, INC.
Represented By: Thomas S. Berkley
Represented By: Luis Fernando Llach Zuniga
Represented By: David Yita Loh
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Represented By: Manolo Tomas Rodriguez Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFUNDAY CHARTERS, INC.
Represented By: Michael T. Moore
Represented By: Lars Altman
Represented By: Clay M. Naughton
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Kyle A. Quintana
Represented By: Michel O. Weisz
Represented By: Paul E. Calvesbert-Borgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: ANTHONY NORMAN SABGA
Represented By: Clay M. Naughton
Represented By: Michel O. Weisz
Represented By: Paul E. Calvesbert-Borgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?