Andalusian Global Designated v. FOMB, et al
Petitioner / Appellant: OCHER ROSE, L.L.C., GLENDON OPPORTUNITIES FUND, LP, OAKTREE VALUE OPPORTUNITIES FUND, L.P., PUERTO RICO AAA PORTFOLIO BOND FUND, INC., OAKTREE OPPORTUNITIES FUND IX, L.P., PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND III, INC., PUERTO RICO INVESTORS TAX-FREE FUND V, INC., LMA SPC, for an on behalf of Map 98 Segregated Portfolio, PUERTO RICO AAA PORTFOLIO TARGET MATURITY FUND, INC., REDWOOD MASTER FUND, LTD, PUERTO RICO INVESTORS BOND FUND I, INC., PUERTO RICO MORTGAGE-BACKED & U.S. GOVERNMENT SECURITIES FUND, INC., PUERTO RICO INVESTORS TAX-FREE FUND III, INC., ANDALUSIAN GLOBAL DESIGNATED ACTIVITY COMPANY, OAKTREE HUNTINGTON INVESTMENT FUND II, L.P., CROWN MANAGED ACCOUNTS, for and on behalf of Crown/PW SP, SV CREDIT, L.P., TAX-FREE PUERTO RICO FUND, INC., PUERTO RICO INVESTORS TAX-FREE FUND, INC., PUERTO RICO GNMA AND U.S. GOVERNMENT TARGET MATURITY FUND, INC., PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND IV, INC., OAKTREE OPPORTUNITIES FUND X (PARALLEL), L.P., PUERTO RICO INVESTORS TAX-FREE FUND II, INC., PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND II, INC., PUERTO RICO INVESTORS TAX-FREE FUND VI, INC., OCEANA MASTER FUND LTD, MASON CAPITAL MASTER FUND LP, PUERTO RICO INVESTORS TAX-FREE FUND IV, INC., OAKTREE-FORREST MULTI-STRATEGY, L.L.C. (SERIES B), PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND I, INC., OAKTREE OPPORTUNITIES FUND X, L.P., PENTWATER MERGER ARBITRAGE MASTER FUND LTD., OAKTREE OPPORTUNITIES FUND IX (PARALLEL), L.P., TAX-FREE PUERTO RICO TARGET MATURITY FUND, INC., PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND V, INC., OAKTREE OPPORTUNITIES FUND IX (PARALLEL 2), L.P., PWCM MASTER FUND LTD, PUERTO RICO AAA PORTFOLIO BOND FUND II, INC., OAKTREE OPPORTUNITIES FUND X (PARALLEL 2), L.P.,, TAX-FREE PUERTO RICO FUND II, INC., OAKTREE OPPORTUNITIES FUND X (PARALLEL 2), L.P. and OAKTREE VALUE OPPORTUNITIES FUND HOLDINGS, L.P.
Interested Party: PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY, OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF RETIRED EMPLOYEES OF THE COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO, PUERTO RICO MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION, ASOCIACION DE CONTRATISTAS DE ENERGIA RENOVABLE, CAMARA DE MERCADEO, INDUSTRIA Y DISTRIBUCION DE ALIMENTOS, PV PROPERTIES, INC., ASOCIACION DE RESTAURANTES DE PUERTO RICO and CENTRO UNIDO DE DETALLISTAS
Not Yet Classified: COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO, FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD, EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE GOVERNMENT OF PUERTO RICO and PUERTO RICO ELECTRIC POWER AUTHORITY (PREPA)
3Rd Party Plaintiff: XIOMARA RIVERA-CRUZ, ARACELIA TORRES IRIZARRY, CARLOS L. MERCED-CENTENO and ARACELIS NAZARIO TORRES
Debtor: PUERTO RICO HIGHWAYS AND TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY
Trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ-ARRIBAS and US TRUSTEE-REGION 21, United States Trustee
Case Number: 20-1065
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 CASE argued. Panel: Jeffrey R. Howard, Chief Appellate Judge; Sandra L. Lynch, Appellate Judge and William J. Kayatta, Jr., Appellate Judge. Arguing attorneys: Benjamin Rosenblum for Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund Holdings, L.P., Ocher Rose, L.L.C., SV Credit, L.P., Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, LMA SPC, Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P., Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., PWCM Master Fund Ltd and Redwood Master Fund, Ltd, Martin J. Bienenstock for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico, FOMB and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority, Peter M. Friedman for AAFAF and Catherine Steege for Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. [20-1065] (AA) [Entered: 03/03/2020 12:18 PM]
February 27, 2020 NOTICE issued. After 03/12/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Bradley R. Bobroff for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Lucia Chapman for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Valerie Concepcion-Cintron for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Peter D. Doyle for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Carl Forbes, Jr. for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico, FOMB and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority, Gregg M. Mashberg for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico, FOMB and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority, Hector M. Mayol Kauffmann for Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Matthew J. Morris for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Scott Rutsky for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Chris Theodoridis for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, FOMB and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority, Carl Wedoff for Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Jared D. Zajac for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico, FOMB and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority. [20-1065] (CMP) [Entered: 02/27/2020 10:48 AM]
