Gelabert-De-Peguero, et al v. Rivera
Defendant: GILBERTO Y. FEBUS-PEREZ, as San Juan Municipal Police Officer, JOHN DOES, 1-100, LUIS A. BURGOS-NIEVES, as San Juan Municipal Police Officer, LUIS D. VASQUEZ-CRESPO, as San Juan Municipal Police Officer, CARMEN YULIN CRUZ SOTO, Mayor of San Juan, JERMARI SERRANO-BORRERO, as San Juan Municipal Police Officer, MUNICIPALITY OF SAN JUAN, GUILLERMO CALIXTO-RODRIGUEZ, Commissioner of the Municipality of San Juan Police, EDWIN ROSARIO-CORDOVA, as San Juan Municipal Police Officer, GILBERTO Y. FEBUS-PEREZ, San Juan Municipal Police Officer, EDWIN ROSARIO-CORDOVA, San Juan Municipal Police Officer, JERMARI SERRANO-BORRERO, San Juan Municipal Police Officer, LUIS D. VASQUEZ-CRESPO, San Juan Municipal Police Officer and LUIS A. BURGOS-NIEVES, San Juan Municipal Police Officer
Plaintiff / Appellee: MARIA CONFESOR-ROSARIO, GLENNIS GELABERT-DE-PEGUERO, NANCY ORFELINA-ALVAREZ, MELVIN PEGUERO-ROSARIO, Minor, STACY PEGUERO-ALVAREZ, Minor, M.P.-R., Minor and S.P.-A., Minor
Defendant / Appellant: ISMAEL RIVERA, Police Officer
Case Number: 19-1221
Filed: March 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 RESPONSE filed by Appellant Ismael Rivera to reply [ # 6246687-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 04/16/2019. [19-1221] (AAV) [Entered: 04/16/2019 01:27 PM]
April 12, 2019 REPLY filed by Appellees Maria Confesor-Rosario, M.P.-R., Nancy Orfelina-Alvarez, S.P.-A. and Glennis Gelabert-De-Peguero in 19-1221, 19-1226, 19-1227 to response [ # 6245919-2 ], response [ # 6245594-2 ], response [ # 6245292-2 ], response [ # 6244608-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 04/12/2019. [19-1221, 19-1226, 19-1227] (JAA) [Entered: 04/12/2019 05:39 PM]
April 8, 2019 RESPONSE filed by Appellant Ismael Rivera to order [ # 6240591-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 04/08/2019. [19-1221] (AAV) [Entered: 04/08/2019 06:04 PM]
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Upon consideration of motion, defendant-appellant Ismael Rivera's motion for leave to file a position on appealability is denied as moot in light of this court's March 19, 2019 order to show cause. Further, appellant's motion to extend time to file a response is allowed. Appellant shall file the response to the March 19, 2019 order on or before April 9, 2019 . [19-1221] (GRC) [Entered: 03/20/2019 04:06 PM]
March 19, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file a response filed by Appellant Ismael Rivera. Certificate of service dated 03/19/2019. [19-1221] (AAV) [Entered: 03/19/2019 05:23 PM]
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER to Show Cause entered directing appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Show cause response due 04/02/2019. [19-1221] (GRC) [Entered: 03/19/2019 04:33 PM]
March 18, 2019 MOTION for leave to file Position on Appealability filed by Appellant Ismael Rivera. Certificate of service dated 03/18/2019. [19-1221] (AAV) [Entered: 03/18/2019 01:42 PM]
March 14, 2019 CERTIFICATE of service for notice of appearance [ # 6239457-2 ] filed by Appellees Maria Confesor-Rosario, Nancy Orfelina-Alvarez, Stacy Peguero-Alvarez and Melvin Peguero-Rosario in 19-1221, 19-1226, 19-1227. Certificate of service dated 03/14/2019. [19-1221, 19-1226, 19-1227] (JAA) [Entered: 03/14/2019 11:35 AM]
March 14, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Maria Confesor-Rosario, Nancy Orfelina-Alvarez, Melvin Peguero-Rosario and Stacy Peguero-Alvarez in 19-1221 filed by Attorney Juan A. Albino. Certificate of service dated 03/14/2019. [19-1221] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional case 19-1226 and 19-1227. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (JAA) [Entered: 03/14/2019 11:19 AM]
March 11, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Ismael Rivera. Certificate of service dated 03/11/2019. [19-1221] (AAV) [Entered: 03/11/2019 06:51 PM]
March 11, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Ismael Rivera filed by Attorney Angel A. Valencia-Aponte. Certificate of service dated 03/11/2019. [19-1221] (AAV) [Entered: 03/11/2019 06:48 PM]
March 7, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #304) filed by Appellant Ismael Rivera. Appearance form due 03/21/2019. Docketing Statement due 03/21/2019. [19-1221] (GRC) [Entered: 03/07/2019 11:54 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Gelabert-De-Peguero, et al v. Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARIA CONFESOR-ROSARIO
Represented By: Juan A. Albino-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GLENNIS GELABERT-DE-PEGUERO
Represented By: Juan A. Albino-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NANCY ORFELINA-ALVAREZ
Represented By: Juan A. Albino-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MELVIN PEGUERO-ROSARIO, Minor
Represented By: Juan A. Albino-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STACY PEGUERO-ALVAREZ, Minor
Represented By: Juan A. Albino-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: M.P.-R., Minor
Represented By: Juan A. Albino-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: S.P.-A., Minor
Represented By: Juan A. Albino-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GILBERTO Y. FEBUS-PEREZ, as San Juan Municipal Police Officer
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES, 1-100
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUIS A. BURGOS-NIEVES, as San Juan Municipal Police Officer
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUIS D. VASQUEZ-CRESPO, as San Juan Municipal Police Officer
Represented By: Rosa Maria Cruz-Niemiec
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARMEN YULIN CRUZ SOTO, Mayor of San Juan
Represented By: Rosa Maria Cruz-Niemiec
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERMARI SERRANO-BORRERO, as San Juan Municipal Police Officer
Represented By: Rosa Maria Cruz-Niemiec
Represented By: Juan A. Albino-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUNICIPALITY OF SAN JUAN
Represented By: Rosa Maria Cruz-Niemiec
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUILLERMO CALIXTO-RODRIGUEZ, Commissioner of the Municipality of San Juan Police
Represented By: Rosa Maria Cruz-Niemiec
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWIN ROSARIO-CORDOVA, as San Juan Municipal Police Officer
Represented By: Rosa Maria Cruz-Niemiec
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GILBERTO Y. FEBUS-PEREZ, San Juan Municipal Police Officer
Represented By: Rosa Maria Cruz-Niemiec
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWIN ROSARIO-CORDOVA, San Juan Municipal Police Officer
Represented By: Rosa Maria Cruz-Niemiec
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERMARI SERRANO-BORRERO, San Juan Municipal Police Officer
Represented By: Rosa Maria Cruz-Niemiec
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUIS D. VASQUEZ-CRESPO, San Juan Municipal Police Officer
Represented By: Rosa Maria Cruz-Niemiec
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUIS A. BURGOS-NIEVES, San Juan Municipal Police Officer
Represented By: Rosa Maria Cruz-Niemiec
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ISMAEL RIVERA, Police Officer
Represented By: Rosa Maria Cruz-Niemiec
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?