Coop. de Ahorro y Cred. de Rin, et al v. COFINA, et al
Petitioner: JOSE L. DALMAU-SANTIAGO, ROSSANA LOPEZ-LEON, MIGUEL A. NADAL-POWER, CIRILO TIRADO-RIVERA, PETER C. HEIN, ANIBAL JOSE TORRES-TORRES, EDUARDO BHATIA-GAUTIER, UNION INDEPENDIENTE DE EMPLEADOS DE LA AUTORIDAD DE ACUEDUCTOS Y ALCANTARILLADOS, MOVIMIENTO DE CONCERTACION CIUDADANA INC., GMS GROUP LLC, UNION DE EMPLEADOS DE OFICINA Y PROFESIONALES DE LA AUTORIDAD DE EDIFICIOS PUBLICOS, UNION DE EMPLEADOS PROFESIONALES INDEPENDIENTES, UNITED AUTOMOBILE, AEROSPACE & AGRICULTURAL IMPLEMENT WORKERS OF AMERICA INTERNATIONAL UNION, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION, CAPITULO INSTITUTO DE CULTURA PUERTORRIQUENA, RENE PINTO-LUGO, STEPHEN T. MANGIARACINA, UNION DE EMPLEADOS DE OFICINA COMERCIO Y RAMAS ANEXAS, PUERTOS, MANUEL NATAL-ALBELO, CAPITULO DE JUBILADOS, MARK ELLIOTT, CAPITULO AUTORIDAD DE CARRETERAS, UNION NACIONAL DE EDUCADORES Y TRABAJADORES DE LA EDUCACION, UNION INSULAR DE TRABAJADORES INDUSTRIALES Y CONSTRUCCIONES ELECTRICAS INC., COOPERATIVA DE AHORRO Y CREDITO DEL VALENCIANO, CAPITULO DE OFICINA DESARROLLO SOCIOECONOMICO Y COMUNITARIO, CAPITULO OFICINA DEL PROCURADOR DEL VETERANO, LAWRENCE B. DVORES, ASOCIACION DE INNSPECTORES DE JUEGOS DE AZAR and ASOCIACION DE INSPECTORES DE JUEGOS DE AZAR
Appellee: EP CANYON LTD., f/k/a Permal Canyon 10 Ltd., MA MULTI-SECTOR OPPORTUNISTIC FUND, LP, WINDERMERE IRELAND FUNDS PLC, DECAGON HOLDINGS 2, LLC, TILDEN PARK INVESTMENT MASTER FUND LP, GOLDENTREE MASTER FUND, LTD., HIGH YIELD AND BANK LOAN SERIES TRUST, COMPASS ESMA LP, ASIG INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, DECAGON HOLDINGS 4, LLC, COMPASS TSMA LP, PAROCHIAL EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT FUND OF LOUISIANA, GOLDENTREE STRUCTURED PRODUCTS OPPORTUNITIES FUND EXTENSION HOLDINGS, LLC, GOLDENTREE DISTRESSED MASTER FUND 2014 LTD., GOLDENTREE ENTRUST MASTER SPC, on behalf of and for the account of Segregated Portfolio I, WHITEBOX CAJA BLANCA FUND, LP, GOLDENTREE E DISTRESSED MASTER DEBT FUND II LP, SB SPECIAL SITUATION MASTER FUND SPC-PORTFOLIO D, PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY, PANDORA SELECT PARTNERS, L.P., GOLDENTREE MULTI-SECTOR FUND OFFSHORE ERISA, LTD., CORBIN ERISA OPPORTUNITY FUND, LTD., DECAGON HOLDINGS 5, LLC, DECAGON HOLDINGS 10, LLC, DECAGON HOLDINGS 9, LLC, CANYON BLUE CREDIT INVESTMENT FUND, L.P., GOLDENTREE HIGH YIELD VALUE FUND OFFSHORE (STRATEGIC), LTD., CREDIT FUND GOLDEN LTD., CANYON VALUE REALIZATION MAC 18 LTD., SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT ASSOCIATION, GN3 SIP LIMITED, GOLDENTREE 2017K-SC, LTD., GT NM, LP, CANYON-GRF MASTER FUND II, L.P., ROCK BLUFF HIGH YIELD PARTNERSHIP, LP, CANYON VALUE REALIZATION FUND, L.P., GOLDENTREE INSURANCE FUND SERIES INTERESTS OF THE SALI MULTI-SERIES FUND, LP, CANYON DISTRESSED OPPORTUNITY MASTER FUND II, L.P., GOLDENTREE MULTI-SECTOR MASTER FUND ICAV - GOLDENTREE MULTI-SECTOR MASTER FUND PORTFOLIO A, CANYON NZ-DOF INVESTING, L.P., GOLDENTREE STRUCTURED PRODUCTS - C LP, GOLD COAST CAPITAL SUBSIDIARY X LIMITED, WHITEBOX MULTI-STRATEGY PARTNERS, L.P., CENTURYLINK INC. DEFINED BENEFIT MASTER TRUST, WHITEBOX INSTITUTIONAL PARTNERS, L.P., LOUISIANA STATE EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM, SCOGGIN WORLDWIDE FUND LTD., CANYON-SL VALUE FUND, L.P., GUADALUPE FUND, LP, DECAGON HOLDINGS 1, LLC, SCOGGIN INTERNATIONAL FUND, LTD., GOLDENTREE DISTRESSED FUND 2014 LP, TACONIC OPPORTUNITY MASTER FUND LP, CANYON BALANCED MASTER FUND, LTD., CANYON-ASP FUND, L.P., GOLDENTREE HIGH YIELD VALUE MASTER UNIT TRUST, GOLDENTREE NJ DISTRESSED FUND 2015 LP, TACONIC MASTER FUND 1.5 LP, CANYON DISTRESSED OPPORTUNITY INVESTING FUND II, L.P., DECAGON HOLDINGS 6, LLC, DECAGON HOLDINGS 3, LLC, WHITEBOX TERM CREDIT FUND I L.P., ARISTEIA MASTER L.P., CORBIN OPPORTUNITY FUND, L.P., OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS, CANYON VALUE REALIZATION MASTER FUND, L.P., WHITEBOX ASYMMETRIC PARTNERS, L.P., DECAGON HOLDINGS 7, LLC, GOLDENTREE E DISTRESSED DEBT FUND II LP, DECAGON HOLDINGS 8, LLC, GOLDENTREE E DISTRESSED MASTER FUND II LP, GOLDENTREE ASSENT MANAGEMENT LP, ARISTEIA CAPITAL, LLC, CANYON CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC, WHITEBOX ADVISORS LLC, TACONIC CAPITAL ADVISORS, L.P. and TILDEN PARK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT LP
Petitioner / Appellant: COOPERATIVA DE AHORRO Y CREDITO DE JUANA DIAZ, COOPERATIVA DE AHORRO Y CREDITO DE RINCON and COOPERATIVA DE AHORRO Y CREDITO DR. MANUEL ZENO GANDIA
Trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ-ARRIBAS
Not Yet Classified: FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD, PUERTO RICO SALES TAX FINANCING CORPORATION, a/k/a Cofina, a/k/a Corporacion del Fondo de Interes Apremiante and COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
Case Number: 19-1391
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Aristeia Capital, LLC, Canyon Capital Advisors, LLC, Goldentree Assent Management LP, Taconic Capital Advisors, L.P., Tilden Park Capital Management LP and Whitebox Advisors LLC filed by Attorney Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz. Certificate of service dated 01/17/2020. [19-1391] (CRR) [Entered: 01/17/2020 03:14 PM]