February 24, 2020 NINE (9) paper copies of reply brief [ # 6319234-2 ] submitted by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund Holdings, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., Redwood Master Fund, Ltd, SV Credit, L.P., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc. and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc.. [20-1065] (ATC) [Entered: 02/25/2020 01:23 PM]
February 21, 2020 REPLY BRIEF filed by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund Holdings, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., Redwood Master Fund, Ltd, SV Credit, L.P., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc. and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 02/21/2020. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 02/27/2020 . [20-1065] (LIM) [Entered: 02/24/2020 10:21 AM]
February 21, 2020 BRIEF tendered by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund Holdings, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Redwood Master Fund, Ltd, SV Credit, L.P., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc. and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc.. [20-1065] (BB) [Entered: 02/21/2020 06:29 PM]
February 12, 2020 SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX filed by Appellees Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico and FOMB. Number of volumes: 1. Number of copies: 5. Certificate of service dated 02/07/2020. [20-1065] (GAK) [Entered: 02/12/2020 09:14 AM]
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Jeffrey R. Howard, Chief Appellate Judge. Upon consideration of debtors-appellees Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico, and the Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico's motion for leave to file a supplemental appendix, the motion is allowed. Appellees tendered supplemental appendix is accepted for filing on this date. [20-1065] (GAK) [Entered: 02/12/2020 09:11 AM]
February 11, 2020 NINE (9) paper copies of appellee/respondent brief [ # 6315945-2 ] submitted by Appellees Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico and FOMB. [20-1065] (ATC) [Entered: 02/11/2020 04:53 PM]
February 11, 2020 NINE (9) paper copies of appellee/respondent brief [ # 6315943-2 ] submitted by Appellee AAFAF. [20-1065] (ATC) [Entered: 02/11/2020 04:35 PM]
February 10, 2020 PLEADING tendered: Supplemental Appendix filed by Appellees Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico, and FOMB. Number of Volumes: 1. Number of copies: 5. Certificate of service dated 02/07/2020. [20-1065] (DK) [Entered: 02/10/2020 03:49 PM]
February 10, 2020 NINE (9) paper copies of appellee/respondent brief [ # 6315947-2 ] submitted by Appellee Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. [20-1065] (JMK) [Entered: 02/10/2020 11:43 AM]
February 7, 2020 APPELLEE'S BRIEF filed by Appellee Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Certificate of service dated 02/07/2020. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 02/10/2020 . [20-1065] (DK) [Entered: 02/07/2020 09:01 PM]
February 7, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellees Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico, and FOMB. Certificate of service dated 02/07/2020. [20-1065] (DK) [Entered: 02/07/2020 08:59 PM]
February 7, 2020 APPELLEES' BRIEF filed by Appellees Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico, and FOMB. Certificate of service dated 02/07/2020. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 02/10/2020 . [20-1065] (DK) [Entered: 02/07/2020 08:58 PM]
February 7, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellee AAFAF. Certificate of service dated 02/07/2020. [20-1065] (DK) [Entered: 02/07/2020 08:54 PM]
February 7, 2020 APPELLEE'S BRIEF filed by Appellee AAFAF. Certificate of service dated 02/07/2020. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 02/10/2020 . [20-1065] (DK) [Entered: 02/07/2020 08:52 PM]
February 7, 2020 BRIEF tendered by Appellee Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. [20-1065] (CS) [Entered: 02/07/2020 07:13 PM]
February 7, 2020 MOTION for leave to file supplemental appendix filed by Appellees Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico and FOMB. Certificate of service dated 02/07/2020. [20-1065] (TWM) [Entered: 02/07/2020 06:49 PM]
February 7, 2020 BRIEF tendered by Appellees FOMB, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico and Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. [20-1065] (TWM) [Entered: 02/07/2020 06:48 PM]
February 7, 2020 BRIEF tendered by Appellee AAFAF. [20-1065] (PMF) [Entered: 02/07/2020 05:30 PM]
February 5, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee AAFAF filed by Attorney Yaira Dubin. Certificate of service dated 02/05/2020. [20-1065] (YD) [Entered: 02/05/2020 10:13 PM]
February 3, 2020 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Fernando Agrait for Not Parties PV Properties, Inc., Puerto Rico Manufacturers Association, Asociacion de Contratistas de Energia Renovable, Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Centro Unido de Detallistas and Asociacion de Restaurantes de Puerto Rico. Copy of Order entered January 15, 2020. Forwarded to Bufete Martinez-Alvarez, Edif Centro DE Seguros, 701 Ponce DE Leon Ave, Ste 414 San Juan, PR 00907-3248. [20-1065] (JMK) [Entered: 02/07/2020 04:40 PM]
