Employees Retirement System, et al v. Andalusian Global Designated, et al
Defendant: TAX-FREE PUERTO RICO TARGET MATURITY FUND, INC., PUERTO RICO INVESTORS TAX-FREE FUND, INC., PUERTO RICO GNMA AND U.S. GOVERNMENT TARGET MATURITY FUND, INC., PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND IV, INC., PUERTO RICO INVESTORS TAX-FREE FUND V, INC., PUERTO RICO AAA PORTFOLIO BOND FUND, INC., PUERTO RICO INVESTORS TAX-FREE FUND VI, INC., PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND III, INC., PUERTO RICO INVESTORS TAX-FREE FUND IV, INC., PUERTO RICO AAA PORTFOLIO TARGET MATURITY FUND, INC., PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND V, INC., UBS IRA SELECT GROWTH & INCOME PUERTO RICO FUND, PUERTO RICO MORTGAGE-BACKED & U.S. GOVERNMENT SECURITIES FUND, INC., PUERTO RICO AAA PORTFOLIO BOND FUND II, INC., PUERTO RICO INVESTORS TAX-FREE FUND III, INC., TAX-FREE PUERTO RICO FUND II, INC., PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND, INC., TAX-FREE PUERTO RICO FUND, INC., PUERTO RICO INVESTORS TAX-FREE FUND II, INC., PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND II, INC. and PUERTO RICO INVESTORS BOND FUND I, INC.
Defendant / Appellant: OAKTREE OPPORTUNITIES FUND IX (PARALLEL 2), L.P., SV CREDIT, L.P., ANDALUSIAN GLOBAL DESIGNATED ACTIVITY COMPANY, ALTAIR GLOBAL CREDIT OPPORTUNITIES FUND (A), LLC, OAKTREE-FORREST MULTI-STRATEGY, L.L.C. (SERIES B), MASON CAPITAL MASTER FUND LP, OAKTREE OPPORTUNITIES FUND IX, L.P., OAKTREE VALUE OPPORTUNITIES FUND, L.P., NOKOTA CAPITAL MASTER FUND, L.P., GLENDON OPPORTUNITIES FUND, LP and OCHER ROSE, L.L.C.
Debtor: COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO, PUERTO RICO ELECTRIC POWER AUTHORITY (PREPA), PUERTO RICO SALES TAX FINANCING CORPORATION, Depository Trust Company, a/k/a Cofina and PUERTO RICO HIGHWAYS AND TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY
Plaintiff / Appellee: FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD and EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE GOVERNMENT OF PUERTO RICO
Amicus Curiae: UNITED STATES
Not Yet Classified: OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF RETIRED EMPLOYEES OF THE COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
Case Number: 19-1699
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 NINE (9) paper copies of reply brief [ # 6281431-2 ] submitted by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Ocher Rose, L.L.C. and SV Credit, L.P. [19-1699] (JMK) [Entered: 09/16/2019 10:08 AM]
September 11, 2019 REPLY BRIEF filed by Appellants' Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Ocher Rose, L.L.C. and SV Credit, L.P.. Certificate of service dated 09/11/2019. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 09/19/2019 . [19-1699] (LIM) [Entered: 09/12/2019 09:56 AM]
September 11, 2019 BRIEF tendered by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Ocher Rose, L.L.C. and SV Credit, L.P.. [19-1699] (SLS) [Entered: 09/11/2019 08:39 PM]
September 4, 2019 NINE (9) paper copies of appellee/respondent brief [ # 6278993-2 ] submitted by Appellee FOMB in 19-1699, 19-1700. [19-1699, 19-1700] (JMK) [Entered: 09/04/2019 04:35 PM]
September 4, 2019 NINE (9) paper copies of appellee/respondent brief [ # 6278999-2 ] submitted by Appellee Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico in 19-1699 and 19-1700. [19-1699, 19-1700] (JMK) [Entered: 09/04/2019 10:11 AM]
August 28, 2019 APPELLEE'S BRIEF filed by Appellee Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico in 19-1699 and 19-1700. Certificate of service dated 08/28/2019. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 09/04/2019 . [19-1699, 19-1700] (DK) [Entered: 08/30/2019 05:23 PM]
August 28, 2019 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee FOMB in 19-1699 and 19-1700. Certificate of service dated 08/28/2019. [19-1699, 19-1700] (DK) [Entered: 08/30/2019 05:12 PM]
August 28, 2019 APPELLEE'S BRIEF filed by Appellee FOMB in 19-1699 and 19-1700. Certificate of service dated 08/28/2019. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 09/04/2019 . [19-1699, 19-1700] (DK) [Entered: 08/30/2019 05:11 PM]
