American Academy of Pediatrics, et al v. FDA
Plaintiff / Appellee: DR. LYNDA YOUNG, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, DR. TED KREMER, DR. JONATHAN WINICKOFF, TRUTH INITIATIVE FOUNDATION, d/b/a Truth Initiative, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY CANCER ACTION NETWORK, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY, MASSACHUSETTS CHAPTER OF AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, INC., AMERICAN LUNG ASSOCIATION, CAMPAIGN FOR TOBACCO-FREE KIDS and AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION
Defendant / Appellant: US FOOD & DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 19-1507
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 REPLY filed by Appellant FDA to response [ # 6268895-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 07/22/2019. [19-1507] (ABK) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:01 PM]
July 19, 2019 RESPONSE filed by Appellees American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Campaign for Tobacco-Free Kids, Doctor Ted Kremer, Massachusetts Chapter of American Academy of Pediatrics, Inc., Truth Initiative Foundation, Doctor Jonathan Winickoff and Doctor Lynda Young to motion [ # 6268583-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 07/19/2019. [19-1507] (SPL) [Entered: 07/19/2019 04:15 PM]
July 19, 2019 ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant FDA. Certificate of service dated 07/19/2019. [19-1507] (ABK) [Entered: 07/19/2019 01:54 PM]
July 18, 2019 MOTION to hold case in abeyance filed by Appellant FDA. Certificate of service dated 07/18/2019. [19-1507] (ABK) [Entered: 07/18/2019 03:58 PM]
July 3, 2019 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Mark E. Greenwold for American Lung Association, American Cancer Society, American Heart Association, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, Campaign for Tobacco-Free Kids, Massachusetts Chapter of American Academy of Pediatrics, Inc., Truth Initiative Foundation, Doctor Ted Kremer, Doctor Jonathan Winickoff and Doctor Lynda Young, Dennis Henigan for American Lung Association, American Cancer Society, American Heart Association, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, Campaign for Tobacco-Free Kids, Massachusetts Chapter of American Academy of Pediatrics, Inc., Truth Initiative Foundation, Doctor Ted Kremer, Doctor Jonathan Winickoff and Doctor Lynda Young and Jessica A. Wall for American Lung Association, American Cancer Society, American Heart Association, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, Campaign for Tobacco-Free Kids, Massachusetts Chapter of American Academy of Pediatrics, Inc., Truth Initiative Foundation, Doctor Ted Kremer, Doctor Jonathan Winickoff and Doctor Lynda Young. [19-1507] (AL) [Entered: 07/03/2019 03:35 PM]
June 27, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant FDA filed by Attorney Mark B. Stern. Certificate of service dated 06/27/2019. [19-1507] (MBS) [Entered: 06/27/2019 08:58 PM]
June 18, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 07/29/2019 for appellant US Food & Drug Administration. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1507] (AL) [Entered: 06/18/2019 09:40 AM]
June 18, 2019 NOTICE issued. After 07/02/2019, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Mark E. Greenwold for American Lung Association, American Cancer Society, American Heart Association, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, Campaign for Tobacco-Free Kids, Massachusetts Chapter of American Academy of Pediatrics, Inc., Truth Initiative Foundation, Doctor Ted Kremer, Doctor Jonathan Winickoff and Doctor Lynda Young, Dennis Henigan for American Lung Association, American Cancer Society, American Heart Association, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, Campaign for Tobacco-Free Kids, Massachusetts Chapter of American Academy of Pediatrics, Inc., Truth Initiative Foundation, Doctor Ted Kremer, Doctor Jonathan Winickoff and Doctor Lynda Young and Jessica A. Wall for American Lung Association, American Cancer Society, American Heart Association, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, Campaign for Tobacco-Free Kids, Massachusetts Chapter of American Academy of Pediatrics, Inc., Truth Initiative Foundation, Doctor Ted Kremer, Doctor Jonathan Winickoff and Doctor Lynda Young. [19-1507] (AL) [Entered: 06/18/2019 09:36 AM]
June 17, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant FDA. Certificate of service dated 06/17/2019. [19-1507] (JU) [Entered: 06/17/2019 03:20 PM]
June 17, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant FDA indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 06/17/2019. [19-1507] (JU) [Entered: 06/17/2019 03:18 PM]
June 10, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Campaign for Tobacco-Free Kids, Doctor Ted Kremer, Massachusetts Chapter of American Academy of Pediatrics, Inc., Truth Initiative Foundation, Doctor Jonathan Winickoff and Doctor Lynda Young filed by Attorney Scott P. Lewis. Certificate of service dated 06/10/2019. [19-1507] (SPL) [Entered: 06/10/2019 03:31 PM]
June 6, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant FDA filed by Attorney Alisa B. Klein. Certificate of service dated 06/06/2019. [19-1507] (ABK) [Entered: 06/06/2019 12:55 PM]
June 6, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant FDA filed by Attorney Jennifer L. Utrecht. Certificate of service dated 06/06/2019. [19-1507] (JU) [Entered: 06/06/2019 12:08 PM]
May 29, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #63) filed by Appellant FDA. Docketing Statement due 06/17/2019. Transcript Report/Order form due 06/17/2019. Appearance form due 06/17/2019. [19-1507] (AL) [Entered: 06/03/2019 03:35 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: American Academy of Pediatrics, et al v. FDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DR. LYNDA YOUNG
Represented By: Mark E. Greenwold
Represented By: Dennis Henigan
Represented By: Jessica A. Wall
Represented By: Scott P. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS
Represented By: Mark E. Greenwold
Represented By: Dennis Henigan
Represented By: Jessica A. Wall
Represented By: Scott P. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DR. TED KREMER
Represented By: Mark E. Greenwold
Represented By: Dennis Henigan
Represented By: Jessica A. Wall
Represented By: Scott P. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DR. JONATHAN WINICKOFF
Represented By: Mark E. Greenwold
Represented By: Dennis Henigan
Represented By: Jessica A. Wall
Represented By: Scott P. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TRUTH INITIATIVE FOUNDATION, d/b/a Truth Initiative
Represented By: Mark E. Greenwold
Represented By: Dennis Henigan
Represented By: Jessica A. Wall
Represented By: Scott P. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY CANCER ACTION NETWORK
Represented By: Mark E. Greenwold
Represented By: Dennis Henigan
Represented By: Jessica A. Wall
Represented By: Scott P. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY
Represented By: Mark E. Greenwold
Represented By: Dennis Henigan
Represented By: Jessica A. Wall
Represented By: Scott P. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MASSACHUSETTS CHAPTER OF AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, INC.
Represented By: Mark E. Greenwold
Represented By: Dennis Henigan
Represented By: Jessica A. Wall
Represented By: Scott P. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AMERICAN LUNG ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Mark E. Greenwold
Represented By: Dennis Henigan
Represented By: Jessica A. Wall
Represented By: Scott P. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CAMPAIGN FOR TOBACCO-FREE KIDS
Represented By: Mark E. Greenwold
Represented By: Dennis Henigan
Represented By: Jessica A. Wall
Represented By: Scott P. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Mark E. Greenwold
Represented By: Dennis Henigan
Represented By: Jessica A. Wall
Represented By: Scott P. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: US FOOD & DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Jennifer Utrecht
Represented By: Daniel Crane-Hirsch
Represented By: Alisa Beth Klein
Represented By: Mark B. Stern
Represented By: Cynthia A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?