Rios-Rodriguez, et al v. FDIC, et al
Plaintiff: GISELLE I. PASTRANA-CHICALNA, HECTOR PADILLA-MEDINA, MAYRA GONZALEZ, MAYRA L. SANTIAGO-MARTINEZ, JAVIER S. COLON, SILVESTRE J. VELEZ-CRUZ, MAYRA SANTIAGO-VEGA, SADHIA VAZQUEZ, EMPRESAS MARTINEZ, ULADIA DEL JESUS-MARTINEZ, ARQUIMIDES SANCHEZ-GARCIA, DAVID VARGAS-RUIZ, HARY PACHECO, ENID ENCARNACION, JEFFRY JAVIER PEREZ-CABAN, FABIAN HERNANDEZ-FERNANDEZ, ISRAEL MARTINEZ, ADRIAN HERNANDEZ-GONZALEZ, INEABELLE TIRADO-RIVERA, JESUS M. DIAZ-RIVERA, WALESKA TORRES-TORO, MELISSA DAVILA-RIVERA, SHELMY SIERRA-DIAZ, JULIA PENA-DE-JESUS, MARIA PEREZ-OTERO and LUIS E. CONCEPCION-NUNEZ
Defendant: MARIA DEL CARMEN MURILLO-VELEZ, BUILDTECH CONTRACTOR CORP., DORAL MORTGAGE, JORGE A. RIOS-PULPEIRO, UNIVERSAL INSURANCE, MAPFRE INSURANCE COMPANY, DORAL BANK, HILLVIEW CONDOMINIUM CORP. and BUILDERS GROUP & DEVELOPMENT CORP.
Plaintiff / Appellant: JULIO C. OTERO-GONZALEZ, ERIKA MIRANDA-ACEVEDO, REBECA GONZALEZ-PEREZ, JOSE WILKES HUERTAS, MARTIN DE LEON, ROSE MARIE VELEZ-RODRIGUEZ, LARIMAR BERAS, ERIK CASTILLO-PEREZ, JULIANETTE ROJAS-CHEVEREY, LUZ M. MIRANDA-HERNANDEZ, JESUS AGOSTO-SANCHEZ, HECTOR J. COLON-HERNANDEZ, EVELYN RAMOS-PABON, LISA R. CASANOVA-DEL MORAL, WANDA OTERO, JUAN S. VELEZ, LOURDES RODRIGUEZ-RUIZ, JOSE E. CORUJO-ALEJANDRO, XAVIER HERNANDEZ-GONZALEZ, BEATRIZ CHAPMAN-MARTINEZ, KELVIN RIOS-RODRIGUEZ, JULIO A. CORTES, EDUARDO FIRPI, WANDA I. OTERO NAVIA, MARTIN DE LEON CORNELIO, SHADIA VAZQUEZ BERNABER, JULIANETTE ROJAS-CHEVERE and REBECCA GONZALEZ-PEREZ
Defendant / Appellee: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, as Receiver for Doral Bank and ACE INSURANCE CO.
