Xu v. Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang, et al
Plaintiff: FEI XIE and XIAO WEI YANG CATERING LINKAGE IN INNER MONGOLIA CO., LTD
Undetermined: FRANK XU
Defendant / Appellee: CHENG XU, INNER MONGOLIA XIAO WEI YANG USA, INC., d/b/a Xiao Wei Yang, d/b/a Little Lamb Restaurant and YONGHUA QIN
Case Number: 19-1267
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2019 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Deborah J. Peckham for Appellees Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Cheng Xu and Yonghua Qin. Copy of Notice issued April 12, 2019. Forwarding address unknown. [19-1267] (ZN) [Entered: 05/07/2019 03:19 PM]
May 6, 2019 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Deborah J. Peckham for Appellees Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Cheng Xu and Yonghua Qin. Copy of Notice issued April 30, 2019. Forwarding address unknown. [19-1267] (ZN) [Entered: 05/07/2019 03:16 PM]
April 30, 2019 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Deborah J. Peckham for Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Cheng Xu and Yonghua Qin, Aaron S. Welo for Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Cheng Xu and Yonghua Qin and Jonathan W. Lent for Xiao Wei Yang Catering Linkage In Inner Mongolia Co., Ltd and Fei Xie. [19-1267] (GRC) [Entered: 04/30/2019 01:31 PM]
April 29, 2019 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Jonathan W. Lent for Not Parties Xiao Wei Yang Catering Linkage In Inner Mongolia Co., Ltd and Fei Xie. Copy of Notice issued April 12, 2019. Forwarded to 375 Totten Pond Road Waltham, MA 02451. [19-1267] (ZN) [Entered: 04/30/2019 09:18 AM]
April 29, 2019 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Deborah J. Peckham for Appellees Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Cheng Xu and Yonghua Qin. Copy of Notice issued April 12, 2019. Forwarded to Testa, Hurwitz & Thibeault 125 Summer Street Boston, MA 02110. [19-1267] (ZN) [Entered: 04/30/2019 09:16 AM]
April 17, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellees Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Yonghua Qin and Cheng Xu indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 04/17/2019. [19-1267] (LRS) [Entered: 04/17/2019 06:19 PM]
April 12, 2019 NOTICE issued. After 04/26/2019, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Deborah J. Peckham for Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Cheng Xu and Yonghua Qin, Aaron S. Welo for Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Cheng Xu and Yonghua Qin and Jonathan W. Lent for Xiao Wei Yang Catering Linkage In Inner Mongolia Co., Ltd and Fei Xie. [19-1267]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to attach a missing document. (GRC) [Entered: 04/12/2019 04:53 PM]
April 9, 2019 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Jonathan W. Lent for Not Parties Xiao Wei Yang Catering Linkage In Inner Mongolia Co., Ltd and Fei Xie. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued March 20, 2019. Forwarded to 375 Totten Pond Rd Waltham, MA 02451. [19-1267] (ZN) [Entered: 04/11/2019 12:46 PM]
April 8, 2019 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Deborah J. Peckham for Appellees Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Cheng Xu and Yonghua Qin. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued March 20, 2019. Forwarded to 125 Summer St Boston, MA 02110. [19-1267] (ZN) [Entered: 04/11/2019 12:50 PM]
April 3, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Frank Xu indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 04/03/2019. [19-1267] (KTP) [Entered: 04/03/2019 12:45 PM]
April 3, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Frank Xu. Certificate of service dated 04/03/2019. [19-1267] (KTP) [Entered: 04/03/2019 12:43 PM]
April 3, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Frank Xu filed by Attorney Kevin T. Peters. Certificate of service dated 04/03/2019. [19-1267] (KTP) [Entered: 04/03/2019 12:40 PM]
March 29, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Yonghua Qin and Cheng Xu filed by Attorney Robert J. O'Regan. Certificate of service dated 03/29/2019. [19-1267] (RJO) [Entered: 03/29/2019 01:21 PM]
March 29, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Yonghua Qin and Cheng Xu filed by Attorney Laura R. Studen. Certificate of service dated 03/29/2019. [19-1267] (LRS) [Entered: 03/29/2019 01:03 PM]
March 20, 2019 SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entry: 221 (judgment). [19-1267] (GRC) [Entered: 03/20/2019 11:26 AM]
March 20, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #218) filed by Appellant Frank Xu. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 04/03/2019. [19-1267] (GRC) [Entered: 03/20/2019 11:21 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Xu v. Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: FRANK XU
Represented By: Jason E. Armiger
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Peters
Represented By: James S. Bolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEI XIE
Represented By: Frank Xu
Represented By: Michael A. Albert
Represented By: Hunter D. Keeton
Represented By: Jonathan W. Lent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XIAO WEI YANG CATERING LINKAGE IN INNER MONGOLIA CO., LTD
Represented By: Frank Xu
Represented By: Michael A. Albert
Represented By: Hunter D. Keeton
Represented By: Jonathan W. Lent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHENG XU
Represented By: Laura R. Studen
Represented By: Todd J. Bennett
Represented By: Catherine Elizabeth Brady Murillo
Represented By: Aaron S. Welo
Represented By: Deborah J. Peckham
Represented By: Sara Yevics Beccia
Represented By: Aaron Y. Silverstein
Represented By: Robert J. O'Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INNER MONGOLIA XIAO WEI YANG USA, INC., d/b/a Xiao Wei Yang, d/b/a Little Lamb Restaurant
Represented By: Laura R. Studen
Represented By: Todd J. Bennett
Represented By: Catherine Elizabeth Brady Murillo
Represented By: Aaron S. Welo
Represented By: Deborah J. Peckham
Represented By: Sara Yevics Beccia
Represented By: Aaron Y. Silverstein
Represented By: Robert J. O'Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: YONGHUA QIN
Represented By: Laura R. Studen
Represented By: Todd J. Bennett
Represented By: Catherine Elizabeth Brady Murillo
Represented By: Aaron S. Welo
Represented By: Deborah J. Peckham
Represented By: Sara Yevics Beccia
Represented By: Aaron Y. Silverstein
Represented By: Robert J. O'Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?