LaMonde v. Haverhill District Court
Defendant / Appellee: HAVERHILL DISTRICT COURT
Plaintiff / Appellant: FRANK LAMONDE
Case Number: 19-2055
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 01/08/2020 for appellant Frank LaMonde. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-2055] (CMP) [Entered: 11/29/2019 12:02 PM]
November 27, 2019 SIGNED NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by Appellant Frank LaMonde. Certificate of service was not included. [19-2055] (CMP) [Entered: 11/29/2019 09:59 AM]
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: This court has docketed plaintiff Frank LaMonde's appeal from the order of dismissal entered on September 25, 2019 in No. 1:19-cv-11344-WGY (D. Mass.) as Appeal No. 19-2055. The notice of appeal was not signed. Accordingly, we transmit the notice of appeal to appellant Frank LaMonde and direct that he return a signed copy to this court. The failure by the appellant to return a signed copy of the notice of appeal on or before November 22, 2019 may lead to dismissal of her appeal for lack of diligent prosecution. See 1st. Cir. R. 3.0(b). [19-2055] (CMP) [Entered: 11/08/2019 08:47 AM]
November 5, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #9) filed by Appellant Frank LaMonde. [19-2055]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (CMP) [Entered: 11/05/2019 01:16 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaMonde v. Haverhill District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HAVERHILL DISTRICT COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRANK LAMONDE
Represented By: Frank LaMonde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?