Awosefaju v. Evans, et al

Defendant / Appellee: LORRAINE C. EVANS, FANNY HERNANDEZ, Former President of MRCA, HENRY IDADA, Former President of MRCA, JEROME BRANCH, MANDELA HOLMES INC and MANDELA HOLMES, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: FRANCIS O. AWOSEFAJU
Case Number: 19-1332
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Appellate Judge: Appellant Francis Awosefaju's request for, among other things, appointment of counsel and consolidation of Appeal Nos. 18-2242 and 19-1332 is denied . There is no constitutional right to appointment of counsel in a civil case, and this is not an appropriate case for this court to exercise its discretion to seek counsel to represent appellant. See King v. Greenblatt , 149 F.3d 9, 14 (1st Cir. 1998); 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). [18-2242, 19-1332] (GRC) [Entered: 05/14/2019 11:43 AM]
May 7, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 06/17/2019 for appellant Francis O. Awosefaju. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1332] (GRC) [Entered: 05/07/2019 01:53 PM]
April 23, 2019 MOTION for appointment of counsel and to consolidate cases filed by Appellant Francis O. Awosefaju in 17-1905, 18-2242, and 19-1332. Certificate of service was not included. [17-1905, 18-2242, 19-1332] (GRC) [Entered: 04/24/2019 11:20 AM]
April 11, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #11) filed by Appellant Francis O. Awosefaju. [19-1332] (GRC) [Entered: 04/11/2019 01:50 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Awosefaju v. Evans, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LORRAINE C. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FANNY HERNANDEZ, Former President of MRCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HENRY IDADA, Former President of MRCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEROME BRANCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MANDELA HOLMES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MANDELA HOLMES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRANCIS O. AWOSEFAJU
Represented By: Francis O. Awosefaju
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?