McGillen, et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al
Defendant / Appellee: MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P., ORLANS, P.C., JAMIE WELCH and JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Plaintiff / Appellant: AMY MCGILLEN and JOHN MCGILLEN
Case Number: 20-1244
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Public docket note: Pursuant to the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, this court is temporarily suspending the requirement in Local Rule 25.0(b)(1)(c) that appendices to briefs must be filed only in paper form. For the duration of this suspension, all parties who are represented by counsel shall tender the appendix electronically, through the court's electronic filing system. After the appendix is accepted for filing, the court may set a deadline for paper copies of the appendix. No other rules, including those relating to the form or substance of an appendix, service requirements, or the handling of appendices to be filed under seal, are impacted by this suspension. (MNH) [Entered: 04/21/2020 07:21 PM]
March 31, 2020 NOTICE issued. After 05/14/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Jeffrey C. Ankrom for MTGLQ Investors, L.P. and Effie L. Gikas for Orlans, P.C. and Jamie Welch. [20-1244] (AL) [Entered: 03/31/2020 10:01 AM]
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants John McGillen and Amy McGillen. Brief and Appendix due 07/17/2020 for appellants Amy McGillen and John McGillen. [20-1244] (AL) [Entered: 03/27/2020 04:47 PM]
March 27, 2020 MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Amy McGillen and John McGillen. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2020. [20-1244] (BJW) [Entered: 03/27/2020 03:02 PM]
March 24, 2020 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and appendix due 05/04/2020 for appellant Amy McGillen and John McGillen. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [20-1244] (GAK) [Entered: 03/24/2020 05:09 PM]
March 19, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee MTGLQ Investors, L.P. filed by Attorney Krystle Guillory Tadesse. Certificate of service dated 03/19/2020. [20-1244] (KG) [Entered: 03/19/2020 10:18 AM]
March 19, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee MTGLQ Investors, L.P. filed by Attorney Joseph A. Farside, Jr.. Certificate of service dated 03/19/2020. [20-1244] (JAF) [Entered: 03/19/2020 10:14 AM]
March 17, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. filed by Attorney J. Patrick Kennedy. Certificate of service dated 03/17/2020. [20-1244] (JPK) [Entered: 03/17/2020 04:53 PM]
March 17, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. filed by Attorney David Bizar. Certificate of service dated 03/17/2020. [20-1244] (DMB) [Entered: 03/17/2020 04:49 PM]
March 6, 2020 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Amy McGillen and John McGillen indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 03/06/2020. [20-1244] (BJW) [Entered: 03/06/2020 11:09 AM]
March 6, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Amy McGillen and John McGillen filed by Attorney Brian J. Wasser, Esq.. Certificate of service dated 03/06/2020. [20-1244] (BJW) [Entered: 03/06/2020 11:04 AM]
March 6, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Amy McGillen and John McGillen. Certificate of service dated 03/06/2020. [20-1244] (BJW) [Entered: 03/06/2020 11:00 AM]
March 5, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #51) filed by Appellants Amy McGillen and John McGillen. Docketing Statement and Appearance form due 03/19/2020. [20-1244] (AL) [Entered: 03/05/2020 03:35 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: McGillen, et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Represented By: Krystle Guillory Tadesse
Represented By: Effie L. Gikas
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ORLANS, P.C.
Represented By: Effie L. Gikas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMIE WELCH
Represented By: Effie L. Gikas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: David Michael Bizar
Represented By: J. Patrick Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AMY MCGILLEN
Represented By: Brian J. Wasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN MCGILLEN
Represented By: Brian J. Wasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?