Markham Concepts, Inc., et al v. Hasbro, Inc., et al
Defendant: IDA MAE ATKINS
Respondent: LOUIS MARK SOLOMON, MICHAEL S. LAZAROFF and GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP
Plaintiff / Appellant: SUSAN GARRETSON, MARKHAM CONCEPTS, INC., LORRAINE MARKHAM and LORRAINE MARKHAM, individually and in her capacity as trustee of the Bill and Lorraine Markham Exemption Trust and the Lorraine Markham Family Trust
Defendant / Appellee: THOMAS FEIMAN, MICHAEL LINKLETTER, MAX CANDIOTTY, HASBRO, INC., LAURA LINKLETTER RICH, SHARON LINKLETTER, ROBERT MILLER, DAWN LINKLETTER GRIFFIN, DENNIS LINKLETTER, REUBEN KLAMER, THOMAS FEIMAN, in his capacity as a co-trustee of the Irvin S. and Ida Mae Atkins Family Trust, MAX CANDIOTTY, in his capacity as co-trustee of the Irvin S. and Ida Mae Atkins Family Trust and ROBERT MILLER, in his capacity as a co-trustee of the Irvin S. and Ida Mae Atkins Family Trust
Case Number: 19-1927
Filed: September 26, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 14, 2021 Summary Markham Concepts, Inc. v. Hasbro, Inc.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 APPENDIX filed by Appellants Susan Garretson, Lorraine Markham and Markham Concepts, Inc.. Number of volumes: 5. Number of copies: 5. Certificate of service dated 01/23/2020. [19-1927] (LIM) [Entered: 01/24/2020 05:17 PM]
January 24, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellants Susan Garretson, Lorraine Markham and Markham Concepts, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 01/23/2020. [19-1927] (LIM) [Entered: 01/24/2020 10:05 AM]
January 24, 2020 APPELLANTS' BRIEF filed by Appellants Susan Garretson, Lorraine Markham and Markham Concepts, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 01/23/2020. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 01/31/2020 . Brief due 02/24/2020 for APPELLEES Max Candiotty, Thomas Feiman, Hasbro, Inc., Reuben Klamer, Dennis Linkletter, Michael Linkletter, Sharon Linkletter, Dawn Linkletter Griffin, Laura Linkletter Rich and Robert Miller. [19-1927] (LIM) [Entered: 01/24/2020 09:31 AM]
January 23, 2020 BRIEF tendered by Appellants Susan Garretson, Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham. [19-1927] (RP) [Entered: 01/23/2020 09:01 PM]
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Markham Concepts, Inc., Lorraine Markham and Susan Garretson. Brief and Appendix due 01/23/2020 for appellant Susan Garretson, Lorraine Markham and Markham Concepts, Inc.. [19-1927] (AL) [Entered: 11/19/2019 04:16 PM]
November 15, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellants Susan Garretson, Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham. Certificate of service dated 11/15/2019. [19-1927] (RP) [Entered: 11/15/2019 05:35 PM]
November 7, 2019 SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: 272-288. [19-1927] (AL) [Entered: 11/22/2019 06:15 PM]
November 4, 2019 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Robert C. Foote, III for Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham, Gregory A. Markel for Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham, Thomas P. Burke, Jr. for Reuben Klamer, Mitchell N. Reinis for Sharon Linkletter, Michael Linkletter, Laura Linkletter Rich and Dennis Linkletter, Jacob W.S. Schneider for Hasbro, Inc. and Gary Wexler for Dawn Linkletter Griffin, Sharon Linkletter, Michael Linkletter and Laura Linkletter Rich. [19-1927] (AL) [Entered: 11/04/2019 12:10 PM]
November 1, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Hasbro, Inc. filed by Attorney Courtney L. Batliner. Certificate of service dated 11/01/2019. [19-1927] (CLB) [Entered: 11/01/2019 01:20 PM]
October 30, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 12/09/2019 for appellant Susan Garretson, Lorraine Markham and Markham Concepts, Inc.. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1927] (AL) [Entered: 10/30/2019 10:54 AM]
October 23, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Reuben Klamer filed by Attorney Justin Thiele. Certificate of service dated 10/23/2019. [19-1927] (JT) [Entered: 10/23/2019 07:17 PM]
October 23, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Reuben Klamer filed by Attorney Patricia L. Glaser. Certificate of service dated 10/23/2019. [19-1927] (PLG) [Entered: 10/23/2019 07:13 PM]
