Lu v. Trustees of Tufts College, et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES
Plaintiff / Appellant: FRIEDRICH LU, ex rel
Defendant / Appellee: MARIELENA GAMBOA-RUIZ and TRUSTEES OF TUFTS COLLEGE
Case Number: 19-1381
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Marielena Gamboa-Ruiz and Trustees of Tufts College filed by Attorney John G. Wheatley. Certificate of service dated 06/11/2019. [19-1381] (JGW) [Entered: 06/11/2019 10:25 AM]
June 11, 2019 RESPONSE filed by Appellee Trustees of Tufts College to motion [ # 6257600-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 06/11/2019. [19-1381] (JGW) [Entered: 06/11/2019 10:15 AM]
May 30, 2019 MOTION for summary disposition filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1381] (GB) [Entered: 05/31/2019 10:20 AM]
May 30, 2019 LETTER filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu, regarding appellant's brief. [19-1381] (GB) [Entered: 05/31/2019 10:10 AM]
May 30, 2019 APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. Number of copies: 10. Certificate of service dated 05/30/2019. Brief due 07/01/2019 for APPELLEES Marielena Gamboa-Ruiz and Trustees of Tufts College. [19-1381] (LIM) [Entered: 05/30/2019 03:13 PM]
May 15, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 06/24/2019 for appellant Friedrich Lu. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1381] (GB) [Entered: 05/15/2019 03:01 PM]
April 17, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #50) filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. [19-1381] (GB) [Entered: 04/17/2019 02:48 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lu v. Trustees of Tufts College, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRIEDRICH LU, ex rel
Represented By: Friedrich Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARIELENA GAMBOA-RUIZ
Represented By: John Goddard Wheatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRUSTEES OF TUFTS COLLEGE
Represented By: John Goddard Wheatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Cynthia A. Young
Represented By: Steven T. Sharobem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?