Torres-Torres, et al v. Perello-Borras, et al
Plaintiff: NELSON RIVERA-PEREZ and BLANCA SERRANO-MALDONADO
Defendant: EDUARDO BHATIA-GAUTIER, in his Personal and Official Capacity as President of the Senate of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, JOHN DOE and JANE DOE
Plaintiff / Appellant: CARLOS J. MALAVE-MAYOL, MARIA DE LOS A. RIVERA-DIAZ, WILFREDO SOTO-ARCE, WILLIAM TORRELLAS-DIAZ, EDWIN TORRES-CRUZ, LUIS MALDONADO-COTTO, YESENIA MARIA SUAREZ, FLORENTIN TIRADO-CARLO, WAI LOK LO-SANTIAGO, FREDDY RAMOS-SOTO, JOSE A. RIVERA-OCASIO, NIVEA J. ORTIZ-CABRERA, GRICEL MENDEZ-SANTOS, HERIBERTO FIGUEROA-SANTANA, MIGUEL SANTIAGO-CALDERON, CHRISTIAN MORALES-LEON, JUANA E. SEPULVEDA-VALENTIN, PEDRO L. LOPEZ-REYES, YAMAIRA ORTIZ-PEREA, ALBA N. SOTO-ROJAS, EMMANUEL FONTANILLA-ESPINAL, ALEX RIVERA-PORTELA, LAURA RIVERA-RULLAN, JANICE TORRES-TORRES, VILMARIE TEXIDOR-SANCHEZ, OMAYRA GARAY-GARCIA, JOSE ROHENA-SOSA, ANGEL ACABA-VAZQUEZ, LIZBET ROBLES-RODRIGUEZ, JULIO FELIZ-PONS, MARGARITA ARROYO-MOLINA, CLAIMY RAMIREZ-DIAZ, NANCY MORALES-RIVERA, AURA B. RIVERA-MEDINA, GABRIEL SANCHEZ-RIOS, NINOCHKA MARQUEZ-ROSA, ISABEL DE LA CRUZ-SANCHEZ, ROBERTO VALENTIN-SANTIAGO, CARLOS CRUZ-DIAZ, SANDRA TORO-MARTINEZ, CARLOS DE JESUS-ARZOLA, ELEANOR RODRIGUEZ-AVILES, VICTORIA RAMIREZ-CONCEPCION, KEVIN GONZALEZ-ALVAREZ, THELMA DELGADO-PEDROGO, JAMILETTE RAMIREZ-SANCHEZ, JORGE LOPEZ-SANTIAGO, EMITZA COTTO-ESCALERA, MARIELIS RODRIGUEZ-LEON, IVAN TORRES-SANCHEZ, GLADYS ALBERTI-TORRES, EDUARDO BETANCOURT-OTERO, NANGELY DE JESUS-MORALES, JONATHAN SANTIAGO-MORENO, EVELYN RODRIGUEZ-MARRERO, JOEL SEIJO-RIVERA, ENID RUIZ-RODRIGUEZ, JORGE PEREZ-BORROTO, CARLOS FERNANDEZ-FLORES, NYDIA TOSAS-CORDERO, KARLA MEDINA-VILARINO, OMAR SANTIAGO-RODRIGUEZ, ASNEL FERNANDEZ-MARTINEZ, HAYDEE RESTO-COLON, NILSA PAGAN-SERRANO, LUIS RIVERA-RIVERA, JOSE OYOLA-MARQUEZ, MIGUEL A. HERNANDEZ-MONTANEZ, ANGEL LAFUENTE-AMARO, LEADETTE GONZALEZ-COLON, SONIA CHAVEZ-HERRERA, ENID PILLOT-MARTINEZ, SOLBEE MALAVE-VARGAS, LUZ S. MALDONADO-MARTINEZ, LUZ PEREZ-BETANCOURT, JUAN SANTIAGO-GONZALEZ, ANGEL MALDONADO-ALICEA, MIGUEL GONZALEZ-ROLON, NAISHA CINTRON-SANTIAGO, MIGDALIA SILVA-ACEVEDO, MARJORIE OCASIO-SANTIAGO and JOSE L. AROYO-ORTIZ
Defendant / Appellee: ROSENDO VELA-BIRRIEL, in his Personal and Official Capacity as Deputy Superintendent in Charge of Operations, JAIME PERELLO-BORRAS, in his Personal and Official Capacity as Speaker of the House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, JULIO MOJICA, in his Personal and Official Capacity as Director of Facilities Conservation and Technical Services, RENE VALLE-UMPIERRE, in his Personal and Official Capacity as Director of Decoration and Facilities Administration, XAVIER GONZALEZ-CALDERON, in his Personal and Official Capacity as Administrator of the House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, ALVARO VAZQUEZ-RAMOS, in his Personal and Official Capacity as Deputy Superintendent in Charge of Administration, JOSE A. FUENTES-SERRANO, in his Personal and Official Capacity as Human Resources Director of the House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, JOSE SAPIA, in his Personal and Official Capacity as Director of General Services, JAVIER VAZQUEZ-COLLAZO, in his Personal and Official Capacity as Superintendent of the Capitol Building, MIGUEL A. ARANA-COLON, in his Personal and Official Capacity as Human Resources Director at the Office of the Superintendent of the Capitol Building and AILEEN FIGUEROA-VAZQUEZ, in her Personal and Official Capacity as Secretary of the House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Interested Party: CRIM
Case Number: 19-1399
