Jones v. Mitchell, et al
Defendant: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION, DOUGLAS L. BOWER, NEIL NORCLIFFE, DANIEL BENNETT, MASSACHUSETTS PARTNERSHIP FOR CORRECTIONAL HEALTHCARE, LLC, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF PUBLIC SAFETY, SCOTT J. STEEVER, THOMAS A. TURCO, III, CHRISTOPHER FALLON, CAROL HIGGINS O'BRIEN, MARTA LEON, HANK L. LAVALLEY and TODD DERBYSHIRE
Plaintiff / Appellant: EDWARD T. JONES
Defendant / Appellee: LISA A. MITCHELL, MICHAEL DEVINE, JOHN F. CAMELO and VANESSA MARTINO-FLEMING
Case Number: 20-1195
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 RESPONSE filed by Appellant Edward T. Jones to response and motion to strike document [ # 6332709-2 ], response and motion to withdraw document [ # 6332709-3 ]. Certificate of service dated 04/21/2020. [20-1195] (DAL) [Entered: 04/21/2020 04:58 PM]
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER to Show Cause entered: Attorney William J. Egan has moved to withdraw as counsel for appellant Edward T. Jones. On or before May 5, 2020 , appellant must either show cause why counsel should not be allowed to withdraw or advise this court in writing whether he will proceed pro se or retain new counsel. Show cause response due 05/05/2020. [20-1195] (ALW) [Entered: 04/21/2020 04:45 PM]
April 20, 2020 Request to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Edward T. Jones is pending in the Court of Appeals. [20-1195] (GAK) [Entered: 04/20/2020 10:23 AM]
April 16, 2020 MOTION for Attorney Motion to Withdraw Appearance of William J. Egan for Plaintiff-Appellant Edward T. Jones to withdraw as counsel filed by Appellant Edward T. Jones. Certificate of service dated 04/16/2020. [20-1195] (WJE) [Entered: 04/16/2020 11:22 AM]
April 15, 2020 COMPLIANT REQUEST for in forma pauperis status filed by Appellant Edward T. Jones. Certificate of service was not included. [20-1195] (ALW) [Entered: 04/16/2020 09:11 PM]
April 15, 2020 RENEWED MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Edward T. Jones. Certificate of service was not included. [20-1195] (ALW) [Entered: 04/16/2020 08:57 PM]
April 15, 2020 MOTION to strike withdrawal of appearance and RESPONSE to motion to withdraw as counsel [ # 6329906-2 ], order general show cause [ # 6331501-2 ] filed by Appellant Edward T. Jones. Certificate of service dated 04/10/2020. [20-1195]. (ALW) [Entered: 04/16/2020 08:39 PM]
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Order entered: Attorney Danielle Andrews Long has moved to withdraw as counsel for appellant Edward T. Jones. On or before May 11, 2020 , appellant must either show cause why counsel should not be allowed to withdraw or advise this court in writing whether he will proceed pro se or retain new counsel. [20-1195] (ALW) [Entered: 04/10/2020 05:54 PM]
April 10, 2020 Mail returned as undeliverable to Party Edward T. Jones. Copy of Order entered March 30, 2020. [20-1195] (JMK) [Entered: 04/10/2020 04:42 PM]
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Upon consideration of motion, and upon review of the record in this case, interested party Vanessa Martino-Fleming's motion to amend the case caption is allowed. The above revised caption must be used on all papers filed in this case. n[20-1195] (ALW) [Entered: 04/06/2020 03:13 PM]
April 3, 2020 MOTION for Attorney Danielle Andrews Long and Robinson & Cole LLP to withdraw as counsel filed by Appellant Edward T. Jones. Certificate of service dated 04/03/2020. [20-1195] (DAL) [Entered: 04/03/2020 03:14 PM]
March 31, 2020 DOCKET sheet sent to appellant. [20-1195] (DPO) [Entered: 03/31/2020 04:03 PM]
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER entered. Appellant's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") is denied without prejudice to filing a compliant motion and financial affidavit with this court. A compliant request for IFP status consists of a motion and a fully completed Form 4, financial affidavit. We note that appellant's IFP request is deficient in that it does not state the issues to be presented on appeal. Unless appellant provides this court with proof of paying the $505 filing fee to the district court or filing a compliant request for IFP status with this court by May 13, 2020, this appeal may be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Loc. R. 3.0(b). [20-1195] (GAK) [Entered: 03/30/2020 04:34 PM]
March 30, 2020 Mail returned as undeliverable to Party Edward T. Jones. Copy of Notice issued March 2, 2020. [20-1195] (JMK) [Entered: 03/30/2020 03:51 PM]
March 27, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Not Party Vanessa Martino-Fleming filed by Attorney George J. Puddister IV. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2020. [20-1195] (GJP) [Entered: 03/27/2020 01:25 PM]
March 25, 2020 MOTION to amend caption filed by Appellee Vanessa Martino-Fleming. Certificate of service dated 03/25/2020. [20-1195] (GJP) [Entered: 03/25/2020 01:49 PM]
March 2, 2020 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Edward T. Jones indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service was not included. [20-1195] (ALW) [Entered: 03/05/2020 11:00 AM]
March 2, 2020 AFFIDAVIT in support of motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ # 6322350-2 ] filed by Appellant Edward T. Jones. Certificate of service was not included. [20-1195] (ALW) [Entered: 03/05/2020 10:50 AM]
March 2, 2020 MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Edward T. Jones. Certificate of service was not included. [20-1195] (ALW) [Entered: 03/05/2020 10:22 AM]
March 2, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #176) filed by Appellant Edward T. Jones. Transcript Report/Order form and Fee due 03/16/2020. [20-1195] (MNH) [Entered: 03/02/2020 09:14 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jones v. Mitchell, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Maura T. Healey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUGLAS L. BOWER
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEIL NORCLIFFE
Represented By: George J. Puddister IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MASSACHUSETTS PARTNERSHIP FOR CORRECTIONAL HEALTHCARE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF PUBLIC SAFETY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT J. STEEVER
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS A. TURCO, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER FALLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROL HIGGINS O'BRIEN
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTA LEON
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANK L. LAVALLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD DERBYSHIRE
Represented By: George J. Puddister IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDWARD T. JONES
Represented By: Edward T. Jones
Represented By: William John Egan
Represented By: Danielle Andrews Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LISA A. MITCHELL
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL DEVINE
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN F. CAMELO
Represented By: Daryl Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VANESSA MARTINO-FLEMING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?