Case Number: 19-1288
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2019 Filing fee was paid in the district court by Appellants Jesus Agosto-Sanchez, Larimar Beras, Lisa R. Casanova-Del Moral, Erik Castillo-Perez, Beatriz Chapman-Martinez, Hector J. Colon-Hernandez, Julio A. Cortes, Jose E. Corujo-Alejandro, Eduardo Firpi, Rebecca Gonzalez-Perez, Xavier Hernandez-Gonzalez, Erika Miranda-Acevedo, Luz M. Miranda-Hernandez, Wanda I. Otero Navia, Julio C. Otero-Gonzalez, Evelyn Ramos-Pabon, Kelvin Rios-Rodriguez, Lourdes Rodriguez-Ruiz, Julianette Rojas-Chevere, Shadia Vazquez Bernaber, Juan S. Velez, Rose Marie Velez-Rodriguez, Jose Wilkes Huertas and Martin de Leon Cornelio on 05/09/2019. [19-1288] (GK) [Entered: 05/10/2019 10:45 AM]
May 7, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 06/17/2019 for appellants Jesus Agosto-Sanchez, Larimar Beras, Lisa R. Casanova-Del Moral, Erik Castillo-Perez, Beatriz Chapman-Martinez, Hector J. Colon-Hernandez, Julio A. Cortes, Jose E. Corujo-Alejandro, Eduardo Firpi, Rebecca Gonzalez-Perez, Xavier Hernandez-Gonzalez, Erika Miranda-Acevedo, Luz M. Miranda-Hernandez, Wanda I. Otero Navia, Julio C. Otero-Gonzalez, Evelyn Ramos-Pabon, Kelvin Rios-Rodriguez, Lourdes Rodriguez-Ruiz, Julianette Rojas-Chevere, Shadia Vazquez Bernaber, Juan S. Velez, Rose Marie Velez-Rodriguez, Jose Wilkes Huertas and Martin de Leon Cornelio. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1288] (GB) [Entered: 05/07/2019 02:14 PM]
April 23, 2019 CERTIFICATE of service for notice of appearance [ # 6248948-2 ] filed by Appellee ACE Insurance Co.. Certificate of service dated 04/23/2019. [19-1288] (KCS) [Entered: 04/23/2019 03:57 PM]
April 23, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee ACE Insurance Co. filed by Attorney Kenneth C. Suria. Certificate of service dated 04/23/2019. [19-1288] (KCS) [Entered: 04/23/2019 03:21 PM]
April 22, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee FDIC filed by Attorney Jairo Mellado-Villarreal. Certificate of service dated 04/22/2019. [19-1288] (JAM) [Entered: 04/22/2019 02:48 PM]
April 22, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee FDIC filed by Attorney Tessie M. Leal-Garabis. Certificate of service dated 04/22/2019. [19-1288] (TML) [Entered: 04/22/2019 02:44 PM]
April 22, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee FDIC filed by Attorney Kathleen V. Gunning. Certificate of service dated 04/22/2019. [19-1288] (KVG) [Entered: 04/22/2019 12:12 PM]
April 8, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Jesus Agosto-Sanchez, Larimar Beras, Lisa R. Casanova-Del Moral, Erik Castillo-Perez, Beatriz Chapman-Martinez, Hector J. Colon-Hernandez, Julio A. Cortes, Jose E. Corujo-Alejandro, Martin De Leon, Eduardo Firpi, Rebeca Gonzalez-Perez, Xavier Hernandez-Gonzalez, Erika Miranda-Acevedo, Luz M. Miranda-Hernandez, Wanda Otero, Julio C. Otero-Gonzalez, Evelyn Ramos-Pabon, Kelvin Rios-Rodriguez, Lourdes Rodriguez-Ruiz, Juan S. Velez, Rose Marie Velez-Rodriguez and Jose Wilkes Huertas. Certificate of service dated 04/08/2019. [19-1288] (NR) [Entered: 04/08/2019 05:46 PM]
April 8, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Jesus Agosto-Sanchez, Larimar Beras, Lisa R. Casanova-Del Moral, Erik Castillo-Perez, Beatriz Chapman-Martinez, Hector J. Colon-Hernandez, Julio A. Cortes, Jose E. Corujo-Alejandro, Martin De Leon, Eduardo Firpi, Rebeca Gonzalez-Perez, Xavier Hernandez-Gonzalez, Erika Miranda-Acevedo, Luz M. Miranda-Hernandez, Wanda Otero, Julio C. Otero-Gonzalez, Evelyn Ramos-Pabon, Kelvin Rios-Rodriguez, Lourdes Rodriguez-Ruiz, Julianette Rojas-Cheverey, Juan S. Velez, Rose Marie Velez-Rodriguez and Jose Wilkes Huertas filed by Attorney Nelson Robles-Diaz. Certificate of service dated 04/08/2019. [19-1288] (NR) [Entered: 04/08/2019 05:44 PM]
April 5, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #75) filed by Appellants Jesus Agosto-Sanchez, Larimar Beras, Lisa R. Casanova-Del Moral, Erik Castillo-Perez, Beatriz Chapman-Martinez, Hector J. Colon-Hernandez, Julio A. Cortes, Jose E. Corujo-Alejandro, Martin De Leon, Eduardo Firpi, Rebeca Gonzalez-Perez, Xavier Hernandez-Gonzalez, Erika Miranda-Acevedo, Luz M. Miranda-Hernandez, Wanda Otero, Julio C. Otero-Gonzalez, Evelyn Ramos-Pabon, Kelvin Rios-Rodriguez, Lourdes Rodriguez-Ruiz, Julianette Rojas-Cheverey, Juan S. Velez, Rose Marie Velez-Rodriguez and Jose Wilkes Huertas. Fee due 04/22/2019 . Appearance form and Docketing Statement due 04/22/2019 . [19-1288] (GB) [Entered: 04/06/2019 05:00 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Rios-Rodriguez, et al v. FDIC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JULIO C. OTERO-GONZALEZ
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ERIKA MIRANDA-ACEVEDO
