Saad Maura, et al v. Scotiabank de Puerto Rico, et al
Plaintiff: GLADYS M. RIVERA-RODRIGUEZ, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP REYES-RIVERA and ADALBERTO REYES-GARCED
Plaintiff / Appellant: DAMARIS TORRES-NUNEZ, EVELYN MORALEZ-SUAREZ, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP BERRIOS-RIVERA, TOMAS ANTONIO VELEZ-MARTINEZ, TANIA LIZ RODRIGUEZ-GARCIA, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP ESTRADA-QUILES, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP RAMOS-CRESPO, ANASTACIO FALCON-ROSARIO, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP CARMONA-HERNANDEZ, CARLOS JOSE SARNELLI, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP RODRIGUEZ-DURAN, EFRAIN LLANES-COLON, XIOMARA ZABALA-GARCIA, LUZ ESTELA POUERIET-DIAZ, YOLANDA QUILES-SERRANO, RUBEN MIRANDA-MERCADO, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP ARROYO-MENDEZ, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP LUCIANO-CRUZ, ALBA YANIRA TORRES-CINTRON, ANTONIO MUNOZ-SUAREZ, JOSE A. VARGAS-ARRATIBEL, WALESKA DEL CARMEN MALDONADO-RODRIGUEZ, JOSE MANUEL LOPEZ-CRUZ, ISMAEL PAGAN-CEDENO, LILLYBELL OLIVO-RIVERA, LUIS EUGENIO DIOU-AGRAIT, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP CRUZ-FERRER, RAFAEL RODRIGUEZ-RIVERA, JOSE ANTONIO LAPORTE-ESPADA, GERARDO ACOSTA-FIGUEROA, EDWIN MARRERO-TORRES, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP ORTIZ-SOTO, MARIA BELEN DIAZ-RIVERA, RAMON SOTO-MORALES, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP RONDON-MOJICA, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP AVILA-CHAMPANA, LUIS E. SANTIAGO-COLON, WANDA I. VILLAFANE-MATOS, ELSIE SUSAN SANCHEZ-GONZALEZ, MANUEL IVAN CRIADO-CRIADO, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP CABAN-REYES, KAREN BARREDA-RIVERA, EVELYN RAMOS-CORTES, HIRAM PENA-ROLDAN, EVELYN CRUZ-FLORES, ROLANDO AVILA-PEREZ, RAMON SANCHEZ-PAGAN, MARCELO MERCADO-ORITZ, VIRGEN NOEMI MARRERO-CARBALLO, BRUNILDA ROJAS-GONZALEZ, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP LOPEZ-REYES, NORMA H. MARTINEZ-RODRIGUEZ, JOSE ALBERTO HERNANDEZ-TORRES, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP MALDONADO-RECIO, DINORAH SANCHEZ-FIGUEROA, MIGUEL ANGEL MEDINA-LOPEZ, JUAN A SOTO-AYBAR, YIRIES JOSEPH ASEF SAAD-MAURA, LUIS ENRIQUE RAMOS-PITRE, GINNETTE PEREZ-CAMPO, MIRIAM JANETTE MERCADO-ACOSTA, ALL OTHERS IN SIMILAR SITUATION, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP ALEJANDRO-JIMENEZ, MARIA DE LOS ANGELES COLON-MOREL, YASSER CRUZ-PADILLA, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP DEL ROSARIO-SELLES, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP RODRIGUEZ-MALDONADO, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP SEVILLA-RIVERA, LILLIAM BETHZAIDA HERNANDEZ-AMARO, IVONNE BERNARD-RIVERA, MIRIAM CARRION-SOTO, CLARIVETTE CASTRO-NARVAEZ, JOHN MACEIRA-LOPEZ, CARMEN NELIDA BRAVO-SOTO, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP RAMOS-ENCARNACION, REINALDO OQUENDO-VEGA, MANUEL F. EGIPCIACO-RUIZ, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP GONZALEZ-MARTINEZ, CARLOS ALBERTO ALVAREZ-RIVERA, MARIA AWILDA CRUZ-ACEVEDO, MADELINE RIVERA-PAGAN, EUNICE MARIBEL LUGO-MEJIAS, LEIDA MENDEZ-PAGAN, ANGEL MANUEL LLORENS ORLANDI, GABRIEL CHAVEZ-DIAZ, PABLO GUADALUPE-MENDOZA, YOLANDA ARROYO-FONTANEZ, JOHANN ENID MARTINEZ-ORITZ, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP CHEVERE-STUART, GLENDA MARIE VIERA-RIVERA, ANGEL L. BERRIOS-ORTIZ, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP CASTRO-TRINIDAD, NELSON NUNEZ-ROLON, ANA LUISA BERRIOS-DOBLE, JOSE ANTONIO GONZALEZ-ARCE, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP CONCEPCION-RAMOS, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP SALICRUP-RUIZ, JOSE GERALDO ROMAN-GONZALEZ, GRORIBEL SOTO-DE JESUS, SONIA LINNETTE ROMERO-RAMOS, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP MANSO-SANTIAGO, ELBA M. ALICEA-ORTIZ, LIZZETTE ALEJANDRO-OCASIO, ILDEFONSO MARTINEZ-SANTIAGO, FERNANDO SUAREZ-GUILLEN, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP LLANES-ZABALA, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP MALDONADO-GONZALEZ, MARIA MERCEDES REYES-CONCEPCION, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP PEREZ-CASTRO, ANTONIO ROSA-AGOSTO, MARILYN FONSECA-COTTO, JUAN DIAZ-PEREZ, HECTOR LUIS RIVERA-RODRIGUEZ, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP PENA-PAGAN, MARISOL AMARO-MEDINA, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP CHAVEZ-ZARAGOZA, FRANCISCA CRUZ-DELGADO, DIANNE QUILES-LUGO, GILBERT ARROYO-LOPERENA, LUIS ALEXIS MANSO-ROSARIO, SAMUEL LUCIANO-PEREZ, MIGUEL ANTONIO CHEVERE-DONES, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP GONZALEZ-RODRIGUEZ, GLORIA MARIA TAPIA-DE-JESUS, JAZMIN ERIKA RODRIGUEZ-MORALES, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP MARTINEZ-TORRES, RAFAEL EDUARDO NARVAEZ-CABEZAS, IRIS YOLANDA CARDONA-TIRADO, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP ALVAREZ-DIAZ, VIVIANA SANCHEZ-SERRANO, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP LOPEZ-COLON, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP ACOSTA-HERNANDEZ, ROBERTO OCANA-SERRANO, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP PAGAN-DEL RIO, VIVIAN ENID FLORES-MERCED, SANDRA IVETTE ROMAN-DIAZ, MARCOS GONZALEZ-RODRIGUEZ, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP VARGAS-RODRIGUEZ, ZORAIDA SANTOS-PAGAN, HIRAN ORTIZ-ORTIZ, NANCY MELENDEZ-VALENTIN, CARMEN JOSEFINA VALENTIN-DAVILA, NILDA IRIS EUTSLER-DELGADO, ALEXY SOTO-ROSARIO, EVELYN SERRANO-AGUEDA, GLENNY DIAZ-DOMINQUEZ, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP DIAZ-BRAVO, LADY TRISTANY MELENDEZ, LUZ NEREIDA STUART-DIAZ, JOSE NOEL RODRIGUEZ-ALVAREZ, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP PAGAN-GONZALEZ, AGUSTIN ALEJANDRO CRUZ, FELIX JOSE RIVERA-PEREZ, CECILIO ALLENDE-QUINONES, NEIDA INES HERNANDEZ-IRIZARRY, ANA L. TOLEDO DAVILA, CARLOS JOSE SUAREZ-GUILLEN, RAMON R. GONZALEZ-PEREZ, HAYDEE RODRIGUEZ-NICHOLS, ESTHER ROSA LOPEZ-MEDINA, DEOGRACIA TAPIA-FEBRES, DONOVAN MALDONADO-CRUZ, MADELINE TRINIDAD-DIAZ, MARIBEL SANTANA-SANTANA, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP ALLENDE-VILLAFANE, ERIC SANTIAGO HALAIS-BORGES, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP VIDAL-SANCHEZ, JULIO RONDON-REYES, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP RODRIGUEZ-FELICIANO, EDWIN GIRALD-TORRES, NESTOR CRUZ-DIAZ, CONCEPCION GONZALEZ-RIVERA, IAN DE LLANO-JIMENEZ, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP LOPEZ-BLECK, ANGEL LOUIS CARMONA-BENET, MIRIAM RIVERA-TORRES, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP RODRIGUEZ-MELENDEZ, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP MELENDEZ-DIAZ, NELLY RAMONITA GONZALEZ-RODRIGUEZ, LUIS MANUEL FERNANDEZ-VELAZQUEZ, RUTH NOEMI RIVERA-COLON, EDA PEREZ-CABRERA, ANGEL LUIS RODRIGUEZ-CAMACHO, ELIZABETH MONTALVO-MELENDEZ, REYNALDO RODRIGUEZ-COLON, SONIA ACEVEDO, EULOGIA R. DEL RIO-TORRES, MANUEL ANGEL VEGA-BONILLA, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP NUNEZ-ORTIZ, JULIO VICTOR CASTRO-LOPEZ, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP VEGA-PEREZ, ERIKA ENCARNACION-SANCHEZ, EUGENIO JOEL RAMOS-CALDERON, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP RODRIGUEZ-ROMAN, SARA VICTORIA COLON-VEGA, JOSE ANTONIO CONCEPCION-SOTO, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP ROMAN-SERRANO, BRUNILDA SANTIAGO-RIVERA, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP RODRIGUEZ-BERMUDEZ, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP MIRANDA-ACEVEDO, SOL MARGARITA CABRERA MUNOZ, JAIME RAFAEL VIDAL-RODRIGUEZ, MARIO JOSE RIVERA-COTTO, OLGA PAGAN-MALDONADO, EDWIN FRANCISCO RODRIGUEZ, JOSE RAMON CINTRON-MERCADO, GLENDALYS GONZALEZ-SANTIAGO, ORLANDO DIAZ-SOTO, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP TAPIA-BENITEZ, LUIS EDUARDO PARDO-TORO, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP SOTO-DIAZ, ANGELA L. ROSARIO-DELEON, EDWIN CASILLAS-BERRIOS, RAFAEL ANTONIO FONSECA-MARRERO, JOSE ARNALDO GONZALEZ-SANTIAGO, ELIZABETH CHAMPANA-GAGNERON, MARIA DE LOS ANGELES HERNANDEZ-DIAZ, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP OQUENDO-HERNANDEZ, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP GONZALEZ-RIVERA, WANDA L. ALEJANDRO-RUIZ, PEDRO JAVIER RODRIGUEZ-QUILES, NANCY COLON-BERRIOS, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP RODRIGUEZ-LUGO, FRIDA MARCHOSKY-KOGAN, JUAN ARSENIO VELAZQUEZ DURAN, MARIA M. ONDINA-GORDO, EZEQUIEL ANTONIO GONZALEZ-CARRIO, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP VELEZ-CORDERO, RICARDO JOSE VAZQUEZ-SERRA, OLGA IVETTE SANABRIA-VELAZQUEZ, JOSE ALFREDO JIMENEZ-FIGUEROA, JULIO ENRIQUE COLON, ROBERTO PEREZ-RAMIREZ, CARLOS LUIS AMADOR-FERNANDEZ, IVEA MARIA SELLES-HERNANDEZ, MIGDALIA MARGARITA DE LEON-VELEZ, JOSE ANTONIO DIAZ-PEREZ, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP DIOU-COLON, MARGARITA RIVERA-RIVERA, ZAYRA DEL ROSARIO TORRES-MATOS, WILLIAM PAGAN-RODRIGUEZ, ADELIZ FERRER-DECAMPS, JOHNNY EDGAR MELENDEZ-GONZALEZ, IVA YADIRA DE JESUS-GARCIA, MARIA LUISA CRUZ-RIVERA, GLORIA BERMUDEZ-VARGAS, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP EGIPCIACO-PORRATA, GILBERTO CRUZ-PEREZ, YAMELIT MALDONADO-SOTO, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP SOTO-VEGUILLA, PAULA E. ESTRADA-DIAZ, WALDEMIR COLON-LEBRON, MARIA VELILLA-SOTOMAYOR, PROVIDENCIA RODRIGUEZ-VEGA, GLORIA A. RODRIGUEZ-TRUJILLO, NATHAN CABAN-GARCIA, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP MEDINA-DE-JESUS, WALBERTO NUSSA GONZALEZ, MICHAEL JOSEPH MORRIS-ZAMORA, DAVID ALVAREZ-LOPEZ, PEDRO SEVILLA-ESTELA, ROBERTO SALICRUP-HERNANDEZ, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP CRIADO-TORRES, ARISTIDES LOPEZ-RAMOS, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP VELEZ-SERRANO, MANUEL ANTONIO TOLEDO-GARCIA, LUIS FRANCISCO ORTIZ-OSUNA, MARIBEL HERNANDEZ-PEREZ, ZULEIKA COSME-RIVERA, GRACIANO VELEZ-ALBALADEJO, OLGA I. GONZALEZ-DIAZ, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP CASILLAS-ANDRADES, MARIA FELICIANO-MENDEZ, JOAQUIN JOSE JARQUE-RODRIGUEZ, HARRY RODRIGUEZ-CRUZ, MILKA YADIRA RIVERA-RIVERA, EMERITO RUIZ-RODRIGUEZ, PEDRO RAFAEL HERNANDEZ-SANCHEZ, WILLIAM LOPEZ-COLON, MYRNA PEREZ-MORALES, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP CURET-ALVARADO, SONIA YVID CONDE-BURGOS, CARMEN GLORIA GARCIA-RIVERA, BETZAIDA I. PORRATA-TIRADO, JUANITA ALVARADO-SAEZ, MARIA ISABEL OTERO-CARABALLO, IVETTE MARIA PEREZ-NIEVES, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP GIRALD-PEREZ, EDWIN PEREZ AYALA, JESUS E. MONROIG-JIMENEZ, NAIHR ZARAGOZA-VALLE, MARETZA MENDEZ-MUNIZ, BENITA ORTIZ-CEBALLOS, EDWIN MARTINEZ-RIVERA, EILEEN DALMARY JIMENEZ-GAVILLAN, RODYLOIDA RUIZ-DELGADO, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP SOTO-SANCHEZ, MARIBEL TORRES-ENCARNACION, NELSON ALVARADO-HERNANDEZ, YANIRA SANTIAGO-RIVERA, WANDA GONZALEZ-RIVERA, MORAIMA RIVERA-GONZALEZ, ANTUANETTE RAMOS-AYALA, MARIA MILAGROS DURAN-MORALES, NERISLIANG CRESPO RIVERA, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP DIAZ-LLERA, JULIO ENRIQUE RIVERA-NEGRON, MARITZA RIVERA-RODRIGUEZ, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP SOTOMAYOR-VELILLA, GLORIA MARGARITA ALICEA-RIVERA, FERNANDO LUIS ROSARIO-CARDONA, JOSE G. MALDONADO-MALAVE, ANNIEL CARRASQUILLO-AMARO, EDWIN GLASS-MARTINEZ, JUAN MANUEL RODRIGUEZ-IRIZARRY, AMETZA DELGADO-CARDONA, JORGE JOSE ROSA-MIRANDA, ANTONIO VALDIVIA, NELIDA RAMOS-LOPEZ, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP RIVERA-PEREZ, JORGE CEDENO-ROSADO, JOSE MANUEL RIVERA-COLON, MAYRA ELENA ORTIZ-RENTAS, MIGUEL ANGEL RIOS-SANTIAGO, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP CRUZ-MORALES, WILMA GANDARA-GORRITZ, CARMEN BENITEZ-GARAY, LOURDES HERNANDEZ-LLANES, IVELISSE VEGUILLA-COLON, GILBERTO GONZALEZ-VELEZ, IVAN R. SOTOMAYOR-SERRA, JUAN ERNESTO DEL ROSARIO-MASINI, RICARDO RENE SOTO-BONILLA, MARCOS E. RODRIGUEZ-GOMEZ, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP DEL LLANO-BARREDA, ZULMA I. RECIO-LOPEZ, LUIS ANGEL MARTINEZ-OTERO, GLORISSA CORDERO-CABRERA, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP GUADALUPE-RAMOS, JUDITH MATOS-NEGRON, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP MARQUEZ-SANTANA, SANDRA DE LOS ANGELES FERNANDEZ-GARCIA, DESERIE CINTRON-CABRERA, MIGUEL ANGEL MARQUEZ-CAMACHO, MARIA MAGDALENA