August 28, 2019 BRIEF tendered by Appellee Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico in 19-1699, Not Party Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico in 19-1700. [19-1699, 19-1700] (CS) [Entered: 08/28/2019 07:17 PM]
August 28, 2019 BRIEF tendered by Appellee FOMB in 19-1699, 19-1700. [19-1699, 19-1700] (TWM) [Entered: 08/28/2019 03:48 PM]
August 2, 2019 NINE (9) paper copies of appellant/petitioner brief [ # 6271296-2 ] submitted by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Ocher Rose, L.L.C. and SV Credit, L.P. in 19-1699. [19-1699, 19-1700] (JMK) [Entered: 08/02/2019 11:12 AM]
July 30, 2019 JOINT APPENDIX filed by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Ocher Rose, L.L.C. and SV Credit, L.P. in 19-1699, Appellants Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc. and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc. in 19-1700. Number of volumes: 2. Number of copies: 5. Certificate of service dated 07/29/2019. [19-1699, 19-1700] (GRC) [Entered: 08/06/2019 02:44 PM]
July 30, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico in 19-1699, 19-1700 filed by Attorney William D. Dalsen. Certificate of service dated 07/30/2019. [19-1699, 19-1700] (WDD) [Entered: 07/30/2019 12:16 PM]
July 30, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico in 19-1699, 19-1700 filed by Attorney John E. Roberts. Certificate of service dated 07/30/2019. [19-1699, 19-1700] (JER) [Entered: 07/30/2019 12:13 PM]
July 30, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico in 19-1699, 19-1700 filed by Attorney Jeffrey W. Levitan. Certificate of service dated 07/30/2019. [19-1699, 19-1700] (JWL) [Entered: 07/30/2019 12:09 PM]
July 30, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico in 19-1699, 19-1700 filed by Attorney Margaret A. Dale. Certificate of service dated 07/30/2019. [19-1699, 19-1700] (MAD) [Entered: 07/30/2019 12:06 PM]
July 30, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico in 19-1699, 19-1700 filed by Attorney Martin J. Bienenstock. Certificate of service dated 07/30/2019. [19-1699, 19-1700] (MJB) [Entered: 07/30/2019 12:03 PM]
July 30, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico in 19-1699, 19-1700 filed by Attorney Stephen L. Ratner. Certificate of service dated 07/30/2019. [19-1699, 19-1700] (SLR) [Entered: 07/30/2019 12:00 PM]
July 30, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico in 19-1699, 19-1700 filed by Attorney Mark D. Harris. Certificate of service dated 07/30/2019. [19-1699, 19-1700] (MDH) [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:57 AM]
July 30, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico in 19-1699, 19-1700 filed by Attorney Timothy W. Mungovan. Certificate of service dated 07/30/2019. [19-1699, 19-1700] (TWM) [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:51 AM]
July 29, 2019 APPELLANTS' BRIEF filed by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Ocher Rose, L.L.C. and SV Credit, L.P.. Certificate of service dated 07/29/2019. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 08/06/2019 . [19-1699] (LIM) [Entered: 07/30/2019 02:23 PM]
July 29, 2019 BRIEF tendered by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Ocher Rose, L.L.C. and SV Credit, L.P.. [19-1699] (SLS) [Entered: 07/29/2019 08:55 PM]
July 29, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc. and Not Parties Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) and UBS IRA Select Growth & Income Puerto Rico Fund in 19-1700, Not Parties Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc. and UBS IRA Select Growth & Income Puerto Rico Fund in 19-1699 filed by Attorney Jose C. Sanchez Castro. Certificate of service dated 07/29/2019. [19-1700, 19-1699] (JCS) [Entered: 07/29/2019 03:07 PM]
July 26, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Antonio Juan Bennazar-Zequeira. Certificate of service dated 07/26/2019. [19-1699] (AJB) [Entered: 07/26/2019 06:43 PM]
July 26, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Lindsay C. Harrison. Certificate of service dated 07/26/2019. [19-1699] (LCH) [Entered: 07/26/2019 05:50 PM]
