Diaz-Baez, et al v. Alicea-Vasallo, et al
Plaintiff: GRETCHEN M. ACEVEDO-RIVERA, MARIANNA RAMIREZ-ALVAREZ, GLORIELY MIRANDA-OCASIO, AXEL FRESSE-ALVAREZ, JORGE APARICIO-TORRES, BERNICE BERBERENA-MALDONADO, DOMINGO MARIANI-MOLINI, MARIELA TORRES-MOLINI, HUMBERTO L. MULER-SANTIAGO, NEREIDA RIVERA-BATISTA, CARMEN E. RODRIGUEZ-SANTIAGO, LUIS A. RODRIGUEZ-TORO, LYNETTE YAMBO-MERCADO, JUANA M. CONTRERAS-CASTRO, LEILA A. HERNANDEZ-JIMENEZ, LUIS A. MULER-SANTIAGO, MARIBEL ALICEA-LUGO, YELITZA I. HERNANDEZ-HERNANDEZ, REBECA M. NEGRON-UMPIERRE, RICARDO ROSARIO-SANCHEZ, CARMEN YOLANDA VAZQUEZ-ORTIZ, YALITZA ROSARIO-MENENDEZ and RAQUEL CARDONA-SOTO
Defendant: ABC INSURANCE COMPANY, ERNESTO RIVERA-NEGRON, MARIBEL CONCEPCION-CANTRES, former Personnel Director of the ACAA, in her official and personal capacities and RICHARD DOE
Plaintiff / Appellant: DAVID R. SHERMAN, CARLOS A. AQUINO-VALENTIN, AMARILIS RIVERO-QUILES, LUZ CRISTINA JIMENEZ-CORTES, MARIEL TORRES-LOPEZ, MARISOL DOMINGUEZ-RIVERA, ROSA M. SANTOS-CARBALLO, MERCEDES LAMBERTY-ROMAN, HECTOR J. ALBELO-CARTAGENA, DAISY RODRIGUEZ-ALEJANDRO, RUTH M. MELENDEZ-RODRIGUEZ, RADAMES PEREZ-RODRIGUEZ, TIRSO RODRIGUEZ-APONTE, CESAR E. DEIDA-TORRES, IVAN E. GONZALEZ-GARCIA, CARMEN HAYDEE RAMOS-LUNA, CIRILO TIRADO-RIVERA, MARIELI RIOS-PEREZ, YANIRA RODRIGUEZ-RIVERA, JOSE W. ORTIZ-LOPEZ, VIVIAN M. BRACERO-ROSA, DAVID PONCE-MENA, VIRGINIA ECHEVARRIA, PEDRO R. MARTINEZ-AGOSTO, VIRGILIO ESCOBAR-QUINONES, RAMON L. RIVERA-GASCOT, ANTONIO J. COLLADO-RIVERA, VICTOR A. BURGOS-TORRES, LUIS LAGARES-GARCIA, VIVIAN A. HERNANDEZ-ROBLES, ASTRID M. DELGADO-IRIZARRY, GISSELLE PAGAN-MELENDEZ, MARIA S. DIAZ-BAEZ, EDUARDO BARREIRO-DIAZ, JONATHAN R. ORTIZ-SERRANO, HECTOR M. BARRIOS-VELAZQUEZ, MANUEL R. REYES-ALFONSO, NATIVIDAD CURBELLO-CONTRERAS, SYLVIA ALVARADO-HERNANDEZ, MONICA RODRIGUEZ-OCASIO, JOSE E. FIGUEROA-NIEVES, MONICA MOLINA-SALAS, ROBERTO MIRANDA-SANTIAGO, BRAULIO E. FIGUEROA-DIAZ, SHIERLY CARDONA-ORTIZ, ROCIO RIVERA-TORRES, PEDRO FELIX-TORRES, BRENDA MARTINEZ-FIGUEROA, ROSA M. SOTO-GARCIA, PEDRO I. CARTAGENA-RODRIGUEZ, FELIX MARRERO-VAZQUEZ, LIMARI MARTINEZ-RODRIGUEZ, LUIS COSS-VARGAS, CLARIBEL ROSADO-FERNANDEZ, ALLAN WAINWRIGHT-ESTAPE, JOSE GRAU-ORTIZ, OMAR RIVERA-PEREZ, KAROLIE GOMEZ-RIVERA, ADA I. RIVERA-GARCIA, DIANA I. SANCHEZ-PAGAN, EVELYN VELAZQUEZ-ADORNO, MELIXA MARRERO-GONZALEZ, DANIEL RAMOS-RAMOS, BETZAIDA ROSARIO-FELIX, MELISA RIVERA-FUENTES, ZUHER YOUSSIF-YASSIN, REBECCA COTTO-OYOLA, THELMA L. PEREZ-GUZMAN, DEBBIE A. CARDONA-CAPRE, CARMEN E. MEDINA-ADORNO and MARIA I. DELANNOY-DE-JESUS
Defendant / Appellee: JULIO ALICEA-VASALLO, Executive Director of the ACAA, in his official and personal capacities and ADMINISTRATION FOR COMPENSATION FOR AUTOMOBILE ACCIDENTS
Case Number: 19-1474
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Hector J. Albelo-Cartagena, Sylvia Alvarado-Hernandez, Carlos A. Aquino-Valentin, Eduardo Barreiro-Diaz, Hector M. Barrios-Velazquez, Vivian M. Bracero-Rosa, Victor A. Burgos-Torres, Debbie A. Cardona-Capre, Shierly Cardona-Ortiz, Pedro I. Cartagena-Rodriguez, Antonio J. Collado-Rivera, Luis Coss-Vargas, Rebecca Cotto-Oyola, Natividad Curbello-Contreras, Cesar E. Deida-Torres, Maria I. Delannoy-De-Jesus, Astrid M. Delgado-Irizarry, Maria S. Diaz-Baez, Marisol Dominguez-Rivera, Virginia Echevarria, Virgilio Escobar-Quinones, Pedro Felix-Torres, Braulio E. Figueroa-Diaz, Jose E. Figueroa-Nieves, Karolie Gomez-Rivera, Ivan E. Gonzalez-Garcia, Jose Grau-Ortiz, Vivian A. Hernandez-Robles, Luz Cristina Jimenez-Cortes, Luis Lagares-Garcia, Mercedes Lamberty-Roman, Melixa Marrero-Gonzalez, Felix Marrero-Vazquez, Pedro R. Martinez-Agosto, Brenda Martinez-Figueroa, Limari Martinez-Rodriguez, Carmen E. Medina-Adorno, Ruth