January 17, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Aristeia Capital, LLC, Canyon Capital Advisors, LLC, Goldentree Assent Management LP, Taconic Capital Advisors, L.P., Tilden Park Capital Management LP and Whitebox Advisors LLC filed by Attorney Sylvia M. Arizmendi. Certificate of service dated 01/17/2020. [19-1391] (SMA) [Entered: 01/17/2020 03:11 PM]
January 17, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Aristeia Capital, LLC, Canyon Capital Advisors, LLC, Goldentree Assent Management LP, Taconic Capital Advisors, L.P., Tilden Park Capital Management LP and Whitebox Advisors LLC filed by Attorney Rafael Escalera. Certificate of service dated 01/17/2020. [19-1391] (RE) [Entered: 01/17/2020 03:05 PM]
January 17, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Aristeia Capital, LLC, Canyon Capital Advisors, LLC, Goldentree Assent Management LP, Taconic Capital Advisors, L.P., Tilden Park Capital Management LP and Whitebox Advisors LLC filed by Attorney David Cooper. Certificate of service dated 01/17/2020. [19-1391] (DMC) [Entered: 01/17/2020 03:01 PM]
January 17, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Aristeia Capital, LLC, Canyon Capital Advisors, LLC, Goldentree Assent Management LP, Taconic Capital Advisors, L.P., Tilden Park Capital Management LP and Whitebox Advisors LLC filed by Attorney Susheel Kirpalani. Certificate of service dated 01/17/2020. [19-1391] (SK) [Entered: 01/17/2020 02:59 PM]
January 17, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Aristeia Capital, LLC, Canyon Capital Advisors, LLC, Goldentree Assent Management LP, Taconic Capital Advisors, L.P., Tilden Park Capital Management LP and Whitebox Advisors LLC filed by Attorney Susheel Kirpalani. Certificate of service dated 01/17/2020. [19-1391] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. (CRR) [Entered: 01/17/2020 02:56 PM]
January 15, 2020 NOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorney has been removed from the service list for this case: Maria Teresa Alvarez-Santos for AAFAF. [19-1391] (CMP) [Entered: 01/15/2020 09:00 AM]
January 13, 2020 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Maria Teresa Alvarez-Santos for Appellee AAFAF. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1391] (CMP) [Entered: 01/13/2020 04:03 PM]
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Appellate Judge: The motion of the COFINA Senior Bondholders' Coalition for permission to appear as appellees in this appeal is allowed to the extent that the Senior Coalition may participate in briefing and any oral argument. The Senior Coalition shall file its brief according to the same schedule as the appellees. It should take care to supplement its corporate disclosure statement whenever the information contained in that statement changes. [19-1391] (CMP) [Entered: 01/10/2020 12:00 PM]
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, FOMB, AAFAF and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation. Brief due 02/21/2020 for appellee Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Financial Oversight and Management Board, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation. [19-1391] (GRC) [Entered: 01/06/2020 03:21 PM]
January 2, 2020 TEN (10) paper copies of appellant/petitioner brief [ # 6306587-2 ] submitted by Appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon. [19-1391] (JMK) [Entered: 01/02/2020 10:29 AM]
December 30, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees FOMB, Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and AAFAF. Certificate of service dated 12/30/2019. [19-1391] (BSR) [Entered: 12/30/2019 01:29 PM]
December 27, 2019 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon. Certificate of service dated 12/23/2019. [19-1391] (LIM) [Entered: 12/27/2019 04:22 PM]
December 27, 2019 APPELLANTS' BRIEF filed by Appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon. Certificate of service dated 12/23/2019. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 01/03/2020 . Brief due 01/22/2020 for APPELLEES ASIG International Limited, Aristeia Master L.P., Canyon Balanced Master Fund, Ltd., Canyon Blue Credit Investment Fund, L.P., Canyon Distressed Opportunity Investing Fund II, L.P., Canyon Distressed Opportunity Master Fund II, L.P., Canyon NZ-DOF Investing, L.P., Canyon Value Realization Fund, L.P., Canyon Value Realization MAC 18 Ltd., Canyon Value Realization Master Fund, L.P., Canyon-ASP Fund, L.P., Canyon-GRF Master Fund II, L.P., Canyon-SL Value Fund, L.P., CenturyLink Inc. Defined Benefit Master Trust, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Compass ESMA LP, Compass TSMA LP, Corbin ERISA Opportunity Fund, Ltd., Corbin Opportunity Fund, L.P., Credit Fund Golden Ltd., Decagon Holdings 1, LLC, Decagon Holdings 10, LLC, Decagon Holdings 2, LLC, Decagon Holdings 3, LLC, Decagon Holdings 4, LLC, Decagon Holdings 5, LLC, Decagon Holdings 6, LLC, Decagon Holdings 7, LLC, Decagon Holdings 8, LLC, Decagon Holdings 9, LLC, EP Canyon Ltd., Financial Oversight and Management Board, GN3 SIP Limited, GT NM, LP, Gold Coast Capital Subsidiary X Limited, GoldenTree 2017K-SC, Ltd., GoldenTree Distressed Fund 2014 LP, GoldenTree Distressed Master Fund 2014 Ltd., GoldenTree E Distressed Debt Fund II LP, GoldenTree E Distressed Master Fund II