January 28, 2020 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Martin J. Bienenstock for Appellees Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico, FOMB, Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) and Not Party Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority. Certificate of service dated 01/28/2020. [20-1065] (MJB) [Entered: 01/28/2020 12:09 PM]
January 28, 2020 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Jason Zakia for Appellants Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc. and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 01/28/2020. [20-1065] (JZ) [Entered: 01/28/2020 11:06 AM]
January 28, 2020 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Benjamin Rosenblum for Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund Holdings, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Redwood Master Fund, Ltd and SV Credit, L.P.. Certificate of service dated 01/28/2020. [20-1065] (BR) [Entered: 01/28/2020 09:39 AM]
January 27, 2020 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Catherine Steege for Appellee Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Certificate of service dated 01/27/2020. [20-1065] (CS) [Entered: 01/27/2020 12:29 PM]
January 24, 2020 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Peter M. Friedman for Appellee AAFAF. Certificate of service dated 01/24/2020. [20-1065] (PMF) [Entered: 01/24/2020 06:44 PM]
January 23, 2020 CASE calendared: Tuesday, 03/03/2020 AM Boston, MA Panel Courtroom. Designation form due 01/28/2020 --[Edited 01/23/2020 by DT] (DT) [Entered: 01/23/2020 04:12 PM]
January 20, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico and Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Paul V. Possinger. Certificate of service dated 01/20/2020. [20-1065] (PVP) [Entered: 01/20/2020 04:37 PM]
January 17, 2020 NINE (9) paper copies of appellant/petitioner brief [ # 6310292-2 ] submitted by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund Holdings, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., Redwood Master Fund, Ltd, SV Credit, L.P., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc. and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc. [20-1065] (JMK) [Entered: 01/21/2020 08:47 AM]
January 16, 2020 APPENDIX filed by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P.,, Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., Redwood Master Fund, Ltd, SV Credit, L.P., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc. and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc.. Number of volumes: 1. Number of copies: 5. Certificate of service dated 01/15/2020. [20-1065] (LIM) [Entered: 01/16/2020 04:22 PM]
January 15, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P.,, Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., Redwood Master Fund, Ltd, SV Credit, L.P., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc. and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 01/15/2020. [20-1065] (LIM) [Entered: 01/16/2020 08:48 AM]
January 15, 2020 APPELLANTS' BRIEF filed by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P.,, Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., Redwood Master Fund, Ltd, SV Credit, L.P., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc. and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 01/15/2020. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 01/21/2020 . [20-1065] (LIM) [Entered: 01/16/2020 08:45 AM]
January 15, 2020 BRIEF tendered by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P.,, Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Redwood Master Fund, Ltd, SV Credit, L.P., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc. and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc.. [20-1065] (BB) [Entered: 01/15/2020 08:22 PM]
January 15, 2020 EXPEDITED briefing schedule set.. Appellants shall file their opening brief on January 15, 2020; Appellees shall file their response brief on February 7, 2020; and Appellants shall file their reply brief on February 21, 2020. [20-1065] (DPO) [Entered: 01/15/2020 05:22 PM]
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Appellate Judge: ,We have reviewed the parties' Joint Motion to Set Expedited Briefing Schedule. The Joint Motion is resolved as follows: (1) Appellants shall file their opening brief on January 15, 2020; (2) Appellees shall file their response brief on February 7, 2020; and (3) Appellants shall file their reply brief on February 21, 2020. We contemplate argument during this court's March 2020 sitting. [20-1065] (DPO) [Entered: 01/15/2020 05:16 PM]
January 15, 2020 JOINT MOTION to expedite briefing schedule filed by Appellees AAFAF, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico, FOMB, Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P.,, Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Redwood Master Fund, Ltd, SV Credit, L.P., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc. and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 01/15/2020. [20-1065] (DRF) [Entered: 01/15/2020 11:48 AM]
January 15, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico and Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Brian S. Rosen. Certificate of service dated 01/15/2020. [20-1065] (BSR) [Entered: 01/15/2020 10:12 AM]
January 15, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico and Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Stephen L. Ratner. Certificate of service dated 01/15/2020. [20-1065] (SLR) [Entered: 01/15/2020 10:10 AM]