M. Melendez-Rodriguez, Roberto Miranda-Santiago, Monica Molina-Salas, Jose W. Ortiz-Lopez, Jonathan R. Ortiz-Serrano, Gisselle Pagan-Melendez, Thelma L. Perez-Guzman, Radames Perez-Rodriguez, David Ponce-Mena, Carmen Haydee Ramos-Luna, Daniel Ramos-Ramos, Manuel R. Reyes-Alfonso, Marieli Rios-Perez, Melisa Rivera-Fuentes, Ada I. Rivera-Garcia, Ramon L. Rivera-Gascot, Omar Rivera-Perez, Rocio Rivera-Torres, Amarilis Rivero-Quiles, Daisy Rodriguez-Alejandro, Tirso Rodriguez-Aponte, Monica Rodriguez-Ocasio, Yanira Rodriguez-Rivera, Claribel Rosado-Fernandez, Betzaida Rosario-Felix, Diana I. Sanchez-Pagan, Rosa M. Santos-Carballo, David R. Sherman, Rosa M. Soto-Garcia, Cirilo Tirado-Rivera, Mariel Torres-Lopez, Evelyn Velazquez-Adorno, Allan Wainwright-Estape and Zuher Youssif-Yassin filed by Attorney Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez. Certificate of service dated 06/04/2019. [19-1474] (JRR) [Entered: 06/04/2019 07:44 AM]
June 3, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Maria S. Diaz-Baez filed by Attorney Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado. Certificate of service dated 06/03/2019. [19-1474] (FZ) [Entered: 06/03/2019 03:15 PM]
May 30, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Not Parties Gretchen M. Acevedo-Rivera, Maribel Alicea-Lugo, Jorge Aparicio-Torres, Bernice Berberena-Maldonado, Raquel Cardona-Soto, Juana M. Contreras-Castro, Axel Fresse-Alvarez, Yelitza I. Hernandez-Hernandez, Leila A. Hernandez-Jimenez, Domingo Mariani-Molini, Gloriely Miranda-Ocasio, Humberto L. Muler-Santiago, Luis A. Muler-Santiago, Rebeca M. Negron-Umpierre, Marianna Ramirez-Alvarez, Nereida Rivera-Batista, Carmen E. Rodriguez-Santiago, Luis A. Rodriguez-Toro, Yalitza Rosario-Menendez, Ricardo Rosario-Sanchez, Mariela Torres-Molini, Carmen Yolanda Vazquez-Ortiz, Lynette Yambo-Mercado, Appellants Hector J. Albelo-Cartagena, Sylvia Alvarado-Hernandez, Carlos A. Aquino-Valentin, Eduardo Barreiro-Diaz, Hector M. Barrios-Velazquez, Vivian M. Bracero-Rosa, Victor A. Burgos-Torres, Debbie A. Cardona-Capre, Shierly Cardona-Ortiz, Pedro I. Cartagena-Rodriguez, Antonio J. Collado-Rivera, Luis Coss-Vargas, Rebecca Cotto-Oyola, Natividad Curbello-Contreras, Cesar E. Deida-Torres, Maria I. Delannoy-De-Jesus, Astrid M. Delgado-Irizarry, Maria S. Diaz-Baez, Marisol Dominguez-Rivera, Virginia Echevarria, Virgilio Escobar-Quinones, Pedro Felix-Torres, Braulio E. Figueroa-Diaz, Jose E. Figueroa-Nieves, Karolie Gomez-Rivera, Ivan E. Gonzalez-Garcia, Jose Grau-Ortiz, Vivian A. Hernandez-Robles, Luz Cristina Jimenez-Cortes, Luis Lagares-Garcia, Mercedes Lamberty-Roman, Melixa Marrero-Gonzalez, Felix Marrero-Vazquez, Pedro R. Martinez-Agosto, Brenda Martinez-Figueroa, Limari Martinez-Rodriguez, Carmen E. Medina-Adorno, Ruth M. Melendez-Rodriguez, Roberto Miranda-Santiago, Monica Molina-Salas, Jose W. Ortiz-Lopez, Jonathan R. Ortiz-Serrano, Gisselle Pagan-Melendez, Thelma L. Perez-Guzman, Radames Perez-Rodriguez, David Ponce-Mena, Carmen Haydee Ramos-Luna, Daniel Ramos-Ramos, Manuel R. Reyes-Alfonso, Marieli Rios-Perez, Melisa Rivera-Fuentes, Ada I. Rivera-Garcia, Ramon L. Rivera-Gascot, Omar Rivera-Perez, Rocio Rivera-Torres, Amarilis Rivero-Quiles, Daisy Rodriguez-Alejandro, Tirso Rodriguez-Aponte, Monica Rodriguez-Ocasio, Yanira Rodriguez-Rivera, Claribel Rosado-Fernandez, Betzaida Rosario-Felix, Diana I. Sanchez-Pagan, Rosa M. Santos-Carballo, David R. Sherman, Rosa M. Soto-Garcia, Cirilo Tirado-Rivera, Mariel Torres-Lopez, Evelyn Velazquez-Adorno, Allan Wainwright-Estape, Zuher Youssif-Yassin and Appellee Richard Doe. Certificate of service dated 05/30/2019. [19-1474] (JEV) [Entered: 05/30/2019 04:01 PM]