REYES-PAGAN, FRANCISCA CHARLES-BELEN, ALEJANDRO ESTRADA-MAISONET, MARIA CELIA LEBRON-QUINTANA, INES YAMIRA RIVERA-AQUINO, CLARA MORETA-RODRIGUEZ, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP GONZALEZ-CRUZ, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP HERNANDEZ-SANTOS, MARIA DE LOURDES BLEK-ESTEVEZ, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP RIVERA-OLIVO, IVAN DAVID COLON-VEGA, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP RIVERA-RIVERA, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP RIVERA-MALDONADO, ROLANDO RADAMES GUTIERREZ-DE JESUS, JAIME MACHADO-ROMAN, ANA YAMILE SERRANO-CASTRO, CARMEN GLORIA GOMEZ-NUNEZ, GRISELDA CRESPO-ARVELO, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP GUTIERREZ-COSME, WILLIAM RODRIGUEZ-OJEDA, HILDA DEL ROSARIO FIGUEROA-SANTIAGO, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP TOLEDO-ROJAS, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP CRUZ-TORRES, CARMEN RIVERA-VILLEDA, JUAN FERNANDO CRUZ-TORRES, DENISSE DEMOYA-BURGOS, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP RIVERA-MONTALVO, GLORIA MARIA RUIZ-COLON, CATHERINE MORALES-CASTRO, YVETTE LORRAINE BONHOMME-SANTOS, VIRGILIO OSCAR RIVERA-RODRIGUEZ, JESUS MANUEL MALDONADO-PEREZ, EVELYN IVETTE PEREZ-LOURIDO, MARLEEN RIVERA-MULERO, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP ROSARIO-RUIZ, OLGA ENETTE RIVERA-CRESPI, GRISBETH MOJICA-GONZALEZ, LESLIE MOLINA-CANCEL, JAVIER ANTONIO RIVERA-DUENO, MARIA FELICITA ANDRADE-MALDONADO, MARIA ISABEL TORO-LEVY, ERVIN RODRIGUEZ-LABOY, PAMELA IVETTE PEREZ-RIVERA, JAVIER BAERGA-SCHROEDER, MIGDALIA DIAZ-PEREZ, ANGEL LUIS MATOS-RAMOS, ABC PLAINTIFFS, ENRIQUE TOLLENS-ACOSTA, PATRICIO RODRIGUEZ-LOPEZ, LESTER I. GONZALEZ-SANTIAGO, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP ALVAREZ-GANDARA, RUZAIDI VILLAFANE-ESQUILIN, UNKNOWN PLAINTIFFS, ANGEL LUIS DAVILA-REYES, DIANNETTE GONZALEZ-CHARLES, MARILYN DELGADO-PEREZ, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP TOLLENS-GONZALEZ, MURIEL RIVERA-MUNOZ, SANTA ORTIZ-SALINAS, MERCEDES LLERA-CATALA, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP GLASS-RIVERA and JOSE M. CURET-SALIM
Defendant / Appellee: BANCO SANTANDER DE PUERTO RICO, FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, OPERATING PARTNERS COMPANY, LLC., SANTANDER FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., UNITED STATES, CITIMORTGAGE, INC., PUERTO RICO MORTGAGE-BACKED & U.S. GOVERNMENT SECURITIES FUND, INC., WELLS FARGO, FIRST BANK PUERTO RICO, INC., LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC., TRM LLC., BANCO POPULAR DE PUERTO RICO, MIDFIRST BANK, JAMES B. NUTTER & COMPANY, SCOTIABANK DE PUERTO RICO, LEHMAN RE LIMITED, a Bermuda Corporation, BANCO COOPERATIVO, COOPERATIVA DE AHORRO Y CREDITO LAS PIEDRAS, MWPR CR, LLC, ORIENTAL BANK, COOPERATIVA DE AHORRO Y CREDITO DE CIALES, ROOSEVELT REO PR IV CORP., PR ASSET PORTFOLIO 2013-1 INTER SUB I INTERNATIONAL, LLC., AUTORIDAD PARA EL FINANCIAMIENTO DE LA VIVIENDA DE PUERTO RICO, BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, ROOSEVELT CAYMAN ASSETS COMPANY I, DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL, INC., XYZ INSURANCE CO, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., WM CAPITAL PARTNERS, 53 LLC., ROOSEVELT REO PR CORP., ROOSEVELT CAYMAN ASSET COMPANY II, RNPM LLC., USDA RURAL DEVELOPMENT, TAX-FREE PUERTO RICO TARGET MATURITY FUND, INC., LIME RESIDENTIAL LTD., RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LIME PROPERTIES LTD. and RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 20-1114
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellee Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 04/02/2020. [20-1114] (RJC) [Entered: 04/02/2020 02:03 PM]
April 2, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellee Santander Financial Services, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 04/02/2020. [20-1114] (RJC) [Entered: 04/02/2020 02:01 PM]
April 2, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellee PR Asset Portfolio 2013-1 Inter Sub I International, LLC.. Certificate of service dated 04/02/2020. [20-1114] (RJC) [Entered: 04/02/2020 02:00 PM]
April 2, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellee Banco Santander De Puerto Rico. Certificate of service dated 04/02/2020. [20-1114] (RJC) [Entered: 04/02/2020 01:12 PM]
April 2, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Banco Santander De Puerto Rico, PR Asset Portfolio 2013-1 Inter Sub I International, LLC., Santander Financial Services, Inc. and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc. filed by Attorney Ricardo J. Casellas Santana. Certificate of service dated 04/02/2020. [20-1114] (RJC) [Entered: 04/02/2020 01:08 PM]
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Upon consideration, defendants-appellees Roosevelt REO PR IV Corp., Roosevelt REO PR Corp., Roosevelt Cayman Assets Company I, Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II, and Rushmore Loan Management's unopposed motion to amend the case caption is allowed in part. The case caption for this matter is revised to reflect that Rushmore Loan Management is Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC. The motion to amend is denied in all other respects. See Fed. R. App. P. 12(a) ("[T]he circuit clerk must docket the appeal under the title of the district-court action . . ."). The following revised caption must be used on all papers filed in this case. [20-1114] (GB) [Entered: 03/26/2020 05:03 PM]
March 20, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellee Scotiabank de Puerto Rico. Certificate of service dated 03/20/2020. [20-1114] (IL) [Entered: 03/20/2020 04:20 PM]
March 20, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Scotiabank de Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Ivan Llado. Certificate of service dated 03/20/2020. [20-1114] (IL) [Entered: 03/20/2020 04:17 PM]
March 16, 2020 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Alfonso L Perez-Diaz for Bank of America, N.A. and Fernando J. Valderrabano Marina for First Bank Puerto Rico, Inc. [20-1114] (GB) [Entered: 03/16/2020 01:45 PM]
March 12, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Roosevelt REO PR IV Corp., Roosevelt REO PR Corp., Rushmore Loan Management Services, Roosevelt Cayman Assets Company I and Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II filed by Attorney Carlos A. Valldejuly-Sastre. Certificate of service dated 03/12/2020. [20-1114] (CAV) [Entered: 03/12/2020 11:21 AM]
March 12, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Bayview Loan Servicing, Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC. and Wells Fargo filed by Attorney Carlos A. Valldejuly-Sastre. Certificate of service dated 03/12/2020. [20-1114] (CAV) [Entered: 03/12/2020 11:16 AM]
March 3, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellee Banco Cooperativo. Certificate of service dated 03/03/2020. [20-1114] (JIP) [Entered: 03/03/2020 06:00 PM]
March 3, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellee Oriental Bank. Certificate of service dated 03/03/2020. [20-1114] (CRB) [Entered: 03/03/2020 11:28 AM]
March 3, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Local Rule 3.0(a)(3) Regarding Docketing Statement filed by Appellee Oriental Bank. Certificate of service dated 03/03/2020. [20-1114] (CRB) [Entered: 03/03/2020 11:17 AM]
February 28, 2020 NOTICE issued. After 03/13/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Caitlin Kasmar for Midfirst Bank, Alfonso L Perez-Diaz for Bank of America, N.A., Fernando J. Valderrabano Marina for First Bank Puerto Rico, Inc. and Pedro Rafael Vazquez-Pesquera for Autoridad Para El Financiamiento De La Vivienda De Puerto Rico. [20-1114] (GB) [Entered: 02/28/2020 10:58 AM]
February 26, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Roosevelt REO PR IV Corp., Rushmore Loan Management Services, Roosevelt REO PR Corp., Roosevelt Cayman Assets Company I and Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II filed by Attorney Alejandro J. Garcia Carballo. Certificate of service dated 02/26/2020. [20-1114] (AJG) [Entered: 02/26/2020 04:40 PM]
February 26, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Banco Cooperativo filed by Attorney Jorge I. Peirats. Certificate of service dated 02/26/2020. [20-1114] (JIP) [Entered: 02/26/2020 02:01 PM]
February 26, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Banco Cooperativo de Puerto Rico (Appellee). Certificate of service dated 02/26/2020. [20-1114] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS, BY 02/28/2020. (JRA) [Entered: 02/26/2020 08:57 AM]
February 26, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Banco Cooperativo filed by Attorney Jorge I. Peirats. Certificate of service dated 02/26/2020. [20-1114] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS, BY 02/28/2020. (JRA) [Entered: 02/26/2020 08:53 AM]
February 25, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellee James B. Nutter & Company. Certificate of service dated 02/25/2020. [20-1114] (EAS) [Entered: 02/25/2020 03:33 PM]
February 25, 2020 MOTION to amend caption filed by Appellees Roosevelt REO PR IV Corp., Rushmore Loan Management Services, Roosevelt REO PR Corp., Roosevelt Cayman Assets Company I and Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II. Certificate of service dated 02/25/2020. [20-1114] (AJG) [Entered: 02/25/2020 02:41 PM]
February 25, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellee First Bank Puerto Rico, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 02/25/2020. [20-1114] (AG) [Entered: 02/25/2020 01:59 PM]
February 25, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Banco Popular de Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Michael Y. Kieval. Certificate of service dated 02/25/2020. [20-1114] (MYK) [Entered: 02/25/2020 12:40 PM]
February 25, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Banco Popular de Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Mitchel H. Kider. Certificate of service dated 02/25/2020. [20-1114] (MHK) [Entered: 02/25/2020 12:34 PM]
February 25, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Bayview Loan Servicing, Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC. and Wells Fargo filed by Attorney Hollee M. Boudreau. Certificate of service dated 02/25/2020. [20-1114] (HB) [Entered: 02/25/2020 09:24 AM]
February 25, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation filed by Attorney Vanessa M. Torres Quinones. Certificate of service dated 02/25/2020. [20-1114] (VMT) [Entered: 02/25/2020 09:17 AM]
February 25, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Cooperativa de Ahorro y Credito de Ciales filed by Attorney Edgardo J. Hernandez-Oharriz. Certificate of service dated 02/25/2020. [20-1114] (EJH) [Entered: 02/25/2020 01:06 AM]
February 24, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Bank of America, N.A. filed by Attorney Keith Levenberg. Certificate of service dated 02/24/2020. [20-1114] (KEL) [Entered: 02/24/2020 05:42 PM]
February 24, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Banco Popular de Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Christian A. Munoz Lugo. Certificate of service dated 02/24/2020. [20-1114] (CAM) [Entered: 02/24/2020 03:45 PM]
February 24, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee First Bank Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Attorney ARLYN GONZALEZ DIAZ. Certificate of service dated 02/24/2020. [20-1114] CLERK'S NOTE: Document was filed in wrong case (NOA lists case no. as 20-1444). Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (AG) [Entered: 02/24/2020 02:54 PM]
February 24, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., Lime Properties Ltd. and Lime Residential Ltd. filed by Attorney Alejandro J. Cepeda-Diaz. Certificate of service dated 02/24/2020. [20-1114] (AJC) [Entered: 02/24/2020 02:02 PM]
February 24, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellee Lime Residential Ltd.. Certificate of service dated 02/24/2020. [20-1114] (CMA) [Entered: 02/24/2020 09:24 AM]
February 24, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellee Lime Properties Ltd.. Certificate of service dated 02/24/2020. [20-1114] (CMA) [Entered: 02/24/2020 09:20 AM]
