Club Gallistico de Puerto Rico, et al v. US, et al
Plaintiff: ASOCIACION CULTURAL Y DEPORTIVA DEL GALLO FINO DE PELEA, JOSE MIGUEL CEDENO, ANGEL MANUEL ORTIZ-DIAZ, JOHN J. OLIVARES-YACE and ANGEL LUIS NARVAEZ-RODRIGUEZ
Plaintiff / Appellant: NYDIA M. HERNANDEZ-GOTAY, LAURA GREEN, FAUSTINO ROSARIO-RODRIGUEZ, CARLOS QUINONES-FIGUEROA, CLUB GALLISTICO DE PUERTO RICO, INC. and LUIS JOEL BARRETO-BARRETO
Interested Party: ASOCIACION DE ALCALDES, MAYAGUEZ, PR, JUAN CARLOS ALBORS LAHONGRAIS, RESIDENT COMMISSIONER OF PUERTO RICO, COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO, SENATE OF THE COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO and PUERTO RICO HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Defendant / Appellee: DONALD J. TRUMP, US DEPT OF AGRICULTURE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES, SONNY PURDUE and WILLIAM P. BARR
Case Number: 19-2236
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2019 MOTION for leave to file oversized PETITION FOR STAY OF JUDGMENT PENDING APPEAL filed by Appellants Luis Joel Barreto-Barreto, Club Gallistico de Puerto Rico, Inc., Laura Green, Nydia M. Hernandez-Gotay, Faustino Rosario-Rodriguez and Carlos Quinones-Figueroa. Certificate of service dated 12/08/2019. [19-2236] (FMR) [Entered: 12/08/2019 12:58 PM]
December 6, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees William P. Barr, Sonny Purdue, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Justice, US and USDA filed by Attorney John S. Koppel. Certificate of service dated 12/06/2019. [19-2236] (JSK) [Entered: 12/06/2019 02:49 PM]
December 6, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Luis Joel Barreto-Barreto, Club Gallistico de Puerto Rico, Inc., Laura Green, Nydia M. Hernandez-Gotay, Carlos Quinones-Figueroa and Faustino Rosario-Rodriguez filed by Attorney Rafael A. Ojeda-Diez. Certificate of service dated 12/06/2019. [19-2236] (RAO) [Entered: 12/06/2019 09:47 AM]
December 6, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Luis Joel Barreto-Barreto, Club Gallistico de Puerto Rico, Inc., Laura Green, Nydia M. Hernandez-Gotay, Carlos Quinones-Figueroa and Faustino Rosario-Rodriguez. Certificate of service dated 12/06/2019. [19-2236] (FMR) [Entered: 12/06/2019 07:39 AM]
December 4, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Club Gallistico de Puerto Rico, Inc., Laura Green, Nydia M. Hernandez-Gotay, Luis Joel Barreto-Barreto, Carlos Quinones-Figueroa and Faustino Rosario-Rodriguez filed by Attorney FELIX ROMAN CARRASQUILLO. Certificate of service dated 12/04/2019. [19-2236] (FMR) [Entered: 12/04/2019 07:51 AM]
December 4, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #79) filed by Appellants Luis Joel Barreto-Barreto, Club Gallistico de Puerto Rico, Inc., Laura Green, Nydia M. Hernandez-Gotay, Carlos Quinones-Figueroa and Faustino Rosario-Rodriguez. Docketing Statement due 12/18/2019. Appearance form due 12/18/2019.. [19-2236] (GAK) [Entered: 12/04/2019 12:31 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Club Gallistico de Puerto Rico, et al v. US, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NYDIA M. HERNANDEZ-GOTAY
Represented By: Rafael Angel Ojeda-Diez
Represented By: Felix M. Roman Carrasquillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LAURA GREEN
Represented By: Rafael Angel Ojeda-Diez
Represented By: Felix M. Roman Carrasquillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FAUSTINO ROSARIO-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Rafael Angel Ojeda-Diez
Represented By: Felix M. Roman Carrasquillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARLOS QUINONES-FIGUEROA
Represented By: Rafael Angel Ojeda-Diez
Represented By: Felix M. Roman Carrasquillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CLUB GALLISTICO DE PUERTO RICO, INC.
Represented By: Rafael Angel Ojeda-Diez
Represented By: Felix M. Roman Carrasquillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LUIS JOEL BARRETO-BARRETO
Represented By: Rafael Angel Ojeda-Diez
Represented By: Felix M. Roman Carrasquillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASOCIACION CULTURAL Y DEPORTIVA DEL GALLO FINO DE PELEA
Represented By: Edwin Prado-Galarza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE MIGUEL CEDENO
Represented By: Edwin Prado-Galarza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGEL MANUEL ORTIZ-DIAZ
Represented By: Edwin Prado-Galarza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN J. OLIVARES-YACE
Represented By: Edwin Prado-Galarza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGEL LUIS NARVAEZ-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Edwin Prado-Galarza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASOCIACION DE ALCALDES
Represented By: Jorge Martinez-Luciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MAYAGUEZ, PR
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JUAN CARLOS ALBORS LAHONGRAIS
Represented By: Juan Carlos Albors Lahongrais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: RESIDENT COMMISSIONER OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Veronica Ferraiuoli Hornedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Raul Castellanos-Malave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SENATE OF THE COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PUERTO RICO HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Represented By: Carlos E. Rivera-Justiniano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONALD J. TRUMP
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Christopher R. Healy
Represented By: John Samuel Koppel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: US DEPT OF AGRICULTURE
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Christopher R. Healy
Represented By: John Samuel Koppel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Christopher R. Healy
Represented By: John Samuel Koppel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Christopher R. Healy
Represented By: John Samuel Koppel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SONNY PURDUE
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Christopher R. Healy
Represented By: John Samuel Koppel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Christopher R. Healy
Represented By: John Samuel Koppel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?