May 30, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Not Parties Gretchen M. Acevedo-Rivera, Maribel Alicea-Lugo, Jorge Aparicio-Torres, Bernice Berberena-Maldonado, Raquel Cardona-Soto, Juana M. Contreras-Castro, Axel Fresse-Alvarez, Yelitza I. Hernandez-Hernandez, Leila A. Hernandez-Jimenez, Domingo Mariani-Molini, Gloriely Miranda-Ocasio, Humberto L. Muler-Santiago, Luis A. Muler-Santiago, Rebeca M. Negron-Umpierre, Marianna Ramirez-Alvarez, Nereida Rivera-Batista, Carmen E. Rodriguez-Santiago, Luis A. Rodriguez-Toro, Yalitza Rosario-Menendez, Ricardo Rosario-Sanchez, Mariela Torres-Molini, Carmen Yolanda Vazquez-Ortiz, Lynette Yambo-Mercado, Appellants Hector J. Albelo-Cartagena, Sylvia Alvarado-Hernandez, Carlos A. Aquino-Valentin, Eduardo Barreiro-Diaz, Hector M. Barrios-Velazquez, Vivian M. Bracero-Rosa, Victor A. Burgos-Torres, Debbie A. Cardona-Capre, Shierly Cardona-Ortiz, Pedro I. Cartagena-Rodriguez, Antonio J. Collado-Rivera, Luis Coss-Vargas, Rebecca Cotto-Oyola, Natividad Curbello-Contreras, Cesar E. Deida-Torres, Maria I. Delannoy-De-Jesus, Astrid M. Delgado-Irizarry, Maria S. Diaz-Baez, Marisol Dominguez-Rivera, Virginia Echevarria, Virgilio Escobar-Quinones, Pedro Felix-Torres, Braulio E. Figueroa-Diaz, Jose E. Figueroa-Nieves, Karolie Gomez-Rivera, Ivan E. Gonzalez-Garcia, Jose Grau-Ortiz, Vivian A. Hernandez-Robles, Luz Cristina Jimenez-Cortes, Luis Lagares-Garcia, Mercedes Lamberty-Roman, Melixa Marrero-Gonzalez, Felix Marrero-Vazquez, Pedro R. Martinez-Agosto, Brenda Martinez-Figueroa, Limari Martinez-Rodriguez, Carmen E. Medina-Adorno, Ruth M. Melendez-Rodriguez, Roberto Miranda-Santiago, Monica Molina-Salas, Jose W. Ortiz-Lopez, Jonathan R. Ortiz-Serrano, Gisselle Pagan-Melendez, Thelma L. Perez-Guzman, Radames Perez-Rodriguez, David Ponce-Mena, Carmen Haydee Ramos-Luna, Daniel Ramos-Ramos, Manuel R. Reyes-Alfonso, Marieli Rios-Perez, Melisa Rivera-Fuentes, Ada I. Rivera-Garcia, Ramon L. Rivera-Gascot, Omar Rivera-Perez, Rocio Rivera-Torres, Amarilis Rivero-Quiles, Daisy Rodriguez-Alejandro, Tirso Rodriguez-Aponte, Monica Rodriguez-Ocasio, Yanira Rodriguez-Rivera, Claribel Rosado-Fernandez, Betzaida Rosario-Felix, Diana I. Sanchez-Pagan, Rosa M. Santos-Carballo, David R. Sherman, Rosa M. Soto-Garcia, Cirilo Tirado-Rivera, Mariel Torres-Lopez, Evelyn Velazquez-Adorno, Allan Wainwright-Estape, Zuher Youssif-Yassin and Appellee Richard Doe filed by Attorney Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado. Certificate of service dated 05/30/2019. [19-1474] (JEV) [Entered: 05/30/2019 03:42 PM]
May 30, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Hector J. Albelo-Cartagena, Sylvia Alvarado-Hernandez, Carlos A. Aquino-Valentin, Eduardo Barreiro-Diaz, Hector M. Barrios-Velazquez, Vivian M. Bracero-Rosa, Victor A. Burgos-Torres, Debbie A. Cardona-Capre, Shierly Cardona-Ortiz, Pedro I. Cartagena-Rodriguez, Antonio J. Collado-Rivera, Luis Coss-Vargas, Rebecca Cotto-Oyola, Natividad Curbello-Contreras, Cesar E. Deida-Torres, Maria I. Delannoy-De-Jesus, Astrid M. Delgado-Irizarry, Maria S. Diaz-Baez, Marisol Dominguez-Rivera, Virginia Echevarria, Virgilio Escobar-Quinones, Pedro Felix-Torres, Braulio E. Figueroa-Diaz, Jose E. Figueroa-Nieves, Karolie Gomez-Rivera, Ivan E. Gonzalez-Garcia, Jose Grau-Ortiz, Vivian A. Hernandez-Robles, Luz Cristina Jimenez-Cortes, Luis Lagares-Garcia, Mercedes Lamberty-Roman, Melixa Marrero-Gonzalez, Felix Marrero-Vazquez, Pedro R. Martinez-Agosto, Brenda Martinez-Figueroa, Limari Martinez-Rodriguez, Carmen E. Medina-Adorno, Ruth M. Melendez-Rodriguez, Roberto Miranda-Santiago, Monica Molina-Salas, Jose W. Ortiz-Lopez, Jonathan R. Ortiz-Serrano, Gisselle Pagan-Melendez, Thelma L. Perez-Guzman, Radames Perez-Rodriguez, David Ponce-Mena, Carmen Haydee