February 24, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellee DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 02/24/2020. [20-1114] (CMA) [Entered: 02/24/2020 09:15 AM]
February 24, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., Lime Properties Ltd. and Lime Residential Ltd. filed by Attorney Carmen M. Alfonso Rodriguez. Certificate of service dated 02/24/2020. [20-1114] (CMA) [Entered: 02/24/2020 09:07 AM]
February 20, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants ABC Plaintiffs, Sonia Acevedo, Gerardo Acosta-Figueroa, Lizzette Alejandro-Ocasio, Wanda L. Alejandro-Ruiz, Elba M. Alicea-Ortiz, Gloria Margarita Alicea-Rivera, All Others in Similar Situation, Cecilio Allende-Quinones, Nelson Alvarado-Hernandez, Juanita Alvarado-Saez, David Alvarez-Lopez, Carlos Alberto Alvarez-Rivera, Carlos Luis Amador-Fernandez, Marisol Amaro-Medina, Maria Felicita Andrade-Maldonado, Yolanda Arroyo-Fontanez, Gilbert Arroyo-Loperena, Yiries Joseph Asef Saad-Maura, Rolando Avila-Perez, Javier Baerga-Schroeder, Karen Barreda-Rivera, Carmen Benitez-Garay, Gloria Bermudez-Vargas, Ivonne Bernard-Rivera, Ana Luisa Berrios-Doble, Angel L. Berrios-Ortiz, Yvette Lorraine Bonhomme-Santos, Carmen Nelida Bravo-Soto, Nathan Caban-Garcia, Sol Margarita Cabrera Munoz, Iris Yolanda Cardona-Tirado, Angel Louis Carmona-Benet, Anniel Carrasquillo-Amaro, Miriam Carrion-Soto, Edwin Casillas-Berrios, Julio Victor Castro-Lopez, Clarivette Castro-Narvaez, Jorge Cedeno-Rosado, Elizabeth Champana-Gagneron, Francisca Charles-Belen, Gabriel Chavez-Diaz, Miguel Antonio Chevere-Dones, Deserie Cintron-Cabrera, Jose Ramon Cintron-Mercado, Julio Enrique Colon, Nancy Colon-Berrios, Waldemir Colon-Lebron, Maria De Los Angeles Colon-Morel, Ivan David Colon-Vega, Sara Victoria Colon-Vega, Jose Antonio Concepcion-Soto, Sonia Yvid Conde-Burgos, Conjugal Partnership Acosta-Hernandez, Conjugal Partnership Alejandro-Jimenez, Conjugal Partnership Allende-Villafane, Conjugal Partnership Alvarez-Diaz, Conjugal Partnership Alvarez-Gandara, Conjugal Partnership Arroyo-Mendez, Conjugal Partnership Avila-Champana, Conjugal Partnership Berrios-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Caban-Reyes, Conjugal Partnership Carmona-Hernandez, Conjugal Partnership Casillas-Andrades, Conjugal Partnership Castro-Trinidad, Conjugal Partnership Chavez-Zaragoza, Conjugal Partnership Chevere-Stuart, Conjugal Partnership Concepcion-Ramos, Conjugal Partnership Criado-Torres, Conjugal Partnership Cruz-Ferrer, Conjugal Partnership Cruz-Morales, Conjugal Partnership Cruz-Torres, Conjugal Partnership Curet-Alvarado, Conjugal Partnership Del Llano-Barreda, Conjugal Partnership Del Rosario-Selles, Conjugal Partnership Diaz-Bravo, Conjugal Partnership Diaz-Llera, Conjugal Partnership Diou-Colon, Conjugal Partnership Egipciaco-Porrata, Conjugal Partnership Estrada-Quiles, Conjugal Partnership Girald-Perez, Conjugal Partnership Glass-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Gonzalez-Cruz, Conjugal Partnership Gonzalez-Martinez, Conjugal Partnership Gonzalez-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Gonzalez-Rodriguez, Conjugal Partnership Guadalupe-Ramos, Conjugal Partnership Gutierrez-Cosme, Conjugal Partnership Hernandez-Santos, Conjugal Partnership Llanes-Zabala, Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Bleck, Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Colon, Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Reyes, Conjugal Partnership Luciano-Cruz, Conjugal Partnership Maldonado-Gonzalez, Conjugal Partnership Maldonado-Recio, Conjugal Partnership Manso-Santiago, Conjugal Partnership Marquez-Santana, Conjugal Partnership Martinez-Torres, Conjugal Partnership Medina-De-Jesus, Conjugal Partnership Melendez-Diaz, Conjugal Partnership Miranda-Acevedo, Conjugal Partnership Nunez-Ortiz, Conjugal Partnership Oquendo-Hernandez, Conjugal Partnership Ortiz-Soto, Conjugal Partnership Pagan-Del Rio, Conjugal Partnership Pagan-Gonzalez, Conjugal Partnership Pena-Pagan, Conjugal Partnership Perez-Castro, Conjugal Partnership Ramos-Crespo, Conjugal Partnership Ramos-Encarnacion, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Maldonado, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Montalvo, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Olivo, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Perez, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Bermudez, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Duran, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Feliciano, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Lugo, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Maldonado, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Melendez, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Roman, Conjugal Partnership Roman-Serrano, Conjugal Partnership Rondon-Mojica, Conjugal Partnership Rosario-Ruiz, Conjugal Partnership Salicrup-Ruiz, Conjugal Partnership Sevilla-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Soto-Diaz, Conjugal Partnership Soto-Sanchez, Conjugal Partnership Soto-Veguilla, Conjugal Partnership Sotomayor-Velilla, Conjugal Partnership Tapia-Benitez, Conjugal Partnership Toledo-Rojas, Conjugal Partnership Tollens-Gonzalez, Conjugal Partnership Vargas-Rodriguez, Conjugal Partnership Vega-Perez, Conjugal Partnership Velez-Cordero, Conjugal Partnership Velez-Serrano, Conjugal Partnership Vidal-Sanchez, Glorissa Cordero-Cabrera, Zuleika Cosme-Rivera, Nerisliang Crespo Rivera, Griselda Crespo-Arvelo, Manuel Ivan Criado-Criado, Agustin Alejandro Cruz, Maria Awilda Cruz-Acevedo, Francisca Cruz-Delgado, Nestor Cruz-Diaz, Evelyn Cruz-Flores, Yasser Cruz-Padilla, Gilberto Cruz-Perez, Maria Luisa Cruz-Rivera, Juan Fernando Cruz-Torres, Jose M. Curet-Salim, Angel Luis Davila-Reyes, Iva Yadira De Jesus-Garcia, Migdalia Margarita De Leon-Velez, Ian de Llano-Jimenez, Sandra de los Angeles Fernandez-Garcia, Maria de Lourdes Blek-Estevez, Eulogia R. Del Rio-Torres, Juan Ernesto Del Rosario-Masini, Ametza Delgado-Cardona, Marilyn Delgado-Perez, Denisse Demoya-Burgos, Glenny Diaz-Dominquez, Jose Antonio Diaz-Perez, Juan Diaz-Perez, Migdalia Diaz-Perez, Maria Belen Diaz-Rivera, Orlando Diaz-Soto, Luis Eugenio Diou-Agrait, Maria Milagros Duran-Morales, Manuel F. Egipciaco-Ruiz, Erika Encarnacion-Sanchez, Paula E. Estrada-Diaz, Alejandro Estrada-Maisonet, Nilda Iris Eutsler-Delgado, Anastacio Falcon-Rosario, Maria Feliciano-Mendez, Luis Manuel Fernandez-Velazquez, Adeliz Ferrer-Decamps, Hilda Del Rosario Figueroa-Santiago, Vivian Enid Flores-Merced, Marilyn Fonseca-Cotto, Rafael Antonio Fonseca-Marrero, Wilma Gandara-Gorritz, Carmen Gloria Garcia-Rivera, Edwin Girald-Torres, Edwin Glass-Martinez, Carmen Gloria Gomez-Nunez, Walberto Nussa Gonzalez, Jose Antonio Gonzalez-Arce, Ezequiel Antonio Gonzalez-Carrio, Diannette Gonzalez-Charles, Olga I. Gonzalez-Diaz, Ramon R. Gonzalez-Perez, Concepcion Gonzalez-Rivera, Wanda Gonzalez-Rivera, Marcos Gonzalez-Rodriguez, Nelly Ramonita Gonzalez-Rodriguez, Glendalys Gonzalez-Santiago, Jose Arnaldo Gonzalez-Santiago, Lester I. Gonzalez-Santiago, Gilberto Gonzalez-Velez, Pablo Guadalupe-Mendoza, Eric Santiago Halais-Borges, Lilliam Bethzaida Hernandez-Amaro, Maria De Los Angeles Hernandez-Diaz, Neida Ines Hernandez-Irizarry, Lourdes Hernandez-Llanes, Maribel Hernandez-Perez, Pedro Rafael Hernandez-Sanchez, Jose Alberto Hernandez-Torres, Joaquin Jose Jarque-Rodriguez, Jose Alfredo Jimenez-Figueroa, Eileen Dalmary Jimenez-Gavillan, Jose Antonio Laporte-Espada, Maria Celia Lebron-Quintana, Efrain Llanes-Colon, Mercedes Llera-Catala, Angel Manuel Llorens Orlandi, William Lopez-Colon, Jose Manuel Lopez-Cruz, Esther Rosa Lopez-Medina, Aristides Lopez-Ramos, Samuel Luciano-Perez, Eunice Maribel Lugo-Mejias, John Maceira-Lopez, Jaime Machado-Roman, Donovan Maldonado-Cruz, Jose G. Maldonado-Malave, Jesus Manuel Maldonado-Perez, Waleska del Carmen Maldonado-Rodriguez, Yamelit Maldonado-Soto, Luis Alexis Manso-Rosario, Luis Alexis Manso-Rosario, Frida Marchosky-Kogan, Miguel Angel Marquez-Camacho, Virgen Noemi Marrero-Carballo, Edwin Marrero-Torres, Johann Enid Martinez-Oritz, Luis Angel Martinez-Otero, Edwin Martinez-Rivera, Norma H. Martinez-Rodriguez, Ildefonso Martinez-Santiago, Judith Matos-Negron, Angel Luis Matos-Ramos, Miguel Angel Medina-Lopez, Johnny Edgar Melendez-Gonzalez, Nancy Melendez-Valentin, Maretza Mendez-Muniz, Leida Mendez-Pagan, Miriam Janette Mercado-Acosta, Marcelo Mercado-Oritz, Ruben Miranda-Mercado, Grisbeth Mojica-Gonzalez, Leslie Molina-Cancel, Jesus E. Monroig-Jimenez, Elizabeth Montalvo-Melendez, Catherine Morales-Castro, Evelyn Moralez-Suarez, Clara Moreta-Rodriguez, Michael Joseph Morris-Zamora, Antonio Munoz-Suarez, Rafael Eduardo Narvaez-Cabezas, Nelson Nunez-Rolon, Roberto Ocana-Serrano, Lillybell Olivo-Rivera, Maria M. Ondina-Gordo, Reinaldo Oquendo-Vega, Benita Ortiz-Ceballos, Hiran Ortiz-Ortiz, Luis Francisco Ortiz-Osuna, Mayra Elena Ortiz-Rentas, Santa Ortiz-Salinas, Maria Isabel Otero-Caraballo, Ismael Pagan-Cedeno, Olga Pagan-Maldonado, William Pagan-Rodriguez, Luis Eduardo Pardo-Toro, Hiram Pena-Roldan, Edwin Perez Ayala, Eda Perez-Cabrera, Ginnette Perez-Campo, Evelyn Ivette Perez-Lourido, Myrna Perez-Morales, Ivette Maria Perez-Nieves, Roberto Perez-Ramirez, Pamela Ivette Perez-Rivera, Betzaida I. Porrata-Tirado, Betzaida I. Porrata-Tirado, Luz Estela Poueriet-Diaz, Dianne Quiles-Lugo, Yolanda Quiles-Serrano, Rolando Radames Gutierrez-de Jesus, Antuanette Ramos-Ayala, Eugenio Joel Ramos-Calderon, Evelyn Ramos-Cortes, Nelida Ramos-Lopez, Luis Enrique Ramos-Pitre, Zulma I. Recio-Lopez, Maria Mercedes Reyes-Concepcion, Maria Magdalena Reyes-Pagan, Miguel Angel Rios-Santiago, Ines Yamira Rivera-Aquino, Jose Manuel Rivera-Colon, Ruth Noemi Rivera-Colon, Mario Jose Rivera-Cotto, Olga Enette Rivera-Crespi, Olga Enette Rivera-Crespi, Javier Antonio Rivera-Dueno, Moraima Rivera-Gonzalez, Marleen Rivera-Mulero, Muriel Rivera-Munoz, Julio Enrique Rivera-Negron, Madeline Rivera-Pagan, Felix Jose Rivera-Perez, Margarita Rivera-Rivera, Milka Yadira Rivera-Rivera, Hector Luis Rivera-Rodriguez, Hector Luis Rivera-Rodriguez, Maritza Rivera-Rodriguez, Virgilio Oscar Rivera-Rodriguez, Miriam Rivera-Torres, Carmen Rivera-Villeda, Edwin Francisco Rodriguez, Jose Noel Rodriguez-Alvarez, Angel Luis Rodriguez-Camacho, Reynaldo Rodriguez-Colon, Harry Rodriguez-Cruz, Tania Liz Rodriguez-Garcia, Marcos E. Rodriguez-Gomez, Juan Manuel Rodriguez-Irizarry, Ervin Rodriguez-Laboy, Patricio Rodriguez-Lopez, Jazmin Erika Rodriguez-Morales, Haydee Rodriguez-Nichols, William Rodriguez-Ojeda, Pedro Javier Rodriguez-Quiles, Rafael Rodriguez-Rivera, Gloria A. Rodriguez-Trujillo, Providencia Rodriguez-Vega, Brunilda Rojas-Gonzalez, Sandra Ivette Roman-Diaz, Jose Geraldo Roman-Gonzalez, Sonia Linnette Romero-Ramos, Julio Rondon-Reyes, Antonio Rosa-Agosto, Jorge Jose Rosa-Miranda, Fernando Luis Rosario-Cardona, Angela L. Rosario-DeLeon, Gloria Maria Ruiz-Colon, Rodyloida Ruiz-Delgado, Emerito Ruiz-Rodriguez, Rober