October 22, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Max Candiotty, Thomas Feiman, Dawn Linkletter Griffin, Laura Linkletter Rich, Dennis Linkletter, Michael Linkletter, Sharon Linkletter and Robert Miller filed by Attorney Ryan M. Gainor. Certificate of service dated 10/22/2019. [19-1927] (RMG) [Entered: 10/22/2019 03:26 PM]
October 18, 2019 NOTICE issued. After 11/01/2019, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Robert C. Foote, III for Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham, Gregory A. Markel for Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham, Courtney L.B. Batliner for Hasbro, Inc., Thomas P. Burke, Jr. for Reuben Klamer, Mitchell N. Reinis for Sharon Linkletter, Michael Linkletter, Laura Linkletter Rich and Dennis Linkletter, Jacob W.S. Schneider for Hasbro, Inc. and Gary Wexler for Dawn Linkletter Griffin, Sharon Linkletter, Michael Linkletter and Laura Linkletter Rich. [19-1927] (AL) [Entered: 10/18/2019 06:35 PM]
October 17, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Hasbro, Inc. filed by Attorney Mark T. Goracke. Certificate of service dated 10/17/2019. [19-1927] (MTG) [Entered: 10/17/2019 04:56 PM]
October 17, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Max Candiotty, Thomas Feiman, Dawn Linkletter Griffin, Laura Linkletter Rich, Dennis Linkletter, Michael Linkletter, Sharon Linkletter and Robert Miller filed by Attorney Christine K. Bush. Certificate of service dated 10/17/2019. [19-1927] (CKB) [Entered: 10/17/2019 01:51 PM]
October 17, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Susan Garretson, Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham filed by Attorney John T. Moehringer. Certificate of service dated 10/16/2019. [19-1927] (JTM) [Entered: 10/17/2019 09:59 AM]
October 16, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Reuben Klamer filed by Attorney Joshua J. Pollack. Certificate of service dated 10/16/2019. [19-1927] (JJP) [Entered: 10/16/2019 10:34 PM]
October 16, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Reuben Klamer filed by Attorney Erica J. Van Loon. Certificate of service dated 10/16/2019. [19-1927] (EJV) [Entered: 10/16/2019 10:31 PM]
October 16, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Max Candiotty, Thomas Feiman, Dawn Linkletter Griffin, Laura Linkletter Rich, Dennis Linkletter, Michael Linkletter, Sharon Linkletter and Robert Miller filed by Attorney David B. Jinkins. Certificate of service dated 10/16/2019. [19-1927] (DBJ) [Entered: 10/16/2019 08:20 PM]
October 16, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Susan Garretson, Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham filed by Attorney David A. Cole. Certificate of service dated 10/16/2019. [19-1927] (DC) [Entered: 10/16/2019 06:03 PM]
October 16, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Susan Garretson, Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 10/16/2019. [19-1927] (RP) [Entered: 10/16/2019 06:01 PM]
October 16, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Susan Garretson, Markham Concepts, Inc. and Lorraine Markham. Certificate of service dated 10/16/2019. [19-1927] (RP) [Entered: 10/16/2019 05:57 PM]
October 16, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Markham Concepts, Inc., Lorraine Markham and Susan Garretson filed by Attorney Robert M. Pollaro. Certificate of service dated 10/16/2019. [19-1927] (RP) [Entered: 10/16/2019 05:56 PM]
October 16, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Hasbro, Inc. filed by Attorney Patricia K. Rocha. Certificate of service dated 10/16/2019. [19-1927] (PKR) [Entered: 10/16/2019 05:06 PM]
October 16, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Hasbro, Inc. filed by Attorney Joshua C. Krumholz. Certificate of service dated 10/16/2019. [19-1927] (JCK) [Entered: 10/16/2019 04:20 PM]
October 3, 2019 SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: 271. [19-1927] (AL) [Entered: 10/31/2019 09:15 AM]
October 3, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #267) filed by Appellants Susan Garretson, Lorraine Markham and Markham Concepts, Inc.. Docketing Statement due 10/17/2019. Transcript Report/Order form due 10/17/2019. Appearance form due 10/17/2019. [19-1927] (AL) [Entered: 10/03/2019 01:40 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Markham Concepts, Inc., et al v. Hasbro, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SUSAN GARRETSON
Represented By: Robert Pollaro
Represented By: Mary C. Dunn
Represented By: Joseph V. Cavanagh Jr.
