Turcotte v. Comcast Cable Commc'n Mgmt LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant: BRENDA TURCOTTE and BRENDA MARIE TURCOTTE
Defendant / Appellee: COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS MANAGEMENT, LLC
Case Number: 19-1438
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file opening forms filed by Appellant Brenda Marie Turcotte. Transcript report/order form due 07/09/2019. [19-1438] (GRC) [Entered: 06/25/2019 04:30 PM]
June 10, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file a transcript report/order form filed by Appellant Brenda Marie Turcotte. Certificate of service dated 06/10/2019. [19-1438] CLERK'S NOTE: The ECF filer did not select the option that best describes the document. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (BMT) [Entered: 06/10/2019 02:33 PM]
June 7, 2019 RESPONSE filed by Appellee Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC to response [ # 6257527-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 06/07/2019. [19-1438] (CC) [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:38 PM]
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file opening forms filed by Appellant Brenda Marie Turcotte. Transcript report/order form due 06/10/2019. [19-1438] (GRC) [Entered: 06/03/2019 01:17 PM]
May 30, 2019 RESPONSE filed by Appellant Brenda Marie Turcotte to order regarding untimely appeal [ # 6254676-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 05/30/2019. [19-1438] (BMT) [Entered: 05/30/2019 09:32 PM]
May 29, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file a transcript report/order form filed by Appellant Brenda Marie Turcotte. Certificate of service dated 05/29/2019. [19-1438] (BMT) [Entered: 05/29/2019 03:35 PM]
May 27, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Brenda Marie Turcotte indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 05/27/2019. [19-1438] CLERK'S NOTE: The document incomplete. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS (05/30/2019). (BMT) [Entered: 05/27/2019 10:50 PM]
May 22, 2019 NOTICE issued. After 06/05/2019, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Brian J Bouchard for Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC. [19-1438] (GRC) [Entered: 05/22/2019 02:45 PM]
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER to Show Cause entered directing appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as untimely. Show cause response due 05/30/2019. [19-1438] (GRC) [Entered: 05/16/2019 02:31 PM]
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: Endorsed Order entered on May 15, 2019 by Magistrate Judge Johnstone granting [54] Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal. [19-1438] (GK) [Entered: 05/15/2019 01:08 PM]
May 2, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #49) filed by Appellant Brenda Turcotte. Transcript Report/Order form due 05/16/2019. [19-1438] (GRC) [Entered: 05/02/2019 02:29 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turcotte v. Comcast Cable Commc'n Mgmt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRENDA TURCOTTE
Represented By: Leslie H. Johnson
Represented By: Brenda Turcotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRENDA MARIE TURCOTTE
Represented By: Brenda Marie Turcotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Cole
Represented By: Brian J. Bouchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?