Castejon v. Saul
Defendant / Appellee: ANDREW M. SAUL, Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff / Appellant: LUIS M. CASTEJON
Case Number: 19-2148
Filed: November 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Luis M. Castejon. Brief and Appendix due 01/21/2020 for appellant Luis M. Castejon. [19-2148] (GB) [Entered: 12/20/2019 12:49 PM]
December 20, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Luis M. Castejon. Certificate of service dated 12/20/2019. [19-2148] (FMZ) [Entered: 12/20/2019 07:34 AM]
December 18, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Andrew M. Saul filed by Attorney Rebecca H. Estelle, Assistant Regional Counsel, United States Social Security Administration. Certificate of service dated 12/18/2019. [19-2148] (RE) [Entered: 12/18/2019 09:22 AM]
December 17, 2019 NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Michael J. Pelgro for Andrew M. Saul. [19-2148] (GB) [Entered: 12/17/2019 09:53 AM]
December 4, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Andrew M. Saul filed by Attorney Mariana E. Bauza. Certificate of service dated 12/04/2019. [19-2148] (MEB) [Entered: 12/04/2019 01:32 PM]
December 2, 2019 NOTICE issued. After 12/16/2019, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Michael J. Pelgro for Andrew M. Saul. [19-2148] (GB) [Entered: 12/02/2019 10:19 AM]
November 26, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Luis M. Castejon. Certificate of service dated 11/26/2019. [19-2148] (FMZ) [Entered: 11/26/2019 09:26 AM]
November 26, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Luis M. Castejon filed by Attorney Felix M Zeno Gloro. Certificate of service dated 11/26/2019. [19-2148] (FMZ) [Entered: 11/26/2019 09:25 AM]
November 14, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 12/24/2019 for appellant Luis M. Castejon. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-2148] (GB) [Entered: 11/14/2019 02:20 PM]
November 12, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #27) filed by Appellant Luis M. Castejon. Appearance form and Docketing Statement due 11/26/2019 . [19-2148] (GB) [Entered: 11/09/2019 04:04 PM]
November 12, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #27) filed by Appellant Luis M. Castejon. Appearance form and Docketing Statement due 11/26/2019 . [19-2148] (GB) [Entered: 11/09/2019 04:04 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castejon v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDREW M. SAUL, Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Michael J. Pelgro
Represented By: Rebecca Estelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LUIS M. CASTEJON
Represented By: Felix M. Zeno Gloro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?