Represented By: John T. Moehringer
Represented By: David Cole
Represented By: Robert James Cavanagh Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARKHAM CONCEPTS, INC.
Represented By: Joseph V. Cavanagh Jr.
Represented By: John T. Moehringer
Represented By: Gregory A. Markel
Represented By: David Cole
Represented By: Robert James Cavanagh Jr.
Represented By: Robert Pollaro
Represented By: Mary C. Dunn
Represented By: Robert C. Foote III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LORRAINE MARKHAM
Represented By: John T. Moehringer
Represented By: Gregory A. Markel
Represented By: David Cole
Represented By: Robert James Cavanagh Jr.
Represented By: Robert Pollaro
Represented By: Mary C. Dunn
Represented By: Robert C. Foote III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LORRAINE MARKHAM, individually and in her capacity as trustee of the Bill and Lorraine Markham Exemption Trust and the Lorraine Markham Family Trust
Represented By: Joseph V. Cavanagh Jr.
Represented By: John T. Moehringer
Represented By: Gregory A. Markel
Represented By: David Cole
Represented By: Robert James Cavanagh Jr.
Represented By: Robert Pollaro
Represented By: Mary C. Dunn
Represented By: Robert C. Foote III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS FEIMAN
Represented By: Christine K. Bush
Represented By: Ryan M. Gainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL LINKLETTER
Represented By: Christine K. Bush
Represented By: David B. Jinkins
Represented By: Ryan M. Gainor
Represented By: Mitchell N. Reinis
Represented By: Gary Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAX CANDIOTTY
Represented By: Christine K. Bush
Represented By: Ryan M. Gainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HASBRO, INC.
Represented By: Jacob W.S. Schneider
Represented By: Patricia K. Rocha
Represented By: Joseph Avanzato
Represented By: Joshua C. Krumholz
Represented By: Brenna Anatone Force
Represented By: Mark Goracke
Represented By: Courtney L.B. Batliner
Represented By: Mark T. Goracke
Represented By: Courtney L. Batliner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAURA LINKLETTER RICH
Represented By: Christine K. Bush
Represented By: David B. Jinkins
Represented By: Ryan M. Gainor
Represented By: Mitchell N. Reinis
Represented By: Gary Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHARON LINKLETTER
Represented By: Christine K. Bush
Represented By: David B. Jinkins
Represented By: Ryan M. Gainor
Represented By: Mitchell N. Reinis
Represented By: Gary Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT MILLER
Represented By: Christine K. Bush
Represented By: Ryan M. Gainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAWN LINKLETTER GRIFFIN
Represented By: Christine K. Bush
Represented By: David B. Jinkins
Represented By: Ryan M. Gainor
Represented By: Gary Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENNIS LINKLETTER
Represented By: Christine K. Bush
Represented By: David B. Jinkins
Represented By: Ryan M. Gainor
Represented By: Mitchell N. Reinis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REUBEN KLAMER
Represented By: Erica J. Van Loon
Represented By: Thomas P. Burke Jr.
Represented By: Patricia L. Glaser
Represented By: Eric E. Renner
Represented By: Joshua J. Pollack
Represented By: Justin Thiele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS FEIMAN, in his capacity as a co-trustee of the Irvin S. and Ida Mae Atkins Family Trust
Represented By: Christine K. Bush
Represented By: Ryan M. Gainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAX CANDIOTTY, in his capacity as co-trustee of the Irvin S. and Ida Mae Atkins Family Trust
Represented By: Christine K. Bush
Represented By: Ryan M. Gainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT MILLER, in his capacity as a co-trustee of the Irvin S. and Ida Mae Atkins Family Trust
Represented By: Christine K. Bush
Represented By: Ryan M. Gainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: LOUIS MARK SOLOMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MICHAEL S. LAZAROFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDA MAE ATKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?