Cruz Millan, et al v. Federal Deposit Insurance, et al
Plaintiff: EFRAIN BURGOS LOPEZ, JONATHAN ZHENG, A.S.C., minor represented by Luis Carrion-Lopez, J.D.G., minor 2 represented by Thais Nahir Garcia, LUIS M. TORRES RODRIGUEZ, A.T.L., minor represented by Jelissa Lomboy Mendez, JOEL OLIVO MIRANDA, O.M.M., minor 1 represented by Jean Carlos Maldonado and O'Neilly Machado, JEAN CARLOS MALDONADO TIBURCIO, NYDIA E. OSORIO, LUIS L. BAEZ, XAVIER ZHENG, ORLANDO JUNIOR ARAGONES TORRES, GUILLERMO M. LUGO ROSARIO, VANESSA COLON DELGADO, J.D.G., minor 1 represented by Thais Nahir Garcia, RICCIA M. BURGOS AVILLAN, M.O.R., minor 1 represented by Jorge Ocasio and Ashley Mercedez, STEVEN REYES, NIXZALYS REINOSA DIAZ, K.M.P., minor represented by Joseph Morales and Amy Pinero, A.O.R., minor 2 represented by Jorge Ocasio and Ashley Mercedez, GLORIRMA PARRILLA BECERRILL, J.M.C., minor 3 represented by Marisely Cruz Rodriguez, ALEX EMANUEL RIVERA RIVERA, IRIS NATALIA MACIEL LENCINAS, GIOVANNI OLIVO OTERO, K.R.O., minor 2 represented by Orlando Ribot and Yanell Garcet, CANDY YAHAIRA DIAZ RODRIGUEZ, CARLOS R. ARENAS VAZQUEZ, AMY N. PINERO LOPEZ, ERWIN E. COUVERTIER MENDEZ, IRVIN ISMAEL CARRILLO ORTIZ, EFREN FIGUEROA BENITEZ, LIZZY M. SIERRA ORTIZ, JORGE PEREZ SANTIAGO, WILLIAM D. CUADRADO RAMIREZ, G.B.M., minor represented by Edgardo Brito and Yadira Molina, KIMBERLY ZHENG, WANDA YVETTE SOSA, MELVIN GONZALEZ, A.O.C., minor 2 represented by Candy Yahaira Diaz, LUZ N. HERNANDEZ-RIVERA, I.M.C., minor 1 represented by Marisely Cruz Rodriguez, J.B.R., minor 1 represented by Luis Jose Burgos and Nixzalys Diaz, MARIA R. ARROYO-MOULIER, SHIRLEY ROLDAN-NIEVES, T.P.R., minor represented by Tania Rexach-Torres, CARLA P. ANDRADES GONZALEZ, CARMEN G. REYES BERMUDEZ, NELSON J. GERADINO ROLON, IRALYS SABRINA GARCIA, a/k/a Iralys Sanabria Garcia, ONEILL RODRIGUEZ LAUREANO, RAFAEL ANTONIO LORA ROSARIO, CESAR L. IBAN-CORDERO, JELISSA LOMBOY MENDEZ, ABRAHAM OTERO VIDAL, NORMA ROSADO RODRIGUEZ, YADIRA MOLINA-CORUJO, L.O.V., minor represented by Juan Luis Otero and Elisa Vazquez, EVELYN GARCIA MELENDEZ, LUIS PINERO-RIVERA, MARITZA GONZALEZ-RAMOS, ROBERTO ROSARIO, LUIS A. RODRIGUEZ SERRANO, MARIA T. LEPORTE NEGRON, M.C.M., minor represented by William Cuadrado and Miriel Mercado, CECILIO REYES MATOS, SCOTIABANK DE PUERTO RICO, title holder, M.T.M., minor 2 represented by Dimingo Ribot and Widalys Molina, S.S., minor 2 represented by Diana Molina, A.F.N., minor 1 represented by Mercedes Nieves, A.B.C., minor 1 represented by Dimingo Ribot and Widalys Molina, X.T.A., minor 2 represented by Luis Torres and Carla Andrades, GUILLERMO LUGO ESPINO, TANIA REXACH TORRES, ELEISON TIRADO MOLINARI, K.B.R., minor 2 represented by Luis Jose Burgos and Nixzalys Diaz, ASHLEY MERCEDEZ RODRIGUEZ, K.R.O., minor 3 represented by Orlando Ribot and Yanell Garcet, YANELL GARCET-RIOS, MARIA ISABEL NARVAEZ ORTIZA, ISEAEL O'NEILL ROSA, BLAS A. LEBRON