July 26, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Catherine L. Steege. Certificate of service dated 07/26/2019. [19-1699] (CS) [Entered: 07/26/2019 05:46 PM]
July 26, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Ian Heath Gershengorn. Certificate of service dated 07/26/2019. [19-1699] (IHG) [Entered: 07/26/2019 05:40 PM]
July 26, 2019 EXPEDITED briefing schedule set. Appellants' opening brief shall be filed on July 29, 2019; appellees' response brief shall be filed on August 28, 2019; and appellants' reply brief shall be filed on September 11, 2019. [19-1699, 19-1700] (GRC) [Entered: 07/26/2019 04:33 PM]
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge: The Motion to Consolidate Appeal Nos. 19-1699 and 19-1700 is granted. The Motion to Expedite is also granted. Appellants' opening brief shall be filed on July 29, 2019; appellees' response brief shall be filed on August 28, 2019; and appellants' reply brief shall be filed on September 11, 2019. [19-1699, 19-1700] (GRC) [Entered: 07/26/2019 04:28 PM]
July 25, 2019 MOTION to consolidate cases filed by Appellants Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc. and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc. in 19-1700. Certificate of service dated 07/25/2019. [19-1700 and 19-1699] (GRC) [Entered: 07/26/2019 01:56 PM]
July 25, 2019 RESPONSE filed by Appellee Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico to motion to expedite [ # 6269790-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 07/25/2019. [19-1699] (CS) [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:58 PM]
July 25, 2019 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Ocher Rose, L.L.C. and SV Credit, L.P.. [19-1699] (GRC) [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:54 PM]
July 24, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Ocher Rose, L.L.C. and SV Credit, L.P. filed by Attorney Isel M. Perez. Certificate of service dated 07/24/2019. [19-1699] (IMP) [Entered: 07/24/2019 12:46 PM]
July 24, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Ocher Rose, L.L.C. and SV Credit, L.P. filed by Attorney David R. Fox. Certificate of service dated 07/24/2019. [19-1699] (DRF) [Entered: 07/24/2019 12:42 PM]
July 24, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Ocher Rose, L.L.C. and SV Credit, L.P. filed by Attorney Geoffrey S. Stewart. Certificate of service dated 07/24/2019. [19-1699] (GSS) [Entered: 07/24/2019 12:40 PM]
July 24, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Ocher Rose, L.L.C. and SV Credit, L.P. filed by Attorney Beth Heifetz. Certificate of service dated 07/24/2019. [19-1699] (BH) [Entered: 07/24/2019 12:34 PM]
July 24, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Ocher Rose, L.L.C. and SV Credit, L.P. filed by Attorney Benjamin Rosenblum. Certificate of service dated 07/24/2019. [19-1699] (BR) [Entered: 07/24/2019 12:32 PM]
July 24, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Ocher Rose, L.L.C. and SV Credit, L.P. filed by Attorney Bruce Bennett. Certificate of service dated 07/24/2019. [19-1699] (BB) [Entered: 07/24/2019 12:29 PM]
July 24, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Ocher Rose, L.L.C. and SV Credit, L.P.. Certificate of service dated 07/24/2019. [19-1699] (SLS) [Entered: 07/24/2019 12:21 PM]
July 24, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Ocher Rose, L.L.C. and SV Credit, L.P. indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 07/24/2019. [19-1699] (SLS) [Entered: 07/24/2019 12:19 PM]
July 24, 2019 MOTION to expedite Briefing and Determination of the Appeal filed by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Ocher Rose, L.L.C. and SV Credit, L.P.. Certificate of service dated 07/24/2019. [19-1699] (SLS) [Entered: 07/24/2019 12:14 PM]
July 24, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Ocher Rose, L.L.C. and SV Credit, L.P. filed by Attorney Alfredo Fernandez Martinez. Certificate of service dated 07/24/2019. [19-1699] (AF) [Entered: 07/24/2019 12:10 PM]
July 24, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Ocher Rose, L.L.C., SV Credit, L.P. and Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P. filed by Attorney Sparkle L. Sooknanan. Certificate of service dated 07/24/2019. [19-1699] (SLS) [Entered: 07/24/2019 11:38 AM]