LP, GoldenTree Entrust Master SPC, GoldenTree High Yield Value Fund Offshore (Strategic), Ltd., GoldenTree High Yield Value Master Unit Trust, GoldenTree Insurance Fund Series Interests of the SALI Multi-Series Fund, LP, GoldenTree Master Fund, Ltd., GoldenTree Multi-Sector Fund Offshore ERISA, Ltd., GoldenTree Multi-Sector Master Fund ICAV - GoldenTree Multi-Sector Master Fund Portfolio A, GoldenTree NJ Distressed Fund 2015 LP, GoldenTree Structured Products - C LP, GoldenTree Structured Products Opportunities Fund Extension Holdings, LLC, Guadalupe Fund, LP, High Yield and Bank Loan Series Trust, Louisiana State Employees' Retirement System, MA Multi-Sector Opportunistic Fund, LP, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Pandora Select Partners, L.P., Parochial Employees' Retirement Fund of Louisiana, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority, Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation, Rock Bluff High Yield Partnership, LP, SB Special Situation Master Fund SPC-Portfolio D, San Bernardino County Employees Retirement Association, Scoggin International Fund, Ltd., Scoggin Worldwide Fund Ltd., Taconic Master Fund 1.5 LP, Taconic Opportunity Master Fund LP, Tilden Park Investment Master Fund LP, Whitebox Asymmetric Partners, L.P., Whitebox Caja Blanca Fund, LP, Whitebox Institutional Partners, L.P., Whitebox Multi-Strategy Partners, L.P., Whitebox Term Credit Fund I L.P. and Windermere Ireland Funds PLC. [19-1391] (LIM) [Entered: 12/27/2019 04:12 PM]
December 23, 2019 BRIEF tendered by Appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia. [19-1391] (GJR) [Entered: 12/23/2019 01:45 PM]
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER directing Appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon to file a conforming brief. Brief due 12/24/2019. [19-1391] (CMP) [Entered: 12/17/2019 03:31 PM]
December 16, 2019 BRIEF tendered by Appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia. [19-1391] (GJR) [Entered: 12/16/2019 02:06 PM]
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER directing Appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon to file a conforming brief. Brief due 12/16/2019. [19-1391] (CMP) [Entered: 12/09/2019 03:39 PM]
December 6, 2019 PLEADING tendered: TEN (10) paper copies of appellants' brief [ # 6301748-2 ] submitted by Appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon. [19-1391] (JMK) [Entered: 12/06/2019 12:35 PM]
December 6, 2019 APPENDIX filed by Appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon. Number of volumes: 1. Number of copies: 5. Certificate of service dated 12/05/2019. [19-1391] (LIM) [Entered: 12/06/2019 11:23 AM]
December 4, 2019 BRIEF tendered by Appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia. [19-1391] (GJR) [Entered: 12/04/2019 03:09 PM]
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz. Brief and appendix due 12/04/2019. [19-1391] (CMP) [Entered: 12/03/2019 02:22 PM]
December 2, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia. Certificate of service dated 12/02/2019. [19-1391] (GJR) [Entered: 12/02/2019 09:39 PM]
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz. Brief and Appendix due 12/02/2019 for appellant Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon. [19-1391] (KPC) [Entered: 11/14/2019 09:52 AM]
November 13, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia. Certificate of service dated 11/13/2019. [19-1391] (GJR) [Entered: 11/13/2019 02:43 PM]
October 30, 2019 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Movants Aristeia Capital, LLC, Canyon Capital Advisors, LLC, Goldentree Assent Management LP, Taconic Capital Advisors, L.P., Tilden Park Capital Management LP and Whitebox Advisors LLC. [19-1391] (KPC) [Entered: 10/30/2019 11:03 AM]
October 28, 2019 NINE (9) Courtesy copies of Motion for leave to file an appearance filed by Movants Aristeia Capital, LLC, Canyon Capital Advisors, LLC, Goldentree Assent Management LP, Taconic Capital Advisors, L.P., Tilden Park Capital Management LP and Whitebox Advisors LLC. [19-1391] (LIM) [Entered: 10/28/2019 03:36 PM]
October 25, 2019 MOTION for leave to file an appearance form filed by Movants Aristeia Capital, LLC, Canyon Capital Advisors, LLC, Goldentree Assent Management LP, Taconic Capital Advisors, L.P., Tilden Park Capital Management LP and Whitebox Advisors LLC. Certificate of service dated 10/25/2019. [19-1391] (KPC) [Entered: 10/25/2019 04:41 PM]
October 4, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 11/13/2019 for appellant Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1391] (KPC) [Entered: 10/04/2019 10:34 AM]
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge: Appellees have moved to dismiss this appeal on equitable mootness grounds. After careful review of the parties' filings, we deny the motion without prejudice to reconsideration by the panel that decides the appeal. The stay of the briefing schedule is lifted, the present schedule is vacated, and the clerk shall set a new briefing schedule. [19-1391] (KPC) [Entered: 10/04/2019 10:30 AM]
September 16, 2019 REPLY filed by Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation and AAFAF to response [ # 6278731-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 09/16/2019. [19-1391] (BSR) [Entered: 09/16/2019 06:22 PM]
