Duane v. Vermont Mutual Ins. Co.
Interested Party: EMILY P. CROWLEY, PATRICK DRISCOLL and BOYLE SHAUGHNESSY LAW PC
Plaintiff / Appellant: JON DUANE
Defendant / Appellee: VERMONT MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 20-1139
Filed: February 9, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 MANDATE issued. [20-1139] (GB) [Entered: 03/24/2020 01:53 PM]
March 24, 2020 JUDGMENT entered: Upon consideration of appellant's unopposed motion, it is hereby ordered that this appeal be voluntarily dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) with each party to bear its own costs. Mandate to issue forthwith. [20-1139] (GB) [Entered: 03/24/2020 01:52 PM]
March 10, 2020 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Appellant Jon Duane. Certificate of service dated 03/10/2020. [20-1139] (MAA) [Entered: 03/10/2020 01:48 PM]
March 10, 2020 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Appellant Jon Duane. Certificate of service dated 03/10/2020. [20-1139] CLERK'S NOTE: It appears the document was scanned rather than created by converting the original word processing document into a PDF file. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS, BY 03/12/2020. (MAA) [Entered: 03/10/2020 01:26 PM]
March 10, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Jon Duane filed by Attorney Mark Aronsson. Certificate of service dated 03/10/2020. [20-1139] (MAA) [Entered: 03/10/2020 12:30 PM]
February 25, 2020 NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file an appearance form, docketing statement and transcript report/order form or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript report/order form due 03/10/2020 . [20-1139] (GB) [Entered: 02/25/2020 08:22 AM]
February 25, 2020 NOTICE issued. After 03/10/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Patrick Driscoll for Jon Duane, Thomas G. Hodgkins for Jon Duane and Aaron R. White for Jon Duane and Boyle Shaughnessy Law PC, Emily P. Crowley and Patrick Driscoll. [20-1139] (GB) [Entered: 02/25/2020 08:19 AM]
February 10, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #181) filed by Appellant Jon Duane. Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript Report/Order form due 02/24/2020 . [20-1139] (GB) [Entered: 02/09/2020 02:21 PM]
February 10, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #181) filed by Appellant Jon Duane. Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript Report/Order form due 02/24/2020 . [20-1139] (GB) [Entered: 02/09/2020 02:21 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Duane v. Vermont Mutual Ins. Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: EMILY P. CROWLEY
Represented By: Aaron R. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PATRICK DRISCOLL
Represented By: Aaron R. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: BOYLE SHAUGHNESSY LAW PC
Represented By: Aaron R. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JON DUANE
Represented By: Thomas G. Hodgkins
Represented By: Aaron R. White
Represented By: Patrick Driscoll
Represented By: Mark A. Aronsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VERMONT MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Peter E. Heppner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?