July 24, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #254) filed by Appellants Altair Global Credit Opportunities Fund (A), LLC, Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Nokota Capital Master Fund, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Ocher Rose, L.L.C. and SV Credit, L.P.. Appearance form due 08/07/2019. Docketing Statement due 08/07/2019. Transcript Report/Order form due 08/07/2019. [19-1699] (GRC) [Entered: 07/24/2019 11:09 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Employees Retirement System, et al v. Andalusian Global Designated, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: OAKTREE OPPORTUNITIES FUND IX (PARALLEL 2), L.P.
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Christopher DiPompeo
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: James M. Gross
Represented By: Parker Andrew Rider-Longmaid
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Represented By: Isel Maria Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SV CREDIT, L.P.
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Christopher DiPompeo
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: James M. Gross
Represented By: Parker Andrew Rider-Longmaid
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Represented By: Isel Maria Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ANDALUSIAN GLOBAL DESIGNATED ACTIVITY COMPANY
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Christopher DiPompeo
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: James M. Gross
Represented By: Parker Andrew Rider-Longmaid
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Represented By: Isel Maria Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ALTAIR GLOBAL CREDIT OPPORTUNITIES FUND (A), LLC
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Christopher DiPompeo
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: James M. Gross
Represented By: Parker Andrew Rider-Longmaid
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: OAKTREE-FORREST MULTI-STRATEGY, L.L.C. (SERIES B)
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Christopher DiPompeo
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: James M. Gross
Represented By: Parker Andrew Rider-Longmaid
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Represented By: Isel Maria Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MASON CAPITAL MASTER FUND LP
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Christopher DiPompeo
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: James M. Gross
Represented By: Parker Andrew Rider-Longmaid
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Represented By: Isel Maria Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: OAKTREE OPPORTUNITIES FUND IX, L.P.
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Christopher DiPompeo
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: James M. Gross
Represented By: Parker Andrew Rider-Longmaid
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Represented By: Isel Maria Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: OAKTREE VALUE OPPORTUNITIES FUND, L.P.
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Christopher DiPompeo
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: James M. Gross
Represented By: Parker Andrew Rider-Longmaid
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Represented By: Isel Maria Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: NOKOTA CAPITAL MASTER FUND, L.P.
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Christopher DiPompeo
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: James M. Gross
Represented By: Parker Andrew Rider-Longmaid
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GLENDON OPPORTUNITIES FUND, LP
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Christopher DiPompeo
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: James M. Gross
Represented By: Parker Andrew Rider-Longmaid
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Represented By: Isel Maria Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: OCHER ROSE, L.L.C.
