Liviz v. Baker, et al
Defendant / Appellee: MICHAEL L. PARSON, Governor, DAVID IGE, Governor, JAY ROBERT PRITZKER, Governor, WILLIAM ASA HUTCHINSON, Governor, KAY E. IVEY, Governor, RONALD D. DESANTIS, Governor, GARY R. HERBERT, Governor, JANET T. MILLS, Governor, JOHN KEVIN STITT, Governor, CHARLES D. BAKER, Governor, GAVIN NEWSOM, Governor, ERIC J. HOLCOMB, Governor, MATT G. BEVIN, Governor, STEVE C. BULLOCK, Governor, HENRY D. MCMASTER, Governor, BRADLEY J. LITTLE, Governor, JAMES C. JUSTICE, Governor, JOHN BEL EDWARDS, Governor, MARK GORDON, Governor, STEVE F. SISOLAK, Governor, TIMOTHY J. WALZ, Governor, KRISTI NOEM, Governor, RALPH S. NORTHAM, Governor, GRETCHEN E. WHITMER, Governor, PHILIP D. MURPHY, Governor, ANDREW M. CUOMO, Governor, PHILIP B. SCOTT, Governor, LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, Governor, LAURA KELLY, Governor, MICHAEL J. DUNLEAVY, Governor, MICHELLE LUJAN GRISHAM, Governor, GINA M. RAIMONDO, Governor, MIKE DEWINE, Governor, ANTHONY S. EVERS, Governor, GREG ABBOTT, Governor, RAY COOPER, Governor, CHRIS SUNUNU, Governor, JARED POLIS, Governor, DEWEY P. BRYANT, Governor, DOUGLAS A. DUCEY, Governor, JAY INSLEE, Governor, JOHN CHARLES CARNEY, Governor, KIM K. REYNOLDS, Governor, BRIAN KEMP, Governor, WILLIAM B. LEE, Governor, EDWARD M. LAMONT, Governor, THOMAS WOLF, Governor and ROY COOPER, Governor
Plaintiff / Appellant: ILYA LIVIZ, SR.
Case Number: 19-1224
Filed: March 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 NOTICE issued. After 05/06/2019, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Hector H. Balderas for Michelle Lujan Grisham, Xavier Becerra for Gavin Newsom, Andrew Beshear for Matt G. Bevin, Mark Brnovich for Douglas A. Ducey, Christopher M. Carr for Brian Kemp, Kevin G. Clarkson for Michael J. Dunleavy, Clare E. Connors for David Ige, Thomas J. Donovan, Jr. for Philip B. Scott, Keith Ellison for Timothy J. Walz, Bob Ferguson for Jay Inslee, Aaron D. Ford for Steve F. Sisolak, Timothy Charles Fox for Steve C. Bullock, Aaron M. Frey for Janet T. Mills, Brian E. Frosh for Lawrence J. Hogan, Gurbir S. Grewal for Philip D. Murphy, Mark R. Herring for Ralph S. Northam, Bridget Hill for Mark Gordon, Curtis Theophilus Hill, Jr. for Eric J. Holcomb, Jim Hood for Dewey P. Bryant, Mike Hunter for John Kevin Stitt, Letitia James for Andrew M. Cuomo, Kathy Jennings for John Charles Carney, Joshua L. Kaul for Anthony S. Evers, Jeff Landry for John Bel Edwards, Steve Marshall for Kay E. Ivey, Thomas J. Miller for Kim K. Reynolds, Ashley Moody for Ronald D. DeSantis, Patrick Morrisey for James C. Justice, Dana Nessel for Gretchen E. Whitmer, Kenneth Paxton, Jr. for Greg Abbott, Kwame Raoul for Jay Robert Pritzker, Jason Ravnsborg for Kristi Noem, Sean D. Reyes for Gary R. Herbert, Leslie Rutledge for William Asa Hutchinson, Derek Schmidt for Laura Kelly, Eric Schmitt for Michael L. Parson, Josh Shapiro for Thomas Wolf, Herbert H. Slatery, III for William B. Lee, Josh Stein for Roy Cooper, William M. Tong for Edward M. Lamont, Lawrence G. Wasden for Bradley J. Little, Philip J. Weiser for Jared Polis, Alan Wilson for Henry D. McMaster and David A. Yost for Mike DeWine. [19-1224] (AL) [Entered: 04/22/2019 08:43 AM]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: In an electronic order entered on February 27, 2019 in No. 1:19-cv-10304-WGY (D. Mass.), the district court certified pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) and Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(3)(A) that the appeal is not taken in good faith. If appellant seeks to challenge the district courts certification, plaintiff-appellant must file a motion pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(5) provided that appellant does so before May 10, 2019 . Accordingly, on or before May 10, 2019 , appellant must either pay the $505 filing fee to the district court or file a motion in this court pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(5). Failure to take either action will lead to dismissal of the appeal for lack of prosecution. See 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). [19-1224] (AL) [Entered: 04/10/2019 01:38 PM]
April 5, 2019 CORRECTED NOTICE* of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file an appearance form and docketing statement or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). *Corrected order issued to amend the text of the order. [19-1224] (AL) [Entered: 04/05/2019 10:00 AM]
March 29, 2019 NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file an appearance form and docketing statement or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Appearance form and Docketing Statement due 04/12/2019. [19-1224] (AL) [Entered: 03/29/2019 04:42 PM]
March 11, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #15) filed by Appellant Ilya Liviz, Sr.. Docketing Statement due 03/25/2019. Appearance form due 03/25/2019. [19-1224] (AL) [Entered: 03/11/2019 04:00 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Liviz v. Baker, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL L. PARSON, Governor
