Gelabert-De-Peguero, et al v. Cruz Soto, et al
Defendant: ISMAEL RIVERA, Police Officer, JOHN DOES, 1-100, LUIS A. BURGOS-NIEVES, as San Juan Municipal Police Officer, LUIS D. VASQUEZ-CRESPO, as San Juan Municipal Police Officer, JERMARI SERRANO-BORRERO, as San Juan Municipal Police Officer, GILBERTO Y. FEBUS-PEREZ, as San Juan Municipal Police Officer, MUNICIPALITY OF SAN JUAN, EDWIN ROSARIO-CORDOVA, as San Juan Municipal Police Officer, GILBERTO Y. FEBUS-PEREZ, San Juan Municipal Police Officer, EDWIN ROSARIO-CORDOVA, San Juan Municipal Police Officer, JERMARI SERRANO-BORRERO, San Juan Municipal Police Officer, LUIS D. VASQUEZ-CRESPO, San Juan Municipal Police Officer and LUIS A. BURGOS-NIEVES, San Juan Municipal Police Officer
Plaintiff / Appellee: MARIA CONFESOR-ROSARIO, GLENNIS GELABERT-DE-PEGUERO, NANCY ORFELINA-ALVAREZ, MELVIN PEGUERO-ROSARIO, Minor, STACY PEGUERO-ALVAREZ, Minor, M.P.-R., Minor and S.P.-A., Minor
Defendant / Appellant: GUILLERMO CALIXTO-RODRIGUEZ, Commissioner of the Municipality of San Juan Police and CARMEN YULIN CRUZ SOTO, Mayor of San Juan
Case Number: 19-1226
Filed: March 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 RESPONSE filed by Appellants Guillermo Calixto-Rodriguez and Carmen Yulin Cruz Soto to reply [ # 6246687-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 04/23/2019. [19-1226] (RMC) [Entered: 04/23/2019 01:21 PM]
April 22, 2019 RESPONSE filed by Appellants Guillermo Calixto-Rodriguez and Carmen Yulin Cruz Soto to reply [ # 6246687-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 04/22/2019. [19-1226] CLERK'S NOTE: The wrong PDF file was attached. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS (04/25/2019). (RMC) [Entered: 04/22/2019 12:47 PM]
April 12, 2019 REPLY filed by Appellees Maria Confesor-Rosario, M.P.-R., Nancy Orfelina-Alvarez, S.P.-A. and Glennis Gelabert-De-Peguero in 19-1221, 19-1226, 19-1227 to response [ # 6245919-2 ], response [ # 6245594-2 ], response [ # 6245292-2 ], response [ # 6244608-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 04/12/2019. [19-1221, 19-1226, 19-1227] (JAA) [Entered: 04/12/2019 05:39 PM]
April 4, 2019 MOTION Showing Cause for Interlocutory Appeal and RESPONSE to order for lack of jurisdiction [ # 6240859-2 ] filed by Not Parties Edwin Rosario-Cordova and Jermari Serrano-Borrero. Certificate of service dated 04/04/2019. [19-1226] CLERK'S NOTE: Document was filed in wrong case. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (RSM) [Entered: 04/04/2019 06:04 PM]
April 4, 2019 RESPONSE to order for lack of jurisdiction [ # 6240859-2 ] filed by Appellants Guillermo Calixto-Rodriguez and Carmen Yulin Cruz Soto. Certificate of service dated 04/04/2019. [19-1226] CLERK'S NOTE: The ECF filer did not select the option that best describes the document. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (RMC) [Entered: 04/04/2019 05:22 PM]
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file response filed by Appellants Guillermo Calixto-Rodriguez and Carmen Yulin Cruz Soto. Response to show cause order due 04/05/2019. [19-1226] (GRC) [Entered: 04/03/2019 04:08 PM]
April 2, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file a response filed by Appellants Guillermo Calixto-Rodriguez and Carmen Yulin Cruz Soto. Certificate of service dated 04/02/2019. [19-1226] (RMC) [Entered: 04/02/2019 07:33 AM]
March 20, 2019 CORRECTD ORDER* to Show Cause entered directing appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Show cause response due 04/03/2019. [19-1226]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to replace an attachment. *Corrected notice issued to amend the caption. (GRC) [Entered: 03/20/2019 04:55 PM]
March 14, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Maria Confesor-Rosario, Nancy Orfelina-Alvarez, Stacy Peguero-Alvarez and Melvin Peguero-Rosario in 19-1226 filed by Attorney Juan A. Albino. Certificate of service dated 03/14/2019. [19-1226] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional cases 19-1221 and 19-1227. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. . (JAA) [Entered: 03/14/2019 11:50 AM]