MIRANDA, N.S.C., minor 2 represented by Vanessa Colon Delgado, CARLOS M. SANTIAGO HUERTAS, L.V.N., minor 2 represented by Mercedes Nieves, JERLIANN CARRILLO OSIRIO, G.M.C., minor 2 represented by Marisely Cruz Rodriguez, MARISELY CRUZ RODRIGUEZ, N.G.R., minor represented by Nelson G. Gerardino Narvaez, JESUS MENDEZ DIAZ, HECTOR ROBLES-RODRIGUEZ, Y.L.G., minor 1 represented by Orlando Ribot and Yanell Garcet, REY SALCEDO-RODRIGUEZ, S.H., minor 1 represented by Diana Molina, C.G.S., minor represented by Nelson E. Gerardo Narvaez and Lizzy M Sierra Ortiz, J.L.S., minor represented by Lizzy M. Sierra Ortiz, JULIOA L. ROMERO-FELICIANO, JORGE LUIS OCASIO RIVERA, L.R.D., minor 1 represented by Candy Yahaira Diaz, JUAN MACKENZIE MARIN, D.C.C., minor 2 represented by Erwin Couvertier and Jeliann Carrillo, P.S.C., minor 1 represented by Vanessa Colon Delgado, ROSA IVETTE PARDO RIOS, ZAISKA ANNETTE ALGARIN CASTRO, E.M.M., minor 2 represented by Jean Carlos Maldonado and O'Neilly Machado, JAMIE SANZ ESTRELLA, NELSON TORRES COLON, LUIS JOSE BURGOS VELASQUEZ, A.L.R., D.L.S., minor 2 represented by Iralys Sanabria and Blas Lebron, A.B.R., minor represented by Luz Vanessa Rivera Martinez, ROSA A. CARRION, L.P.A., minor represented by Maria R. Arroyo-Moulier, NYDIA MENDEZ-DIAZ, MERCEDES NIEVES FRANCIS, JOSE R. PACHECO RODRIGUEZ, JOEL PENA UECHI, THAIS NAHIR GARCIA RESTO, B.M.M., minor 2 represented by Juan MacKensie and Iris Maciel, JOSEPH MORALES PEREZ, S.M.P., minor 2 represented by Glorirma Parrilla Becerrill, C.M.P., minor 1 represented by Glorirma Parrilla Becerrill, J.C.C., minor 1 represented by Edwin Couvertier and Jerliann Carrillo, J.L.S., minor 1 represented by Iralys Sanabria and Blas Lebron, O'NEILLY MARCHADO ILARRAZA, a/k/a O'Neilly Machado Ilarraza, ALBA NIDIA CANCEL CARRERO, EDGARDO BRITO-BAEZ, AVELYS TROCHE-ORTIZ, A.T.A., minor 1 represented by Luis Torres and Carla Andrades, LUIS SERRANO-RODRIGUEZ, FRANCISCO J. REYES, NICHOLAS FUENTES LEBRON, MARIA TERESA NUNEZ-COLON, JOSE LABOY DAVILA, JULEYSHA M. CRUZ CRUZ, NEREIDA CASILLAS CORDERO, Y.O.R., minor 1 represented by Carmen Reyes and Abraham Otero, ARNALDO RIVERA-PEREZ, MELISSA ZACHEUS CONDE, A.S.T., minor 2 represented by Luis Serrano and Avelys Troche, MARTA SALCEDO, GEOVANEE LOPEZ, J.R.M., minor 2 represented by Hector Robles and Priscila Medina, L.T.S., minor 1 represented by Luis Serrano and Avelys Troche, HECMARY ACOSTA, JOSEPH M. LOPEZ SIERRA, MIRIEL D. MERCADO GONZALEZ, J.O.C., minor represented by Joel Olivo Miranda, LUZ VANESSA RIVERA MARTINEZ, DOMINGO RIBOT-RUIZ, J.R.M., minor 1 represented by Hector Robles and Priscila Medina, ROSA I. FERNANDEZ, JIMMY SANTIAGO-DIAZ, L.O.R., minor 2 represented by Carmen Reyes and Abraham Otero, JUAN LUIS OTERO VIDAL, PRISCILA MEDINA, ORLANDO L. RIBOT-RUIZ, JESSICA RIVERA DIAZ, NELSON E. GERADINO NAVAEZ, a/k/a Nelson E. Gerardino Narvarez, G.M.M., minor 1 represented by Juan MacKensie and Iris Maciel, WIDALYS MOLINA-NIEVES, ELIZA JINET VAZQUEZ MARTINEZ, DIANA MOLINA ELIEZER, CHERYLL TIDWELL-LLABRES, ANGEL R. MENDEZ RIVERA, C.V.N., minor 3 represented by Mercedes Nieves, KEISCHIE ANN SANTOS FERNANDEZ, NATALIE EMANUELI GRERNA, MANUEL SANTANA-HERNANDEZ and LUIS M. CARRION-LOPEZ
