Alpine v. Smith

Petitioner / Appellant: CHARLES ALPINE
Respondent / Appellee: JIMMY SMITH, Warden at ALLRED and JIMMY SMITH, Warden
Case Number: 19-1433
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to pay fee filed by Appellant Charles Alpine. Filing fee due 07/09/2019. [19-1388, 19-1417, 19-1433] (GK) [Entered: 06/25/2019 11:45 AM]
June 24, 2019 MOTION to extend time to pay filing fee filed by Appellant Charles Alpine. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1433] (GRC) [Entered: 06/24/2019 04:54 PM]
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER directing petitioner to file a request for a certificate of appealabilty in this court by 07/12/2019. Date of denial by district court: April 9, 2019. [19-1433] (GRC) [Entered: 06/12/2019 02:19 PM]
June 4, 2019 DOCKET sheet sent to appellant. [19-1388, 19-1417, 19-1433] (GRC) [Entered: 06/04/2019 04:33 PM]
June 4, 2019 LETTER sent to Appellant Charles Alpine in 19-1388, 19-1417, and 19-1433 regarding status of appeals. [19-1388, 19-1417, 19-1433] (GRC) [Entered: 06/04/2019 04:32 PM]
May 30, 2019 NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss for failure to pay the filing fee. Fees due 06/13/2019. [19-1388, 19-1417, 19-1433] (GK) [Entered: 05/30/2019 03:28 PM]
May 2, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #6) filed by Appellant Charles Alpine. Fee due 05/16/2019. [19-1433] (GRC) [Entered: 05/02/2019 10:51 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alpine v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: CHARLES ALPINE
Represented By: Charles Alpine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: JIMMY SMITH, Warden at ALLRED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: JIMMY SMITH, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?