January 15, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico and Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Jeffrey W. Levitan. Certificate of service dated 01/15/2020. [20-1065] (JWL) [Entered: 01/15/2020 10:00 AM]
January 15, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico and Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Mark D. Harris. Certificate of service dated 01/15/2020. [20-1065] (MDH) [Entered: 01/15/2020 09:56 AM]
January 15, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico and Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Martin J. Bienenstock. Certificate of service dated 01/15/2020. [20-1065] (MJB) [Entered: 01/15/2020 09:54 AM]
January 15, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico and Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Attorney William D. Dalsen. Certificate of service dated 01/15/2020. [20-1065] (WDD) [Entered: 01/15/2020 09:51 AM]
January 15, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico and Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Attorney John E. Roberts. Certificate of service dated 01/15/2020. [20-1065] (JER) [Entered: 01/15/2020 09:47 AM]
January 15, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico and Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Margaret A. Dale. Certificate of service dated 01/15/2020. [20-1065] (MAD) [Entered: 01/15/2020 09:43 AM]
January 15, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico and Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Timothy W. Mungovan. Certificate of service dated 01/15/2020. [20-1065] (TWM) [Entered: 01/15/2020 09:38 AM]
January 13, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee AAFAF filed by Attorney Ashley Pavel. Certificate of service dated 01/13/2020. [20-1065] (AMP) [Entered: 01/13/2020 09:59 PM]
January 13, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee AAFAF filed by Attorney John J. Rapisardi. Certificate of service dated 01/13/2020. [20-1065] (JJR) [Entered: 01/13/2020 09:56 PM]
January 13, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee AAFAF filed by Attorney Suzzanne Uhland. Certificate of service dated 01/13/2020. [20-1065] (SU) [Entered: 01/13/2020 09:52 PM]
January 13, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee AAFAF filed by Attorney Peter Friedman. Certificate of service dated 01/13/2020. [20-1065] (PMF) [Entered: 01/13/2020 09:41 PM]
January 13, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc. and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc. filed by Attorney Jose C. Sanchez Castro. Certificate of service dated 01/13/2020. [20-1065] (JCS) [Entered: 01/13/2020 05:36 PM]
January 13, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Antonio Juan Bennazar-Zequeira. Certificate of service dated 01/13/2020. [20-1065] (AJB) [Entered: 01/13/2020 05:26 PM]
January 13, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Lindsay C. Harrison. Certificate of service dated 01/13/2020. [20-1065] (LCH) [Entered: 01/13/2020 05:24 PM]
January 13, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Ian Heath Gershengorn. Certificate of service dated 01/13/2020. [20-1065] (IHG) [Entered: 01/13/2020 05:20 PM]
January 13, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Catherine L. Steege. Certificate of service dated 01/13/2020. [20-1065] (CS) [Entered: 01/13/2020 05:17 PM]
January 13, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc. and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc. filed by Attorney Alicia I. Lavergne Ramirez. Certificate of service dated 01/13/2020. [20-1065] (AIL) [Entered: 01/13/2020 04:44 PM]
January 13, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc. and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc. filed by Attorney Jason N. Zakia. Certificate of service dated 01/13/2020. [20-1065] (JZ) [Entered: 01/13/2020 11:13 AM]
January 13, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc. and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc. filed by Attorney John K. Cunningham. Certificate of service dated 01/13/2020. [20-1065] (JKC) [Entered: 01/13/2020 11:05 AM]
January 13, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P.,, Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., Redwood Master Fund, Ltd, SV Credit, L.P., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc. and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 01/10/2020. [20-1065] (CMP) [Entered: 01/13/2020 10:59 AM]
January 13, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P.,, Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Redwood Master Fund, Ltd and SV Credit, L.P. filed by Attorney Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez. Certificate of service dated 01/13/2020. [20-1065] (AF) [Entered: 01/13/2020 09:28 AM]
January 11, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P.,, Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Redwood Master Fund, Ltd and SV Credit, L.P. filed by Attorney Geoffrey S. Stewart. Certificate of service dated 01/11/2020. [20-1065] (GSS) [Entered: 01/11/2020 05:28 PM]
January 11, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P.,, Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Redwood Master Fund, Ltd and SV Credit, L.P. filed by Attorney Beth Heifetz. Certificate of service dated 01/11/2020. [20-1065] (BH) [Entered: 01/11/2020 05:26 PM]