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Carolina Guzman-Tejada for Angel Acaba-Vazquez, Lizbet Robles-Rodriguez, Juan Santiago-Gonzalez, Nangely De Jesus-Morales, Asnel Fernandez-Martinez, Wai Lok Lo-Santiago, Carlos J. Malave-Mayol, Luis Maldonado-Cotto, Nancy Morales-Rivera, Miguel A. Hernandez-Montanez, Aura B. Rivera-Medina, Jose A. Rivera-Ocasio, Wilfredo Soto-Arce, Vilmarie Texidor-Sanchez, Juana E. Sepulveda-Valentin, Solbee Malave-Vargas, Jorge Perez-Borroto, Margarita Arroyo-Molina, Nilsa Pagan-Serrano, Enid Ruiz-Rodriguez, Marielis Rodriguez-Leon, Gabriel Sanchez-Rios, Jonathan Santiago-Moreno, Carlos Fernandez-Flores, Leadette Gonzalez-Colon, Heriberto Figueroa-Santana, Florentin Tirado-Carlo, Christian Morales-Leon, Luz Perez-Betancourt, Yesenia Maria Suarez, Isabel De La Cruz-Sanchez, Miguel Santiago-Calderon, Thelma Delgado-Pedrogo, Nydia Tosas-Cordero, Eleanor Rodriguez-Aviles, Edwin Torres-Cruz, Joel Seijo-Rivera, Roberto Valentin-Santiago, Yamaira Ortiz-Perea, Omayra Garay-Garcia, Enid Pillot-Martinez, Laura Rivera-Rullan, Alex Rivera-Portela, Emmanuel Fontanilla-Espinal, Miguel Gonzalez-Rolon, Omar Santiago-Rodriguez, Claimy Ramirez-Diaz, William Torrellas-Diaz, Emitza Cotto-Escalera and Blanca Serrano-Maldonado, Amled Y. Perez-Ayala for Angel Acaba-Vazquez, Janice Torres-Torres, Marjorie Ocasio-Santiago, Jamilette Ramirez-Sanchez, Freddy Ramos-Soto, Naisha Cintron-Santiago, Jose Rohena-Sosa, Kevin Gonzalez-Alvarez, Angel Maldonado-Alicea, Jose Oyola-Marquez, Carlos De Jesus-Arzola, Luis Rivera-Rivera, Gladys Alberti-Torres, Eduardo Betancourt-Otero, Migdalia Silva-Acevedo, Lizbet Robles-Rodriguez, Juan Santiago-Gonzalez, Nangely De Jesus-Morales, Asnel Fernandez-Martinez, Wai Lok Lo-Santiago, Carlos J. Malave-Mayol, Luis Maldonado-Cotto, Nancy Morales-Rivera, Miguel A. Hernandez-Montanez, Aura B. Rivera-Medina, Jose A. Rivera-Ocasio, Wilfredo Soto-Arce, Vilmarie Texidor-Sanchez, Juana E. Sepulveda-Valentin, Karla Medina-Vilarino, Evelyn Rodriguez-Marrero, Victoria Ramirez-Concepcion, Sonia Chavez-Herrera, Gricel Mendez-Santos, Haydee Resto-Colon, Ninochka Marquez-Rosa, Pedro L. Lopez-Reyes, Maria De Los A. Rivera-Diaz, Julio Feliz-Pons, Sandra Toro-Martinez, Alba N. Soto-Rojas, Jorge Lopez-Santiago, Nivea J. Ortiz-Cabrera, Angel Lafuente-Amaro, Solbee Malave-Vargas, Jorge Perez-Borroto, Margarita Arroyo-Molina, Nilsa Pagan-Serrano, Enid Ruiz-Rodriguez, Marielis Rodriguez-Leon, Gabriel Sanchez-Rios, Jonathan Santiago-Moreno, Carlos Fernandez-Flores, Leadette Gonzalez-Colon, Heriberto Figueroa-Santana, Florentin Tirado-Carlo, Christian Morales-Leon, Luz Perez-Betancourt, Yesenia Maria Suarez, Isabel De La Cruz-Sanchez, Miguel Santiago-Calderon, Thelma Delgado-Pedrogo, Nydia Tosas-Cordero, Eleanor Rodriguez-Aviles, Edwin Torres-Cruz, Joel Seijo-Rivera, Roberto Valentin-Santiago, Yamaira Ortiz-Perea, Omayra Garay-Garcia, Enid Pillot-Martinez, Laura Rivera-Rullan, Alex Rivera-Portela, Emmanuel Fontanilla-Espinal, Miguel Gonzalez-Rolon, Omar Santiago-Rodriguez, Claimy Ramirez-Diaz, William Torrellas-Diaz, Emitza Cotto-Escalera and Blanca Serrano-Maldonado, Gittel Almonte-Duluc for Jaime Perello-Borras, Javier Vazquez-Collazo, Rosendo Vela-Birriel, Alvaro Vazquez-Ramos, Miguel A. Arana-Colon, Rene Valle-Umpierre, Jose Sapia, Julio Mojica and Eduardo Bhatia-Gautier, Melissa Massheder-Torres for Jaime Perello-Borras, Javier Vazquez-Collazo, Rosendo Vela-Birriel, Alvaro Vazquez-Ramos, Miguel A. Arana-Colon and Eduardo Bhatia-Gautier and Aurea Yadira Rivera-Alvarado for Jose A. Fuentes-Serrano, Xavier Gonzalez-Calderon, Jaime Perello-Borras, Javier Vazquez-Collazo, Rosendo Vela-Birriel, Alvaro Vazquez-Ramos, Miguel A. Arana-Colon, Aileen Figueroa-Vazquez, Rene Valle-Umpierre, Jose Sapia, Julio Mojica and Eduardo Bhatia-Gautier. [19-1399] (MH) [Entered: 05/22/2019 09:55 AM]
May 6, 2019 NOTICE issued. After 05/20/2019, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Carolina Guzman-Tejada for Angel Acaba-Vazquez, Lizbet Robles-Rodriguez, Juan Santiago-Gonzalez, Nangely De Jesus-Morales, Asnel Fernandez-Martinez, Wai Lok Lo-Santiago, Carlos J. Malave-Mayol, Luis Maldonado-Cotto, Nancy Morales-Rivera, Miguel A. Hernandez-Montanez, Aura B. Rivera-Medina, Jose A. Rivera-Ocasio, Wilfredo Soto-Arce, Vilmarie Texidor-Sanchez, Juana E. Sepulveda-Valentin, Solbee Malave-Vargas, Jorge Perez-Borroto, Margarita Arroyo-Molina, Nilsa Pagan-Serrano, Enid Ruiz-Rodriguez, Marielis Rodriguez-Leon, Gabriel Sanchez-Rios, Jonathan Santiago-Moreno, Carlos Fernandez-Flores, Leadette