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Christopher DiPompeo
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: James M. Gross
Represented By: Parker Andrew Rider-Longmaid
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Represented By: Isel Maria Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAX-FREE PUERTO RICO TARGET MATURITY FUND, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUERTO RICO INVESTORS TAX-FREE FUND, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUERTO RICO GNMA AND U.S. GOVERNMENT TARGET MATURITY FUND, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND IV, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUERTO RICO INVESTORS TAX-FREE FUND V, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUERTO RICO AAA PORTFOLIO BOND FUND, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUERTO RICO INVESTORS TAX-FREE FUND VI, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND III, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUERTO RICO INVESTORS TAX-FREE FUND IV, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUERTO RICO AAA PORTFOLIO TARGET MATURITY FUND, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND V, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS IRA SELECT GROWTH & INCOME PUERTO RICO FUND
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Christopher DiPompeo
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUERTO RICO MORTGAGE-BACKED & U.S. GOVERNMENT SECURITIES FUND, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUERTO RICO AAA PORTFOLIO BOND FUND II, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUERTO RICO INVESTORS TAX-FREE FUND III, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAX-FREE PUERTO RICO FUND II, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAX-FREE PUERTO RICO FUND, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUERTO RICO INVESTORS TAX-FREE FUND II, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND II, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUERTO RICO INVESTORS BOND FUND I, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Paul V. Possinger
Represented By: Stephan E. Hornung
Represented By: Peter D. Doyle
Represented By: Rachel G. Miller Ziegler
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Chris Theodoridis
Represented By: Michael A. Firestein
Represented By: Jennifer L. Roche
Represented By: Julia D. Alonzo
Represented By: Lucia Chapman
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Susana I. Penagaricano Brown
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Lary Alan Rappaport
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
Represented By: Bradley R. Bobroff
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Maja Zerjal
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Carl Forbes Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Hackett
Represented By: Jared D. Zajac
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Scott Rutsky
Represented By: Adele M. El-Khouri
Represented By: Stephen L. Ratner
Represented By: Michael Luskin
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Kevin J. Perra
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Daniel Jose Perez-Refojos
Represented By: Chad Golder
Represented By: Margaret Antinori Dale
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Steven O. Weise
Represented By: Ginger D. Anders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: PUERTO RICO ELECTRIC POWER AUTHORITY (PREPA)
Represented By: Joseph P. Davis III
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Katiuska Bolanos-Lugo
Represented By: Carl Forbes Jr.
Represented By: Jared D. Zajac
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: PUERTO RICO SALES TAX FINANCING CORPORATION, Depository Trust Company, a/k/a Cofina
Represented By: Chris Theodoridis
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg
Represented By: Chantel L. Febus
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Carl Forbes Jr.
Represented By: Jared D. Zajac
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Kevin J. Perra
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: PUERTO RICO HIGHWAYS AND TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY
Represented By: Chris Theodoridis
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Carl Forbes Jr.
Represented By: Andres W. Lopez
Represented By: Jared D. Zajac
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Kevin J. Perra
Represented By: Raul Castellanos-Malave
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD
Represented By: Paul V. Possinger
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Chantel L. Febus
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Maja Zerjal
Represented By: Michael R. Hackett
Represented By: Luis Francisco Del-Valle-Emmanuelli
Represented By: Jared D. Zajac
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Stephen L. Ratner
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Kevin J. Perra
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Steven O. Weise
Represented By: Margaret Antinori Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE GOVERNMENT OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Paul V. Possinger
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Chantel L. Febus
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Maja Zerjal
Represented By: Michael R. Hackett
Represented By: Luis Francisco Del-Valle-Emmanuelli
Represented By: Jared D. Zajac
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Stephen L. Ratner
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Kevin J. Perra
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Steven O. Weise
Represented By: Margaret Antinori Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Mark R. Freeman
Represented By: Michael Shih
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF RETIRED EMPLOYEES OF THE COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Melissa M. Root
Represented By: Antonio Juan Bennazar-Zequeira
Represented By: Ian Heath Gershengorn
Represented By: Richard B. Levin
Represented By: Hector Mayol Kauffman
Represented By: Catherine Steege
Represented By: Robert D. Gordon
Represented By: Lindsay C. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?