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Appellees' motion to extend the time to file a reply to appellants' response to the motion to dismiss is allowed. Appellees' reply is due on or before September 16, 2019 . [19-1391] (KPC) [Entered: 08/30/2019 05:24 PM]
August 30, 2019 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia. Certificate of service dated 08/30/2019. [19-1391] (GJR) [Entered: 08/30/2019 01:17 PM]
August 30, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file a response filed by Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation and AAFAF. Certificate of service dated 08/30/2019. [19-1391] (BSR) [Entered: 08/30/2019 11:54 AM]
August 29, 2019 RESPONSE filed by Appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia to motion to dismiss case [ # 6264444-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 08/29/2019. [19-1391] (GJR) [Entered: 08/29/2019 07:53 PM]
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Upon consideration of motion, it is ordered that the time for appellants to file a response to appellees' motion to dismiss be enlarged to and including August 29, 2019 . No further extension of this deadline should be expected. [19-1391] (KPC) [Entered: 08/21/2019 10:02 AM]
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon, and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia's unopposed motion to stay briefing pending the court's decision on the appellees' motion to dismiss is granted. [19-1391] (KPC) [Entered: 08/21/2019 09:58 AM]
August 19, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file a response filed by Appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia and Not Party Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito del Valenciano. Certificate of service dated 08/19/2019. [19-1391] (GJR) [Entered: 08/19/2019 10:03 PM]
August 7, 2019 MOTION to stay Briefing Schedule filed by Appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia. Certificate of service dated 08/07/2019. [19-1391] (GJR) [Entered: 08/07/2019 08:07 PM]
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file response filed by Appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz. Response to appellees' motion to dismiss due 08/19/2019. We are disinclined to grant a request for further enlargement of this deadline. [19-1391] (KPC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 12:51 PM]
July 30, 2019 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Bradley R. Bobroff for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Lucia Chapman for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Peter D. Doyle for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Carl Forbes, Jr. for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Gregg M. Mashberg for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Chris Theodoridis for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Jared D. Zajac for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Enrique M. Almeida Bernal for Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito del Valenciano and Gary F. Eisenberg for GMS Group LLC. [19-1391] (KPC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 12:17 PM]
July 29, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file a response filed by Appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia. Certificate of service dated 07/29/2019. [19-1391] (GJR) [Entered: 07/29/2019 08:16 PM]
July 15, 2019 NOTICE issued. After 07/29/2019, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Bradley R. Bobroff for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Lucia Chapman for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Peter D. Doyle for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Carl Forbes, Jr. for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Gregg M. Mashberg for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Chris Theodoridis for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Jared D. Zajac for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Enrique M. Almeida Bernal for Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito del Valenciano and Gary F. Eisenberg for GMS Group LLC. [19-1391] (KPC) [Entered: 07/15/2019 09:08 AM]
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Upon consideration of motion, it is ordered that the time for appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon, and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia to file a response to the motion to dismiss be enlarged to and including July 29, 2019 . [19-1391] (KC) [Entered: 07/09/2019 12:32 PM]
July 8, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file a response filed by Appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia. Certificate of service dated 07/08/2019. [19-1391] (GJR) [Entered: 07/08/2019 09:39 PM]
July 1, 2019 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, FOMB, AAFAF and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation. [19-1391] (KC) [Entered: 07/01/2019 11:34 AM]
June 28, 2019 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation. Certificate of service dated 06/28/2019. [19-1391] (BSR) [Entered: 06/28/2019 11:08 PM]
June 28, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee AAFAF filed by Attorney John J. Rapisardi. Certificate of service dated 06/28/2019. [19-1391] (JJR) [Entered: 06/28/2019 05:26 PM]