Gonzalez-Colon, Heriberto Figueroa-Santana, Florentin Tirado-Carlo, Christian Morales-Leon, Luz Perez-Betancourt, Yesenia Maria Suarez, Isabel De La Cruz-Sanchez, Miguel Santiago-Calderon, Thelma Delgado-Pedrogo, Nydia Tosas-Cordero, Eleanor Rodriguez-Aviles, Edwin Torres-Cruz, Joel Seijo-Rivera, Roberto Valentin-Santiago, Yamaira Ortiz-Perea, Omayra Garay-Garcia, Enid Pillot-Martinez, Laura Rivera-Rullan, Alex Rivera-Portela, Emmanuel Fontanilla-Espinal, Miguel Gonzalez-Rolon, Omar Santiago-Rodriguez, Claimy Ramirez-Diaz, William Torrellas-Diaz, Emitza Cotto-Escalera and Blanca Serrano-Maldonado, Amled Y. Perez-Ayala for Angel Acaba-Vazquez, Janice Torres-Torres, Marjorie Ocasio-Santiago, Jamilette Ramirez-Sanchez, Freddy Ramos-Soto, Naisha Cintron-Santiago, Jose Rohena-Sosa, Kevin Gonzalez-Alvarez, Angel Maldonado-Alicea, Jose Oyola-Marquez, Carlos De Jesus-Arzola, Luis Rivera-Rivera, Gladys Alberti-Torres, Eduardo Betancourt-Otero, Migdalia Silva-Acevedo, Lizbet Robles-Rodriguez, Juan Santiago-Gonzalez, Nangely De Jesus-Morales, Asnel Fernandez-Martinez, Wai Lok Lo-Santiago, Carlos J. Malave-Mayol, Luis Maldonado-Cotto, Nancy Morales-Rivera, Miguel A. Hernandez-Montanez, Aura B. Rivera-Medina, Jose A. Rivera-Ocasio, Wilfredo Soto-Arce, Vilmarie Texidor-Sanchez, Juana E. Sepulveda-Valentin, Karla Medina-Vilarino, Evelyn Rodriguez-Marrero, Victoria Ramirez-Concepcion, Sonia Chavez-Herrera, Gricel Mendez-Santos, Haydee Resto-Colon, Ninochka Marquez-Rosa, Pedro L. Lopez-Reyes, Maria De Los A. Rivera-Diaz, Julio Feliz-Pons, Sandra Toro-Martinez, Alba N. Soto-Rojas, Jorge Lopez-Santiago, Nivea J. Ortiz-Cabrera, Angel Lafuente-Amaro, Solbee Malave-Vargas, Jorge Perez-Borroto, Margarita Arroyo-Molina, Nilsa Pagan-Serrano, Enid Ruiz-Rodriguez, Marielis Rodriguez-Leon, Gabriel Sanchez-Rios, Jonathan Santiago-Moreno, Carlos Fernandez-Flores, Leadette Gonzalez-Colon, Heriberto Figueroa-Santana, Florentin Tirado-Carlo, Christian Morales-Leon, Luz Perez-Betancourt, Yesenia Maria Suarez, Isabel De La Cruz-Sanchez, Miguel Santiago-Calderon, Thelma Delgado-Pedrogo, Nydia Tosas-Cordero, Eleanor Rodriguez-Aviles, Edwin Torres-Cruz, Joel Seijo-Rivera, Roberto Valentin-Santiago, Yamaira Ortiz-Perea, Omayra Garay-Garcia, Enid Pillot-Martinez, Laura Rivera-Rullan, Alex Rivera-Portela, Emmanuel Fontanilla-Espinal, Miguel Gonzalez-Rolon, Omar Santiago-Rodriguez, Claimy Ramirez-Diaz, William Torrellas-Diaz, Emitza Cotto-Escalera and Blanca Serrano-Maldonado, Gittel Almonte-Duluc for Jaime Perello-Borras, Javier Vazquez-Collazo, Rosendo Vela-Birriel, Alvaro Vazquez-Ramos, Miguel A. Arana-Colon, Rene Valle-Umpierre, Jose Sapia, Julio Mojica and Eduardo Bhatia-Gautier, Melissa Massheder-Torres for Jaime Perello-Borras, Javier Vazquez-Collazo, Rosendo Vela-Birriel, Alvaro Vazquez-Ramos, Miguel A. Arana-Colon and Eduardo Bhatia-Gautier, Aurea Yadira Rivera-Alvarado for Jose A. Fuentes-Serrano, Xavier Gonzalez-Calderon, Jaime Perello-Borras, Javier Vazquez-Collazo, Rosendo Vela-Birriel, Alvaro Vazquez-Ramos, Miguel A. Arana-Colon, Aileen Figueroa-Vazquez, Rene Valle-Umpierre, Jose Sapia, Julio Mojica and Eduardo Bhatia-Gautier and Tania X. Laporte Reveron for CRIM. [19-1399] (MH) [Entered: 05/06/2019 10:25 AM]
May 3, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Angel Acaba-Vazquez, Gladys Alberti-Torres, Jose L. Aroyo-Ortiz, Margarita Arroyo-Molina, Eduardo Betancourt-Otero, Sonia Chavez-Herrera, Naisha Cintron-Santiago, Emitza Cotto-Escalera, Carlos Cruz-Diaz, Carlos De Jesus-Arzola, Nangely De Jesus-Morales, Isabel De La Cruz-Sanchez, Thelma Delgado-Pedrogo, Julio Feliz-Pons, Carlos Fernandez-Flores, Asnel Fernandez-Martinez, Heriberto Figueroa-Santana, Emmanuel Fontanilla-Espinal, Omayra Garay-Garcia, Kevin Gonzalez-Alvarez, Leadette Gonzalez-Colon, Miguel Gonzalez-Rolon, Miguel A. Hernandez-Montanez, Angel Lafuente-Amaro, Wai Lok Lo-Santiago, Pedro L. Lopez-Reyes, Jorge Lopez-Santiago, Carlos J. Malave-Mayol, Solbee Malave-Vargas, Angel Maldonado-Alicea, Luis Maldonado-Cotto, Luz S. Maldonado-Martinez, Ninochka Marquez-Rosa, Karla Medina-Vilarino, Gricel Mendez-Santos, Christian