Defendant: MULTINATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, HF ENGINEERING CONSULTING GROUP, PSC, G2 CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT LLC, EUGENIO ALEMANY, EFRAIN SANTANA-ROSARIO, R.Q.D.M., PSC, ANTONIO HERNANDEZ CRUZ, K.C.R., SCOTIABANK OF PR, mortgage creditor, BAUTISTA REO PR CORP., TECNICIA DESIGN GROUP, PSC, a/k/a Teknica Design, TERRAZAS DE CEIBA, INC., ACE INSURANCE CO., MUNICIPALITY OF CEIBA, JORGE L. ROBERT, CONSTRUCCIONES YAMALI, INC., EDWIN DISAL DEL LA MOTA, BLACK POINT MANAGEMENT LLC, RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC, EVELYN TORRES-GONZALEZ, JORGE GONZALES-FUENTES, EUGENIO ALEMANY & ASOCIADOS, SANTERINI CONSTRUCTION, INC., EURO ENGINEERING CONTRACTOR, INC., BANCO POPULAR DE PUERTO RICO, CJN HEAVY EQUIPMENT, CORP., TOMMY FIGUEROA-ROSARIO, UNIVERSAL INSURANCE COMPANY and BLACK POINT PR LLC
Interested Party: MANUEL BATISTA-DE LA ROSA and SHIRLEY A. TEJADA
Plaintiff / Appellant: FRANCES T. SERRA MORALES, O.M.S., minor 3 represented by Orlando Morales and Quetcy Soler, G.C.L., minor 2 represented by Manuel Morales and Yadira Leon, BETHMARIE VAZQUEZ RODRIGUEZ, K.D.C.H., minor 1 represented by Roberto Cruz and Neysa Hernandez, WILMARIS ROBELS RIVAS, J.P.R., minor represented by Frances Rodriguez Morales, MIGUEL ANGEL MERCADO CRUZ, YADIRA LEON DIAZ, Y.S.P.R., minor represented by Sarah Mercedes Roldan and Joel Pena, J.J.C.A., minor 2 represented by Jon Paul Rodriguez and Madelyn Aponte, ISMAEL RIOS FELICIANO, AECH, minor 2 represented by Roberto Cruz and Neysa Hernandez, LETICIA CRUZ MILLAN, JOSE VIDAL ARROYO RIVERA, SAMUEL ORTIZ ORTIZ, MADELYN APONTE MARTINEZ, CARLOS G. SANTIAGO AYALA, J.L.C.A., minor 1 represented by Jon Paul Rodriguez and Madelyn Aponte, JON PAUL RODEIGUEZ FONTANEZ, DOMINO GARCIA PARRILLA, Y.I.B.R., minor represented by Sarah Roldan, J.A.R.M., minor 2 represented by Omar Mendiz and Suheily Maldonado, ROBERTO CRUZ MILLAN, MANUEL MORALES ESTRADA, RAIDZA FRAGOSA CRUZ, GERALDINE ARROYO SERRA, L.B.L., minor 1 represented by Maniel Morales and Yadira Leon, ADA BELEN AYALA BRENES, ORLANDO MORALES RIVERA, MARITZA HUERTAS PEREZ, SARAH MERCEDES ROLDAN MERCADO, LYDIA ESTHER PEREZ MAYSONET, MARIBEL MALDONADO CAMACHO, J.M.S, minor 1 represented by Orlando Morales and Quetcy Soler, QUETCY EVETTE SOLER SANTANA, NEYSA HERNANDEZ RAMIREZ, K.M.S., minor 2 represented by Orlando Morales and Quetcy Soler, OMAR MENDEZ ROSA, FRANCESCA ANNA RODRIGUEZ MORALES, A.G.R.M., minor 1 represented by Omar Mendez and Suheily Maldonado, JOSSIE FRANCHESKA COLON PEREZ, E.M.T., minor 3 represented by Manuel Morales and Yadira Leon, CARMEN LINA MORALES FELIX, SUHEILY MARIA MALDONADO, BENJAMIN RODRIGUEZ MELENDEZ and J.M.M.P., minor represented by Miguel Mercado-Cruz