Ramos-Luna, Daniel Ramos-Ramos, Manuel R. Reyes-Alfonso, Marieli Rios-Perez, Melisa Rivera-Fuentes, Ada I. Rivera-Garcia, Ramon L. Rivera-Gascot, Omar Rivera-Perez, Rocio Rivera-Torres, Amarilis Rivero-Quiles, Daisy Rodriguez-Alejandro, Tirso Rodriguez-Aponte, Monica Rodriguez-Ocasio, Yanira Rodriguez-Rivera, Claribel Rosado-Fernandez, Betzaida Rosario-Felix, Diana I. Sanchez-Pagan, Rosa M. Santos-Carballo, David R. Sherman, Rosa M. Soto-Garcia, Cirilo Tirado-Rivera, Mariel Torres-Lopez, Evelyn Velazquez-Adorno, Allan Wainwright-Estape and Zuher Youssif-Yassin filed by Attorney Manuel Porro-Vizcarra. Certificate of service dated 05/30/2019. [19-1474] (MP) [Entered: 05/30/2019 02:03 PM]
May 30, 2019 NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellants are directed to file an appearance form and docketing statement or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Appearance form and Docketing Statement due 06/13/2019. [19-1474] (MH) [Entered: 05/30/2019 09:38 AM]
May 15, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #449) filed by Appellants Hector J. Albelo-Cartagena, Sylvia Alvarado-Hernandez, Carlos A. Aquino-Valentin, Eduardo Barreiro-Diaz, Hector M. Barrios-Velazquez, Vivian M. Bracero-Rosa, Victor A. Burgos-Torres, Debbie A. Cardona-Capre, Shierly Cardona-Ortiz, Pedro I. Cartagena-Rodriguez, Antonio J. Collado-Rivera, Luis Coss-Vargas, Rebecca Cotto-Oyola, Natividad Curbello-Contreras, Cesar E. Deida-Torres, Maria I. Delannoy-De-Jesus, Astrid M. Delgado-Irizarry, Maria S. Diaz-Baez, Marisol Dominguez-Rivera, Virginia Echevarria, Virgilio Escobar-Quinones, Pedro Felix-Torres, Braulio E. Figueroa-Diaz, Jose E. Figueroa-Nieves, Karolie Gomez-Rivera, Ivan E. Gonzalez-Garcia, Jose Grau-Ortiz, Vivian A. Hernandez-Robles, Luz Cristina Jimenez-Cortes, Luis Lagares-Garcia, Mercedes Lamberty-Roman, Melixa Marrero-Gonzalez, Felix Marrero-Vazquez, Pedro R. Martinez-Agosto, Brenda Martinez-Figueroa, Limari Martinez-Rodriguez, Carmen E. Medina-Adorno, Ruth M. Melendez-Rodriguez, Roberto Miranda-Santiago, Monica Molina-Salas, Jose W. Ortiz-Lopez, Jonathan R. Ortiz-Serrano, Gisselle Pagan-Melendez, Thelma L. Perez-Guzman, Radames Perez-Rodriguez, David Ponce-Mena, Carmen Haydee Ramos-Luna, Daniel Ramos-Ramos, Manuel R. Reyes-Alfonso, Marieli Rios-Perez, Melisa Rivera-Fuentes, Ada I. Rivera-Garcia, Ramon L. Rivera-Gascot, Omar Rivera-Perez, Rocio Rivera-Torres, Amarilis Rivero-Quiles, Daisy Rodriguez-Alejandro, Tirso Rodriguez-Aponte, Monica Rodriguez-Ocasio, Yanira Rodriguez-Rivera, Claribel Rosado-Fernandez, Betzaida Rosario-Felix, Diana I. Sanchez-Pagan, Rosa M. Santos-Carballo, David R. Sherman, Rosa M. Soto-Garcia, Cirilo Tirado-Rivera, Mariel Torres-Lopez, Evelyn Velazquez-Adorno, Allan Wainwright-Estape and Zuher Youssif-Yassin. Docketing Statement and Appearance form due 05/29/2019. [19-1474] (MH) [Entered: 05/15/2019 02:19 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz-Baez, et al v. Alicea-Vasallo, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID R. SHERMAN
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARLOS A. AQUINO-VALENTIN
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AMARILIS RIVERO-QUILES
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LUZ CRISTINA JIMENEZ-CORTES
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARIEL TORRES-LOPEZ
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARISOL DOMINGUEZ-RIVERA
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROSA M. SANTOS-CARBALLO
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MERCEDES LAMBERTY-ROMAN
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HECTOR J. ALBELO-CARTAGENA
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAISY RODRIGUEZ-ALEJANDRO
