Towle v. Edmark
Petitioner / Appellant: ROBERT V. TOWLE
Respondent / Appellee: MICHELLE EDMARK, Warden, NH State Prison
Case Number: 19-2015
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: In light of this court's December 4, 2019 order vacating the October 24, 2019 briefing schedule as entered in error, petitioner-appellant Robert V. Towle's motion to vacate the briefing schedule and to hold his case in abeyance is denied as moot. [19-2015] (GB) [Entered: 12/04/2019 03:31 PM]
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: The briefing schedule for petitioner-appellant Robert V. Towle, issued on October 24, 2019 is hereby vacated as it was entered in error. [19-2015] (GB) [Entered: 12/04/2019 03:27 PM]
December 2, 2019 MOTION to hold case in abeyance and Motion to vacate briefing schedule filed by Appellant Robert V. Towle. Certificate of service dated 11/25/2019. [19-2015] (GB) [Entered: 12/03/2019 08:23 AM]
October 24, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 12/03/2019 for appellant Robert V. Towle. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-2015] (KPC) [Entered: 10/24/2019 09:49 AM]
October 23, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Robert V. Towle indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. [19-2015] (KPC) [Entered: 10/23/2019 04:24 PM]
October 11, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #174) filed by Appellant Robert V. Towle. Transcript Report/Order form due 10/25/2019. Fee due 10/25/2019. [19-2015] (KPC) [Entered: 10/11/2019 03:13 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Towle v. Edmark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: ROBERT V. TOWLE
Represented By: Robert V. Towle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: MICHELLE EDMARK, Warden, NH State Prison
Represented By: Elizabeth Christian Woodcock
Represented By: Lynmarie C. Cusack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?