Gonzalez-Acevedo v. US, et al
Plaintiff: AG, minor daughter and EDMARIE MENDEZ-SALAS
Defendant / Appellee: IMMIGRATION CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO, ALBERTO GONZALEZ, MANUEL OYOLA-TORRES, PUERTO RICO POLICE DEPARTMENT, JOSE PEREZ-NIEVES, WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, PALO DE ROBLES, RICHARD ESCALERA, JOSE ROSARIO, WILLIAM STEPHEN MULDROW, LOURDES ECHEVARRIA, CHAD WOLF, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, HON. EMILIO DIAZ-COLON, Puerto Rico Police Department Superintendent, UNITED STATES, AIDA T. SILVA, US DEPT. OF HOMELAND SECURITY, HERIBERTO MENDEZ-PEREZ, JOSE VERA, ROBERTO ESCOBAR, ELIUD ESTRADA, JULIA CORREA-HERNANDEZ, RAMON PEREZ-CREPO and DENNISE NOEMI LONGO-QUINONES, Puerto Rico Secretary of Justice
Plaintiff / Appellant: MANUEL J. GONZALEZ-ACEVEDO
Case Number: 20-1032
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 MOTION to amend caption filed by Appellant Manuel J. Gonzalez-Acevedo. Certificate of service dated 02/25/2020. [20-1032] (MJG) [Entered: 02/25/2020 10:19 PM]
February 25, 2020 Notice to the Court filed by Appellant Manuel J. Gonzalez-Acevedo. Certificate of service dated 02/25/2020. [20-1032] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (MJG) [Entered: 02/25/2020 10:01 PM]
February 13, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee US filed by Attorney Mariana E. Bauza. Certificate of service dated 02/13/2020. [20-1032] (MEB) [Entered: 02/13/2020 03:56 PM]
February 13, 2020 CERTIFICATE of service for notice [ # 6316905-2 ] filed by Appellant Manuel J. Gonzalez-Acevedo. Certificate of service dated 02/13/2020. [20-1032] (MJG) [Entered: 02/13/2020 06:17 AM]
February 12, 2020 NOTICE of change of address filed by Appellant Manuel J. Gonzalez-Acevedo. Certificate of service dated 02/12/2020. [20-1032] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (MJG) [Entered: 02/12/2020 10:35 PM]
February 10, 2020 Mail returned as undeliverable to Not Party Edmarie Mendez-Salas. Copy of Notice issued January 22, 2020. Forwarded to HC-05 Box 10972, Moca, PR 00676. [20-1032] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (JMK) [Entered: 02/12/2020 04:05 PM]
February 5, 2020 COURTESY COPY of docketing statement [ # 6314272-2 ] filed by Appellant Manuel J. Gonzalez-Acevedo. Certificate of service dated 02/03/2020. [20-1032] (GB) [Entered: 02/05/2020 04:23 PM]
February 5, 2020 COURTESY COPY of notice of appearance [ # 6314268-2 ] filed by Appellant Manuel J. Gonzalez-Acevedo. Certificate of service dated 02/03/2020. [20-1032]. (GB) [Entered: 02/05/2020 04:19 PM]
February 3, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Manuel J. Gonzalez-Acevedo. Certificate of service dated 02/03/2020. [20-1032] (MJG) [Entered: 02/03/2020 01:37 PM]
February 3, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Manuel J. Gonzalez-Acevedo filed by Party Manuel de J. Gonzalez-Acevedo. Certificate of service dated 02/03/2020. [20-1032] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. . (MJG) [Entered: 02/03/2020 01:28 PM]
January 22, 2020 Public docket note: Chad Wolf was sworn in as Acting Secretary of Homeland Security on November 13, 2019. We have substituted him for Secretary, Janet Napolitano, as the appellee. William P. Barr was sworn in as Attorney General of the United States on February 14, 2019. We have substituted him for Eric Holder, as the appellee. Dennise N. Longo-Quinones was sworn in as Attorney General of Puerto Rico on August 7, 2019. We have substituted her for Guillermo Somoza as Attorney General of Puerto Rico as the appellee. William Stephen Muldrow was sworn in as the United States Attorney for Puerto Rico on October 4, 2020. We have substituted him for Acting United States Attorney, Rosa Emilia Rodirguez, as the appellee. [20-1032]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (RMK) [Entered: 01/22/2020 11:23 AM]
January 22, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #131) filed by Appellant Manuel J. Gonzalez-Acevedo. [20-1032] (RMK) [Entered: 01/22/2020 11:08 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Gonzalez-Acevedo v. US, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: IMMIGRATION CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Dennise Noemi Longo-Quinones
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALBERTO GONZALEZ
Represented By: Dennise Noemi Longo-Quinones
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MANUEL OYOLA-TORRES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PUERTO RICO POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Dennise Noemi Longo-Quinones
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSE PEREZ-NIEVES
Represented By: Dennise Noemi Longo-Quinones
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PALO DE ROBLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD ESCALERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSE ROSARIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM STEPHEN MULDROW
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LOURDES ECHEVARRIA
Represented By: Dennise Noemi Longo-Quinones
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHAD WOLF, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HON. EMILIO DIAZ-COLON, Puerto Rico Police Department Superintendent
Represented By: Dennise Noemi Longo-Quinones
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AIDA T. SILVA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: US DEPT. OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HERIBERTO MENDEZ-PEREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSE VERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERTO ESCOBAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELIUD ESTRADA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JULIA CORREA-HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Dennise Noemi Longo-Quinones
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RAMON PEREZ-CREPO
Represented By: Dennise Noemi Longo-Quinones
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENNISE NOEMI LONGO-QUINONES, Puerto Rico Secretary of Justice
Represented By: Dennise Noemi Longo-Quinones
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MANUEL J. GONZALEZ-ACEVEDO
Represented By: Manuel J. Gonzalez-Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AG, minor daughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDMARIE MENDEZ-SALAS
Represented By: Edmarie Mendez-Salas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?