Eresian v. Webster First Fed Credit Union, et al

Appellant: MELANIE CARA ERESIAN
Interested Party: US TRUSTEE
Appellee: DAVID M. NICKLESS, Chapter 7 Trustee and WEBSTER FIRST FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Case Number: 19-9001
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 04/03/2019 for appellant Melanie Cara Eresian. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-9001, 19-9002] (GB) [Entered: 02/22/2019 08:41 AM]
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Appeal Nos. 19-9001 and 19-9002 are consolidated for purposes of briefing and oral argument. See Fed. R. App. P. 3(b)(2). The parties are directed to use the above caption on all future filings related to these cases. [19-9001, 19-9002] (GB) [Entered: 02/22/2019 08:23 AM]
February 21, 2019 Filing fee was paid in BAP by Appellant Melanie Cara Eresian. [19-9001] (GK) [Entered: 02/21/2019 09:14 AM]
January 31, 2019 NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss for failure to pay the filing fee. Fee due 02/14/2019. [19-9001] (GK) [Entered: 01/31/2019 03:20 PM]
January 9, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #18) filed by Appellant Melanie Cara Eresian. Fee due 01/23/2019 . [19-9001] (GB) [Entered: 01/09/2019 10:30 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eresian v. Webster First Fed Credit Union, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MELANIE CARA ERESIAN
Represented By: Melanie Cara Eresian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US TRUSTEE
Represented By: Richard King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DAVID M. NICKLESS, Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By: David M. Nickless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WEBSTER FIRST FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Represented By: Carl D. Aframe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?