Morales-Leon, Nancy Morales-Rivera, Marjorie Ocasio-Santiago, Nivea J. Ortiz-Cabrera, Yamaira Ortiz-Perea, Jose Oyola-Marquez, Nilsa Pagan-Serrano, Luz Perez-Betancourt, Jorge Perez-Borroto, Enid Pillot-Martinez, Victoria Ramirez-Concepcion, Claimy Ramirez-Diaz, Jamilette Ramirez-Sanchez, Freddy Ramos-Soto, Haydee Resto-Colon, Maria De Los A. Rivera-Diaz, Aura B. Rivera-Medina, Jose A. Rivera-Ocasio, Alex Rivera-Portela, Luis Rivera-Rivera, Laura Rivera-Rullan, Lizbet Robles-Rodriguez, Eleanor Rodriguez-Aviles, Marielis Rodriguez-Leon, Evelyn Rodriguez-Marrero, Jose Rohena-Sosa, Enid Ruiz-Rodriguez, Gabriel Sanchez-Rios, Miguel Santiago-Calderon, Juan Santiago-Gonzalez, Jonathan Santiago-Moreno, Omar Santiago-Rodriguez, Joel Seijo-Rivera, Juana E. Sepulveda-Valentin, Migdalia Silva-Acevedo, Wilfredo Soto-Arce, Alba N. Soto-Rojas, Yesenia Maria Suarez, Vilmarie Texidor-Sanchez, Florentin Tirado-Carlo, Sandra Toro-Martinez, William Torrellas-Diaz, Edwin Torres-Cruz, Ivan Torres-Sanchez, Janice Torres-Torres, Nydia Tosas-Cordero and Roberto Valentin-Santiago. Certificate of service dated 05/03/2019. [19-1399] (DRR) [Entered: 05/03/2019 03:07 PM]
May 3, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Angel Acaba-Vazquez, Gladys Alberti-Torres, Jose L. Aroyo-Ortiz, Margarita Arroyo-Molina, Eduardo Betancourt-Otero, Sonia Chavez-Herrera, Naisha Cintron-Santiago, Emitza Cotto-Escalera, Carlos Cruz-Diaz, Carlos De Jesus-Arzola, Nangely De Jesus-Morales, Isabel De La Cruz-Sanchez, Thelma Delgado-Pedrogo, Julio Feliz-Pons, Carlos Fernandez-Flores, Asnel Fernandez-Martinez, Heriberto Figueroa-Santana, Emmanuel Fontanilla-Espinal, Omayra Garay-Garcia, Kevin Gonzalez-Alvarez, Leadette Gonzalez-Colon, Miguel Gonzalez-Rolon, Miguel A. Hernandez-Montanez, Angel Lafuente-Amaro, Wai Lok Lo-Santiago, Pedro L. Lopez-Reyes, Jorge Lopez-Santiago, Carlos J. Malave-Mayol, Solbee Malave-Vargas, Angel Maldonado-Alicea, Luis Maldonado-Cotto, Luz S. Maldonado-Martinez, Ninochka Marquez-Rosa, Karla Medina-Vilarino, Gricel Mendez-Santos, Christian Morales-Leon, Nancy Morales-Rivera, Marjorie Ocasio-Santiago, Nivea J. Ortiz-Cabrera, Yamaira Ortiz-Perea, Jose Oyola-Marquez, Nilsa Pagan-Serrano, Luz Perez-Betancourt, Jorge Perez-Borroto, Enid Pillot-Martinez, Victoria Ramirez-Concepcion, Claimy Ramirez-Diaz, Jamilette Ramirez-Sanchez, Freddy Ramos-Soto, Haydee Resto-Colon, Maria De Los A. Rivera-Diaz, Aura B. Rivera-Medina, Jose A. Rivera-Ocasio, Alex Rivera-Portela, Luis Rivera-Rivera, Laura Rivera-Rullan, Lizbet Robles-Rodriguez, Eleanor Rodriguez-Aviles, Marielis Rodriguez-Leon, Evelyn Rodriguez-Marrero, Jose Rohena-Sosa, Enid Ruiz-Rodriguez, Gabriel Sanchez-Rios, Miguel Santiago-Calderon, Juan Santiago-Gonzalez, Jonathan Santiago-Moreno, Omar Santiago-Rodriguez, Joel Seijo-Rivera, Juana E. Sepulveda-Valentin, Migdalia Silva-Acevedo, Wilfredo Soto-Arce, Alba N. Soto-Rojas, Yesenia Maria Suarez, Vilmarie Texidor-Sanchez, Florentin Tirado-Carlo, Sandra Toro-Martinez, William Torrellas-Diaz, Edwin Torres-Cruz, Ivan Torres-Sanchez, Janice Torres-Torres, Nydia Tosas-Cordero and Roberto Valentin-Santiago indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 05/03/2019. [19-1399] (DRR) [Entered: 05/03/2019 03:03 PM]
May 3, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Angel Acaba-Vazquez, Gladys Alberti-Torres, Jose L. Aroyo-Ortiz, Margarita Arroyo-Molina, Eduardo Betancourt-Otero, Sonia Chavez-Herrera, Naisha Cintron-Santiago, Emitza Cotto-Escalera, Carlos Cruz-Diaz, Carlos De Jesus-Arzola, Nangely De Jesus-Morales, Isabel De La Cruz-Sanchez, Thelma Delgado-Pedrogo, Julio Feliz-Pons, Carlos Fernandez-Flores, Asnel Fernandez-Martinez, Heriberto Figueroa-Santana, Emmanuel Fontanilla-Espinal, Omayra Garay-Garcia, Kevin Gonzalez-Alvarez, Leadette Gonzalez-Colon, Miguel Gonzalez-Rolon, Miguel A. Hernandez-Montanez, Angel Lafuente-Amaro, Wai Lok Lo-Santiago, Pedro L. Lopez-Reyes, Jorge Lopez-Santiago, Carlos J. Malave-Mayol, Solbee Malave-Vargas, Angel Maldonado-Alicea, Luis Maldonado-Cotto, Luz S. Maldonado-Martinez, Ninochka Marquez-Rosa, Karla Medina-Vilarino, Gricel