February 20, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants ABC Plaintiffs, Sonia Acevedo, Gerardo Acosta-Figueroa, Lizzette Alejandro-Ocasio, Wanda L. Alejandro-Ruiz, Elba M. Alicea-Ortiz, Gloria Margarita Alicea-Rivera, All Others in Similar Situation, Cecilio Allende-Quinones, Nelson Alvarado-Hernandez, Juanita Alvarado-Saez, David Alvarez-Lopez, Carlos Alberto Alvarez-Rivera, Carlos Luis Amador-Fernandez, Marisol Amaro-Medina, Maria Felicita Andrade-Maldonado, Yolanda Arroyo-Fontanez, Gilbert Arroyo-Loperena, Yiries Joseph Asef Saad-Maura, Rolando Avila-Perez, Javier Baerga-Schroeder, Karen Barreda-Rivera, Carmen Benitez-Garay, Gloria Bermudez-Vargas, Ivonne Bernard-Rivera, Ana Luisa Berrios-Doble, Angel L. Berrios-Ortiz, Yvette Lorraine Bonhomme-Santos, Carmen Nelida Bravo-Soto, Nathan Caban-Garcia, Sol Margarita Cabrera Munoz, Iris Yolanda Cardona-Tirado, Angel Louis Carmona-Benet, Anniel Carrasquillo-Amaro, Miriam Carrion-Soto, Edwin Casillas-Berrios, Julio Victor Castro-Lopez, Clarivette Castro-Narvaez, Jorge Cedeno-Rosado, Elizabeth Champana-Gagneron, Francisca Charles-Belen, Gabriel Chavez-Diaz, Miguel Antonio Chevere-Dones, Deserie Cintron-Cabrera, Jose Ramon Cintron-Mercado, Julio Enrique Colon, Nancy Colon-Berrios, Waldemir Colon-Lebron, Maria De Los Angeles Colon-Morel, Ivan David Colon-Vega, Sara Victoria Colon-Vega, Jose Antonio Concepcion-Soto, Sonia Yvid Conde-Burgos, Conjugal Partnership Acosta-Hernandez, Conjugal Partnership Alejandro-Jimenez, Conjugal Partnership Allende-Villafane, Conjugal Partnership Alvarez-Diaz, Conjugal Partnership Alvarez-Gandara, Conjugal Partnership Arroyo-Mendez, Conjugal Partnership Avila-Champana, Conjugal Partnership Berrios-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Caban-Reyes, Conjugal Partnership Carmona-Hernandez, Conjugal Partnership Casillas-Andrades, Conjugal Partnership Castro-Trinidad, Conjugal Partnership Chavez-Zaragoza, Conjugal Partnership Chevere-Stuart, Conjugal Partnership Concepcion-Ramos, Conjugal Partnership Criado-Torres, Conjugal Partnership Cruz-Ferrer, Conjugal Partnership Cruz-Morales, Conjugal Partnership Cruz-Torres, Conjugal Partnership Curet-Alvarado, Conjugal Partnership Del Llano-Barreda, Conjugal Partnership Del Rosario-Selles, Conjugal Partnership Diaz-Bravo, Conjugal Partnership Diaz-Llera, Conjugal Partnership Diou-Colon, Conjugal Partnership Egipciaco-Porrata, Conjugal Partnership Estrada-Quiles, Conjugal Partnership Girald-Perez, Conjugal Partnership Glass-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Gonzalez-Cruz, Conjugal Partnership Gonzalez-Martinez, Conjugal Partnership Gonzalez-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Gonzalez-Rodriguez, Conjugal Partnership Guadalupe-Ramos, Conjugal Partnership Gutierrez-Cosme, Conjugal Partnership Hernandez-Santos, Conjugal Partnership Llanes-Zabala, Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Bleck, Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Colon, Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Reyes, Conjugal Partnership Luciano-Cruz, Conjugal Partnership Maldonado-Gonzalez, Conjugal Partnership Maldonado-Recio, Conjugal Partnership Manso-Santiago, Conjugal Partnership Marquez-Santana, Conjugal Partnership Martinez-Torres, Conjugal Partnership Medina-De-Jesus, Conjugal Partnership Melendez-Diaz, Conjugal Partnership Miranda-Acevedo, Conjugal Partnership Nunez-Ortiz, Conjugal Partnership Oquendo-Hernandez, Conjugal Partnership Ortiz-Soto, Conjugal Partnership Pagan-Del Rio, Conjugal Partnership Pagan-Gonzalez, Conjugal Partnership Pena-Pagan, Conjugal Partnership Perez-Castro, Conjugal Partnership Ramos-Crespo, Conjugal Partnership Ramos-Encarnacion, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Maldonado, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Montalvo, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Olivo, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Perez, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Bermudez, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Duran, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Feliciano, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Lugo, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Maldonado, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Melendez, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Roman, Conjugal Partnership Roman-Serrano, Conjugal Partnership Rondon-Mojica, Conjugal Partnership Rosario-Ruiz, Conjugal Partnership Salicrup-Ruiz, Conjugal Partnership Sevilla-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Soto-Diaz, Conjugal Partnership Soto-Sanchez, Conjugal Partnership Soto-Veguilla, Conjugal Partnership Sotomayor-Velilla, Conjugal Partnership Tapia-Benitez, Conjugal Partnership Toledo-Rojas, Conjugal Partnership Tollens-Gonzalez, Conjugal Partnership Vargas-Rodriguez, Conjugal Partnership Vega-Perez, Conjugal Partnership Velez-Cordero, Conjugal Partnership Velez-Serrano, Conjugal Partnership Vidal-Sanchez, Glorissa Cordero-Cabrera, Zuleika Cosme-Rivera, Nerisliang Crespo Rivera, Griselda Crespo-Arvelo, Manuel Ivan Criado-Criado, Agustin Alejandro Cruz, Maria Awilda Cruz-Acevedo, Francisca Cruz-Delgado, Nestor Cruz-Diaz, Evelyn Cruz-Flores, Yasser Cruz-Padilla, Gilberto Cruz-Perez, Maria Luisa Cruz-Rivera, Juan Fernando Cruz-Torres, Jose M. Curet-Salim, Angel Luis Davila-Reyes, Iva Yadira De Jesus-Garcia, Migdalia Margarita De Leon-Velez, Ian de Llano-Jimenez, Sandra de los Angeles Fernandez-Garcia, Maria de Lourdes Blek-Estevez, Eulogia R. Del Rio-Torres, Juan Ernesto Del Rosario-Masini, Ametza Delgado-Cardona, Marilyn Delgado-Perez, Denisse Demoya-Burgos, Glenny Diaz-Dominquez, Jose Antonio Diaz-Perez, Juan Diaz-Perez, Migdalia Diaz-Perez, Maria Belen Diaz-Rivera, Orlando Diaz-Soto, Luis Eugenio Diou-Agrait, Maria Milagros Duran-Morales, Manuel F. Egipciaco-Ruiz, Erika Encarnacion-Sanchez, Paula E. Estrada-Diaz, Alejandro Estrada-Maisonet, Nilda Iris Eutsler-Delgado, Anastacio Falcon-Rosario, Maria Feliciano-Mendez, Luis Manuel Fernandez-Velazquez, Adeliz Ferrer-Decamps, Hilda Del Rosario Figueroa-Santiago, Vivian Enid Flores-Merced, Marilyn Fonseca-Cotto, Rafael Antonio Fonseca-Marrero, Wilma Gandara-Gorritz, Carmen Gloria Garcia-Rivera, Edwin Girald-Torres, Edwin Glass-Martinez, Carmen Gloria Gomez-Nunez, Walberto Nussa Gonzalez, Jose Antonio Gonzalez-Arce, Ezequiel Antonio Gonzalez-Carrio, Diannette Gonzalez-Charles, Olga I. Gonzalez-Diaz, Ramon R. Gonzalez-Perez, Concepcion Gonzalez-Rivera, Wanda Gonzalez-Rivera, Marcos Gonzalez-Rodriguez, Nelly Ramonita Gonzalez-Rodriguez, Glendalys Gonzalez-Santiago, Jose Arnaldo Gonzalez-Santiago, Lester I. Gonzalez-Santiago, Gilberto Gonzalez-Velez, Pablo Guadalupe-Mendoza, Eric Santiago Halais-Borges, Lilliam Bethzaida Hernandez-Amaro, Maria De Los Angeles Hernandez-Diaz, Neida Ines Hernandez-Irizarry, Lourdes Hernandez-Llanes, Maribel Hernandez-Perez, Pedro Rafael Hernandez-Sanchez, Jose Alberto Hernandez-Torres, Joaquin Jose Jarque-Rodriguez, Jose Alfredo Jimenez-Figueroa, Eileen Dalmary Jimenez-Gavillan, Jose Antonio Laporte-Espada, Maria Celia Lebron-Quintana, Efrain Llanes-Colon, Mercedes Llera-Catala, Angel Manuel Llorens Orlandi, William Lopez-Colon, Jose Manuel Lopez-Cruz, Esther Rosa Lopez-Medina, Aristides Lopez-Ramos, Samuel Luciano-Perez, Eunice Maribel Lugo-Mejias, John Maceira-Lopez, Jaime Machado-Roman, Donovan Maldonado-Cruz, Jose G. Maldonado-Malave, Jesus Manuel Maldonado-Perez, Waleska del Carmen Maldonado-Rodriguez, Yamelit Maldonado-Soto, Luis Alexis Manso-Rosario, Luis Alexis Manso-Rosario, Frida Marchosky-Kogan, Miguel Angel Marquez-Camacho, Virgen Noemi Marrero-Carballo, Edwin Marrero-Torres, Johann Enid Martinez-Oritz, Luis Angel Martinez-Otero, Edwin Martinez-Rivera, Norma H. Martinez-Rodriguez, Ildefonso Martinez-Santiago, Judith Matos-Negron, Angel Luis Matos-Ramos, Miguel Angel Medina-Lopez, Johnny Edgar Melendez-Gonzalez, Nancy Melendez-Valentin, Maretza Mendez-Muniz, Leida Mendez-Pagan, Miriam Janette Mercado-Acosta, Marcelo Mercado-Oritz, Ruben Miranda-Mercado, Grisbeth Mojica-Gonzalez, Leslie Molina-Cancel, Jesus E. Monroig-Jimenez, Elizabeth Montalvo-Melendez, Catherine Morales-Castro, Evelyn Moralez-Suarez, Clara Moreta-Rodriguez, Michael Joseph Morris-Zamora, Antonio Munoz-Suarez, Rafael Eduardo Narvaez-Cabezas, Nelson Nunez-Rolon, Roberto Ocana-Serrano, Lillybell Olivo-Rivera, Maria M. Ondina-Gordo, Reinaldo Oquendo-Vega, Benita Ortiz-Ceballos, Hiran Ortiz-Ortiz, Luis Francisco Ortiz-Osuna, Mayra Elena Ortiz-Rentas, Santa Ortiz-Salinas, Maria Isabel Otero-Caraballo, Ismael Pagan-Cedeno, Olga Pagan-Maldonado, William Pagan-Rodriguez, Luis Eduardo Pardo-Toro, Hiram Pena-Roldan, Edwin Perez Ayala, Eda Perez-Cabrera, Ginnette Perez-Campo, Evelyn Ivette Perez-Lourido, Myrna Perez-Morales, Ivette Maria Perez-Nieves, Roberto Perez-Ramirez, Pamela Ivette Perez-Rivera, Betzaida I. Porrata-Tirado, Betzaida I. Porrata-Tirado, Luz Estela Poueriet-Diaz, Dianne Quiles-Lugo, Yolanda Quiles-Serrano, Rolando Radames Gutierrez-de Jesus, Antuanette Ramos-Ayala, Eugenio Joel Ramos-Calderon, Evelyn Ramos-Cortes, Nelida Ramos-Lopez, Luis Enrique Ramos-Pitre, Zulma I. Recio-Lopez, Maria Mercedes Reyes-Concepcion, Maria Magdalena Reyes-Pagan, Miguel Angel Rios-Santiago, Ines Yamira Rivera-Aquino, Jose Manuel Rivera-Colon, Ruth Noemi Rivera-Colon, Mario Jose Rivera-Cotto, Olga Enette Rivera-Crespi, Olga Enette Rivera-Crespi, Javier Antonio Rivera-Dueno, Moraima Rivera-Gonzalez, Marleen Rivera-Mulero, Muriel Rivera-Munoz, Julio Enrique Rivera-Negron, Madeline Rivera-Pagan, Felix Jose Rivera-Perez, Margarita Rivera-Rivera, Milka Yadira Rivera-Rivera, Hector Luis Rivera-Rodriguez, Hector Luis Rivera-Rodriguez, Maritza Rivera-Rodriguez, Virgilio Oscar Rivera-Rodriguez, Miriam Rivera-Torres, Carmen Rivera-Villeda, Edwin Francisco Rodriguez, Jose Noel Rodriguez-Alvarez, Angel Luis Rodriguez-Camacho, Reynaldo Rodriguez-Colon, Harry Rodriguez-Cruz, Tania Liz Rodriguez-Garcia, Marcos E. Rodriguez-Gomez, Juan Manuel Rodriguez-Irizarry, Ervin Rodriguez-Laboy, Patricio Rodriguez-Lopez, Jazmin Erika Rodriguez-Morales, Haydee Rodriguez-Nichols, William Rodriguez-Ojeda, Pedro Javier Rodriguez-Quiles, Rafael Rodriguez-Rivera, Gloria A. Rodriguez-Trujillo, Providencia Rodriguez-Vega, Brunilda Rojas-Gonzalez, Sandra Ivette Roman-Diaz, Jose Geraldo Roman-Gonzalez, Sonia Linnette Romero-Ramos, Julio Rondon-Reyes, Antonio Rosa-Agosto, Jorge Jose Rosa-Miranda, Fernando Luis Rosario-Cardona, Angela L. Rosario-DeLeon, Gloria Maria Ruiz-Colon, Rodyloida Ruiz-Delgado, Emerito Ruiz-Rodriguez, Rober
February 20, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants ABC Plaintiffs, Sonia Acevedo, Gerardo Acosta-Figueroa, Lizzette Alejandro-Ocasio, Wanda L. Alejandro-Ruiz, Elba M. Alicea-Ortiz, Gloria Margarita Alicea-Rivera, All Others in Similar Situation, Cecilio Allende-Quinones, Nelson Alvarado-Hernandez, Juanita Alvarado-Saez, David Alvarez-Lopez, Carlos Alberto Alvarez-Rivera, Carlos Luis Amador-Fernandez, Marisol Amaro-Medina, Maria Felicita Andrade-Maldonado, Yolanda Arroyo-Fontanez, Gilbert Arroyo-Loperena, Yiries Joseph Asef Saad-Maura, Rolando Avila-Perez, Javier Baerga-Schroeder, Karen Barreda-Rivera, Carmen Benitez-Garay, Gloria Bermudez-Vargas, Ivonne Bernard-Rivera, Ana Luisa Berrios-Doble, Angel L. Berrios-Ortiz, Yvette Lorraine Bonhomme-Santos, Carmen Nelida Bravo-Soto, Nathan Caban-Garcia, Sol Margarita Cabrera Munoz, Iris Yolanda Cardona-Tirado, Angel Louis Carmona-Benet, Anniel Carrasquillo-Amaro, Miriam Carrion-Soto, Edwin Casillas-Berrios, Julio Victor Castro-Lopez, Clarivette Castro-Narvaez, Jorge Cedeno-Rosado, Elizabeth Champana-Gagneron, Francisca Charles-Belen, Gabriel Chavez-Diaz, Miguel Antonio Chevere-Dones, Deserie Cintron-Cabrera, Jose Ramon Cintron-Mercado, Julio Enrique Colon, Nancy Colon-Berrios, Waldemir Colon-Lebron, Maria De Los Angeles Colon-Morel, Ivan David Colon-Vega, Sara Victoria Colon-Vega, Jose Antonio Concepcion-Soto, Sonia Yvid Conde-Burgos, Conjugal Partnership Acosta-Hernandez, Conjugal Partnership Alejandro-Jimenez, Conjugal Partnership Allende-Villafane, Conjugal Partnership Alvarez-Diaz, Conjugal Partnership Alvarez-Gandara, Conjugal Partnership Arroyo-Mendez, Conjugal Partnership Avila-Champana, Conjugal Partnership Berrios-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Caban-Reyes, Conjugal Partnership Carmona-Hernandez, Conjugal Partnership Casillas-Andrades, Conjugal Partnership Castro-Trinidad, Conjugal Partnership Chavez-Zaragoza, Conjugal Partnership Chevere-Stuart, Conjugal Partnership Concepcion-Ramos, Conjugal Partnership Criado-Torres, Conjugal Partnership Cruz-Ferrer, Conjugal Partnership Cruz-Morales, Conjugal Partnership Cruz-Torres, Conjugal Partnership Curet-Alvarado, Conjugal Partnership Del Llano-Barreda, Conjugal Partnership Del Rosario-Selles, Conjugal Partnership Diaz-Bravo, Conjugal Partnership Diaz-Llera, Conjugal Partnership Diou-Colon, Conjugal Partnership Egipciaco-Porrata, Conjugal Partnership Estrada-Quiles, Conjugal Partnership Girald-Perez, Conjugal Partnership Glass-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Gonzalez-Cruz, Conjugal Partnership Gonzalez-Martinez, Conjugal Partnership Gonzalez-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Gonzalez-Rodriguez, Conjugal Partnership Guadalupe-Ramos, Conjugal Partnership Gutierrez-Cosme, Conjugal Partnership Hernandez-Santos, Conjugal Partnership Llanes-Zabala, Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Bleck, Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Colon, Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Reyes, Conjugal Partnership Luciano-Cruz, Conjugal Partnership