US v. Collazo-Gonzalez

Appellee: UNITED STATES
Defendant / Appellant: KELVIN IVAN COLLAZO-GONZALEZ
Case Number: 19-1334
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 MANDATE issued. [19-1334] (GB) [Entered: 04/25/2019 01:05 PM]
April 25, 2019 JUDGMENT entered: Upon consideration of appellant's unopposed motion, it is hereby ordered that this appeal be voluntarily dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). Mandate to issue forthwith. [19-1334] (GB) [Entered: 04/25/2019 01:03 PM]
April 12, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee US filed by Attorney Mariana E. Bauza. Certificate of service dated 04/12/2019. [19-1334] (MEB) [Entered: 04/12/2019 10:26 AM]
April 11, 2019 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Appellant Kelvin Ivan Collazo-Gonzalez. Certificate of service dated 04/11/2019. [19-1334] (ASM) [Entered: 04/11/2019 09:34 AM]
April 10, 2019 CRIMINAL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #45) filed by Appellant Kelvin Ivan Collazo-Gonzalez. Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript Report/Order form due 04/24/2019 . [19-1334] (GB) [Entered: 04/10/2019 07:37 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US v. Collazo-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Juan Carlos Reyes-Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KELVIN IVAN COLLAZO-GONZALEZ
Represented By: Eric A. Vos
Represented By: Andrew S. McCutcheon
Represented By: Kelvin Ivan Collazo-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?