June 28, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee AAFAF filed by Attorney Suzzanne Uhland. Certificate of service dated 06/28/2019. [19-1391] (SU) [Entered: 06/28/2019 05:24 PM]
June 28, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee AAFAF filed by Attorney Peter Friedman. Certificate of service dated 06/28/2019. [19-1391] (PMF) [Entered: 06/28/2019 05:22 PM]
June 28, 2019 AMENDED NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation filed by Attorney Martin J. Bienenstock. Certificate of service dated 06/28/2019. [19-1391] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (MJB) [Entered: 06/28/2019 04:27 PM]
June 28, 2019 AMENDED NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation filed by Attorney Michael A. Firestein. Certificate of service dated 06/28/2019. [19-1391] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (MAF) [Entered: 06/28/2019 04:24 PM]
June 28, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation filed by Attorney Stephen L. Ratner. Certificate of service dated 06/28/2019. [19-1391] (SLR) [Entered: 06/28/2019 04:22 PM]
June 28, 2019 AMENDED NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation filed by Attorney Timothy W. Mungovan. Certificate of service dated 06/28/2019. [19-1391] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (TWM) [Entered: 06/28/2019 04:18 PM]
June 28, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation filed by Attorney John E. Roberts. Certificate of service dated 06/28/2019. [19-1391] (JER) [Entered: 06/28/2019 04:12 PM]
June 28, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation filed by Attorney Lary Alan Rappaport. Certificate of service dated 06/28/2019. [19-1391] (LAR) [Entered: 06/28/2019 04:10 PM]
June 28, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation filed by Attorney Brian S. Rosen. Certificate of service dated 06/28/2019. [19-1391] (BSR) [Entered: 06/28/2019 04:07 PM]
June 28, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation filed by Attorney Mark D. Harris. Certificate of service dated 06/28/2019. [19-1391] (MDH) [Entered: 06/28/2019 04:04 PM]
June 28, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation filed by Attorney Martin J. Bienenstock. Certificate of service dated 06/28/2019. [19-1391] (MJB) [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:46 PM]
June 28, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation filed by Attorney Michael A. Firestein. Certificate of service dated 06/28/2019. [19-1391] (MAF) [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:43 PM]
June 28, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation filed by Attorney Timothy W. Mungovan. Certificate of service dated 06/28/2019. [19-1391] (TWM) [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:37 PM]
June 28, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 08/07/2019 for appellant Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1391] (KC) [Entered: 06/28/2019 11:07 AM]
June 12, 2019 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney John A Commerford for Appellee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued April 29, 2019. Forwarding address unknown. [19-1391] (ZN) [Entered: 06/13/2019 01:10 PM]
June 10, 2019 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Mohammad S. Yassin for Appellee AAFAF. Copy of Notice issued May 29, 2019. Forwarding address unknown. [19-1391] (ZN) [Entered: 06/10/2019 03:51 PM]
June 10, 2019 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Carolina Velaz-Rivero for Appellee AAFAF. Copy of Notice issued May 29, 2019. Forwarding address unknown. [19-1391] (ZN) [Entered: 06/10/2019 03:45 PM]
June 10, 2019 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Ericka C. Montull-Novoa for Appellee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Copy of Notice issued May 29, 2019. Forwarding address unknown. [19-1391] (ZN) [Entered: 06/10/2019 03:43 PM]
June 10, 2019 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Wigberto Lugo Mender for Appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz. Copy of Notice issued May 29, 2019. Forwarding address unknown. [19-1391] (ZN) [Entered: 06/10/2019 03:41 PM]
May 29, 2019 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Rafael M. Arrillaga Romany, Nicholas A. Bassett, James R. Bliss, Daniel L. Cantor, John A Commerford, Eric Kay, Wigberto Lugo Mender, Nancy A. Mitchell, Ericka C. Montull-Novoa, Randall Oppenheimer, Diana M. Perez, Scott Rutsky, Kate Scherling, Andrew V. Tenzer, Carolina Velaz-Rivero, Eric Winston, James B. Worthington and Mohammad S. Yassin. [19-1391] (KC) [Entered: 05/29/2019 11:41 AM]
May 28, 2019 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Mohammad S. Yassin for Appellee AAFAF. [19-1391] (KC) [Entered: 05/30/2019 01:38 PM]
May 14, 2019 NOTICE issued. After 05/28/2019, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Rafael M. Arrillaga Romany, Nicholas A. Bassett, James R. Bliss, Daniel L. Cantor, John A Commerford, Eric Kay, Wigberto Lugo Mender, Nancy A. Mitchell, Ericka C. Montull-Novoa, Randall Oppenheimer, Diana M. Perez, Scott Rutsky, Daniel Salinas, Kate Scherling, Andrew V. Tenzer, Carolina Velaz-Rivero, Eric Winston, James B. Worthington and Mohammad S. Yassin. [19-1391] (KC) [Entered: 05/14/2019 10:47 AM]