March 14, 2019 CERTIFICATE of service for notice of appearance [ # 6239457-2 ] filed by Appellees Maria Confesor-Rosario, Nancy Orfelina-Alvarez, Stacy Peguero-Alvarez and Melvin Peguero-Rosario in 19-1221, 19-1226, 19-1227. Certificate of service dated 03/14/2019. [19-1221, 19-1226, 19-1227] (JAA) [Entered: 03/14/2019 11:35 AM]
March 12, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Carmen Yulin Cruz Soto and Guillermo Calixto-Rodriguez. Certificate of service dated 03/12/2019. [19-1226] (RMC) [Entered: 03/12/2019 07:41 AM]
March 12, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Carmen Yulin Cruz Soto and Guillermo Calixto-Rodriguez filed by Attorney Rosa Maria Cruz Niemiec. Certificate of service dated 03/12/2019. [19-1226] (RMC) [Entered: 03/12/2019 07:40 AM]
March 7, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #305) filed by Appellants Guillermo Calixto-Rodriguez and Carmen Yulin Cruz. Appearance form due 03/21/2019. Docketing Statement due 03/21/2019. [19-1226]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to replace an attachment. (GRC) [Entered: 03/07/2019 02:04 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Gelabert-De-Peguero, et al v. Cruz Soto, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARIA CONFESOR-ROSARIO
Represented By: Juan A. Albino-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GLENNIS GELABERT-DE-PEGUERO
Represented By: Juan A. Albino-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NANCY ORFELINA-ALVAREZ
Represented By: Juan A. Albino-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MELVIN PEGUERO-ROSARIO, Minor
Represented By: Juan A. Albino-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STACY PEGUERO-ALVAREZ, Minor
Represented By: Juan A. Albino-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: M.P.-R., Minor
Represented By: Juan A. Albino-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: S.P.-A., Minor
Represented By: Juan A. Albino-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISMAEL RIVERA, Police Officer
Represented By: Rosa Maria Cruz-Niemiec
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES, 1-100
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUIS A. BURGOS-NIEVES, as San Juan Municipal Police Officer
Represented By: Rosa Maria Cruz-Niemiec
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUIS D. VASQUEZ-CRESPO, as San Juan Municipal Police Officer
Represented By: Rosa Maria Cruz-Niemiec
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERMARI SERRANO-BORRERO, as San Juan Municipal Police Officer
Represented By: Rosa Maria Cruz-Niemiec
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GILBERTO Y. FEBUS-PEREZ, as San Juan Municipal Police Officer
Represented By: Rosa Maria Cruz-Niemiec
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUNICIPALITY OF SAN JUAN
Represented By: Rosa Maria Cruz-Niemiec
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWIN ROSARIO-CORDOVA, as San Juan Municipal Police Officer
Represented By: Rosa Maria Cruz-Niemiec
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GILBERTO Y. FEBUS-PEREZ, San Juan Municipal Police Officer
Represented By: Rosa Maria Cruz-Niemiec
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWIN ROSARIO-CORDOVA, San Juan Municipal Police Officer
Represented By: Rosa Maria Cruz-Niemiec
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERMARI SERRANO-BORRERO, San Juan Municipal Police Officer
Represented By: Rosa Maria Cruz-Niemiec
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUIS D. VASQUEZ-CRESPO, San Juan Municipal Police Officer
Represented By: Rosa Maria Cruz-Niemiec
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUIS A. BURGOS-NIEVES, San Juan Municipal Police Officer
Represented By: Rosa Maria Cruz-Niemiec
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GUILLERMO CALIXTO-RODRIGUEZ, Commissioner of the Municipality of San Juan Police
Represented By: Rosa Maria Cruz-Niemiec
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CARMEN YULIN CRUZ SOTO, Mayor of San Juan
Represented By: Rosa Maria Cruz-Niemiec
Represented By: Angel A. Valencia-Aponte
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?