Rocha v. Barr, et al
Petitioner / Appellant: CHRISTIAN A. ROCHA
Respondent / Appellee: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, Acting Secretary, US Department of Homeland Security, TODD M. LYONS, Acting Field Office Director, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, CHRISTOPHER BRACKETT, Superintendent, Strafford County Department of Corrections and WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Case Number: 19-1828
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 10/30/2019 for appellant Christian A. Rocha. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1828] (ALW) [Entered: 09/20/2019 04:20 PM]
September 5, 2019 NOTICE issued. After 09/19/2019, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Thomas P. Velardi for Christopher Brackett. [19-1828] (ALW) [Entered: 09/05/2019 10:43 AM]
September 4, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees William P. Barr, Todd M. Lyons and Kevin K. McAleenan filed by Attorney Alexander J. Halaska. Certificate of service dated 09/04/2019. [19-1828] (AH) [Entered: 09/04/2019 03:36 PM]
September 4, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees William P. Barr, Christopher Brackett, Todd M. Lyons and Kevin K. McAleenan filed by Attorney Alexander J. Halaska. Certificate of service dated 09/04/2019. [19-1828] (AH) [Entered: 09/04/2019 10:40 AM]
August 22, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Christian A. Rocha filed by Attorney Henry Klementowicz. Certificate of service dated 08/22/2019. [19-1828] (HRK) [Entered: 08/22/2019 01:58 PM]
August 22, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Christian A. Rocha filed by Attorney SangYeob Kim. Certificate of service dated 08/22/2019. [19-1828] (SK) [Entered: 08/22/2019 09:14 AM]
August 22, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Christian A. Rocha indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 08/22/2019. [19-1828] (SK) [Entered: 08/22/2019 09:14 AM]
August 22, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Christian A. Rocha. Certificate of service dated 08/22/2019. [19-1828] (SK) [Entered: 08/22/2019 09:12 AM]
August 22, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Christian A. Rocha filed by Attorney Gilles Bissonnette. Certificate of service dated 08/22/2019. [19-1828] (GRB) [Entered: 08/22/2019 08:39 AM]
August 21, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #28) filed by Appellant Christian A. Rocha. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 09/04/2019. [19-1828] (TS) [Entered: 08/21/2019 10:33 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rocha v. Barr, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: CHRISTIAN A. ROCHA
Represented By: Henry R. Klementowicz
Represented By: Gilles R. Bissonnette
Represented By: SangYeob Kim
Represented By: Christian A. Rocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, Acting Secretary, US Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: Alexander Halaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: TODD M. LYONS, Acting Field Office Director, Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: Alexander Halaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: CHRISTOPHER BRACKETT, Superintendent, Strafford County Department of Corrections
Represented By: Thomas P. Velardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: Alexander Halaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?