Mendez-Santos, Christian Morales-Leon, Nancy Morales-Rivera, Marjorie Ocasio-Santiago, Nivea J. Ortiz-Cabrera, Yamaira Ortiz-Perea, Jose Oyola-Marquez, Nilsa Pagan-Serrano, Luz Perez-Betancourt, Jorge Perez-Borroto, Enid Pillot-Martinez, Victoria Ramirez-Concepcion, Claimy Ramirez-Diaz, Jamilette Ramirez-Sanchez, Freddy Ramos-Soto, Haydee Resto-Colon, Maria De Los A. Rivera-Diaz, Aura B. Rivera-Medina, Jose A. Rivera-Ocasio, Alex Rivera-Portela, Luis Rivera-Rivera, Laura Rivera-Rullan, Lizbet Robles-Rodriguez, Eleanor Rodriguez-Aviles, Marielis Rodriguez-Leon, Evelyn Rodriguez-Marrero, Jose Rohena-Sosa, Enid Ruiz-Rodriguez, Gabriel Sanchez-Rios, Miguel Santiago-Calderon, Juan Santiago-Gonzalez, Jonathan Santiago-Moreno, Omar Santiago-Rodriguez, Joel Seijo-Rivera, Juana E. Sepulveda-Valentin, Migdalia Silva-Acevedo, Wilfredo Soto-Arce, Alba N. Soto-Rojas, Yesenia Maria Suarez, Vilmarie Texidor-Sanchez, Florentin Tirado-Carlo, Sandra Toro-Martinez, William Torrellas-Diaz, Edwin Torres-Cruz, Ivan Torres-Sanchez, Janice Torres-Torres, Nydia Tosas-Cordero and Roberto Valentin-Santiago filed by Attorney David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns. Certificate of service dated 05/03/2019. [19-1399] (DRR) [Entered: 05/03/2019 03:00 PM]
May 3, 2019 Filing fee was paid in the district court by Appellants Angel Acaba-Vazquez, Gladys Alberti-Torres, Jose L. Aroyo-Ortiz, Margarita Arroyo-Molina, Eduardo Betancourt-Otero, Sonia Chavez-Herrera, Naisha Cintron-Santiago, Emitza Cotto-Escalera, Carlos Cruz-Diaz, Carlos De Jesus-Arzola, Nangely De Jesus-Morales, Isabel De La Cruz-Sanchez, Thelma Delgado-Pedrogo, Julio Feliz-Pons, Carlos Fernandez-Flores, Asnel Fernandez-Martinez, Heriberto Figueroa-Santana, Emmanuel Fontanilla-Espinal, Omayra Garay-Garcia, Kevin Gonzalez-Alvarez, Leadette Gonzalez-Colon, Miguel Gonzalez-Rolon, Miguel A. Hernandez-Montanez, Angel Lafuente-Amaro, Wai Lok Lo-Santiago, Pedro L. Lopez-Reyes, Jorge Lopez-Santiago, Carlos J. Malave-Mayol, Solbee Malave-Vargas, Angel Maldonado-Alicea, Luis Maldonado-Cotto, Luz S. Maldonado-Martinez, Ninochka Marquez-Rosa, Karla Medina-Vilarino, Gricel Mendez-Santos, Christian Morales-Leon, Nancy Morales-Rivera, Marjorie Ocasio-Santiago, Nivea J. Ortiz-Cabrera, Yamaira Ortiz-Perea, Jose Oyola-Marquez, Nilsa Pagan-Serrano, Luz Perez-Betancourt, Jorge Perez-Borroto, Enid Pillot-Martinez, Victoria Ramirez-Concepcion, Claimy Ramirez-Diaz, Jamilette Ramirez-Sanchez, Freddy Ramos-Soto, Haydee Resto-Colon, Maria De Los A. Rivera-Diaz, Aura B. Rivera-Medina, Jose A. Rivera-Ocasio, Alex Rivera-Portela, Luis Rivera-Rivera, Laura Rivera-Rullan, Lizbet Robles-Rodriguez, Eleanor Rodriguez-Aviles, Marielis Rodriguez-Leon, Evelyn Rodriguez-Marrero, Jose Rohena-Sosa, Enid Ruiz-Rodriguez, Gabriel Sanchez-Rios, Miguel Santiago-Calderon, Juan Santiago-Gonzalez, Jonathan Santiago-Moreno, Omar Santiago-Rodriguez, Joel Seijo-Rivera, Juana E. Sepulveda-Valentin, Migdalia Silva-Acevedo, Wilfredo Soto-Arce, Alba N. Soto-Rojas, Yesenia Maria Suarez, Vilmarie Texidor-Sanchez, Florentin Tirado-Carlo, Sandra Toro-Martinez, William Torrellas-Diaz, Edwin Torres-Cruz, Ivan Torres-Sanchez, Janice Torres-Torres, Nydia Tosas-Cordero and Roberto Valentin-Santiago on 05/02/2019. [19-1399] (GK) [Entered: 05/03/2019 09:08 AM]
May 2, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Miguel A. Arana-Colon, Aileen Figueroa-Vazquez, Jose A. Fuentes-Serrano, Xavier Gonzalez-Calderon, Julio Mojica, Jaime Perello-Borras, Jose Sapia, Rene Valle-Umpierre, Javier Vazquez-Collazo, Alvaro Vazquez-Ramos and Rosendo Vela-Birriel filed by Attorney Carlos Lugo-Fiol. Certificate of service dated 05/02/2019. [19-1399] (CL) [Entered: 05/02/2019 03:36 PM]
