Gomez-Cruz, et al v. Fernandez-Pabellon, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: MARIELY GARCIA-RUIZ, CAIRA BERLY-RIVERA, MARIA VAZQUEZ-MOJICA, JORGE MORALES-VELAZQUEZ, BRENDALIZ GONZALEZ-MENDEZ, AMNER ORTIZ-LOPEZ and CARLOS GOMEZ-CRUZ
Defendant / Appellant: LAURA ISABEL SANTA SANCHEZ, in her personal capacity in her official capacity as Deputy Secretary of Human Resources and Labor Relations at the Department of Family of the Commonwealth of P.R., MARTA ELSA FERNANDEZ-PABELLON, in her personal capacity and in her official capacity as Administrator of the Administration for the Socioeconomic Development of Families, ELSA RODRIGUEZ-VALENTIN, in her capacity and in her official capacity as Deputy Administrator of Substitute care and Adoption at the Administration for Families and Children of the Commonwealth of P.R., TAMARA LUCIANO-FERNANDEZ, in her persinal capacity and in her official capacity as Deputy Administrator of Finance and Budget at the Administration for the Socioeconomic Development of Families, VANESSA PINTADO-RODRIGUEZ, in her personal capacity and in her official capacity as Administrator of the Administration for Families and Children of the Commonwealth of P.R., WILDA RAMOS-ROMAN, in her personal capacity and in her official capactity as Deputy Administrator of Human Resources and Labor Relations at the Administration for Families and Children of the Commonwealth of P.R., CARMEN ANNETTE BELTRAN, in her personal capacity and in her official capacity as Deputy Administrator of Human Resources and Labor Relations at the Administration for the Socioeconomic Development of Families, IDALIA COLON-RONDON, in her personal capacity and in her official as Secretary of the Department of the Family of the Commonwealth of P.R., TAMARA LUCIANO-FERNANDEZ, in her personal capacity and in her official capacity as Deputy Administrator of Finance and Budget at the Administration for the Socioeconomic Development of Families, IDALIA COLON-RONDON, in her personal capacity and in her official capacity as Secretary of the Department of the Family of the Commonwealth of P.R., WILDA RAMOS-ROMAN, in her personal capacity and in her official capacity as Deputy Administrator of Human Resources and Labor Relations at the Administration for Families and Children of the Commonwealth of P.R. and ELSA RODRIGUEZ-VALENTIN, in her personal capacity and in her official capacity as Deputy Administrator of Substitute Care and Adoption at the Administration for Families and Children of the Commonwealth of P.R.
Case Number: 19-1146
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 05/08/2019 for appellant Carmen Annette Beltran, Idalia Colon-Rondon, Marta Elsa Fernandez-Pabellon, Tamara Luciano-Fernandez, Vanessa Pintado-Rodriguez, Wilda Ramos-Roman, Elsa Rodriguez-Valentin and Laura Isabel Santa Sanchez. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1146] (KC) [Entered: 03/29/2019 02:41 PM]
March 25, 2019 RESPONSE filed by Appellants Carmen Annette Beltran, Idalia Colon-Rondon, Marta Elsa Fernandez-Pabellon, Tamara Luciano-Fernandez, Vanessa Pintado-Rodriguez, Wilda Ramos-Roman, Elsa Rodriguez-Valentin and Laura Isabel Santa Sanchez to motion [ # 6239795-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 03/25/2019. [19-1146] (CL) [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:18 AM]
March 20, 2019 NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Wanda Vazquez-Garced for Marta Elsa Fernandez-Pabellon, Tamara Luciano-Fernandez, Idalia Colon-Rondon, Laura Isabel Santa Sanchez, Carmen Annette Beltran, Vanessa Pintado-Rodriguez, Elsa Rodriguez-Valentin and Wilda Ramos-Roman. [19-1146] (KC) [Entered: 03/20/2019 11:32 AM]