Maldonado-Gonzalez, Conjugal Partnership Maldonado-Recio, Conjugal Partnership Manso-Santiago, Conjugal Partnership Marquez-Santana, Conjugal Partnership Martinez-Torres, Conjugal Partnership Medina-De-Jesus, Conjugal Partnership Melendez-Diaz, Conjugal Partnership Miranda-Acevedo, Conjugal Partnership Nunez-Ortiz, Conjugal Partnership Oquendo-Hernandez, Conjugal Partnership Ortiz-Soto, Conjugal Partnership Pagan-Del Rio, Conjugal Partnership Pagan-Gonzalez, Conjugal Partnership Pena-Pagan, Conjugal Partnership Perez-Castro, Conjugal Partnership Ramos-Crespo, Conjugal Partnership Ramos-Encarnacion, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Maldonado, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Montalvo, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Olivo, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Perez, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Bermudez, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Duran, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Feliciano, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Lugo, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Maldonado, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Melendez, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Roman, Conjugal Partnership Roman-Serrano, Conjugal Partnership Rondon-Mojica, Conjugal Partnership Rosario-Ruiz, Conjugal Partnership Salicrup-Ruiz, Conjugal Partnership Sevilla-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Soto-Diaz, Conjugal Partnership Soto-Sanchez, Conjugal Partnership Soto-Veguilla, Conjugal Partnership Sotomayor-Velilla, Conjugal Partnership Tapia-Benitez, Conjugal Partnership Toledo-Rojas, Conjugal Partnership Tollens-Gonzalez, Conjugal Partnership Vargas-Rodriguez, Conjugal Partnership Vega-Perez, Conjugal Partnership Velez-Cordero, Conjugal Partnership Velez-Serrano, Conjugal Partnership Vidal-Sanchez, Glorissa Cordero-Cabrera, Zuleika Cosme-Rivera, Nerisliang Crespo Rivera, Griselda Crespo-Arvelo, Manuel Ivan Criado-Criado, Agustin Alejandro Cruz, Maria Awilda Cruz-Acevedo, Francisca Cruz-Delgado, Nestor Cruz-Diaz, Evelyn Cruz-Flores, Yasser Cruz-Padilla, Gilberto Cruz-Perez, Maria Luisa Cruz-Rivera, Juan Fernando Cruz-Torres, Jose M. Curet-Salim, Angel Luis Davila-Reyes, Iva Yadira De Jesus-Garcia, Migdalia Margarita De Leon-Velez, Ian de Llano-Jimenez, Sandra de los Angeles Fernandez-Garcia, Maria de Lourdes Blek-Estevez, Eulogia R. Del Rio-Torres, Juan Ernesto Del Rosario-Masini, Ametza Delgado-Cardona, Marilyn Delgado-Perez, Denisse Demoya-Burgos, Glenny Diaz-Dominquez, Jose Antonio Diaz-Perez, Juan Diaz-Perez, Migdalia Diaz-Perez, Maria Belen Diaz-Rivera, Orlando Diaz-Soto, Luis Eugenio Diou-Agrait, Maria Milagros Duran-Morales, Manuel F. Egipciaco-Ruiz, Erika Encarnacion-Sanchez, Paula E. Estrada-Diaz, Alejandro Estrada-Maisonet, Nilda Iris Eutsler-Delgado, Anastacio Falcon-Rosario, Maria Feliciano-Mendez, Luis Manuel Fernandez-Velazquez, Adeliz Ferrer-Decamps, Hilda Del Rosario Figueroa-Santiago, Vivian Enid Flores-Merced, Marilyn Fonseca-Cotto, Rafael Antonio Fonseca-Marrero, Wilma Gandara-Gorritz, Carmen Gloria Garcia-Rivera, Edwin Girald-Torres, Edwin Glass-Martinez, Carmen Gloria Gomez-Nunez, Walberto Nussa Gonzalez, Jose Antonio Gonzalez-Arce, Ezequiel Antonio Gonzalez-Carrio, Diannette Gonzalez-Charles, Olga I. Gonzalez-Diaz, Ramon R. Gonzalez-Perez, Concepcion Gonzalez-Rivera, Wanda Gonzalez-Rivera, Marcos Gonzalez-Rodriguez, Nelly Ramonita Gonzalez-Rodriguez, Glendalys Gonzalez-Santiago, Jose Arnaldo Gonzalez-Santiago, Lester I. Gonzalez-Santiago, Gilberto Gonzalez-Velez, Pablo Guadalupe-Mendoza, Eric Santiago Halais-Borges, Lilliam Bethzaida Hernandez-Amaro, Maria De Los Angeles Hernandez-Diaz, Neida Ines Hernandez-Irizarry, Lourdes Hernandez-Llanes, Maribel Hernandez-Perez, Pedro Rafael Hernandez-Sanchez, Jose Alberto Hernandez-Torres, Joaquin Jose Jarque-Rodriguez, Jose Alfredo Jimenez-Figueroa, Eileen Dalmary Jimenez-Gavillan, Jose Antonio Laporte-Espada, Maria Celia Lebron-Quintana, Efrain Llanes-Colon, Mercedes Llera-Catala, Angel Manuel Llorens Orlandi, William Lopez-Colon, Jose Manuel Lopez-Cruz, Esther Rosa Lopez-Medina, Aristides Lopez-Ramos, Samuel Luciano-Perez, Eunice Maribel Lugo-Mejias, John Maceira-Lopez, Jaime Machado-Roman, Donovan Maldonado-Cruz, Jose G. Maldonado-Malave, Jesus Manuel Maldonado-Perez, Waleska del Carmen Maldonado-Rodriguez, Yamelit Maldonado-Soto, Luis Alexis Manso-Rosario, Luis Alexis Manso-Rosario, Frida Marchosky-Kogan, Miguel Angel Marquez-Camacho, Virgen Noemi Marrero-Carballo, Edwin Marrero-Torres, Johann Enid Martinez-Oritz, Luis Angel Martinez-Otero, Edwin Martinez-Rivera, Norma H. Martinez-Rodriguez, Ildefonso Martinez-Santiago, Judith Matos-Negron, Angel Luis Matos-Ramos, Miguel Angel Medina-Lopez, Johnny Edgar Melendez-Gonzalez, Nancy Melendez-Valentin, Maretza Mendez-Muniz, Leida Mendez-Pagan, Miriam Janette Mercado-Acosta, Marcelo Mercado-Oritz, Ruben Miranda-Mercado, Grisbeth Mojica-Gonzalez, Leslie Molina-Cancel, Jesus E. Monroig-Jimenez, Elizabeth Montalvo-Melendez, Catherine Morales-Castro, Evelyn Moralez-Suarez, Clara Moreta-Rodriguez, Michael Joseph Morris-Zamora, Antonio Munoz-Suarez, Rafael Eduardo Narvaez-Cabezas, Nelson Nunez-Rolon, Roberto Ocana-Serrano, Lillybell Olivo-Rivera, Maria M. Ondina-Gordo, Reinaldo Oquendo-Vega, Benita Ortiz-Ceballos, Hiran Ortiz-Ortiz, Luis Francisco Ortiz-Osuna, Mayra Elena Ortiz-Rentas, Santa Ortiz-Salinas, Maria Isabel Otero-Caraballo, Ismael Pagan-Cedeno, Olga Pagan-Maldonado, William Pagan-Rodriguez, Luis Eduardo Pardo-Toro, Hiram Pena-Roldan, Edwin Perez Ayala, Eda Perez-Cabrera, Ginnette Perez-Campo, Evelyn Ivette Perez-Lourido, Myrna Perez-Morales, Ivette Maria Perez-Nieves, Roberto Perez-Ramirez, Pamela Ivette Perez-Rivera, Betzaida I. Porrata-Tirado, Betzaida I. Porrata-Tirado, Luz Estela Poueriet-Diaz, Dianne Quiles-Lugo, Yolanda Quiles-Serrano, Rolando Radames Gutierrez-de Jesus, Antuanette Ramos-Ayala, Eugenio Joel Ramos-Calderon, Evelyn Ramos-Cortes, Nelida Ramos-Lopez, Luis Enrique Ramos-Pitre, Zulma I. Recio-Lopez, Maria Mercedes Reyes-Concepcion, Maria Magdalena Reyes-Pagan, Miguel Angel Rios-Santiago, Ines Yamira Rivera-Aquino, Jose Manuel Rivera-Colon, Ruth Noemi Rivera-Colon, Mario Jose Rivera-Cotto, Olga Enette Rivera-Crespi, Olga Enette Rivera-Crespi, Javier Antonio Rivera-Dueno, Moraima Rivera-Gonzalez, Marleen Rivera-Mulero, Muriel Rivera-Munoz, Julio Enrique Rivera-Negron, Madeline Rivera-Pagan, Felix Jose Rivera-Perez, Margarita Rivera-Rivera, Milka Yadira Rivera-Rivera, Hector Luis Rivera-Rodriguez, Hector Luis Rivera-Rodriguez, Maritza Rivera-Rodriguez, Virgilio Oscar Rivera-Rodriguez, Miriam Rivera-Torres, Carmen Rivera-Villeda, Edwin Francisco Rodriguez, Jose Noel Rodriguez-Alvarez, Angel Luis Rodriguez-Camacho, Reynaldo Rodriguez-Colon, Harry Rodriguez-Cruz, Tania Liz Rodriguez-Garcia, Marcos E. Rodriguez-Gomez, Juan Manuel Rodriguez-Irizarry, Ervin Rodriguez-Laboy, Patricio Rodriguez-Lopez, Jazmin Erika Rodriguez-Morales, Haydee Rodriguez-Nichols, William Rodriguez-Ojeda, Pedro Javier Rodriguez-Quiles, Rafael Rodriguez-Rivera, Gloria A. Rodriguez-Trujillo, Providencia Rodriguez-Vega, Brunilda Rojas-Gonzalez, Sandra Ivette Roman-Diaz, Jose Geraldo Roman-Gonzalez, Sonia Linnette Romero-Ramos, Julio Rondon-Reyes, Antonio Rosa-Agosto, Jorge Jose Rosa-Miranda, Fernando Luis Rosario-Cardona, Angela L. Rosario-DeLeon, Gloria Maria Ruiz-Colon, Rodyloida Ruiz-Delgado, Emerito Ruiz-Rodriguez, Roberto Sa
February 20, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants ABC Plaintiffs, Sonia Acevedo, Gerardo Acosta-Figueroa, Lizzette Alejandro-Ocasio, Wanda L. Alejandro-Ruiz, Elba M. Alicea-Ortiz, Gloria Margarita Alicea-Rivera, All Others in Similar Situation, Cecilio Allende-Quinones, Nelson Alvarado-Hernandez, Juanita Alvarado-Saez, David Alvarez-Lopez, Carlos Alberto Alvarez-Rivera, Carlos Luis Amador-Fernandez, Marisol Amaro-Medina, Maria Felicita Andrade-Maldonado, Yolanda Arroyo-Fontanez, Gilbert Arroyo-Loperena, Yiries Joseph Asef Saad-Maura, Rolando Avila-Perez, Javier Baerga-Schroeder, Karen Barreda-Rivera, Carmen Benitez-Garay, Gloria Bermudez-Vargas, Ivonne Bernard-Rivera, Ana Luisa Berrios-Doble, Angel L. Berrios-Ortiz, Yvette Lorraine Bonhomme-Santos, Carmen Nelida Bravo-Soto, Nathan Caban-Garcia, Sol Margarita Cabrera Munoz, Iris Yolanda Cardona-Tirado, Angel Louis Carmona-Benet, Anniel Carrasquillo-Amaro, Miriam Carrion-Soto, Edwin Casillas-Berrios, Julio Victor Castro-Lopez, Clarivette Castro-Narvaez, Jorge Cedeno-Rosado, Elizabeth Champana-Gagneron, Francisca Charles-Belen, Gabriel Chavez-Diaz, Miguel Antonio Chevere-Dones, Deserie Cintron-Cabrera, Jose Ramon Cintron-Mercado, Julio Enrique Colon, Nancy Colon-Berrios, Waldemir Colon-Lebron, Maria De Los Angeles Colon-Morel, Ivan David Colon-Vega, Sara Victoria Colon-Vega, Jose Antonio Concepcion-Soto, Sonia Yvid Conde-Burgos, Conjugal Partnership Acosta-Hernandez, Conjugal Partnership Alejandro-Jimenez, Conjugal Partnership Allende-Villafane, Conjugal Partnership Alvarez-Diaz, Conjugal Partnership Alvarez-Gandara, Conjugal Partnership Arroyo-Mendez, Conjugal Partnership Avila-Champana, Conjugal Partnership Berrios-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Caban-Reyes, Conjugal Partnership Carmona-Hernandez, Conjugal Partnership Casillas-Andrades, Conjugal Partnership Castro-Trinidad, Conjugal Partnership Chavez-Zaragoza, Conjugal Partnership Chevere-Stuart, Conjugal Partnership Concepcion-Ramos, Conjugal Partnership Criado-Torres, Conjugal Partnership Cruz-Ferrer, Conjugal Partnership Cruz-Morales, Conjugal Partnership Cruz-Torres, Conjugal Partnership Curet-Alvarado, Conjugal Partnership Del Llano-Barreda, Conjugal Partnership Del Rosario-Selles, Conjugal Partnership Diaz-Bravo, Conjugal Partnership Diaz-Llera, Conjugal Partnership Diou-Colon, Conjugal Partnership Egipciaco-Porrata, Conjugal Partnership Estrada-Quiles, Conjugal Partnership Girald-Perez, Conjugal Partnership Glass-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Gonzalez-Cruz, Conjugal Partnership Gonzalez-Martinez, Conjugal Partnership Gonzalez-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Gonzalez-Rodriguez, Conjugal Partnership Guadalupe-Ramos, Conjugal Partnership Gutierrez-Cosme, Conjugal Partnership Hernandez-Santos, Conjugal Partnership Llanes-Zabala, Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Bleck, Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Colon, Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Reyes, Conjugal Partnership Luciano-Cruz, Conjugal Partnership Maldonado-Gonzalez, Conjugal Partnership Maldonado-Recio, Conjugal Partnership Manso-Santiago, Conjugal Partnership Marquez-Santana, Conjugal Partnership Martinez-Torres, Conjugal Partnership Medina-De-Jesus, Conjugal Partnership Melendez-Diaz, Conjugal Partnership Miranda-Acevedo, Conjugal Partnership Nunez-Ortiz, Conjugal Partnership Oquendo-Hernandez, Conjugal Partnership Ortiz-Soto, Conjugal Partnership Pagan-Del Rio, Conjugal Partnership Pagan-Gonzalez, Conjugal Partnership Pena-Pagan, Conjugal Partnership Perez-Castro, Conjugal Partnership Ramos-Crespo, Conjugal Partnership Ramos-Encarnacion, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Maldonado, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Montalvo, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Olivo, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Perez, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Bermudez, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Duran, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Feliciano, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Lugo, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Maldonado, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Melendez, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Roman, Conjugal Partnership Roman-Serrano, Conjugal Partnership Rondon-Mojica, Conjugal Partnership Rosario-Ruiz, Conjugal Partnership Salicrup-Ruiz, Conjugal Partnership Sevilla-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Soto-Diaz, Conjugal Partnership Soto-Sanchez, Conjugal Partnership Soto-Veguilla, Conjugal Partnership Sotomayor-Velilla, Conjugal Partnership Tapia-Benitez, Conjugal Partnership Toledo-Rojas, Conjugal Partnership