May 13, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 05/13/2019. [19-1391] (GJR) [Entered: 05/13/2019 11:24 PM]
May 13, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia. Certificate of service dated 05/13/2019. [19-1391] (GJR) [Entered: 05/13/2019 11:22 PM]
May 13, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia filed by Attorney Guillermo Ramos-Luina. Certificate of service dated 05/13/2019. [19-1391] (GJR) [Entered: 05/13/2019 11:20 PM]
April 29, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #631) filed by Appellants Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito Dr. Manuel Zeno Gandia, Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Juana Diaz and Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Rincon. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 05/13/2019. [19-1391] (KC) [Entered: 04/29/2019 12:20 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coop. de Ahorro y Cred. de Rin, et al v. COFINA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: EP CANYON LTD., f/k/a Permal Canyon 10 Ltd.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MA MULTI-SECTOR OPPORTUNISTIC FUND, LP
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WINDERMERE IRELAND FUNDS PLC
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DECAGON HOLDINGS 2, LLC
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TILDEN PARK INVESTMENT MASTER FUND LP
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GOLDENTREE MASTER FUND, LTD.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HIGH YIELD AND BANK LOAN SERIES TRUST
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: COMPASS ESMA LP
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ASIG INTERNATIONAL LIMITED
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DECAGON HOLDINGS 4, LLC
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: COMPASS TSMA LP
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PAROCHIAL EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT FUND OF LOUISIANA
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GOLDENTREE STRUCTURED PRODUCTS OPPORTUNITIES FUND EXTENSION HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GOLDENTREE DISTRESSED MASTER FUND 2014 LTD.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GOLDENTREE ENTRUST MASTER SPC, on behalf of and for the account of Segregated Portfolio I
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WHITEBOX CAJA BLANCA FUND, LP
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GOLDENTREE E DISTRESSED MASTER DEBT FUND II LP
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SB SPECIAL SITUATION MASTER FUND SPC-PORTFOLIO D
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY
Represented By: John J. Rapisardi
Represented By: Luis C. Marini-Biaggi
Represented By: Maria T. Alvarez-Santos
Represented By: Peter M. Friedman
Represented By: Mohammad S. Yassin
Represented By: Randall Oppenheimer
Represented By: Nancy A. Mitchell
Represented By: Suzzanne Uhland
Represented By: Elizabeth Lemond McKeen
Represented By: Daniel L. Cantor
Represented By: Diana M. Perez
Represented By: William J. Sushon
Represented By: Carolina Velaz-Rivero
Represented By: Maria Teresa Alvarez-Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PANDORA SELECT PARTNERS, L.P.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Daniel Salinas
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GOLDENTREE MULTI-SECTOR FUND OFFSHORE ERISA, LTD.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CORBIN ERISA OPPORTUNITY FUND, LTD.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DECAGON HOLDINGS 5, LLC
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DECAGON HOLDINGS 10, LLC
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DECAGON HOLDINGS 9, LLC
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CANYON BLUE CREDIT INVESTMENT FUND, L.P.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GOLDENTREE HIGH YIELD VALUE FUND OFFSHORE (STRATEGIC), LTD.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CREDIT FUND GOLDEN LTD.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CANYON VALUE REALIZATION MAC 18 LTD.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GN3 SIP LIMITED
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GOLDENTREE 2017K-SC, LTD.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GT NM, LP
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CANYON-GRF MASTER FUND II, L.P.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ROCK BLUFF HIGH YIELD PARTNERSHIP, LP
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CANYON VALUE REALIZATION FUND, L.P.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GOLDENTREE INSURANCE FUND SERIES INTERESTS OF THE SALI MULTI-SERIES FUND, LP
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CANYON DISTRESSED OPPORTUNITY MASTER FUND II, L.P.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GOLDENTREE MULTI-SECTOR MASTER FUND ICAV - GOLDENTREE MULTI-SECTOR MASTER FUND PORTFOLIO A
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CANYON NZ-DOF INVESTING, L.P.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GOLDENTREE STRUCTURED PRODUCTS - C LP