March 15, 2019 MOTION for summary disposition filed by Appellees Caira Berly-Rivera, Mariely Garcia-Ruiz, Carlos Gomez-Cruz, Brendaliz Gonzalez-Mendez, Jorge Morales-Velazquez, Amner Ortiz-Lopez and Maria Vazquez-Mojica. Certificate of service dated 03/15/2019. [19-1146] (DRR) [Entered: 03/15/2019 11:29 AM]
March 15, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Carlos Gomez-Cruz, Mariely Garcia-Ruiz, Amner Ortiz-Lopez, Brendaliz Gonzalez-Mendez, Jorge Morales-Velazquez, Caira Berly-Rivera and Maria Vazquez-Mojica filed by Attorney David Rodriguez-Burns. Certificate of service dated 03/15/2019. [19-1146] (DRR) [Entered: 03/15/2019 11:11 AM]
March 12, 2019 Filing fee was paid in the district court by Appellants Carmen Annette Beltran, Idalia Colon-Rondon, Marta Elsa Fernandez-Pabellon, Tamara Luciano-Fernandez, Vanessa Pintado-Rodriguez, Wilda Ramos-Roman, Elsa Rodriguez-Valentin and Laura Isabel Santa Sanchez on 03/12/2019. [19-1146] (GK) [Entered: 03/12/2019 10:46 AM]
March 1, 2019 NOTICE issued. After 03/15/2019, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Wanda Vazquez-Garced for Marta Elsa Fernandez-Pabellon, Tamara Luciano-Fernandez, Idalia Colon-Rondon, Laura Isabel Santa Sanchez, Carmen Annette Beltran, Vanessa Pintado-Rodriguez, Elsa Rodriguez-Valentin and Wilda Ramos-Roman. [19-1146] (KC) [Entered: 03/01/2019 04:35 PM]
February 26, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Carmen Annette Beltran, Idalia Colon-Rondon, Marta Elsa Fernandez-Pabellon, Tamara Luciano-Fernandez, Vanessa Pintado-Rodriguez, Wilda Ramos-Roman, Elsa Rodriguez-Valentin and Laura Isabel Santa Sanchez indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 02/26/2019. [19-1146] (CL) [Entered: 02/26/2019 05:55 AM]
February 26, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Carmen Annette Beltran, Idalia Colon-Rondon, Marta Elsa Fernandez-Pabellon, Tamara Luciano-Fernandez, Vanessa Pintado-Rodriguez, Wilda Ramos-Roman, Elsa Rodriguez-Valentin and Laura Isabel Santa Sanchez. Certificate of service dated 02/26/2019. [19-1146] (CL) [Entered: 02/26/2019 05:54 AM]
February 25, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Carmen Annette Beltran, Idalia Colon-Rondon, Marta Elsa Fernandez-Pabellon, Tamara Luciano-Fernandez, Vanessa Pintado-Rodriguez, Wilda Ramos-Roman, Elsa Rodriguez-Valentin and Laura Isabel Santa Sanchez filed by Attorney Carlos Lugo-Fiol. Certificate of service dated 02/25/2019. [19-1146] (CL) [Entered: 02/25/2019 11:09 AM]
February 11, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #207) filed by Appellants Carmen Annette Beltran, Idalia Colon-Rondon, Marta Elsa Fernandez-Pabellon, Tamara Luciano-Fernandez, Vanessa Pintado-Rodriguez, Wilda Ramos-Roman, Elsa Rodriguez-Valentin and Laura Isabel Santa Sanchez. Docketing Statement and Appearance form due 02/25/2019. Fee due 02/25/2019. [19-1146] (KC) [Entered: 02/11/2019 04:18 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Gomez-Cruz, et al v. Fernandez-Pabellon, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARIELY GARCIA-RUIZ
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CAIRA BERLY-RIVERA
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARIA VAZQUEZ-MOJICA
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JORGE MORALES-VELAZQUEZ
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BRENDALIZ GONZALEZ-MENDEZ
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AMNER ORTIZ-LOPEZ
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CARLOS GOMEZ-CRUZ
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LAURA ISABEL SANTA SANCHEZ, in her personal capacity in her official capacity as Deputy Secretary of Human Resources and Labor Relations at the Department of Family of the Commonwealth of P.R.
