Clarendon National Ins. Co. v. Philadelphia Indemnity Ins. Co
Plaintiff / Appellant: CLARENDON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant / Appellee: PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 19-1212
Filed: March 12, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 1, 2020 Summary Clarendon National Insurance Co. v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. Brief and Appendix due 06/05/2019 for appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. [19-1212] (GB) [Entered: 04/01/2019 02:13 PM]
March 28, 2019 CERTIFICATE of service for motion to extend time to file brief and/or appendix [ # 6242620-2 ] filed by Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2019. [19-1212] (JWD) [Entered: 03/28/2019 11:51 AM]
March 28, 2019 ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2019. [19-1212] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (JWD) [Entered: 03/28/2019 11:50 AM]
March 27, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and appendix due 05/06/2019 for appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1212] (GRC) [Entered: 03/27/2019 02:58 PM]
March 27, 2019 CERTIFICATE of service for transcript report/order form [ # 6242306-2 ] filed by Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1212] (JWD) [Entered: 03/27/2019 12:22 PM]
March 27, 2019 CERTIFICATE of service for docketing statement [ # 6242305-2 ] filed by Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1212] (JWD) [Entered: 03/27/2019 12:21 PM]
March 27, 2019 CERTIFICATE of service for notice of appearance [ # 6242304-2 ] filed by Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1212] (JWD) [Entered: 03/27/2019 12:19 PM]
March 27, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1212] (JWD) [Entered: 03/27/2019 11:45 AM]
March 27, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1212] (JWD) [Entered: 03/27/2019 11:43 AM]
March 27, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company filed by Attorney John W. Dennehy. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1212] (JWD) [Entered: 03/27/2019 11:42 AM]
March 27, 2019 NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file an appearance form, docketing statement and transcript report/order form or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript report/order form due 04/10/2019. [19-1212] (GRC) [Entered: 03/27/2019 10:26 AM]
March 18, 2019 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 03/18/2019. [19-1212] (DWZ) [Entered: 03/18/2019 01:37 PM]
March 18, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company filed by Attorney David W. Zizik. Certificate of service dated 03/18/2019. [19-1212] (DWZ) [Entered: 03/18/2019 01:33 PM]
March 12, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #36) filed by Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 03/26/2019. [19-1212] (GRC) [Entered: 03/12/2019 04:02 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Clarendon National Ins. Co. v. Philadelphia Indemnity Ins. Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CLARENDON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: John William Dennehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: David W. Zizik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?