Pershouse v. L.L. Bean, Inc.

Plaintiff / Appellant: BENJAMIN T. PERSHOUSE, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Defendant / Appellee: L.L. BEAN, INC.
Case Number: 19-1422
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant Benjamin T. Pershouse. Certificate of service dated 06/26/2019. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 07/05/2019 . Brief due 07/26/2019 for APPELLEE L.L. Bean, Inc. [19-1422] (AMM) [Entered: 06/27/2019 01:23 PM]
June 26, 2019 BRIEF tendered by Appellant Benjamin T. Pershouse. [19-1422] (BB) [Entered: 06/26/2019 07:21 PM]
June 26, 2019 JOINT APPENDIX filed by Appellant Benjamin T. Pershouse. Number of volumes: 1. Number of copies: 5. Certificate of service dated 06/26/2019. [19-1422] (AMM) [Entered: 06/26/2019 03:53 PM]
June 25, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Benjamin T. Pershouse filed by Attorney Michael Liskow. Certificate of service dated 06/25/2019. [19-1422] (ML) [Entered: 06/25/2019 09:14 PM]
June 21, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Benjamin T. Pershouse filed by Attorney Ben Barnow. Certificate of service dated 06/21/2019. [19-1422] (BB) [Entered: 06/21/2019 04:50 PM]
June 7, 2019 NOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney Darlene Alt for Appellee L.L. Bean, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 06/06/2019. [19-1422] (AL) [Entered: 06/07/2019 04:22 PM]
June 5, 2019 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Ben Barnow for Benjamin T. Pershouse, Anthony L. Parkhill for Benjamin T. Pershouse, Darleen Kay Alt for L.L. Bean, Inc., Jeremy S. Goldkind for L.L. Bean, Inc., Daniel Raymond for L.L. Bean, Inc. and Stephanie A. Sheridan for L.L. Bean, Inc.. [19-1422] (AL) [Entered: 06/05/2019 01:40 PM]
May 28, 2019 NOTICE Application and Oath for Admission to Practice and Certificate of Good Standing filed by Appellant Benjamin T. Pershouse. Certificate of service dated 05/28/2019. [19-1422]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was docketed in error. Please disregard. (DP) [Entered: 05/28/2019 04:27 PM]
May 22, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee L.L. Bean, Inc. filed by Attorney Michael A. Vatis. Certificate of service dated 05/22/2019. [19-1422] (MV) [Entered: 05/22/2019 12:10 PM]
May 22, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee L.L. Bean, Inc. filed by Attorney Anthony J. Anscombe. Certificate of service dated 05/22/2019. [19-1422] (AJA) [Entered: 05/22/2019 11:10 AM]
May 17, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 06/26/2019 for appellant Benjamin T. Pershouse. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1422] (AL) [Entered: 05/17/2019 10:59 AM]
May 17, 2019 NOTICE issued. After 05/31/2019, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Ben Barnow for Benjamin T. Pershouse, Michael Liskow for Benjamin T. Pershouse, Anthony L. Parkhill for Benjamin T. Pershouse, Darleen Kay Alt for L.L. Bean, Inc., Mary E. Buckley for L.L. Bean, Inc., Jeremy S. Goldkind for L.L. Bean, Inc., Daniel Raymond for L.L. Bean, Inc. and Stephanie A. Sheridan for L.L. Bean, Inc.. [19-1422] (AL) [Entered: 05/17/2019 10:51 AM]
May 15, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Benjamin T. Pershouse. Certificate of service dated 05/15/2019. [19-1422] (DP) [Entered: 05/15/2019 02:48 PM]
May 2, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Benjamin T. Pershouse filed by Attorney David Pastor. Certificate of service dated 05/02/2019. [19-1422] (DP) [Entered: 05/02/2019 12:00 PM]
May 2, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee L.L. Bean, Inc. filed by Attorney Peter J Brann. Certificate of service dated 05/02/2019. [19-1422] (PJB) [Entered: 05/02/2019 11:04 AM]
May 2, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee L.L. Bean, Inc. filed by Attorney Stacy O. Stitham. Certificate of service dated 05/02/2019. [19-1422] (SOS) [Entered: 05/02/2019 10:49 AM]
May 1, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #48) filed by Appellant Benjamin T. Pershouse. Docketing Statement due 05/15/2019. Appearance form due 05/15/2019. [19-1422] (AL) [Entered: 05/01/2019 05:01 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pershouse v. L.L. Bean, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BENJAMIN T. PERSHOUSE, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: David Pastor
Represented By: Anthony L. Parkhill
Represented By: Michael Liskow
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Represented By: Janine Lee Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: L.L. BEAN, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie A. Sheridan
Represented By: Daniel Raymond
Represented By: Darlene Kay Alt
Represented By: Peter J. Brann
Represented By: Mary E. Buckley
Represented By: Anthony J. Anscombe
Represented By: Stacy O. Stitham
Represented By: Jeremy S. Goldkind
Represented By: Michael Vatis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?