Jenkins v. Housing Court Department, et al
Defendant: EAMONN GILL, Labor Counsel, Human Resources Department of the Massachusetts Trial Courts, MAURA T. HEALEY, Attorney General, PAUL BURKE, Deputy Court Administrator of the Massachusetts Housing Courts, MICHAEL NEVILLE, Chief Housing Specialist of The Boston Housing Court, MARK CONLON, Human Resources Director of the Massachusetts Trial Courts, ANTOINETTE RODNEY-CELESTINE, Administrative Attorney, HR Department of Trial Courts, PAULA M. CAREY, Chief Justice of The Massachusetts Trial Courts, TIMOTHY SULLIVAN, Chief Justice of the Massachusetts Housing Courts, HARRY SPENCE, Court Administrator of the Massachusetts Trial Courts, JEFFREY WINIK, First Justice of The Boston Housing Court and ELIZABETH J. DAY, Assistant Labor Counsel, HR Department of the Massachusetts Trial Courts
Defendant / Appellee: MA TRIAL COURT, BOSTON HOUSING COURTS and MASSACHUSETTS HOUSING COURTS
Plaintiff / Appellant: HECTOR M. JENKINS
Case Number: 20-1124
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Hector M. Jenkins. Brief due 07/06/2020 for appellant Hector M. Jenkins. Appendix due 07/06/2020 for appellant Hector M. Jenkins. [20-1124] (CMP) [Entered: 06/05/2020 03:16 PM]
June 5, 2020 MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Hector M. Jenkins. Certificate of service dated 06/05/2020. [20-1124] (RJS) [Entered: 06/05/2020 01:37 PM]
May 6, 2020 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 06/15/2020 for appellant Hector M. Jenkins. Appendix due 06/15/2020 for appellant Hector M. Jenkins. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-1124] (CMP) [Entered: 05/06/2020 04:35 PM]
May 6, 2020 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Hector M. Jenkins indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 05/04/2020. [20-1124] (CMP) [Entered: 05/06/2020 04:33 PM]
May 5, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Hector M. Jenkins filed by Attorney Robert J. Shapiro. Certificate of service dated 05/05/2020. [20-1124] (RJS) [Entered: 05/05/2020 05:46 PM]
May 1, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Boston Housing Courts, MA Trial Court and Massachusetts Housing Courts filed by Attorney Jasmine Jean-Louis. Certificate of service dated 05/01/2020. [20-1124] (JJ) [Entered: 05/01/2020 12:56 PM]
April 28, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Boston Housing Courts, MA Trial Court and Massachusetts Housing Courts filed by Attorney Howard Meshnick. Certificate of service dated 04/28/2020. [20-1124] (HM) [Entered: 04/28/2020 10:34 AM]
April 23, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #138) filed by Appellant Hector M. Jenkins. Transcript Report/Order form due 05/07/2020. [20-1124] (MNH) [Entered: 04/23/2020 06:40 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jenkins v. Housing Court Department, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAMONN GILL, Labor Counsel, Human Resources Department of the Massachusetts Trial Courts
Represented By: Howard Meshnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAURA T. HEALEY, Attorney General
Represented By: Howard Meshnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL BURKE, Deputy Court Administrator of the Massachusetts Housing Courts
Represented By: Howard Meshnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL NEVILLE, Chief Housing Specialist of The Boston Housing Court
Represented By: Howard Meshnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK CONLON, Human Resources Director of the Massachusetts Trial Courts
Represented By: Howard Meshnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTOINETTE RODNEY-CELESTINE, Administrative Attorney, HR Department of Trial Courts
Represented By: Howard Meshnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAULA M. CAREY, Chief Justice of The Massachusetts Trial Courts
Represented By: Howard Meshnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY SULLIVAN, Chief Justice of the Massachusetts Housing Courts
Represented By: Howard Meshnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRY SPENCE, Court Administrator of the Massachusetts Trial Courts
Represented By: Howard Meshnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY WINIK, First Justice of The Boston Housing Court
Represented By: Howard Meshnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH J. DAY, Assistant Labor Counsel, HR Department of the Massachusetts Trial Courts
Represented By: Howard Meshnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MA TRIAL COURT
Represented By: Jasmine Jean-Louis
Represented By: Howard Meshnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BOSTON HOUSING COURTS
Represented By: Jasmine Jean-Louis
Represented By: Howard Meshnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MASSACHUSETTS HOUSING COURTS
Represented By: Jasmine Jean-Louis
Represented By: Howard Meshnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HECTOR M. JENKINS
Represented By: Hector M. Jenkins
Represented By: Robert J. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?