Tollens-Gonzalez, Conjugal Partnership Vargas-Rodriguez, Conjugal Partnership Vega-Perez, Conjugal Partnership Velez-Cordero, Conjugal Partnership Velez-Serrano, Conjugal Partnership Vidal-Sanchez, Glorissa Cordero-Cabrera, Zuleika Cosme-Rivera, Nerisliang Crespo Rivera, Griselda Crespo-Arvelo, Manuel Ivan Criado-Criado, Agustin Alejandro Cruz, Maria Awilda Cruz-Acevedo, Francisca Cruz-Delgado, Nestor Cruz-Diaz, Evelyn Cruz-Flores, Yasser Cruz-Padilla, Gilberto Cruz-Perez, Maria Luisa Cruz-Rivera, Juan Fernando Cruz-Torres, Jose M. Curet-Salim, Angel Luis Davila-Reyes, Iva Yadira De Jesus-Garcia, Migdalia Margarita De Leon-Velez, Ian de Llano-Jimenez, Sandra de los Angeles Fernandez-Garcia, Maria de Lourdes Blek-Estevez, Eulogia R. Del Rio-Torres, Juan Ernesto Del Rosario-Masini, Ametza Delgado-Cardona, Marilyn Delgado-Perez, Denisse Demoya-Burgos, Glenny Diaz-Dominquez, Jose Antonio Diaz-Perez, Juan Diaz-Perez, Migdalia Diaz-Perez, Maria Belen Diaz-Rivera, Orlando Diaz-Soto, Luis Eugenio Diou-Agrait, Maria Milagros Duran-Morales, Manuel F. Egipciaco-Ruiz, Erika Encarnacion-Sanchez, Paula E. Estrada-Diaz, Alejandro Estrada-Maisonet, Nilda Iris Eutsler-Delgado, Anastacio Falcon-Rosario, Maria Feliciano-Mendez, Luis Manuel Fernandez-Velazquez, Adeliz Ferrer-Decamps, Hilda Del Rosario Figueroa-Santiago, Vivian Enid Flores-Merced, Marilyn Fonseca-Cotto, Rafael Antonio Fonseca-Marrero, Wilma Gandara-Gorritz, Carmen Gloria Garcia-Rivera, Edwin Girald-Torres, Edwin Glass-Martinez, Carmen Gloria Gomez-Nunez, Walberto Nussa Gonzalez, Jose Antonio Gonzalez-Arce, Ezequiel Antonio Gonzalez-Carrio, Diannette Gonzalez-Charles, Olga I. Gonzalez-Diaz, Ramon R. Gonzalez-Perez, Concepcion Gonzalez-Rivera, Wanda Gonzalez-Rivera, Marcos Gonzalez-Rodriguez, Nelly Ramonita Gonzalez-Rodriguez, Glendalys Gonzalez-Santiago, Jose Arnaldo Gonzalez-Santiago, Lester I. Gonzalez-Santiago, Gilberto Gonzalez-Velez, Pablo Guadalupe-Mendoza, Eric Santiago Halais-Borges, Lilliam Bethzaida Hernandez-Amaro, Maria De Los Angeles Hernandez-Diaz, Neida Ines Hernandez-Irizarry, Lourdes Hernandez-Llanes, Maribel Hernandez-Perez, Pedro Rafael Hernandez-Sanchez, Jose Alberto Hernandez-Torres, Joaquin Jose Jarque-Rodriguez, Jose Alfredo Jimenez-Figueroa, Eileen Dalmary Jimenez-Gavillan, Jose Antonio Laporte-Espada, Maria Celia Lebron-Quintana, Efrain Llanes-Colon, Mercedes Llera-Catala, Angel Manuel Llorens Orlandi, William Lopez-Colon, Jose Manuel Lopez-Cruz, Esther Rosa Lopez-Medina, Aristides Lopez-Ramos, Samuel Luciano-Perez, Eunice Maribel Lugo-Mejias, John Maceira-Lopez, Jaime Machado-Roman, Donovan Maldonado-Cruz, Jose G. Maldonado-Malave, Jesus Manuel Maldonado-Perez, Waleska del Carmen Maldonado-Rodriguez, Yamelit Maldonado-Soto, Luis Alexis Manso-Rosario, Luis Alexis Manso-Rosario, Frida Marchosky-Kogan, Miguel Angel Marquez-Camacho, Virgen Noemi Marrero-Carballo, Edwin Marrero-Torres, Johann Enid Martinez-Oritz, Luis Angel Martinez-Otero, Edwin Martinez-Rivera, Norma H. Martinez-Rodriguez, Ildefonso Martinez-Santiago, Judith Matos-Negron, Angel Luis Matos-Ramos, Miguel Angel Medina-Lopez, Johnny Edgar Melendez-Gonzalez, Nancy Melendez-Valentin, Maretza Mendez-Muniz, Leida Mendez-Pagan, Miriam Janette Mercado-Acosta, Marcelo Mercado-Oritz, Ruben Miranda-Mercado, Grisbeth Mojica-Gonzalez, Leslie Molina-Cancel, Jesus E. Monroig-Jimenez, Elizabeth Montalvo-Melendez, Catherine Morales-Castro, Evelyn Moralez-Suarez, Clara Moreta-Rodriguez, Michael Joseph Morris-Zamora, Antonio Munoz-Suarez, Rafael Eduardo Narvaez-Cabezas, Nelson Nunez-Rolon, Roberto Ocana-Serrano, Lillybell Olivo-Rivera, Maria M. Ondina-Gordo, Reinaldo Oquendo-Vega, Benita Ortiz-Ceballos, Hiran Ortiz-Ortiz, Luis Francisco Ortiz-Osuna, Mayra Elena Ortiz-Rentas, Santa Ortiz-Salinas, Maria Isabel Otero-Caraballo, Ismael Pagan-Cedeno, Olga Pagan-Maldonado, William Pagan-Rodriguez, Luis Eduardo Pardo-Toro, Hiram Pena-Roldan, Edwin Perez Ayala, Eda Perez-Cabrera, Ginnette Perez-Campo, Evelyn Ivette Perez-Lourido, Myrna Perez-Morales, Ivette Maria Perez-Nieves, Roberto Perez-Ramirez, Pamela Ivette Perez-Rivera, Betzaida I. Porrata-Tirado, Betzaida I. Porrata-Tirado, Luz Estela Poueriet-Diaz, Dianne Quiles-Lugo, Yolanda Quiles-Serrano, Rolando Radames Gutierrez-de Jesus, Antuanette Ramos-Ayala, Eugenio Joel Ramos-Calderon, Evelyn Ramos-Cortes, Nelida Ramos-Lopez, Luis Enrique Ramos-Pitre, Zulma I. Recio-Lopez, Maria Mercedes Reyes-Concepcion, Maria Magdalena Reyes-Pagan, Miguel Angel Rios-Santiago, Ines Yamira Rivera-Aquino, Jose Manuel Rivera-Colon, Ruth Noemi Rivera-Colon, Mario Jose Rivera-Cotto, Olga Enette Rivera-Crespi, Olga Enette Rivera-Crespi, Javier Antonio Rivera-Dueno, Moraima Rivera-Gonzalez, Marleen Rivera-Mulero, Muriel Rivera-Munoz, Julio Enrique Rivera-Negron, Madeline Rivera-Pagan, Felix Jose Rivera-Perez, Margarita Rivera-Rivera, Milka Yadira Rivera-Rivera, Hector Luis Rivera-Rodriguez, Hector Luis Rivera-Rodriguez, Maritza Rivera-Rodriguez, Virgilio Oscar Rivera-Rodriguez, Miriam Rivera-Torres, Carmen Rivera-Villeda, Edwin Francisco Rodriguez, Jose Noel Rodriguez-Alvarez, Angel Luis Rodriguez-Camacho, Reynaldo Rodriguez-Colon, Harry Rodriguez-Cruz, Tania Liz Rodriguez-Garcia, Marcos E. Rodriguez-Gomez, Juan Manuel Rodriguez-Irizarry, Ervin Rodriguez-Laboy, Patricio Rodriguez-Lopez, Jazmin Erika Rodriguez-Morales, Haydee Rodriguez-Nichols, William Rodriguez-Ojeda, Pedro Javier Rodriguez-Quiles, Rafael Rodriguez-Rivera, Gloria A. Rodriguez-Trujillo, Providencia Rodriguez-Vega, Brunilda Rojas-Gonzalez, Sandra Ivette Roman-Diaz, Jose Geraldo Roman-Gonzalez, Sonia Linnette Romero-Ramos, Julio Rondon-Reyes, Antonio Rosa-Agosto, Jorge Jose Rosa-Miranda, Fernando Luis Rosario-Cardona, Angela L. Rosario-DeLeon, Gloria Maria Ruiz-Colon, Rodyloida Ruiz-Delgado, Emerito Ruiz-Rodriguez, Rober
February 20, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellee Federal National Mortgage Association. Certificate of service dated 02/20/2020. [20-1114] (MAS) [Entered: 02/20/2020 11:27 AM]
February 20, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Federal National Mortgage Association filed by Attorney Monica A. Sanchez. Certificate of service dated 02/20/2020. [20-1114] (MAS) [Entered: 02/20/2020 11:25 AM]
February 18, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Bayview Loan Servicing, Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC. and Wells Fargo filed by Attorney Andrew C. Glass. Certificate of service dated 02/18/2020. [20-1114] (ACG) [Entered: 02/18/2020 10:22 AM]
February 14, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Bank of America, N.A. filed by Attorney James W. McGarry. Certificate of service dated 02/14/2020. [20-1114] (JWM) [Entered: 02/14/2020 06:44 PM]
February 14, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Bayview Loan Servicing, Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC. and Wells Fargo filed by Attorney Gregory N. Blase. Certificate of service dated 02/14/2020. [20-1114] (GNB) [Entered: 02/14/2020 02:17 PM]
February 14, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Bayview Loan Servicing, Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC. and Wells Fargo filed by Attorney Andrew C. Glass. Certificate of service dated 02/14/2020. [20-1114] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS (2/20/20). (HB) [Entered: 02/14/2020 02:09 PM]
February 14, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee MWPR CR, LLC filed by Attorney Francisco J. Fernandez Chiques. Certificate of service dated 02/14/2020. [20-1114] (FJF) [Entered: 02/14/2020 10:52 AM]
February 13, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Oriental Bank filed by Attorney Carlos R. Baralt Suarez. Certificate of service dated 02/13/2020. [20-1114] (CRB) [Entered: 02/13/2020 07:10 PM]
February 13, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees James B. Nutter & Company and Federal National Mortgage Association filed by Attorney Elizabeth A. Sperling. Certificate of service dated 02/13/2020. [20-1114] (EAS) [Entered: 02/13/2020 06:21 PM]
February 13, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #346) filed by Appellants ABC Plaintiffs, Sonia Acevedo, Gerardo Acosta-Figueroa, Lizzette Alejandro-Ocasio, Wanda L. Alejandro-Ruiz, Elba M. Alicea-Ortiz, Gloria Margarita Alicea-Rivera, All Others in Similar Situation, Cecilio Allende-Quinones, Nelson Alvarado-Hernandez, Juanita Alvarado-Saez, David Alvarez-Lopez, Carlos Alberto Alvarez-Rivera, Carlos Luis Amador-Fernandez, Marisol Amaro-Medina, Maria Felicita Andrade-Maldonado, Yolanda Arroyo-Fontanez, Gilbert Arroyo-Loperena, Yiries Joseph Asef Saad-Maura, Rolando Avila-Perez, Javier Baerga-Schroeder, Karen Barreda-Rivera, Carmen Benitez-Garay, Gloria Bermudez-Vargas, Ivonne Bernard-Rivera, Ana Luisa Berrios-Doble, Angel L. Berrios-Ortiz, Yvette Lorraine Bonhomme-Santos, Carmen Nelida Bravo-Soto, Nathan Caban-Garcia, Sol Margarita Cabrera Munoz, Iris Yolanda Cardona-Tirado, Angel Louis Carmona-Benet, Anniel Carrasquillo-Amaro, Miriam Carrion-Soto, Edwin Casillas-Berrios, Julio Victor Castro-Lopez, Clarivette Castro-Narvaez, Jorge Cedeno-Rosado, Elizabeth Champana-Gagneron, Francisca Charles-Belen, Gabriel Chavez-Diaz, Miguel Antonio Chevere-Dones, Deserie Cintron-Cabrera, Jose Ramon Cintron-Mercado, Julio Enrique Colon, Nancy Colon-Berrios, Waldemir Colon-Lebron, Maria De Los Angeles Colon-Morel, Ivan David Colon-Vega, Sara Victoria Colon-Vega, Jose Antonio Concepcion-Soto, Sonia Yvid Conde-Burgos, Conjugal Partnership Acosta-Hernandez, Conjugal Partnership Alejandro-Jimenez, Conjugal Partnership Allende-Villafane, Conjugal Partnership Alvarez-Diaz, Conjugal Partnership Alvarez-Gandara, Conjugal Partnership Arroyo-Mendez, Conjugal Partnership Avila-Champana, Conjugal Partnership Berrios-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Caban-Reyes, Conjugal Partnership Carmona-Hernandez, Conjugal Partnership Casillas-Andrades, Conjugal Partnership Castro-Trinidad, Conjugal Partnership Chavez-Zaragoza, Conjugal Partnership Chevere-Stuart, Conjugal Partnership Concepcion-Ramos, Conjugal Partnership Criado-Torres, Conjugal Partnership Cruz-Ferrer, Conjugal Partnership Cruz-Morales, Conjugal Partnership Cruz-Torres, Conjugal Partnership Curet-Alvarado, Conjugal Partnership Del Llano-Barreda, Conjugal Partnership Del Rosario-Selles, Conjugal Partnership Diaz-Bravo, Conjugal Partnership Diaz-Llera, Conjugal Partnership Diou-Colon, Conjugal Partnership Egipciaco-Porrata, Conjugal Partnership Estrada-Quiles, Conjugal Partnership Girald-Perez, Conjugal Partnership Glass-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Gonzalez-Cruz, Conjugal Partnership Gonzalez-Martinez, Conjugal Partnership Gonzalez-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Gonzalez-Rodriguez, Conjugal Partnership Guadalupe-Ramos, Conjugal Partnership Gutierrez-Cosme, Conjugal Partnership Hernandez-Santos, Conjugal Partnership Llanes-Zabala, Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Bleck, Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Colon, Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Reyes, Conjugal Partnership Luciano-Cruz, Conjugal Partnership Maldonado-Gonzalez, Conjugal Partnership Maldonado-Recio, Conjugal Partnership Manso-Santiago, Conjugal Partnership Marquez-Santana, Conjugal Partnership Martinez-Torres, Conjugal Partnership Medina-De-Jesus, Conjugal Partnership Melendez-Diaz, Conjugal Partnership Miranda-Acevedo, Conjugal Partnership Nunez-Ortiz, Conjugal Partnership Oquendo-Hernandez, Conjugal Partnership Ortiz-Soto, Conjugal Partnership Pagan-Del Rio, Conjugal Partnership Pagan-Gonzalez, Conjugal Partnership Pena-Pagan, Conjugal Partnership Perez-Castro, Conjugal Partnership Ramos-Crespo, Conjugal Partnership Ramos-Encarnacion, Conjugal Partnership Reyes-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Maldonado, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Montalvo, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Olivo, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Perez, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Bermudez, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Duran, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Feliciano, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Lugo, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Maldonado, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Melendez, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Roman, Conjugal