Defendant / Appellee: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE and FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, as receiver for Doral Bank
Case Number: 20-1499
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Jeffrey A. Sandell for FDIC, Rebeca Barnes-Rosich for Euro Engineering Contractor, Inc., Juan Carlos Berrios-Albino for Euro Engineering Contractor, Inc., Miguel Caceres Colon for Luis M. Carrion-Lopez, Jorge Calderon-Lopez for Hector Robles-Rodriguez, Priscila Medina, Hecmary Acosta, Roberto Rosario, Shirley Roldan-Nieves, Arnaldo Rivera-Perez, Luis L. Baez, Rey Salcedo-Rodriguez, Maria R. Arroyo-Moulier, L.P.A., J.R.M., Jimmy Santiago-Diaz, Nydia E. Osorio, Maritza Gonzalez-Ramos, Orlando L. Ribot-Ruiz, Yanell Garcet-Rios, Y.L.G., K.R.O., Domingo Ribot-Ruiz, Widalys Molina-Nieves, A.B.C., M.T.M., Luis Serrano-Rodriguez, Avelys Troche-Ortiz, L.T.S., A.S.T., Francisco J. Reyes, Maria T. Leporte Negron, Jonathan Zheng, Kimberly Zheng, Xavier Zheng, Natalie Emanueli Grerna, Diana Molina Eliezer, S.H., S.S., G.B.M., Edgardo Brito-Baez, Yadira Molina-Corujo, Steven Reyes, Marta Salcedo, Julioa L. Romero-Feliciano, Nydia Mendez-Diaz, Luis Pinero-Rivera, Maria Teresa Nunez-Colon, Cesar L. Iban-Cordero, Melvin Gonzalez, Wanda Yvette Sosa, Cheryll Tidwell-LLabres and C.G.S., Ricardo Castro-Vargas for Eugenio Alemany, Eli Galarza-Rivera for Efrain Santana-Rosario, Jorge J. Lopez-Lopez for CJN Heavy Equipment, Corp., Hector A. Marmol-Lantigua for ACE Insurance Co., Rocio Ramos-Santiago for ACE Insurance Co., Arnaldo Rivera Seda for Municipality of Ceiba and Ivan J. Rodriguez Arsuaga for Universal Insurance Company. [20-1499] (GAK) [Entered: 06/18/2020 04:03 PM]
June 17, 2020 RESPONSE filed by Appellees FDIC and Federal Deposit Insurance in 20-1499, 19-2165 to motion for miscellaneous relief [ # 6345362-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 06/17/2020. [20-1499, 19-2165] (DS) [Entered: 06/17/2020 02:49 PM]
June 17, 2020 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Jeannette Lopez de Victoria for Not Parties Scotiabank de Puerto Rico, Hector Robles-Rodriguez, Priscila Medina, Hecmary Acosta, Roberto Rosario, Shirley Roldan-Nieves, Arnaldo Rivera-Perez, Luis L. Baez, Rey Salcedo-Rodriguez, Maria R. Arroyo-Moulier, L.P.A., J.R.M., Jimmy Santiago-Diaz, Nydia E. Osorio, Maritza Gonzalez-Ramos, Orlando L. Ribot-Ruiz, Yanell Garcet-Rios, Y.L.G., K.R.O., Domingo Ribot-Ruiz, Widalys Molina-Nieves, A.B.C., M.T.M., Luis Serrano-Rodriguez, Avelys Troche-Ortiz, L.T.S., A.S.T., Francisco J. Reyes, Maria T. Leporte Negron, Jonathan Zheng, Kimberly Zheng, Xavier Zheng, Natalie Emanueli Grerna, Diana Molina Eliezer, S.H., S.S., G.B.M., Edgardo Brito-Baez, Yadira Molina-Corujo, Steven Reyes, Marta Salcedo, Julioa L. Romero-Feliciano, Nydia