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GOLD COAST CAPITAL SUBSIDIARY X LIMITED
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WHITEBOX MULTI-STRATEGY PARTNERS, L.P.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CENTURYLINK INC. DEFINED BENEFIT MASTER TRUST
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WHITEBOX INSTITUTIONAL PARTNERS, L.P.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LOUISIANA STATE EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SCOGGIN WORLDWIDE FUND LTD.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CANYON-SL VALUE FUND, L.P.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GUADALUPE FUND, LP
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DECAGON HOLDINGS 1, LLC
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SCOGGIN INTERNATIONAL FUND, LTD.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GOLDENTREE DISTRESSED FUND 2014 LP
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TACONIC OPPORTUNITY MASTER FUND LP
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CANYON BALANCED MASTER FUND, LTD.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CANYON-ASP FUND, L.P.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GOLDENTREE HIGH YIELD VALUE MASTER UNIT TRUST
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GOLDENTREE NJ DISTRESSED FUND 2015 LP
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TACONIC MASTER FUND 1.5 LP
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CANYON DISTRESSED OPPORTUNITY INVESTING FUND II, L.P.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DECAGON HOLDINGS 6, LLC
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DECAGON HOLDINGS 3, LLC
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WHITEBOX TERM CREDIT FUND I L.P.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ARISTEIA MASTER L.P.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CORBIN OPPORTUNITY FUND, L.P.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS
Represented By: Alberto Juan Enrique Aneses-Negron
Represented By: Luc A. Despins
Represented By: James B. Worthington
Represented By: Ericka C. Montull-Novoa
Represented By: John A. Commerford
Represented By: James R. Bliss
Represented By: Andrew V. Tenzer
Represented By: Diana M. Batlle-Barasorda
Represented By: Nicholas A. Bassett
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Represented By: Georg Alexander Bongartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CANYON VALUE REALIZATION MASTER FUND, L.P.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WHITEBOX ASYMMETRIC PARTNERS, L.P.
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DECAGON HOLDINGS 7, LLC
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GOLDENTREE E DISTRESSED DEBT FUND II LP
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DECAGON HOLDINGS 8, LLC
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GOLDENTREE E DISTRESSED MASTER FUND II LP
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdys
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Darren Mitchell Goldman
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Eric Kay
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Eric Winston
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GOLDENTREE ASSENT MANAGEMENT LP
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ARISTEIA CAPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CANYON CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WHITEBOX ADVISORS LLC
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TACONIC CAPITAL ADVISORS, L.P.
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TILDEN PARK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT LP
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Susheel Kirpalani
Represented By: Kate Scherling
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: COOPERATIVA DE AHORRO Y CREDITO DE JUANA DIAZ
Represented By: Wigberto Lugo Mender
Represented By: Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: COOPERATIVA DE AHORRO Y CREDITO DE RINCON
Represented By: Wigberto Lugo Mender
Represented By: Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: COOPERATIVA DE AHORRO Y CREDITO DR. MANUEL ZENO GANDIA
Represented By: Wigberto Lugo Mender
Represented By: Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOSE L. DALMAU-SANTIAGO
Represented By: Rafael M. Arrillaga Romany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ROSSANA LOPEZ-LEON
Represented By: Rafael M. Arrillaga Romany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MIGUEL A. NADAL-POWER
Represented By: Rafael M. Arrillaga Romany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CIRILO TIRADO-RIVERA
Represented By: Rafael M. Arrillaga Romany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PETER C. HEIN
Represented By: Peter C. Hein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ANIBAL JOSE TORRES-TORRES
Represented By: Rafael M. Arrillaga Romany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EDUARDO BHATIA-GAUTIER
Represented By: Rafael M. Arrillaga Romany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNION INDEPENDIENTE DE EMPLEADOS DE LA AUTORIDAD DE ACUEDUCTOS Y ALCANTARILLADOS
Represented By: Roberto O. Maldonado-Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MOVIMIENTO DE CONCERTACION CIUDADANA INC.