January 11, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P.,, Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Redwood Master Fund, Ltd and SV Credit, L.P. filed by Attorney Sparkle L. Sooknanan. Certificate of service dated 01/11/2020. [20-1065] (SLS) [Entered: 01/11/2020 05:23 PM]
January 11, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P.,, Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Redwood Master Fund, Ltd and SV Credit, L.P. filed by Attorney Benjamin Rosenblum. Certificate of service dated 01/11/2020. [20-1065] (BR) [Entered: 01/11/2020 05:20 PM]
January 11, 2020 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P.,, Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Redwood Master Fund, Ltd, SV Credit, L.P., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc. and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc. indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 01/11/2020. [20-1065] (BB) [Entered: 01/11/2020 05:16 PM]
January 11, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P.,, Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Redwood Master Fund, Ltd, SV Credit, L.P., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc. and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 01/11/2020. [20-1065] (BB) [Entered: 01/11/2020 05:12 PM]
January 11, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: After hours on Friday, January 10, 2020, appellants filed a Motion for Expedited Briefing Schedule and for Expedited Determination of the Appeal. Appellees are ordered to file a response thereto no later than noon on Wednesday, January 15, 2020. [20-1065] (DPO) [Entered: 01/11/2020 11:19 AM]
January 10, 2020 MOTION for Expedited Briefing Schedule and for Expedited Determination of the Appeal filed by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P.,, Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, SV Credit, L.P., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Redwood Master Fund, Ltd and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 01/10/2020. [20-1065]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (BB) [Entered: 01/10/2020 07:51 PM]
January 10, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P.,, Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Redwood Master Fund, Ltd, SV Credit, L.P. and Oceana Master Fund Ltd filed by Attorney Bruce Bennett. Certificate of service dated 01/10/2020. [20-1065] (BB) [Entered: 01/10/2020 07:45 PM]
January 10, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P.,, Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Redwood Master Fund, Ltd and SV Credit, L.P. filed by Attorney David R. Fox. Certificate of service dated 01/10/2020. [20-1065] (DRF) [Entered: 01/10/2020 07:39 PM]
January 10, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #9723) filed by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P.,, Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., Redwood Master Fund, Ltd, SV Credit, L.P., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc. and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc.. Docketing Statement due 01/24/2020. Transcript Report/Order form due 01/24/2020. Appearance form due 01/24/2020. Fee due 01/24/2020. [20-1065] (CMP) [Entered: 01/10/2020 08:16 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Andalusian Global Designated v. FOMB, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OCHER ROSE, L.L.C.
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: GLENDON OPPORTUNITIES FUND, LP
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OAKTREE VALUE OPPORTUNITIES FUND, L.P.
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: PUERTO RICO AAA PORTFOLIO BOND FUND, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Jesse L. Green
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OAKTREE OPPORTUNITIES FUND IX, L.P.
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND III, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Jesse L. Green
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: PUERTO RICO INVESTORS TAX-FREE FUND V, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Jesse L. Green
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: LMA SPC, for an on behalf of Map 98 Segregated Portfolio
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: PUERTO RICO AAA PORTFOLIO TARGET MATURITY FUND, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Jesse L. Green
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: REDWOOD MASTER FUND, LTD
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Jesse L. Green
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: PUERTO RICO INVESTORS BOND FUND I, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Jesse L. Green
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: PUERTO RICO MORTGAGE-BACKED & U.S. GOVERNMENT SECURITIES FUND, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Jesse L. Green
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: PUERTO RICO INVESTORS TAX-FREE FUND III, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Jesse L. Green
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: ANDALUSIAN GLOBAL DESIGNATED ACTIVITY COMPANY
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OAKTREE HUNTINGTON INVESTMENT FUND II, L.P.