Represented By: Eric Schmitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID IGE, Governor
Represented By: Clare E. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAY ROBERT PRITZKER, Governor
Represented By: Kwame Raoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM ASA HUTCHINSON, Governor
Represented By: Leslie Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAY E. IVEY, Governor
Represented By: Steve Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RONALD D. DESANTIS, Governor
Represented By: Ashley Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GARY R. HERBERT, Governor
Represented By: Sean D. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANET T. MILLS, Governor
Represented By: Aaron M. Frey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN KEVIN STITT, Governor
Represented By: Mike Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES D. BAKER, Governor
Represented By: Maura T. Healey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GAVIN NEWSOM, Governor
Represented By: Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERIC J. HOLCOMB, Governor
Represented By: Curtis Theophilus Hill Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATT G. BEVIN, Governor
Represented By: Andrew Beshear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVE C. BULLOCK, Governor
Represented By: Timothy Charles Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HENRY D. MCMASTER, Governor
Represented By: Alan Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRADLEY J. LITTLE, Governor
Represented By: Lawrence G. Wasden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES C. JUSTICE, Governor
Represented By: Patrick Morrisey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN BEL EDWARDS, Governor
Represented By: Jeff Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK GORDON, Governor
Represented By: Bridget Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVE F. SISOLAK, Governor
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIMOTHY J. WALZ, Governor
Represented By: Keith Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KRISTI NOEM, Governor
Represented By: Jason Ravnsborg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RALPH S. NORTHAM, Governor
Represented By: Mark R. Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GRETCHEN E. WHITMER, Governor
Represented By: Dana Nessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILIP D. MURPHY, Governor
Represented By: Gurbir S. Grewal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDREW M. CUOMO, Governor
Represented By: Letitia James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILIP B. SCOTT, Governor
Represented By: Thomas J. Donovan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, Governor
Represented By: Brian E. Frosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAURA KELLY, Governor
Represented By: Derek Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL J. DUNLEAVY, Governor
Represented By: Kevin G. Clarkson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHELLE LUJAN GRISHAM, Governor
Represented By: Hector H. Balderas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GINA M. RAIMONDO, Governor
Represented By: Peter F. Neronha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIKE DEWINE, Governor
Represented By: David A. Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANTHONY S. EVERS, Governor
Represented By: Joshua L. Kaul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREG ABBOTT, Governor
Represented By: Kenneth Paxton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RAY COOPER, Governor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRIS SUNUNU, Governor
Represented By: Gordon J. MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JARED POLIS, Governor
Represented By: Philip J. Weiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEWEY P. BRYANT, Governor
Represented By: Jim Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOUGLAS A. DUCEY, Governor
Represented By: Mark Brnovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAY INSLEE, Governor
Represented By: Bob Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN CHARLES CARNEY, Governor
Represented By: Kathy Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIM K. REYNOLDS, Governor
Represented By: Thomas J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRIAN KEMP, Governor
Represented By: Christopher M. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM B. LEE, Governor
Represented By: Herbert H. Slatery III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EDWARD M. LAMONT, Governor
Represented By: William M. Tong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS WOLF, Governor
Represented By: Josh Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROY COOPER, Governor
Represented By: Josh Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ILYA LIVIZ, SR.
Represented By: Ilya Liviz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?