Represented By: Roberto O. Maldonado-Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GMS GROUP LLC
Represented By: Gary F. Eisenberg
Represented By: Rafael Antonio Gonzalez-Valiente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNION DE EMPLEADOS DE OFICINA Y PROFESIONALES DE LA AUTORIDAD DE EDIFICIOS PUBLICOS
Represented By: Roberto O. Maldonado-Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNION DE EMPLEADOS PROFESIONALES INDEPENDIENTES
Represented By: Roberto O. Maldonado-Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED AUTOMOBILE, AEROSPACE & AGRICULTURAL IMPLEMENT WORKERS OF AMERICA INTERNATIONAL UNION
Represented By: Miguel Simonet Sierra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION
Represented By: Miguel Simonet Sierra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CAPITULO INSTITUTO DE CULTURA PUERTORRIQUENA
Represented By: Jessica Esther Mendez-Colberg
Represented By: Rolando Emmanuelli-Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RENE PINTO-LUGO
Represented By: Roberto O. Maldonado-Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STEPHEN T. MANGIARACINA
Represented By: Stephen T. Mangiaracina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNION DE EMPLEADOS DE OFICINA COMERCIO Y RAMAS ANEXAS, PUERTOS
Represented By: Roberto O. Maldonado-Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MANUEL NATAL-ALBELO
Represented By: Roberto O. Maldonado-Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CAPITULO DE JUBILADOS
Represented By: Jessica Esther Mendez-Colberg
Represented By: Rolando Emmanuelli-Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MARK ELLIOTT
Represented By: Rafael Antonio Gonzalez-Valiente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CAPITULO AUTORIDAD DE CARRETERAS
Represented By: Jessica Esther Mendez-Colberg
Represented By: Rolando Emmanuelli-Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNION NACIONAL DE EDUCADORES Y TRABAJADORES DE LA EDUCACION
Represented By: Roberto O. Maldonado-Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNION INSULAR DE TRABAJADORES INDUSTRIALES Y CONSTRUCCIONES ELECTRICAS INC.
Represented By: Roberto O. Maldonado-Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: COOPERATIVA DE AHORRO Y CREDITO DEL VALENCIANO
Represented By: Wigberto Lugo Mender
Represented By: Enrique M. Almeida Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CAPITULO DE OFICINA DESARROLLO SOCIOECONOMICO Y COMUNITARIO
Represented By: Jessica Esther Mendez-Colberg
Represented By: Rolando Emmanuelli-Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CAPITULO OFICINA DEL PROCURADOR DEL VETERANO
Represented By: Jessica Esther Mendez-Colberg
Represented By: Rolando Emmanuelli-Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LAWRENCE B. DVORES
Represented By: Lawrence B. Dvores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ASOCIACION DE INNSPECTORES DE JUEGOS DE AZAR
Represented By: Roberto O. Maldonado-Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ASOCIACION DE INSPECTORES DE JUEGOS DE AZAR
Represented By: Roberto O. Maldonado-Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ-ARRIBAS
Represented By: Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD
Represented By: Paul V. Possinger
Represented By: Michael A. Firestein
Represented By: Jonathan E. Richman
Represented By: Chantel L. Febus
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Scott Rutsky
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Lary Alan Rappaport
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Steven O. Weise
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PUERTO RICO SALES TAX FINANCING CORPORATION, a/k/a Cofina, a/k/a Corporacion del Fondo de Interes Apremiante
Represented By: Paul V. Possinger
Represented By: Michael A. Firestein
Represented By: Jonathan E. Richman
Represented By: Chantel L. Febus
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Scott Rutsky
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Lary Alan Rappaport
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Steven O. Weise
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Paul V. Possinger
Represented By: Michael A. Firestein
Represented By: Scott Rutsky
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Lary Alan Rappaport
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Steven O. Weise
Represented By: Peter D. Doyle
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg
Represented By: Jennifer L. Roche
Represented By: Ginger D. Anders
Represented By: Susana I. Penagaricano Brown
Represented By: Carl Forbes Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Hackett
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Daniel Jose Perez-Refojos
Represented By: Lucia Chapman
Represented By: Laura E. Stafford
Represented By: Adele M. El-Khouri
Represented By: Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
Represented By: Maja Zerjal
Represented By: Michael Luskin
Represented By: Chad Golder
Represented By: Margaret Antinori Dale
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Represented By: Stephan E. Hornung
Represented By: Rachel G. Miller Ziegler
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Jared D. Zajac
Represented By: Julia D. Alonzo
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Chris Theodoridis
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Bradley R. Bobroff
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Stephen L. Ratner
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Kevin J. Perra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?