Tiede v. Seneca Specialty Insurance Co.

Plaintiff / Appellant: MARK TIEDE
Defendant / Appellee: SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 19-1354
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Mark Tiede. Brief and Appendix due 07/03/2019 for appellant Mark Tiede. [19-1354] (KC) [Entered: 05/29/2019 03:02 PM]
May 28, 2019 ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant Mark Tiede. Certificate of service dated 05/28/2019. [19-1354] (MEW) [Entered: 05/28/2019 09:49 PM]
May 14, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Mark Tiede filed by Attorney Matthew M. Cianflone. Certificate of service dated 05/14/2019. [19-1354] (MMC) [Entered: 05/14/2019 10:09 AM]
April 29, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Mark Tiede filed by Attorney Marnix E. Weber. Certificate of service dated 04/29/2019. [19-1354] (MEW) [Entered: 04/29/2019 01:04 PM]
April 23, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 06/03/2019 for appellant Mark Tiede. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1354] (KC) [Entered: 04/23/2019 04:15 PM]
April 23, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Mark Tiede. Certificate of service dated 04/23/2019. [19-1354] (MBF) [Entered: 04/23/2019 02:57 PM]
April 23, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Mark Tiede indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 04/23/2019. [19-1354] (MBF) [Entered: 04/23/2019 02:52 PM]
April 23, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Mark Tiede filed by Attorney Michael B. Flynn. Certificate of service dated 04/23/2019. [19-1354] (MBF) [Entered: 04/23/2019 02:29 PM]
April 11, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #43) filed by Appellant Mark Tiede. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form. and Appearance form due 04/25/2019. [19-1354] (KC) [Entered: 04/11/2019 02:38 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tiede v. Seneca Specialty Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARK TIEDE
Represented By: Marnix E. Weber
Represented By: Michael Brian Flynn
Represented By: Matthew M. Cianflone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: William A. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?