April 19, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #262) filed by Appellants Angel Acaba-Vazquez, Gladys Alberti-Torres, Jose L. Aroyo-Ortiz, Margarita Arroyo-Molina, Eduardo Betancourt-Otero, Sonia Chavez-Herrera, Naisha Cintron-Santiago, Emitza Cotto-Escalera, Carlos Cruz-Diaz, Carlos De Jesus-Arzola, Nangely De Jesus-Morales, Isabel De La Cruz-Sanchez, Thelma Delgado-Pedrogo, Julio Feliz-Pons, Carlos Fernandez-Flores, Asnel Fernandez-Martinez, Heriberto Figueroa-Santana, Emmanuel Fontanilla-Espinal, Omayra Garay-Garcia, Kevin Gonzalez-Alvarez, Leadette Gonzalez-Colon, Miguel Gonzalez-Rolon, Miguel A. Hernandez-Montanez, Angel Lafuente-Amaro, Wai Lok Lo-Santiago, Pedro L. Lopez-Reyes, Jorge Lopez-Santiago, Carlos J. Malave-Mayol, Solbee Malave-Vargas, Angel Maldonado-Alicea, Luis Maldonado-Cotto, Luz S. Maldonado-Martinez, Ninochka Marquez-Rosa, Karla Medina-Vilarino, Gricel Mendez-Santos, Christian Morales-Leon, Nancy Morales-Rivera, Marjorie Ocasio-Santiago, Nivea J. Ortiz-Cabrera, Yamaira Ortiz-Perea, Jose Oyola-Marquez, Nilsa Pagan-Serrano, Luz Perez-Betancourt, Jorge Perez-Borroto, Enid Pillot-Martinez, Victoria Ramirez-Concepcion, Claimy Ramirez-Diaz, Jamilette Ramirez-Sanchez, Freddy Ramos-Soto, Haydee Resto-Colon, Maria De Los A. Rivera-Diaz, Aura B. Rivera-Medina, Jose A. Rivera-Ocasio, Alex Rivera-Portela, Luis Rivera-Rivera, Laura Rivera-Rullan, Lizbet Robles-Rodriguez, Eleanor Rodriguez-Aviles, Marielis Rodriguez-Leon, Evelyn Rodriguez-Marrero, Jose Rohena-Sosa, Enid Ruiz-Rodriguez, Gabriel Sanchez-Rios, Miguel Santiago-Calderon, Juan Santiago-Gonzalez, Jonathan Santiago-Moreno, Omar Santiago-Rodriguez, Joel Seijo-Rivera, Juana E. Sepulveda-Valentin, Migdalia Silva-Acevedo, Wilfredo Soto-Arce, Alba N. Soto-Rojas, Yesenia Maria Suarez, Vilmarie Texidor-Sanchez, Florentin Tirado-Carlo, Sandra Toro-Martinez, William Torrellas-Diaz, Edwin Torres-Cruz, Ivan Torres-Sanchez, Janice Torres-Torres, Nydia Tosas-Cordero and Roberto Valentin-Santiago. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, Fee, and Appearance form due 05/03/2019. [19-1399] (MH) [Entered: 04/19/2019 01:26 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres-Torres, et al v. Perello-Borras, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARLOS J. MALAVE-MAYOL
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARIA DE LOS A. RIVERA-DIAZ
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILFREDO SOTO-ARCE
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM TORRELLAS-DIAZ
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDWIN TORRES-CRUZ
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LUIS MALDONADO-COTTO
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: YESENIA MARIA SUAREZ
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FLORENTIN TIRADO-CARLO
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WAI LOK LO-SANTIAGO
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FREDDY RAMOS-SOTO
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE A. RIVERA-OCASIO
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NIVEA J. ORTIZ-CABRERA
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GRICEL MENDEZ-SANTOS
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HERIBERTO FIGUEROA-SANTANA
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MIGUEL SANTIAGO-CALDERON
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTIAN MORALES-LEON
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JUANA E. SEPULVEDA-VALENTIN
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PEDRO L. LOPEZ-REYES
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: YAMAIRA ORTIZ-PEREA
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALBA N. SOTO-ROJAS
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EMMANUEL FONTANILLA-ESPINAL
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALEX RIVERA-PORTELA
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LAURA RIVERA-RULLAN
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JANICE TORRES-TORRES
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VILMARIE TEXIDOR-SANCHEZ
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: OMAYRA GARAY-GARCIA
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE ROHENA-SOSA
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANGEL ACABA-VAZQUEZ
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LIZBET ROBLES-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JULIO FELIZ-PONS
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARGARITA ARROYO-MOLINA
