Bishay, et al v. Supreme Court of MA, et al
Defendant / Appellee: MERRILL LYNCH CREDIT CORP., a/k/a Bank of America, N.A., JON FREEMAN, REAL ESTATE GROWTH FUND, LLC, SCOTT KAFKER, in individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts, BARBARA A. LENK, in individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts, RALPH D. GANTS, in his individual and official capacity as Chief Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts, PETER D. KYBURG, DAVID A. LOWY, in individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts, ELSPETH B. CYPHER, in individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts, KIMBERLY SUZANNE BUDD, in individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts, MICHAEL P. GIUNTA, MASSACHUSETTS SUPREME JUDICIAL COURT, FRANK M. GAZIANO, in individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts, BARBARA A. LENK, in her individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts, ELSPETH B. CYPHER, in her individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts, FRANK M. GAZIANO, in his individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts, SCOTT KAFKER, in his individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts, DAVID A. LOWY, in her individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts and KIMBERLY SUZANNE BUDD, in her individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts
Plaintiff / Appellant: MARY T. BISHAY and BAHIG F. BISHAY
Case Number: 19-1257
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2019 MOTION for leave to file oversized brief filed by Appellants Bahig F. Bishay and Mary T. Bishay. Certificate of service dated 05/06/2019. [19-1257] (GRC) [Entered: 05/07/2019 10:17 AM]
May 6, 2019 BRIEF tendered by Appellants Bahig F. Bishay and Mary T. Bishay. [19-1257] CLERK'S NOTE: Additional attachments must be filed separately. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (BFB) [Entered: 05/06/2019 02:25 PM]
April 29, 2019 Request to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal filed by Appellants Bahig F. Bishay and Mary T. Bishay was granted in the district court by order dated 04/09/2019. [19-1257] (GK) [Entered: 04/29/2019 09:03 AM]
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: 60 (Electronic Order entered on April 9, 2019 by Judge Sorokin granting [59] Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis). [19-1257] (GK) [Entered: 04/29/2019 09:02 AM]
April 25, 2019 NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: John E. McCann, III for Merrill Lynch Credit Corp.. [19-1257] (GRC) [Entered: 04/25/2019 04:51 PM]
April 5, 2019 NOTICE issued. After 04/19/2019, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: John E. McCann, III for Merrill Lynch Credit Corp.. [19-1257] (GRC) [Entered: 04/05/2019 03:51 PM]
March 28, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Kimberly Suzanne Budd, Elspeth B. Cypher, Ralph D. Gants, Frank M. Gaziano, Scott Kafker, Barbara A. Lenk, David A. Lowy and SJC filed by Attorney Elizabeth Kaplan. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2019. [19-1257] (EAK) [Entered: 03/28/2019 03:13 PM]
March 27, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Merrill Lynch Credit Corp. filed by Attorney Connie Flores Jones. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1257] (CFJ) [Entered: 03/27/2019 12:08 PM]
March 26, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and appendix due 05/06/2019 for appellant Bahig F. Bishay and Mary T. Bishay. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1257] (GRC) [Entered: 03/26/2019 04:54 PM]
March 25, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Bahig F. Bishay. Certificate of service dated 03/25/2019. [19-1257] (BFB) [Entered: 03/25/2019 09:54 AM]
March 18, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #51) filed by Appellants Bahig F. Bishay and Mary T. Bishay. Fee due 04/01/2019. [19-1257] (GRC) [Entered: 03/18/2019 04:25 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bishay, et al v. Supreme Court of MA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MERRILL LYNCH CREDIT CORP., a/k/a Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: John E. McCann III
Represented By: Connie Flores Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JON FREEMAN
Represented By: Robert R. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REAL ESTATE GROWTH FUND, LLC
Represented By: Robert R. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT KAFKER, in individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BARBARA A. LENK, in individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RALPH D. GANTS, in his individual and official capacity as Chief Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PETER D. KYBURG
Represented By: Robert R. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID A. LOWY, in individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELSPETH B. CYPHER, in individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIMBERLY SUZANNE BUDD, in individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL P. GIUNTA
Represented By: Charles F. Rourke II
Represented By: Edward T. Hinchey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MASSACHUSETTS SUPREME JUDICIAL COURT
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRANK M. GAZIANO, in individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BARBARA A. LENK, in her individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELSPETH B. CYPHER, in her individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRANK M. GAZIANO, in his individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT KAFKER, in his individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID A. LOWY, in her individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIMBERLY SUZANNE BUDD, in her individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARY T. BISHAY
Represented By: Mary T. Bishay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BAHIG F. BISHAY
Represented By: Bahig F. Bishay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?