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RUTH M. MELENDEZ-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RADAMES PEREZ-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TIRSO RODRIGUEZ-APONTE
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CESAR E. DEIDA-TORRES
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: IVAN E. GONZALEZ-GARCIA
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARMEN HAYDEE RAMOS-LUNA
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CIRILO TIRADO-RIVERA
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARIELI RIOS-PEREZ
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: YANIRA RODRIGUEZ-RIVERA
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE W. ORTIZ-LOPEZ
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VIVIAN M. BRACERO-ROSA
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID PONCE-MENA
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VIRGINIA ECHEVARRIA
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PEDRO R. MARTINEZ-AGOSTO
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VIRGILIO ESCOBAR-QUINONES
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RAMON L. RIVERA-GASCOT
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTONIO J. COLLADO-RIVERA
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VICTOR A. BURGOS-TORRES
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LUIS LAGARES-GARCIA
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VIVIAN A. HERNANDEZ-ROBLES
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ASTRID M. DELGADO-IRIZARRY
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GISSELLE PAGAN-MELENDEZ
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARIA S. DIAZ-BAEZ
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDUARDO BARREIRO-DIAZ
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JONATHAN R. ORTIZ-SERRANO
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HECTOR M. BARRIOS-VELAZQUEZ
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MANUEL R. REYES-ALFONSO
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NATIVIDAD CURBELLO-CONTRERAS
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SYLVIA ALVARADO-HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MONICA RODRIGUEZ-OCASIO
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE E. FIGUEROA-NIEVES
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MONICA MOLINA-SALAS
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERTO MIRANDA-SANTIAGO
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRAULIO E. FIGUEROA-DIAZ
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHIERLY CARDONA-ORTIZ
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROCIO RIVERA-TORRES
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PEDRO FELIX-TORRES
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRENDA MARTINEZ-FIGUEROA
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROSA M. SOTO-GARCIA
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PEDRO I. CARTAGENA-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FELIX MARRERO-VAZQUEZ
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LIMARI MARTINEZ-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LUIS COSS-VARGAS
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CLARIBEL ROSADO-FERNANDEZ
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALLAN WAINWRIGHT-ESTAPE
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE GRAU-ORTIZ
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: OMAR RIVERA-PEREZ
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KAROLIE GOMEZ-RIVERA
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ADA I. RIVERA-GARCIA
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DIANA I. SANCHEZ-PAGAN