Partnership Roman-Serrano, Conjugal Partnership Rondon-Mojica, Conjugal Partnership Rosario-Ruiz, Conjugal Partnership Salicrup-Ruiz, Conjugal Partnership Sevilla-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Soto-Diaz, Conjugal Partnership Soto-Sanchez, Conjugal Partnership Soto-Veguilla, Conjugal Partnership Sotomayor-Velilla, Conjugal Partnership Tapia-Benitez, Conjugal Partnership Toledo-Rojas, Conjugal Partnership Tollens-Gonzalez, Conjugal Partnership Vargas-Rodriguez, Conjugal Partnership Vega-Perez, Conjugal Partnership Velez-Cordero, Conjugal Partnership Velez-Serrano, Conjugal Partnership Vidal-Sanchez, Glorissa Cordero-Cabrera, Zuleika Cosme-Rivera, Nerisliang Crespo Rivera, Griselda Crespo-Arvelo, Manuel Ivan Criado-Criado, Agustin Alejandro Cruz, Maria Awilda Cruz-Acevedo, Francisca Cruz-Delgado, Nestor Cruz-Diaz, Evelyn Cruz-Flores, Yasser Cruz-Padilla, Gilberto Cruz-Perez, Maria Luisa Cruz-Rivera, Juan Fernando Cruz-Torres, Jose M. Curet-Salim, Angel Luis Davila-Reyes, Iva Yadira De Jesus-Garcia, Migdalia Margarita De Leon-Velez, Eulogia R. Del Rio-Torres, Juan Ernesto Del Rosario-Masini, Ametza Delgado-Cardona, Marilyn Delgado-Perez, Denisse Demoya-Burgos, Glenny Diaz-Dominquez, Jose Antonio Diaz-Perez, Juan Diaz-Perez, Migdalia Diaz-Perez, Maria Belen Diaz-Rivera, Orlando Diaz-Soto, Luis Eugenio Diou-Agrait, Maria Milagros Duran-Morales, Manuel F. Egipciaco-Ruiz, Erika Encarnacion-Sanchez, Paula E. Estrada-Diaz, Alejandro Estrada-Maisonet, Nilda Iris Eutsler-Delgado, Anastacio Falcon-Rosario, Maria Feliciano-Mendez, Luis Manuel Fernandez-Velazquez, Adeliz Ferrer-Decamps, Hilda Del Rosario Figueroa-Santiago, Vivian Enid Flores-Merced, Marilyn Fonseca-Cotto, Rafael Antonio Fonseca-Marrero, Wilma Gandara-Gorritz, Carmen Gloria Garcia-Rivera, Edwin Girald-Torres, Edwin Glass-Martinez, Carmen Gloria Gomez-Nunez, Walberto Nussa Gonzalez, Jose Antonio Gonzalez-Arce, Ezequiel Antonio Gonzalez-Carrio, Diannette Gonzalez-Charles, Olga I. Gonzalez-Diaz, Ramon R. Gonzalez-Perez, Concepcion Gonzalez-Rivera, Wanda Gonzalez-Rivera, Marcos Gonzalez-Rodriguez, Nelly Ramonita Gonzalez-Rodriguez, Glendalys Gonzalez-Santiago, Jose Arnaldo Gonzalez-Santiago, Lester I. Gonzalez-Santiago, Gilberto Gonzalez-Velez, Pablo Guadalupe-Mendoza, Eric Santiago Halais-Borges, Lilliam Bethzaida Hernandez-Amaro, Maria De Los Angeles Hernandez-Diaz, Neida Ines Hernandez-Irizarry, Lourdes Hernandez-Llanes, Maribel Hernandez-Perez, Pedro Rafael Hernandez-Sanchez, Jose Alberto Hernandez-Torres, Joaquin Jose Jarque-Rodriguez, Jose Alfredo Jimenez-Figueroa, Eileen Dalmary Jimenez-Gavillan, Jose Antonio Laporte-Espada, Maria Celia Lebron-Quintana, Efrain Llanes-Colon, Mercedes Llera-Catala, Angel Manuel Llorens Orlandi, William Lopez-Colon, Jose Manuel Lopez-Cruz, Esther Rosa Lopez-Medina, Aristides Lopez-Ramos, Samuel Luciano-Perez, Eunice Maribel Lugo-Mejias, John Maceira-Lopez, Jaime Machado-Roman, Donovan Maldonado-Cruz, Jose G. Maldonado-Malave, Jesus Manuel Maldonado-Perez, Waleska del Carmen Maldonado-Rodriguez, Yamelit Maldonado-Soto, Luis Alexis Manso-Rosario, Luis Alexis Manso-Rosario, Frida Marchosky-Kogan, Miguel Angel Marquez-Camacho, Virgen Noemi Marrero-Carballo, Edwin Marrero-Torres, Johann Enid Martinez-Oritz, Luis Angel Martinez-Otero, Edwin Martinez-Rivera, Norma H. Martinez-Rodriguez, Ildefonso Martinez-Santiago, Judith Matos-Negron, Angel Luis Matos-Ramos, Miguel Angel Medina-Lopez, Johnny Edgar Melendez-Gonzalez, Nancy Melendez-Valentin, Maretza Mendez-Muniz, Leida Mendez-Pagan, Miriam Janette Mercado-Acosta, Marcelo Mercado-Oritz, Ruben Miranda-Mercado, Grisbeth Mojica-Gonzalez, Leslie Molina-Cancel, Jesus E. Monroig-Jimenez, Elizabeth Montalvo-Melendez, Catherine Morales-Castro, Evelyn Moralez-Suarez, Clara Moreta-Rodriguez, Michael Joseph Morris-Zamora, Antonio Munoz-Suarez, Rafael Eduardo Narvaez-Cabezas, Nelson Nunez-Rolon, Roberto Ocana-Serrano, Lillybell Olivo-Rivera, Maria M. Ondina-Gordo, Reinaldo Oquendo-Vega, Benita Ortiz-Ceballos, Hiran Ortiz-Ortiz, Luis Francisco Ortiz-Osuna, Mayra Elena Ortiz-Rentas, Santa Ortiz-Salinas, Maria Isabel Otero-Caraballo, Ismael Pagan-Cedeno, Olga Pagan-Maldonado, William Pagan-Rodriguez, Luis Eduardo Pardo-Toro, Hiram Pena-Roldan, Edwin Perez Ayala, Eda Perez-Cabrera, Ginnette Perez-Campo, Evelyn Ivette Perez-Lourido, Myrna Perez-Morales, Ivette Maria Perez-Nieves, Roberto Perez-Ramirez, Pamela Ivette Perez-Rivera, Betzaida I. Porrata-Tirado, Betzaida I. Porrata-Tirado, Luz Estela Poueriet-Diaz, Dianne Quiles-Lugo, Yolanda Quiles-Serrano, Rolando Radames Gutierrez-de Jesus, Antuanette Ramos-Ayala, Eugenio Joel Ramos-Calderon, Evelyn Ramos-Cortes, Nelida Ramos-Lopez, Luis Enrique Ramos-Pitre, Zulma I. Recio-Lopez, Maria Mercedes Reyes-Concepcion, Adalberto Reyes-Garced, Maria Magdalena Reyes-Pagan, Miguel Angel Rios-Santiago, Ines Yamira Rivera-Aquino, Jose Manuel Rivera-Colon, Ruth Noemi Rivera-Colon, Mario Jose Rivera-Cotto, Olga Enette Rivera-Crespi, Olga Enette Rivera-Crespi, Javier Antonio Rivera-Dueno, Moraima Rivera-Gonzalez, Marleen Rivera-Mulero, Muriel Rivera-Munoz, Julio Enrique Rivera-Negron, Madeline Rivera-Pagan, Felix Jose Rivera-Perez, Margarita Rivera-Rivera, Milka Yadira Rivera-Rivera, Gladys M. Rivera-Rodriguez, Hector Luis Rivera-Rodriguez, Hector Luis Rivera-Rodriguez, Maritza Rivera-Rodriguez, Virgilio Oscar Rivera-Rodriguez, Miriam Rivera-Torres, Carmen Rivera-Villeda, Edwin Francisco Rodriguez, Jose Noel Rodriguez-Alvarez, Angel Luis Rodriguez-Camacho, Reynaldo Rodriguez-Colon, Harry Rodriguez-Cruz, Tania Liz Rodriguez-Garcia, Marcos E. Rodriguez-Gomez, Juan Manuel Rodriguez-Irizarry, Ervin Rodriguez-Laboy, Patricio Rodriguez-Lopez, Jazmin Erika Rodriguez-Morales, Haydee Rodriguez-Nichols, William Rodriguez-Ojeda, Pedro Javier Rodriguez-Quiles, Rafael Rodriguez-Rivera, Gloria A. Rodriguez-Trujillo, Providencia Rodriguez-Vega, Brunilda Rojas-Gonzalez, Sandra Ivette Roman-Diaz, Jose Geraldo Roman-Gonzalez, Sonia Linnette Romero-Ramos, Julio Rondon-Reyes, Antonio Rosa-Agosto, Jorge Jose Rosa-Miranda, Fernando Luis Rosario-Cardona, Angela L. Rosario-DeLeon, Gloria Maria Ruiz-Colon, Rodyloida Ruiz-Delgado, Emerito Ru

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Saad Maura, et al v. Scotiabank de Puerto Rico, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAMARIS TORRES-NUNEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EVELYN MORALEZ-SUAREZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP BERRIOS-RIVERA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TOMAS ANTONIO VELEZ-MARTINEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TANIA LIZ RODRIGUEZ-GARCIA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP ESTRADA-QUILES
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP RAMOS-CRESPO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANASTACIO FALCON-ROSARIO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP CARMONA-HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARLOS JOSE SARNELLI
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP RODRIGUEZ-DURAN
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EFRAIN LLANES-COLON
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: XIOMARA ZABALA-GARCIA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LUZ ESTELA POUERIET-DIAZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: YOLANDA QUILES-SERRANO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RUBEN MIRANDA-MERCADO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP ARROYO-MENDEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP LUCIANO-CRUZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALBA YANIRA TORRES-CINTRON
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTONIO MUNOZ-SUAREZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE A. VARGAS-ARRATIBEL
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WALESKA DEL CARMEN MALDONADO-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE MANUEL LOPEZ-CRUZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ISMAEL PAGAN-CEDENO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LILLYBELL OLIVO-RIVERA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LUIS EUGENIO DIOU-AGRAIT
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP CRUZ-FERRER
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RAFAEL RODRIGUEZ-RIVERA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE ANTONIO LAPORTE-ESPADA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GERARDO ACOSTA-FIGUEROA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDWIN MARRERO-TORRES
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP ORTIZ-SOTO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARIA BELEN DIAZ-RIVERA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RAMON SOTO-MORALES
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP RONDON-MOJICA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP AVILA-CHAMPANA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LUIS E. SANTIAGO-COLON
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WANDA I. VILLAFANE-MATOS
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELSIE SUSAN SANCHEZ-GONZALEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MANUEL IVAN CRIADO-CRIADO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP CABAN-REYES
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KAREN BARREDA-RIVERA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EVELYN RAMOS-CORTES
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HIRAM PENA-ROLDAN
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EVELYN CRUZ-FLORES
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROLANDO AVILA-PEREZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RAMON SANCHEZ-PAGAN
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARCELO MERCADO-ORITZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VIRGEN NOEMI MARRERO-CARBALLO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRUNILDA ROJAS-GONZALEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP LOPEZ-REYES
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NORMA H. MARTINEZ-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE ALBERTO HERNANDEZ-TORRES
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP MALDONADO-RECIO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DINORAH SANCHEZ-FIGUEROA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MIGUEL ANGEL MEDINA-LOPEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JUAN A SOTO-AYBAR
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: YIRIES JOSEPH ASEF SAAD-MAURA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LUIS ENRIQUE RAMOS-PITRE
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GINNETTE PEREZ-CAMPO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MIRIAM JANETTE MERCADO-ACOSTA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALL OTHERS IN SIMILAR SITUATION
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP ALEJANDRO-JIMENEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARIA DE LOS ANGELES COLON-MOREL
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: YASSER CRUZ-PADILLA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP DEL ROSARIO-SELLES
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP RODRIGUEZ-MALDONADO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP SEVILLA-RIVERA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LILLIAM BETHZAIDA HERNANDEZ-AMARO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: IVONNE BERNARD-RIVERA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MIRIAM CARRION-SOTO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CLARIVETTE CASTRO-NARVAEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN MACEIRA-LOPEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARMEN NELIDA BRAVO-SOTO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP RAMOS-ENCARNACION
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: REINALDO OQUENDO-VEGA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MANUEL F. EGIPCIACO-RUIZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP GONZALEZ-MARTINEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARLOS ALBERTO ALVAREZ-RIVERA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARIA AWILDA CRUZ-ACEVEDO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MADELINE RIVERA-PAGAN