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: CROWN MANAGED ACCOUNTS, for and on behalf of Crown/PW SP
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: SV CREDIT, L.P.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Jesse L. Green
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: TAX-FREE PUERTO RICO FUND, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Jesse L. Green
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: PUERTO RICO INVESTORS TAX-FREE FUND, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Jesse L. Green
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: PUERTO RICO GNMA AND U.S. GOVERNMENT TARGET MATURITY FUND, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Jesse L. Green
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND IV, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Jesse L. Green
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OAKTREE OPPORTUNITIES FUND X (PARALLEL), L.P.
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: PUERTO RICO INVESTORS TAX-FREE FUND II, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Jesse L. Green
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND II, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Jesse L. Green
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: PUERTO RICO INVESTORS TAX-FREE FUND VI, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Jesse L. Green
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OCEANA MASTER FUND LTD
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: MASON CAPITAL MASTER FUND LP
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: PUERTO RICO INVESTORS TAX-FREE FUND IV, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Jesse L. Green
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OAKTREE-FORREST MULTI-STRATEGY, L.L.C. (SERIES B)
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND I, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Jesse L. Green
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OAKTREE OPPORTUNITIES FUND X, L.P.
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: PENTWATER MERGER ARBITRAGE MASTER FUND LTD.
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OAKTREE OPPORTUNITIES FUND IX (PARALLEL), L.P.
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: TAX-FREE PUERTO RICO TARGET MATURITY FUND, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Jesse L. Green
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND V, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Jesse L. Green
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OAKTREE OPPORTUNITIES FUND IX (PARALLEL 2), L.P.
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: PWCM MASTER FUND LTD
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Jesse L. Green
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: PUERTO RICO AAA PORTFOLIO BOND FUND II, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Jesse L. Green
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OAKTREE OPPORTUNITIES FUND X (PARALLEL 2), L.P.,
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: TAX-FREE PUERTO RICO FUND II, INC.
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Sanchez-Castro
Represented By: Alicia Irene Lavergne-Ramirez
Represented By: Jesse L. Green
Represented By: Jason Zakia
Represented By: Cheryl T. Sloane
Represented By: John K. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OAKTREE OPPORTUNITIES FUND X (PARALLEL 2), L.P.
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OAKTREE VALUE OPPORTUNITIES FUND HOLDINGS, L.P.
Represented By: Sparkle Leah Sooknanan
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stewart
Represented By: Bruce Bennett
Represented By: Beth Heifetz
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY
Represented By: Peter M. Friedman
Represented By: Luis C. Marini-Biaggi
Represented By: John J. Rapisardi
Represented By: Suzzanne Uhland
Represented By: Carolina Velaz-Rivero
Represented By: Yaira Dubin
Represented By: Ashley M. Pavel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF RETIRED EMPLOYEES OF THE COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Melissa M. Root
Represented By: Antonio Juan Bennazar-Zequeira
Represented By: Richard B. Levin
Represented By: Hector M. Mayol Kauffmann
Represented By: Catherine Steege
Represented By: Carl Wedoff
Represented By: Robert D. Gordon
Represented By: Ian Heath Gershengorn
Represented By: Lindsay C. Harrison
Represented By: Landon Raiford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PUERTO RICO MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Fernando Agrait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASOCIACION DE CONTRATISTAS DE ENERGIA RENOVABLE
Represented By: Fernando Agrait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CAMARA DE MERCADEO, INDUSTRIA Y DISTRIBUCION DE ALIMENTOS
Represented By: Fernando Agrait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PV PROPERTIES, INC.