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EVELYN VELAZQUEZ-ADORNO
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MELIXA MARRERO-GONZALEZ
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DANIEL RAMOS-RAMOS
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BETZAIDA ROSARIO-FELIX
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MELISA RIVERA-FUENTES
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ZUHER YOUSSIF-YASSIN
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: REBECCA COTTO-OYOLA
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THELMA L. PEREZ-GUZMAN
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DEBBIE A. CARDONA-CAPRE
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARMEN E. MEDINA-ADORNO
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARIA I. DELANNOY-DE-JESUS
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Christian Oscar Cintron-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERNESTO RIVERA-NEGRON
Represented By: Ernesto Rivera-Negron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIBEL CONCEPCION-CANTRES, former Personnel Director of the ACAA, in her official and personal capacities
Represented By: Christian Oscar Cintron-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD DOE
Represented By: Christian Oscar Cintron-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JULIO ALICEA-VASALLO, Executive Director of the ACAA, in his official and personal capacities
Represented By: Francisco J. Amundaray-Rodriguez
Represented By: Christian Oscar Cintron-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADMINISTRATION FOR COMPENSATION FOR AUTOMOBILE ACCIDENTS
Represented By: Adrian Sanchez-Pagan
Represented By: Christian Oscar Cintron-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRETCHEN M. ACEVEDO-RIVERA
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIANNA RAMIREZ-ALVAREZ
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIELY MIRANDA-OCASIO
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AXEL FRESSE-ALVAREZ
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORGE APARICIO-TORRES
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERNICE BERBERENA-MALDONADO
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMINGO MARIANI-MOLINI
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIELA TORRES-MOLINI
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUMBERTO L. MULER-SANTIAGO
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Represented By: Humberto L. Muler-Santiago
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEREIDA RIVERA-BATISTA
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARMEN E. RODRIGUEZ-SANTIAGO
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS A. RODRIGUEZ-TORO
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYNETTE YAMBO-MERCADO
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUANA M. CONTRERAS-CASTRO
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEILA A. HERNANDEZ-JIMENEZ
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS A. MULER-SANTIAGO
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIBEL ALICEA-LUGO
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YELITZA I. HERNANDEZ-HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECA M. NEGRON-UMPIERRE
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICARDO ROSARIO-SANCHEZ
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARMEN YOLANDA VAZQUEZ-ORTIZ
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YALITZA ROSARIO-MENENDEZ
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAQUEL CARDONA-SOTO
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Represented By: Jesus R. Rabell-Mendez
Represented By: Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?