US v. Ferrer-Sosa

Appellee: UNITED STATES
Defendant / Appellant: JOSE FERRER-SOSA
Interested Party: ABRAHAM ANHANG and JONATHAN ROMAN-RIVERA
Case Number: 19-1315
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and appendix due 07/15/2019 for appellant Jose Ferrer-Sosa. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1315] (GRC) [Entered: 06/04/2019 03:59 PM]
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER mooting motion to extend time to file opening forms filed by Appellant Jose Ferrer-Sosa. [19-1315] (GRC) [Entered: 06/04/2019 03:56 PM]
June 3, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Jose Ferrer-Sosa indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 06/03/2019. [19-1315] (JRO) [Entered: 06/03/2019 09:31 AM]
May 30, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file a transcript report/order form filed by Appellant Jose Ferrer-Sosa. Certificate of service dated 05/30/2019. [19-1315] (JRO) [Entered: 05/30/2019 12:28 PM]
May 24, 2019 Mail returned as undeliverable to Appellant Jose Ferrer-Sosa. Copy of Order entered May 2, 2019. Forwarded to USP Coleman I PO Box 1033 Coleman, FL 33521. [19-1315] (ZN) [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:01 AM]
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER consolidating cases for purposes of scheduling and oral argument. The following case(s) are consolidated: 19-1312, 19-1315 (Consolidated started 05/20/2019) with 19-1305. [19-1305, 19-1312, 19-1315] (GRC) [Entered: 05/20/2019 04:34 PM]
May 20, 2019 Filing fee was paid in the district court by Appellant Jose Ferrer-Sosa on 05/16/2019. [19-1315] (GK) [Entered: 05/20/2019 10:05 AM]
May 17, 2019 NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file a transcript report/order form or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Transcript report/order form due 05/31/2019. [19-1315] (GRC) [Entered: 05/17/2019 04:42 PM]
May 14, 2019 NOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorneys have been removed from the service list for this case: Juan F. Matos-De-Juan for Jonathan Roman-Rivera. [19-1315] (GRC) [Entered: 05/14/2019 10:49 AM]
May 14, 2019 NOTICE requesting removal from the service list filed by Attorney Juan F. Matos-De-Juan for Not Party Jonathan Roman-Rivera. Certificate of service dated 05/14/2019. [19-1315] (JFM) [Entered: 05/14/2019 10:24 AM]
May 13, 2019 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Juan F. Matos-De-Juan for Not Party Jonathan Roman-Rivera. Copy of Order entered May 2, 2019. [19-1315] (ZN) [Entered: 05/14/2019 09:35 AM]
May 13, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Jose Ferrer-Sosa. Certificate of service dated 05/13/2019. [19-1315] (JRO) [Entered: 05/13/2019 11:39 AM]
May 13, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Jose Ferrer-Sosa filed by Attorney Jose R. Olmo-Rodriguez. Certificate of service dated 05/13/2019. [19-1315] (JRO) [Entered: 05/13/2019 11:38 AM]
May 9, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Jose Ferrer-Sosa. Certificate of service dated 05/09/2019. [19-1315] CLERK'S NOTE: Multiple documents cannot be included in a single PDF file. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS (05/13/2019). (JRO) [Entered: 05/09/2019 12:18 PM]
May 2, 2019 NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss for failure to pay the filing fee. Fee due 05/16/2019. [19-1315] (GK) [Entered: 05/02/2019 04:36 PM]
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file opening forms filed by Appellant Jose Ferrer-Sosa. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript report/order form due 05/09/2019. [19-1315] (GRC) [Entered: 04/26/2019 03:36 PM]
April 25, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file a transcript report/order form filed by Appellant Jose Ferrer-Sosa. Certificate of service dated 04/25/2019. [19-1315] (JRO) [Entered: 04/25/2019 05:58 PM]
April 12, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee US filed by Attorney Mariana E. Bauza. Certificate of service dated 04/12/2019. [19-1315] (MEB) [Entered: 04/12/2019 10:32 AM]
April 11, 2019 CRIMINAL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #1799) filed by Appellant Jose Ferrer-Sosa. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 04/25/2019. Fee due 04/25/2019. [19-1315] (GRC) [Entered: 04/11/2019 03:37 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US v. Ferrer-Sosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Jenifer Yois Hernandez-Vega
Represented By: Jose A. Ruiz-Santiago
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Represented By: Victor O. Acevedo-Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOSE FERRER-SOSA
Represented By: Jose Ramon Olmo-Rodriguez
Represented By: Jose Ferrer-Sosa
Represented By: Ovidio E. Zayas-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ABRAHAM ANHANG
Represented By: Manuel San Juan DeMartino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JONATHAN ROMAN-RIVERA
Represented By: Juan F. Matos-de Juan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?