Gomes v. Silva
Respondent / Appellee: STEVEN SILVA, Superintendent, Massachusetts Correctional Institution-Souza Baranowski
Petitioner / Appellant: JOSEPH GOMES
Case Number: 19-1656
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 1, 2020 Summary Gomes v. Silva

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Joseph Gomes. Brief and appendix due 09/13/2019 for appellant Joseph Gomes. [19-1656] (GRC) [Entered: 08/29/2019 03:56 PM]
August 29, 2019 ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Joseph Gomes. Certificate of service dated 08/28/2019. [19-1656] (CAH) [Entered: 08/29/2019 01:54 PM]
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by David J. Barron, Appellate Judge: Petitioner's motion to proceed IFP is granted. [19-1656] (GRC) [Entered: 07/31/2019 04:41 PM]
July 23, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 09/03/2019 for appellant Joseph Gomes. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1656] (GRC) [Entered: 07/23/2019 11:56 AM]
July 23, 2019 Request to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Joseph Gomes is pending in the Court of Appeals. [19-1656] (GK) [Entered: 07/23/2019 09:51 AM]
July 22, 2019 CORRECTED ORDER entered. The district court granted petitioner-appellant's request for a certificate of appealability. Accordingly, pursuant to Grant-Chase v. Commissioner, 145 F.3d 431 (1st Circuit. 1998), this appeal can go forward on the issue(s) for which the district court granted the certificate. *Corrected order issued to amend the text of the order. [19-1656] (GRC) [Entered: 07/22/2019 04:22 PM]
July 22, 2019 MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Joseph Gomes. Certificate of service dated 07/22/2019. [19-1656] (CAH) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:43 PM]
July 22, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Joseph Gomes indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 07/22/2019. [19-1656] (CAH) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:40 PM]
July 22, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Joseph Gomes filed by Attorney Charles Allan Hope. Certificate of service dated 07/22/2019. [19-1656] (CAH) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:38 PM]
July 22, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Joseph Gomes. Certificate of service dated 07/22/2019. [19-1656] (CAH) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:36 PM]
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered. The district court granted petitioner-appellant's request for a certificate of appealability. Accordingly, pursuant to Grant-Chase v. Commissioner, 145 F.3d 431 (1st Circuit. 1998), this appeal can go forward on the issue(s) for which the district court granted the certificate. [19-1656] (GRC) [Entered: 07/18/2019 12:12 PM]
July 18, 2019 Request to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal filed by Appellant Joseph Gomes was denied in the district court by order dated 06/26/2019. Fee due 08/01/2019. [19-1656] (GRC) [Entered: 07/18/2019 12:10 PM]
July 12, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Steven Silva filed by Attorney Jennifer K. Zalnasky. Certificate of service dated 07/12/2019. [19-1656] (JKZ) [Entered: 07/12/2019 03:37 PM]
July 8, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #40) filed by Appellant Joseph Gomes. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Fee due 07/22/2019. [19-1656] (GRC) [Entered: 07/08/2019 11:34 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomes v. Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: STEVEN SILVA, Superintendent, Massachusetts Correctional Institution-Souza Baranowski
Represented By: Jennifer Kay Zalnasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JOSEPH GOMES
Represented By: Charles Allen Hope
Represented By: Joseph Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?