Represented By: Fernando Agrait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASOCIACION DE RESTAURANTES DE PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Fernando Agrait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CENTRO UNIDO DE DETALLISTAS
Represented By: Fernando Agrait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Paul V. Possinger
Represented By: Peter D. Doyle
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Scott Rutsky
Represented By: Matthew J. Morris
Represented By: Ricardo Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Michael A. Firestein
Represented By: Lucia Chapman
Represented By: Juan Carlos Ramirez-Ortiz
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg
Represented By: Chris Theodoridis
Represented By: Stephan E. Hornung
Represented By: Ginger D. Anders
Represented By: Philip Abelson
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Jared D. Zajac
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Maja Zerjal
Represented By: Laura E. Stafford
Represented By: Adele M. El-Khouri
Represented By: Susana I. Penagaricano Brown
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
Represented By: Bradley R. Bobroff
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Valerie Concepcion-Cintron
Represented By: Steven O. Weise
Represented By: Jennifer L. Roche
Represented By: Carl Forbes Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Hackett
Represented By: Kevin J. Perra
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Lary Alan Rappaport
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Stephen L. Ratner
Represented By: Michael Luskin
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Julia D. Alonzo
Represented By: Daniel Jose Perez-Refojos
Represented By: Chad Golder
Represented By: Margaret Antinori Dale
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Rachel G. Miller Ziegler
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD
Represented By: Paul V. Possinger
Represented By: Peter D. Doyle
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Scott Rutsky
Represented By: Matthew J. Morris
Represented By: Ricardo Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Michael A. Firestein
Represented By: Lucia Chapman
Represented By: Juan Carlos Ramirez-Ortiz
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg
Represented By: Chris Theodoridis
Represented By: Stephan E. Hornung
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Ginger D. Anders
Represented By: Philip Abelson
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Jared D. Zajac
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Maja Zerjal
Represented By: Laura E. Stafford
Represented By: Adele M. El-Khouri
Represented By: Susana I. Penagaricano Brown
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
Represented By: Bradley R. Bobroff
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Valerie Concepcion-Cintron
Represented By: Steven O. Weise
Represented By: Jennifer L. Roche
Represented By: Carl Forbes Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Hackett
Represented By: Kevin J. Perra
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Lary Alan Rappaport
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Stephen L. Ratner
Represented By: Michael Luskin
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Julia D. Alonzo
Represented By: Daniel Jose Perez-Refojos
Represented By: Chad Golder
Represented By: Margaret Antinori Dale
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Rachel G. Miller Ziegler
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE GOVERNMENT OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Paul V. Possinger
Represented By: Peter D. Doyle
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Matthew J. Morris
Represented By: Ricardo Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Michael A. Firestein
Represented By: Lucia Chapman
Represented By: Juan Carlos Ramirez-Ortiz
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg
Represented By: Stephan E. Hornung
Represented By: Ginger D. Anders
Represented By: Philip Abelson
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Jared D. Zajac
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Maja Zerjal
Represented By: Laura E. Stafford
Represented By: Adele M. El-Khouri
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
Represented By: Bradley R. Bobroff
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Valerie Concepcion-Cintron
Represented By: Jennifer L. Roche
Represented By: Carl Forbes Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Hackett
Represented By: Kevin J. Perra
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Lary Alan Rappaport
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Stephen L. Ratner
Represented By: Michael Luskin
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Julia D. Alonzo
Represented By: Daniel Jose Perez-Refojos
Represented By: Chad Golder
Represented By: Margaret Antinori Dale
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Rachel G. Miller Ziegler
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PUERTO RICO ELECTRIC POWER AUTHORITY (PREPA)
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Jared D. Zajac
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Hadassa Waxman
Represented By: Arturo Diaz-Angueira
Represented By: Daniel S. Shamah
Represented By: Maria J. DiConza
Represented By: Joseph P. Davis III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: XIOMARA RIVERA-CRUZ
Represented By: Fermin L. Arraiza Navas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: ARACELIA TORRES IRIZARRY
Represented By: Carlos Alberto Ruiz Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: CARLOS L. MERCED-CENTENO
Represented By: Fermin L. Arraiza Navas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: ARACELIS NAZARIO TORRES
Represented By: Carlos Alberto Ruiz Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: PUERTO RICO HIGHWAYS AND TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Ricardo Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg
Represented By: Chris Theodoridis
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Jared D. Zajac
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Carl Forbes Jr.
Represented By: Kevin J. Perra
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Daniel Jose Perez-Refojos
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Hadassa Waxman
Represented By: Raul Castellanos-Malave
Represented By: Andres W. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ-ARRIBAS
Represented By: Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: US TRUSTEE-REGION 21, United States Trustee
Represented By: Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?