Culley, et al v. Bank of America, N.A., et al
Defendant / Appellee: FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. and HARMON LAW OFFICES, P.C.
Plaintiff / Appellant: CHRISTIAN P. CULLEY and KATHRYN K. CULLEY
Case Number: 19-1436
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Kathryn K. Culley and Christian P. Culley. Brief and Appendix due 08/09/2019 for appellant Christian P. Culley and Kathryn K. Culley. [19-1436] (KC) [Entered: 06/26/2019 12:46 PM]
June 25, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Christian P. Culley and Kathryn K. Culley. Certificate of service dated 06/25/2019. [19-1436] (TSD) [Entered: 06/25/2019 06:47 PM]
June 4, 2019 NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: James B. Fox for First American Title Insurance Company. [19-1436] (KC) [Entered: 06/04/2019 10:45 AM]
May 31, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 07/10/2019 for appellant Christian P. Culley and Kathryn K. Culley. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1436] (KC) [Entered: 05/31/2019 11:49 AM]
May 31, 2019 NOTICE of filing the following transcript(s) in district court by Court Reporter FTR - MA: 09/25/2018, MTD. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [19-1436] (KC) [Entered: 05/31/2019 11:48 AM]
May 20, 2019 NOTICE issued. After 06/03/2019, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: James B. Fox for First American Title Insurance Company. [19-1436] (KC) [Entered: 05/20/2019 04:02 PM]
May 17, 2019 TRANSCRIPT ordered: 09/25/2018, Motion to Dismiss. Transcript(s) due 07/16/2019 from Court Reporter FTR - MA [19-1436] (ZN) [Entered: 05/17/2019 04:26 PM]
May 17, 2019 CERTIFICATE of service for notice of appearance [ # 6254853-2 ], docketing statement [ # 6254856-2 ], transcript report/order form [ # 6254863-2 ] filed by Appellants Christian P. Culley and Kathryn K. Culley. Certificate of service dated 05/17/2019. [19-1436] (TSD) [Entered: 05/17/2019 10:59 AM]
May 17, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Christian P. Culley and Kathryn K. Culley indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 05/17/2019. [19-1436] (TSD) [Entered: 05/17/2019 10:56 AM]
May 17, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Christian P. Culley and Kathryn K. Culley. Certificate of service dated 05/17/2019. [19-1436] (TSD) [Entered: 05/17/2019 10:42 AM]
May 17, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Christian P. Culley and Kathryn K. Culley filed by Attorney Todd S. Dion, Esq.. Certificate of service dated 05/17/2019. [19-1436] (TSD) [Entered: 05/17/2019 10:40 AM]
May 3, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #50) filed by Appellants Christian P. Culley and Kathryn K. Culley. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 05/17/2019. [19-1436] (KC) [Entered: 05/03/2019 04:23 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Culley, et al v. Bank of America, N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Meredith A. Swisher
Represented By: James B. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Represented By: Sean R. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Sean R. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HARMON LAW OFFICES, P.C.
Represented By: Robert M. Mendillo
Represented By: Kurt R. McHugh
Represented By: Scott C. Owens
Represented By: Andrea V. Lasker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTIAN P. CULLEY
Represented By: Todd Steven Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KATHRYN K. CULLEY
Represented By: Todd Steven Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?