Mendez-Diaz, Luis Pinero-Rivera, Maria Teresa Nunez-Colon, Cesar L. Iban-Cordero, Melvin Gonzalez, Wanda Yvette Sosa, Cheryll Tidwell-LLabres, C.G.S., Geovanee Lopez, Rosa A. Carrion, Luis M. Torres Rodriguez, Carla P. Andrades Gonzalez, A.T.A., X.T.A., Luz N. Hernandez-Rivera, Manuel Santana-Hernandez, Scotiabank de Puerto Rico, Hector Robles-Rodriguez, Priscila Medina, Hecmary Acosta, Roberto Rosario, Shirley Roldan-Nieves, Arnaldo Rivera-Perez, Luis L. Baez, Rey Salcedo-Rodriguez, Maria R. Arroyo-Moulier, L.P.A., J.R.M., Jimmy Santiago-Diaz, Nydia E. Osorio, Maritza Gonzalez-Ramos, Orlando L. Ribot-Ruiz, Yanell Garcet-Rios, Y.L.G., K.R.O., Domingo Ribot-Ruiz, Widalys Molina-Nieves, A.B.C., M.T.M., Luis Serrano-Rodriguez, Avelys Troche-Ortiz, L.T.S., A.S.T., Francisco J. Reyes, Maria T. Leporte Negron, Jonathan Zheng, Kimberly Zheng, Xavier Zheng, Natalie Emanueli Grerna, Diana Molina Eliezer, S.H., S.S., G.B.M., Edgardo Brito-Baez, Yadira Molina-Corujo, Steven Reyes, Marta Salcedo, Julioa L. Romero-Feliciano, Nydia Mendez-Diaz, Luis Pinero-Rivera, Maria Teresa Nunez-Colon, Cesar L. Iban-Cordero, Melvin Gonzalez, Wanda Yvette Sosa, Cheryll Tidwell-LLabres, C.G.S., Geovanee Lopez, Rosa A. Carrion, Luis M. Torres Rodriguez, Carla P. Andrades Gonzalez, A.T.A., X.T.A., Luz N. Hernandez-Rivera and Manuel Santana-Hernandez. Copy of Notice issued May 28, 2020. Forwarded to hoeman1959@live.com. [20-1499] (JMK) [Entered: 06/17/2020 10:51 AM]
June 11, 2020 MOTION that the April 15, 2020 Amended Notice of Appeal filed with the District Court (Dkt. 158) be docked in Appeal No. 19-2165 Rather than as a separate Appeal, or for relief in the alternative filed by Appellants A.G.R.M., Ada Belen Ayala Brenes, Jossie Francheska Colon Perez, Leticia Cruz Millan, G.C.L., Domino Garcia Parrilla, J.J.C.A., J.L.C.A., Bethmarie Vazquez Rodriguez and Y.S.P.R. in 20-1499, Appellants AECH, Madelyn Aponte Martinez, Jose Vidal Arroyo Rivera, Geraldine Arroyo Serra, Roberto Cruz Millan, E.M.T., Raidza Fragosa Cruz, Neysa Hernandez Ramirez, Maritza Huertas Perez, J.A.R.M., J.M.M.P., J.M.S, J.P.R., K.D.C.H., Yadira Leon Diaz, Maribel Maldonado Camacho, Suheily Maria Maldonado, Omar Mendez Rosa, Miguel Angel Mercado Cruz, Manuel Morales Estrada, Carmen Lina Morales Felix, Orlando Morales Rivera, O.M.S., Samuel Ortiz Ortiz, Lydia Esther Perez Maysonet, Ismael Rios Feliciano, Wilmaris Robels Rivas, Jon Paul Rodeiguez Fontanez, Benjamin Rodriguez Melendez, Francesca Anna Rodriguez Morales, Sarah Mercedes Roldan Mercado, Carlos G. Santiago Ayala, Frances T. Serra Morales, Quetcy Evette Soler Santana and Y.I.B.R. in 19-2165. Certificate of service dated 06/11/2020. [20-1499, 19-2165] (MCM) [Entered: 06/11/2020 11:47 PM]
June 9, 2020 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Arnaldo Rivera Seda for Not Party Municipality of Ceiba. Copy of Order entered May 28, 2020. Forwarding address unknown. [20-1499] (JMK) [Entered: 06/19/2020 01:42 PM]
