Haddad v. Bryant University
Plaintiff / Appellant: ALEXANDRA HADDAD
Defendant / Appellee: BRYANT COLLEGE
Case Number: 19-2035
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 MANDATE issued. [19-2035] (CMP) [Entered: 11/07/2019 09:39 AM]
November 7, 2019 JUDGMENT dismissing case pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). [19-2035] (CMP) [Entered: 11/07/2019 09:38 AM]
November 5, 2019 STIPULATION of DismissaL of Appeal filed by Appellant Alexandra Haddad and Appellee Bryant College. Certificate of service dated 10/25/2019. [19-2035] (CMP) [Entered: 11/05/2019 11:13 AM]
November 5, 2019 ELECTRONIC SUPPLEMENTAL record filed consisting of stipulation withdrawing appeal and text order transferring the stipulation to the First Circuit Court of Appeals. [19-2035] (CMP) [Entered: 11/05/2019 11:08 AM]
November 1, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #26) filed by Appellant Alexandra Haddad. Docketing Statement due 11/15/2019. Transcript Report/Order form due 11/15/2019. Appearance form due 11/15/2019. [19-2035] (CMP) [Entered: 11/01/2019 09:58 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haddad v. Bryant University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALEXANDRA HADDAD
Represented By: Bridget A. Zerner
Represented By: Edward C. Roy Jr.
Represented By: John J.E. Markham II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRYANT COLLEGE
Represented By: Rajaram Suryanarayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?