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: REBECA GONZALEZ-PEREZ
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE WILKES HUERTAS
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARTIN DE LEON
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROSE MARIE VELEZ-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LARIMAR BERAS
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ERIK CASTILLO-PEREZ
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JULIANETTE ROJAS-CHEVEREY
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LUZ M. MIRANDA-HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JESUS AGOSTO-SANCHEZ
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HECTOR J. COLON-HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EVELYN RAMOS-PABON
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LISA R. CASANOVA-DEL MORAL
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WANDA OTERO
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JUAN S. VELEZ
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LOURDES RODRIGUEZ-RUIZ
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE E. CORUJO-ALEJANDRO
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: XAVIER HERNANDEZ-GONZALEZ
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BEATRIZ CHAPMAN-MARTINEZ
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KELVIN RIOS-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JULIO A. CORTES
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDUARDO FIRPI
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WANDA I. OTERO NAVIA
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARTIN DE LEON CORNELIO
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHADIA VAZQUEZ BERNABER
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JULIANETTE ROJAS-CHEVERE
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: REBECCA GONZALEZ-PEREZ
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIA DEL CARMEN MURILLO-VELEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUILDTECH CONTRACTOR CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DORAL MORTGAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JORGE A. RIOS-PULPEIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSAL INSURANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAPFRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DORAL BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HILLVIEW CONDOMINIUM CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUILDERS GROUP & DEVELOPMENT CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GISELLE I. PASTRANA-CHICALNA
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HECTOR PADILLA-MEDINA
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAYRA GONZALEZ
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAYRA L. SANTIAGO-MARTINEZ
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAVIER S. COLON
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SILVESTRE J. VELEZ-CRUZ
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAYRA SANTIAGO-VEGA
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SADHIA VAZQUEZ
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMPRESAS MARTINEZ
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ULADIA DEL JESUS-MARTINEZ
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARQUIMIDES SANCHEZ-GARCIA
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID VARGAS-RUIZ
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARY PACHECO
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENID ENCARNACION
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFRY JAVIER PEREZ-CABAN
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FABIAN HERNANDEZ-FERNANDEZ
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISRAEL MARTINEZ
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADRIAN HERNANDEZ-GONZALEZ
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INEABELLE TIRADO-RIVERA
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESUS M. DIAZ-RIVERA
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALESKA TORRES-TORO
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA DAVILA-RIVERA
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHELMY SIERRA-DIAZ
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIA PENA-DE-JESUS
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA PEREZ-OTERO
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS E. CONCEPCION-NUNEZ
Represented By: Nelson Robles Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, as Receiver for Doral Bank
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Jairo Alfonso Mellado-Villarreal
Represented By: Tessie Marie Leal Garabis
Represented By: Kathleen V. Gunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ACE INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?