Maravelias v. Coughlin, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: PAUL MARAVELIAS
Defendant / Appellee: JOHN J. COUGHLIN, Senior Judge, 10th Circuit Court- District Division, in his individual and offical capacity, WINDHAM ME, GERALD S. LEWIS, Chief of Police, Town of Windham, in his official capacity, PATRICIA CONWAY, Rockingham County Attorney, in her official capacity, GORDON J. MACDONALD, New Hampshire Attorney General, WINDHAM, NH and WINDHAM POLICE DEPARTMENT
Case Number: 19-2244
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: Amended Notice of Appeal. [19-2244] (GRC) [Entered: 01/16/2020 04:53 PM]
January 16, 2020 AMENDED notice of appeal (doc. #55) filed by Appellant Paul Maravelias on 01/13/2020. [19-2244] (GRC) [Entered: 01/16/2020 04:24 PM]
January 8, 2020 STATUS report filed by Appellant Paul Maravelias. Certificate of service dated 01/08/2020. Next status report due 02/07/2020 for Paul Maravelias. [19-2244] (GRC) [Entered: 01/08/2020 03:26 PM]
December 10, 2019 CORRECTED ORDER* entered: The appellant is directed to file a status report by January 9, 2020 and at thirty day intervals thereafter, informing this court of any action taken by the district court on the post-judgment motion. Further, the appellant is directed to inform this court whether or not he intends to file a notice of appeal or amended notice of appeal from the district court's post-judgment order. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4)(B)(ii). Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal of this appeal for lack of diligent prosecution. 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Once the district court rules on the pending motion, it is directed to forward its decision to this court forthwith. * Corrected Order issued to amend caption. [19-2244] (ALW) [Entered: 12/10/2019 04:03 PM]
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: The appellant is directed to file a status report by January 9, 2020 and at thirty day intervals thereafter, informing this court of any action taken by the district court on the post-judgment motion. Further, the appellant is directed to inform this court whether or not he intends to file a notice of appeal or amended notice of appeal from the district court's post-judgment order. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4)(B)(ii). Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal of this appeal for lack of diligent prosecution. 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Once the district court rules on the pending motion, it is directed to forward its decision to this court forthwith.[19-2244] (ALW) [Entered: 12/10/2019 12:57 PM]
December 6, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee John J. Coughlin filed by Attorney Nancy Smith. Certificate of service dated 12/06/2019. [19-2244] (NJS) [Entered: 12/06/2019 07:50 AM]
December 4, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #46) filed by Appellant Paul Maravelias. [19-2244] (GRC) [Entered: 12/04/2019 02:30 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Maravelias v. Coughlin, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PAUL MARAVELIAS
Represented By: Paul Maravelias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN J. COUGHLIN, Senior Judge, 10th Circuit Court- District Division, in his individual and offical capacity
Represented By: Nancy J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WINDHAM ME
Represented By: Eric Alexander Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GERALD S. LEWIS, Chief of Police, Town of Windham, in his official capacity
Represented By: Eric Alexander Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATRICIA CONWAY, Rockingham County Attorney, in her official capacity
Represented By: Christopher Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GORDON J. MACDONALD, New Hampshire Attorney General
Represented By: Anthony J. Galdieri
Represented By: Samuel R.V. Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WINDHAM, NH
Represented By: Eric Alexander Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WINDHAM POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Eric Alexander Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?