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CLAIMY RAMIREZ-DIAZ
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NANCY MORALES-RIVERA
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AURA B. RIVERA-MEDINA
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GABRIEL SANCHEZ-RIOS
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NINOCHKA MARQUEZ-ROSA
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ISABEL DE LA CRUZ-SANCHEZ
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERTO VALENTIN-SANTIAGO
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARLOS CRUZ-DIAZ
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SANDRA TORO-MARTINEZ
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARLOS DE JESUS-ARZOLA
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELEANOR RODRIGUEZ-AVILES
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VICTORIA RAMIREZ-CONCEPCION
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KEVIN GONZALEZ-ALVAREZ
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THELMA DELGADO-PEDROGO
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMILETTE RAMIREZ-SANCHEZ
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JORGE LOPEZ-SANTIAGO
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EMITZA COTTO-ESCALERA
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARIELIS RODRIGUEZ-LEON
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: IVAN TORRES-SANCHEZ
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GLADYS ALBERTI-TORRES
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDUARDO BETANCOURT-OTERO
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NANGELY DE JESUS-MORALES
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JONATHAN SANTIAGO-MORENO
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EVELYN RODRIGUEZ-MARRERO
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOEL SEIJO-RIVERA
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ENID RUIZ-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JORGE PEREZ-BORROTO
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARLOS FERNANDEZ-FLORES
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NYDIA TOSAS-CORDERO
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KARLA MEDINA-VILARINO
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: OMAR SANTIAGO-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ASNEL FERNANDEZ-MARTINEZ
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HAYDEE RESTO-COLON
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NILSA PAGAN-SERRANO
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LUIS RIVERA-RIVERA
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE OYOLA-MARQUEZ
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MIGUEL A. HERNANDEZ-MONTANEZ
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANGEL LAFUENTE-AMARO
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LEADETTE GONZALEZ-COLON
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SONIA CHAVEZ-HERRERA
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ENID PILLOT-MARTINEZ
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SOLBEE MALAVE-VARGAS
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LUZ S. MALDONADO-MARTINEZ
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LUZ PEREZ-BETANCOURT
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JUAN SANTIAGO-GONZALEZ
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANGEL MALDONADO-ALICEA
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MIGUEL GONZALEZ-ROLON
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NAISHA CINTRON-SANTIAGO
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MIGDALIA SILVA-ACEVEDO
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARJORIE OCASIO-SANTIAGO
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE L. AROYO-ORTIZ
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROSENDO VELA-BIRRIEL, in his Personal and Official Capacity as Deputy Superintendent in Charge of Operations
Represented By: Melissa Massheder-Torres
Represented By: Aurea Yadira Rivera-Alvarado
