Negron v. Nelligan, et al

Defendant: COLETTE M. GOGUEN, LOIS A. RUSSO, THOMAS A. TURCO, III, THOMAS DICKHAUT and KELLY A. RYAN
Defendant / Appellee: ABBE NELLIGAN, LUIS MELENDEZ and LORI CRESEY
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOSE L. NEGRON
Case Number: 19-1435
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER directing appellant to file a corrected Transcript Report/Order Form by 07/11/2019. [19-1435] (ZN) [Entered: 06/27/2019 02:28 PM]
June 27, 2019 SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: 258, 264. [19-1435] (MH) [Entered: 06/27/2019 12:01 PM]
June 24, 2019 NOTICE of Informal Complaint filed by Appellant Jose L. Negron. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1435] (MH) [Entered: 06/25/2019 10:12 AM]
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: In light of the May 29, 2019 court order denying appellant Jose L. Negron's motion for an extension of time, appellant's May 23, 2019 motion to file a letter ex parte and under seal is denied. [19-1435] (MH) [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:08 PM]
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered. This court is in receipt of Prison Litigation Reform Act (PLRA) Forms 1, and 2 filed by appellant Jose L. Negron on May 13, 2019. As noted in PLRA Form 1, the prison trust officer must fill out and sign this form and attach a certified copy of the prisoner trust account statement beginning on October 29, 2018 and preceding your notice of appeal dated April 29, 2019. The record also reflects that PLRA Form 2 has not been filed in this court. Accordingly, this appeal will be dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 3(b) for failure to prosecute on June 28, 2019 unless, within that time, PLRA Forms 1 and 2 are properly completed and filed with this court or the full filing fee is paid to the clerk of the district court and notice is supplied to this court. PLRA Forms 1 and 2 are enclosed with this order. [19-1435] (GK) [Entered: 06/14/2019 01:15 PM]
June 12, 2019 MOTION for Clarification filed by Appellant Jose L. Negron in 19-1435, 19-1489. Certificate of service dated 06/06/2019. [19-1435, 19-1489] (MH) [Entered: 06/12/2019 01:40 PM]
May 30, 2019 NOTICE of appearance filed by Party Jose L. Negron. [19-1435] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was modified to replace an attachment. (MH) [Entered: 05/30/2019 01:49 PM]
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Appellate Judge: Plaintiff-Appellant Jose L. Negron has filed a Motion for Leave for Extension of Time with Affidavit in Support concerning payment of the filing fee for his appeal. The motion is DENIED. So ordered. [19-1435] (MH) [Entered: 05/29/2019 02:34 PM]
May 23, 2019 MOTION to File Letter Ex Parte and Under Seal filed by Appellant Jose L. Negron. Certificate of service dated 05/18/2019. [19-1435] (MH) [Entered: 06/03/2019 08:56 AM]
May 23, 2019 PLRA RESPONSE filed by Appellant Jose L. Negron. [19-1435]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (MH) [Entered: 05/23/2019 01:52 PM]
May 23, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file PLRA response filed by Appellant Jose L. Negron. Certificate of service dated 05/18/2019. [19-1435] (MH) [Entered: 05/23/2019 01:50 PM]
May 17, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Lori Cresey, Luis Melendez and Abbe Nelligan filed by Attorney Sheryl F. Grant. Certificate of service dated 05/17/2019. [19-1435] (SG) [Entered: 05/17/2019 02:51 PM]
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER denying as moot motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Jose L. Negron. [19-1435] (GK) [Entered: 05/14/2019 01:05 PM]
May 13, 2019 DECLARATION in Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1746 filed by Appellant Jose L. Negron. Certificate of service dated 05/05/2019. [19-1435] (MH) [Entered: 05/13/2019 02:12 PM]
May 13, 2019 PLRA Form 1 with Exhibits filed by Appellant Jose L. Negron. Certificate of service dated 05/05/2019. [19-1435]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (MH) [Entered: 05/13/2019 02:09 PM]
May 13, 2019 MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Jose L. Negron. Certificate of service dated 05/05/2019. [19-1435] (MH) [Entered: 05/13/2019 02:07 PM]
May 13, 2019 PLEADING tendered: Transcript Report/Order Form filed by Appellant Jose L. Negron. Certificate of service dated 05/06/2019. [19-1435] (MH) [Entered: 05/13/2019 02:05 PM]
May 13, 2019 PLRA LETTER issued. IFP was granted in district court. PLRA forms sent. PLRA response due 05/28/2019. [19-1435] (MH) [Entered: 05/13/2019 10:46 AM]
May 2, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #253) filed by Appellant Jose L. Negron. Transcript Report/Order form and Fee due 05/16/2019. [19-1435] (MH) [Entered: 05/02/2019 02:48 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Negron v. Nelligan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ABBE NELLIGAN
Represented By: Sheryl Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LUIS MELENDEZ
Represented By: Sheryl Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LORI CRESEY
Represented By: Sheryl Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE L. NEGRON
Represented By: Jose L. Negron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLETTE M. GOGUEN
Represented By: Sheryl Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOIS A. RUSSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS A. TURCO, III
Represented By: Sheryl Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS DICKHAUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY A. RYAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?