US v. Mejia Romero

Defendant / Appellant: ELIN R. MEJIA-ROMERO, a/k/a Sixto Rivera, a/k/a Memelo, Benito Rivera and ELIN ROBINSON MEJIA ROMERO, a/k/a Sixto Rivera, a/k/a Memelo, Benito Rivera
Appellee: UNITED STATES
Case Number: 19-1405
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Elin Robinson Mejia Romero indicating the following transcripts are being ordered: 02/27/2018, status conference; 08/02/2018, Motion Hearing; 09/12/2018, Change of Plea; 09/17/2018, Jury Trial; 09/18/2018, Jury Trial Day 2; 09/20/2018, Jury Trial Day 3; 09/21/2018, Jury Trial Day 4. Transcripts due 08/20/2019 from Court Reporter Joan Daly. [19-1405] (AL) [Entered: 06/21/2019 02:54 PM]
June 21, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Elin Robinson Mejia Romero indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 06/21/2019. [19-1405] (ZBR) [Entered: 06/21/2019 10:51 AM]
June 21, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Elin Robinson Mejia Romero. Certificate of service dated 06/21/2019. [19-1405] (ZBR) [Entered: 06/21/2019 10:40 AM]
June 20, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Elin Robinson Mejia Romero filed by Attorney Zainabu Rumala. Certificate of service dated 06/20/2019. [19-1405] (ZBR) [Entered: 06/20/2019 04:58 PM]
May 17, 2019 NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file an appearance form, docketing statement and transcript report/order form or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript report/order form due 05/31/2019. [19-1405] (AL) [Entered: 05/17/2019 05:26 PM]
April 29, 2019 CRIMINAL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #166) filed by Appellant Elin R. Mejia-Romero. Docketing Statement due 05/13/2019. Transcript Report/Order form due 05/13/2019. Appearance form due 05/13/2019. [19-1405] (AL) [Entered: 04/29/2019 03:22 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US v. Mejia Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ELIN R. MEJIA-ROMERO, a/k/a Sixto Rivera, a/k/a Memelo, Benito Rivera
Represented By: Jamiel Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ELIN ROBINSON MEJIA ROMERO, a/k/a Sixto Rivera, a/k/a Memelo, Benito Rivera
Represented By: Jamiel Allen
Represented By: Elin Robinson Mejia Romero
Represented By: Zainabu Brittany-Rachel Rumala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Lauren Graber
Represented By: Cynthia A. Young
Represented By: Leah Belaire Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?