Newton Covenant Church, et al v. Great American Insurance Co.
Plaintiff / Appellant: CARMEN ALDINGER, ROSELIND PICARD, THOMAS DEVOL, ANDERS BROWNWORTH, GARRETT SMITH, DANIEL ROMAINE, DORIS KELLOM, BEATRICE YANKEY, ROGER MARK, NEWTON COVENANT CHURCH, f/k/a Newton Presbyterian Church, HAROLD JONES and KRISTEN LUCKEN
Defendant / Appellee: GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 19-1826
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 10, 2020 Summary Newton Covenant Church v. Great American Insurance Co.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 10/22/2019 for appellant Carmen Aldinger, Anders Brownworth, Thomas Devol, Harold Jones, Doris Kellom, Kristen Lucken, Roger Mark, Newton Covenant Church, Roselind Picard, Daniel Romaine, Garrett Smith and Beatrice Yankey. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1826] (AL) [Entered: 09/12/2019 02:54 PM]
September 11, 2019 NOTICE issued. After 09/25/2019, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Brian G. Friel for Newton Covenant Church, Garrett Smith, Carmen Aldinger, Anders Brownworth, Thomas Devol, Harold Jones, Doris Kellom, Kristen Lucken, Roger Mark, Roselind Picard, Daniel Romaine and Beatrice Yankey and Kimberly L. Wehle for Newton Covenant Church, Garrett Smith, Carmen Aldinger, Anders Brownworth, Thomas Devol, Harold Jones, Doris Kellom, Kristen Lucken, Roger Mark, Roselind Picard, Daniel Romaine and Beatrice Yankey. [19-1826] (AL) [Entered: 09/11/2019 08:29 AM]
September 4, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Great American Insurance Company filed by Attorney Barry S. Pollack. Certificate of service dated 09/04/2019. [19-1826] (BSP) [Entered: 09/04/2019 02:33 PM]
September 4, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Great American Insurance Company filed by Attorney Ashly E. Scheufele. Certificate of service dated 09/04/2019. [19-1826] (AES) [Entered: 09/04/2019 01:17 PM]
August 26, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Newton Covenant Church, Garrett Smith, Carmen Aldinger, Anders Brownworth, Thomas Devol, Harold Jones, Doris Kellom, Kristen Lucken, Roger Mark, Roselind Picard, Daniel Romaine and Beatrice Yankey indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 08/26/2019. [19-1826] (RJG) [Entered: 08/26/2019 05:20 PM]
August 26, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Newton Covenant Church, Garrett Smith, Carmen Aldinger, Anders Brownworth, Thomas Devol, Harold Jones, Doris Kellom, Kristen Lucken, Roger Mark, Roselind Picard, Daniel Romaine and Beatrice Yankey. Certificate of service dated 08/26/2019. [19-1826] (RJG) [Entered: 08/26/2019 05:09 PM]
August 26, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Newton Covenant Church, Garrett Smith, Carmen Aldinger, Anders Brownworth, Thomas Devol, Harold Jones, Doris Kellom, Kristen Lucken, Roger Mark, Roselind Picard, Daniel Romaine and Beatrice Yankey filed by Attorney Robert J. Gilbert. Certificate of service dated 08/26/2019. [19-1826] (RJG) [Entered: 08/26/2019 03:20 PM]
August 21, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #28) filed by Appellants Carmen Aldinger, Anders Brownworth, Thomas Devol, Harold Jones, Doris Kellom, Kristen Lucken, Roger Mark, Newton Covenant Church, Roselind Picard, Daniel Romaine, Garrett Smith and Beatrice Yankey. Docketing Statement due 09/04/2019. Appearance form due 09/04/2019. [19-1826] (AL) [Entered: 08/21/2019 02:29 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newton Covenant Church, et al v. Great American Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARMEN ALDINGER
Represented By: Robert James Gilbert
Represented By: Brian G. Friel
Represented By: Kimberly L. Wehle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROSELIND PICARD
Represented By: Robert James Gilbert
Represented By: Brian G. Friel
Represented By: Kimberly L. Wehle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THOMAS DEVOL
Represented By: Robert James Gilbert
Represented By: Brian G. Friel
Represented By: Kimberly L. Wehle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANDERS BROWNWORTH
Represented By: Robert James Gilbert
Represented By: Brian G. Friel
Represented By: Kimberly L. Wehle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GARRETT SMITH
Represented By: Robert James Gilbert
Represented By: Brian G. Friel
Represented By: Kimberly L. Wehle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DANIEL ROMAINE
Represented By: Robert James Gilbert
Represented By: Brian G. Friel
Represented By: Kimberly L. Wehle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DORIS KELLOM
Represented By: Robert James Gilbert
Represented By: Brian G. Friel
Represented By: Kimberly L. Wehle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BEATRICE YANKEY
Represented By: Robert James Gilbert
Represented By: Brian G. Friel
Represented By: Kimberly L. Wehle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROGER MARK
Represented By: Robert James Gilbert
Represented By: Brian G. Friel
Represented By: Kimberly L. Wehle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NEWTON COVENANT CHURCH, f/k/a Newton Presbyterian Church
Represented By: Robert James Gilbert
Represented By: Brian G. Friel
Represented By: Kimberly L. Wehle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HAROLD JONES
Represented By: Robert James Gilbert
Represented By: Brian G. Friel
Represented By: Kimberly L. Wehle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KRISTEN LUCKEN
Represented By: Robert James Gilbert
Represented By: Brian G. Friel
Represented By: Kimberly L. Wehle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Barry Shawn Pollack
Represented By: Ashly E. Scheufele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?