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Damaris Ortiz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Gittel Almonte-Duluc
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAIME PERELLO-BORRAS, in his Personal and Official Capacity as Speaker of the House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Melissa Massheder-Torres
Represented By: Aurea Yadira Rivera-Alvarado
Represented By: Damaris Ortiz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Gittel Almonte-Duluc
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JULIO MOJICA, in his Personal and Official Capacity as Director of Facilities Conservation and Technical Services
Represented By: Aurea Yadira Rivera-Alvarado
Represented By: Damaris Ortiz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Gittel Almonte-Duluc
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RENE VALLE-UMPIERRE, in his Personal and Official Capacity as Director of Decoration and Facilities Administration
Represented By: Aurea Yadira Rivera-Alvarado
Represented By: Damaris Ortiz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Gittel Almonte-Duluc
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: XAVIER GONZALEZ-CALDERON, in his Personal and Official Capacity as Administrator of the House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Aurea Yadira Rivera-Alvarado
Represented By: Damaris Ortiz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALVARO VAZQUEZ-RAMOS, in his Personal and Official Capacity as Deputy Superintendent in Charge of Administration
Represented By: Melissa Massheder-Torres
Represented By: Aurea Yadira Rivera-Alvarado
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Damaris Ortiz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Gittel Almonte-Duluc
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSE A. FUENTES-SERRANO, in his Personal and Official Capacity as Human Resources Director of the House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Aurea Yadira Rivera-Alvarado
Represented By: Damaris Ortiz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSE SAPIA, in his Personal and Official Capacity as Director of General Services
Represented By: Aurea Yadira Rivera-Alvarado
Represented By: Damaris Ortiz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Gittel Almonte-Duluc
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAVIER VAZQUEZ-COLLAZO, in his Personal and Official Capacity as Superintendent of the Capitol Building
Represented By: Melissa Massheder-Torres
Represented By: Aurea Yadira Rivera-Alvarado
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Gittel Almonte-Duluc
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIGUEL A. ARANA-COLON, in his Personal and Official Capacity as Human Resources Director at the Office of the Superintendent of the Capitol Building
Represented By: Melissa Massheder-Torres
Represented By: Aurea Yadira Rivera-Alvarado
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Damaris Ortiz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Gittel Almonte-Duluc
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AILEEN FIGUEROA-VAZQUEZ, in her Personal and Official Capacity as Secretary of the House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Aurea Yadira Rivera-Alvarado
Represented By: Damaris Ortiz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDUARDO BHATIA-GAUTIER, in his Personal and Official Capacity as President of the Senate of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Melissa Massheder-Torres
Represented By: Aurea Yadira Rivera-Alvarado
Represented By: Gittel Almonte-Duluc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NELSON RIVERA-PEREZ
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLANCA SERRANO-MALDONADO
Represented By: Amled Y. Perez-Ayala
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Carolina Guzman-Tejada
Represented By: Margarita Cintron-Solla
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose Antonio Oliveras-Cabrera
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CRIM
Represented By: Tania X. Laporte Reveron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?