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Wanda Vazquez-Garced
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Susana I. Penagaricano Brown
Represented By: Angel Juan Valencia-Gatell
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARTA ELSA FERNANDEZ-PABELLON, in her personal capacity and in her official capacity as Administrator of the Administration for the Socioeconomic Development of Families
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Wanda Vazquez-Garced
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Susana I. Penagaricano Brown
Represented By: Angel Juan Valencia-Gatell
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ELSA RODRIGUEZ-VALENTIN, in her capacity and in her official capacity as Deputy Administrator of Substitute care and Adoption at the Administration for Families and Children of the Commonwealth of P.R.
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Wanda Vazquez-Garced
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Susana I. Penagaricano Brown
Represented By: Angel Juan Valencia-Gatell
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TAMARA LUCIANO-FERNANDEZ, in her persinal capacity and in her official capacity as Deputy Administrator of Finance and Budget at the Administration for the Socioeconomic Development of Families
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Wanda Vazquez-Garced
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Susana I. Penagaricano Brown
Represented By: Angel Juan Valencia-Gatell
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: VANESSA PINTADO-RODRIGUEZ, in her personal capacity and in her official capacity as Administrator of the Administration for Families and Children of the Commonwealth of P.R.
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Wanda Vazquez-Garced
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Susana I. Penagaricano Brown
Represented By: Angel Juan Valencia-Gatell
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WILDA RAMOS-ROMAN, in her personal capacity and in her official capactity as Deputy Administrator of Human Resources and Labor Relations at the Administration for Families and Children of the Commonwealth of P.R.
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Wanda Vazquez-Garced
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Susana I. Penagaricano Brown
Represented By: Angel Juan Valencia-Gatell
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CARMEN ANNETTE BELTRAN, in her personal capacity and in her official capacity as Deputy Administrator of Human Resources and Labor Relations at the Administration for the Socioeconomic Development of Families
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Wanda Vazquez-Garced
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Susana I. Penagaricano Brown
Represented By: Angel Juan Valencia-Gatell
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: IDALIA COLON-RONDON, in her personal capacity and in her official as Secretary of the Department of the Family of the Commonwealth of P.R.
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Wanda Vazquez-Garced
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Susana I. Penagaricano Brown
Represented By: Angel Juan Valencia-Gatell
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TAMARA LUCIANO-FERNANDEZ, in her personal capacity and in her official capacity as Deputy Administrator of Finance and Budget at the Administration for the Socioeconomic Development of Families
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Wanda Vazquez-Garced
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Susana I. Penagaricano Brown
Represented By: Angel Juan Valencia-Gatell
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: IDALIA COLON-RONDON, in her personal capacity and in her official capacity as Secretary of the Department of the Family of the Commonwealth of P.R.
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Wanda Vazquez-Garced
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Susana I. Penagaricano Brown
Represented By: Angel Juan Valencia-Gatell
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WILDA RAMOS-ROMAN, in her personal capacity and in her official capacity as Deputy Administrator of Human Resources and Labor Relations at the Administration for Families and Children of the Commonwealth of P.R.
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Wanda Vazquez-Garced
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Susana I. Penagaricano Brown
Represented By: Angel Juan Valencia-Gatell
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ELSA RODRIGUEZ-VALENTIN, in her personal capacity and in her official capacity as Deputy Administrator of Substitute Care and Adoption at the Administration for Families and Children of the Commonwealth of P.R.
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Wanda Vazquez-Garced
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Susana I. Penagaricano Brown
Represented By: Angel Juan Valencia-Gatell
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?