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EUNICE MARIBEL LUGO-MEJIAS
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LEIDA MENDEZ-PAGAN
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANGEL MANUEL LLORENS ORLANDI
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GABRIEL CHAVEZ-DIAZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PABLO GUADALUPE-MENDOZA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: YOLANDA ARROYO-FONTANEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHANN ENID MARTINEZ-ORITZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP CHEVERE-STUART
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GLENDA MARIE VIERA-RIVERA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANGEL L. BERRIOS-ORTIZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP CASTRO-TRINIDAD
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NELSON NUNEZ-ROLON
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANA LUISA BERRIOS-DOBLE
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE ANTONIO GONZALEZ-ARCE
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP CONCEPCION-RAMOS
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP SALICRUP-RUIZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE GERALDO ROMAN-GONZALEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GRORIBEL SOTO-DE JESUS
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SONIA LINNETTE ROMERO-RAMOS
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP MANSO-SANTIAGO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELBA M. ALICEA-ORTIZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LIZZETTE ALEJANDRO-OCASIO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ILDEFONSO MARTINEZ-SANTIAGO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FERNANDO SUAREZ-GUILLEN
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP LLANES-ZABALA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP MALDONADO-GONZALEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARIA MERCEDES REYES-CONCEPCION
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP PEREZ-CASTRO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTONIO ROSA-AGOSTO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARILYN FONSECA-COTTO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JUAN DIAZ-PEREZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HECTOR LUIS RIVERA-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: John A. Stewart-Sotomayor
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP PENA-PAGAN
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARISOL AMARO-MEDINA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP CHAVEZ-ZARAGOZA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRANCISCA CRUZ-DELGADO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DIANNE QUILES-LUGO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GILBERT ARROYO-LOPERENA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LUIS ALEXIS MANSO-ROSARIO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: John A. Stewart-Sotomayor
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SAMUEL LUCIANO-PEREZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MIGUEL ANTONIO CHEVERE-DONES
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP GONZALEZ-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GLORIA MARIA TAPIA-DE-JESUS
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAZMIN ERIKA RODRIGUEZ-MORALES
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP MARTINEZ-TORRES
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RAFAEL EDUARDO NARVAEZ-CABEZAS
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: IRIS YOLANDA CARDONA-TIRADO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP ALVAREZ-DIAZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VIVIANA SANCHEZ-SERRANO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP LOPEZ-COLON
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP ACOSTA-HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERTO OCANA-SERRANO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP PAGAN-DEL RIO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VIVIAN ENID FLORES-MERCED
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SANDRA IVETTE ROMAN-DIAZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARCOS GONZALEZ-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP VARGAS-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ZORAIDA SANTOS-PAGAN
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HIRAN ORTIZ-ORTIZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NANCY MELENDEZ-VALENTIN
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARMEN JOSEFINA VALENTIN-DAVILA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NILDA IRIS EUTSLER-DELGADO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALEXY SOTO-ROSARIO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EVELYN SERRANO-AGUEDA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GLENNY DIAZ-DOMINQUEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP DIAZ-BRAVO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LADY TRISTANY MELENDEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LUZ NEREIDA STUART-DIAZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE NOEL RODRIGUEZ-ALVAREZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP PAGAN-GONZALEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AGUSTIN ALEJANDRO CRUZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FELIX JOSE RIVERA-PEREZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CECILIO ALLENDE-QUINONES
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NEIDA INES HERNANDEZ-IRIZARRY
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANA L. TOLEDO DAVILA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARLOS JOSE SUAREZ-GUILLEN
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RAMON R. GONZALEZ-PEREZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HAYDEE RODRIGUEZ-NICHOLS
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ESTHER ROSA LOPEZ-MEDINA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DEOGRACIA TAPIA-FEBRES
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DONOVAN MALDONADO-CRUZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MADELINE TRINIDAD-DIAZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARIBEL SANTANA-SANTANA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP ALLENDE-VILLAFANE
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ERIC SANTIAGO HALAIS-BORGES
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP VIDAL-SANCHEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JULIO RONDON-REYES
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP RODRIGUEZ-FELICIANO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDWIN GIRALD-TORRES
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NESTOR CRUZ-DIAZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONCEPCION GONZALEZ-RIVERA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: IAN DE LLANO-JIMENEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP LOPEZ-BLECK
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANGEL LOUIS CARMONA-BENET
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MIRIAM RIVERA-TORRES
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP RODRIGUEZ-MELENDEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP MELENDEZ-DIAZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NELLY RAMONITA GONZALEZ-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LUIS MANUEL FERNANDEZ-VELAZQUEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RUTH NOEMI RIVERA-COLON
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDA PEREZ-CABRERA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANGEL LUIS RODRIGUEZ-CAMACHO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELIZABETH MONTALVO-MELENDEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: REYNALDO RODRIGUEZ-COLON
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SONIA ACEVEDO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EULOGIA R. DEL RIO-TORRES
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MANUEL ANGEL VEGA-BONILLA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP NUNEZ-ORTIZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JULIO VICTOR CASTRO-LOPEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP VEGA-PEREZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ERIKA ENCARNACION-SANCHEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EUGENIO JOEL RAMOS-CALDERON
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP RODRIGUEZ-ROMAN
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SARA VICTORIA COLON-VEGA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE ANTONIO CONCEPCION-SOTO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP ROMAN-SERRANO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRUNILDA SANTIAGO-RIVERA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP RODRIGUEZ-BERMUDEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP MIRANDA-ACEVEDO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SOL MARGARITA CABRERA MUNOZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAIME RAFAEL VIDAL-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARIO JOSE RIVERA-COTTO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: OLGA PAGAN-MALDONADO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDWIN FRANCISCO RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE RAMON CINTRON-MERCADO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GLENDALYS GONZALEZ-SANTIAGO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ORLANDO DIAZ-SOTO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP TAPIA-BENITEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LUIS EDUARDO PARDO-TORO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP SOTO-DIAZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANGELA L. ROSARIO-DELEON
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDWIN CASILLAS-BERRIOS
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RAFAEL ANTONIO FONSECA-MARRERO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE ARNALDO GONZALEZ-SANTIAGO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELIZABETH CHAMPANA-GAGNERON
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARIA DE LOS ANGELES HERNANDEZ-DIAZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP OQUENDO-HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP GONZALEZ-RIVERA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WANDA L. ALEJANDRO-RUIZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PEDRO JAVIER RODRIGUEZ-QUILES
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NANCY COLON-BERRIOS
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP RODRIGUEZ-LUGO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRIDA MARCHOSKY-KOGAN
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JUAN ARSENIO VELAZQUEZ DURAN
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARIA M. ONDINA-GORDO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EZEQUIEL ANTONIO GONZALEZ-CARRIO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP VELEZ-CORDERO
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICARDO JOSE VAZQUEZ-SERRA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: OLGA IVETTE SANABRIA-VELAZQUEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE ALFREDO JIMENEZ-FIGUEROA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JULIO ENRIQUE COLON
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERTO PEREZ-RAMIREZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARLOS LUIS AMADOR-FERNANDEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: IVEA MARIA SELLES-HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MIGDALIA MARGARITA DE LEON-VELEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE ANTONIO DIAZ-PEREZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP DIOU-COLON
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARGARITA RIVERA-RIVERA
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ZAYRA DEL ROSARIO TORRES-MATOS
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM PAGAN-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ADELIZ FERRER-DECAMPS
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHNNY EDGAR MELENDEZ-GONZALEZ
Represented By: Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times |