June 9, 2020 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Arnaldo Rivera Seda for Not Party Municipality of Ceiba. Copy of Notice issued May 28, 2020. Forwarding address unknown. [20-1499] (JMK) [Entered: 06/19/2020 01:41 PM]
June 8, 2020 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Jeannette Lopez de Victoria for Not Parties Scotiabank de Puerto Rico, Hector Robles-Rodriguez, Priscila Medina, Hecmary Acosta, Roberto Rosario, Shirley Roldan-Nieves, Arnaldo Rivera-Perez, Luis L. Baez, Rey Salcedo-Rodriguez, Maria R. Arroyo-Moulier, L.P.A., J.R.M., Jimmy Santiago-Diaz, Nydia E. Osorio, Maritza Gonzalez-Ramos, Orlando L. Ribot-Ruiz, Yanell Garcet-Rios, Y.L.G., K.R.O., Domingo Ribot-Ruiz, Widalys Molina-Nieves, A.B.C., M.T.M., Luis Serrano-Rodriguez, Avelys Troche-Ortiz, L.T.S., A.S.T., Francisco J. Reyes, Maria T. Leporte Negron, Jonathan Zheng, Kimberly Zheng, Xavier Zheng, Natalie Emanueli Grerna, Diana Molina Eliezer, S.H., S.S., G.B.M., Edgardo Brito-Baez, Yadira Molina-Corujo, Steven Reyes, Marta Salcedo, Julioa L. Romero-Feliciano, Nydia Mendez-Diaz, Luis Pinero-Rivera, Maria Teresa Nunez-Colon, Cesar L. Iban-Cordero, Melvin Gonzalez, Wanda Yvette Sosa, Cheryll Tidwell-LLabres, C.G.S., Geovanee Lopez, Rosa A. Carrion, Luis M. Torres Rodriguez, Carla P. Andrades Gonzalez, A.T.A., X.T.A., Luz N. Hernandez-Rivera, Manuel Santana-Hernandez, Scotiabank de Puerto Rico, Hector Robles-Rodriguez, Priscila Medina, Hecmary Acosta, Roberto Rosario, Shirley Roldan-Nieves, Arnaldo Rivera-Perez, Luis L. Baez, Rey Salcedo-Rodriguez, Maria R. Arroyo-Moulier, L.P.A., J.R.M., Jimmy Santiago-Diaz, Nydia E. Osorio, Maritza Gonzalez-Ramos, Orlando L. Ribot-Ruiz, Yanell Garcet-Rios, Y.L.G., K.R.O., Domingo Ribot-Ruiz, Widalys Molina-Nieves, A.B.C., M.T.M., Luis Serrano-Rodriguez, Avelys Troche-Ortiz, L.T.S., A.S.T., Francisco J. Reyes, Maria T. Leporte Negron, Jonathan Zheng, Kimberly Zheng, Xavier Zheng, Natalie Emanueli Grerna, Diana Molina Eliezer, S.H., S.S., G.B.M., Edgardo Brito-Baez, Yadira Molina-Corujo, Steven Reyes, Marta Salcedo, Julioa L. Romero-Feliciano, Nydia Mendez-Diaz, Luis Pinero-Rivera, Maria Teresa Nunez-Colon, Cesar L. Iban-Cordero, Melvin Gonzalez, Wanda Yvette Sosa, Cheryll Tidwell-LLabres, C.G.S., Geovanee Lopez, Rosa A. Carrion, Luis M. Torres Rodriguez, Carla P. Andrades Gonzalez, A.T.A., X.T.A., Luz N. Hernandez-Rivera and Manuel Santana-Hernandez. Copy of Order issued May 28, 2020. Forwarded to hoeman1959@live.com. [20-1499] (JMK) [Entered: 06/17/2020 10:49 AM]
May 28, 2020 NOTICE issued. After 06/11/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Jeffrey A. Sandell for FDIC, Rebeca Barnes-Rosich for Euro Engineering Contractor, Inc., Juan Carlos Berrios-Albino for Euro Engineering Contractor, Inc., Miguel Caceres Colon for Luis M. Carrion-Lopez, Jorge Calderon-Lopez for Hector Robles-Rodriguez, Priscila Medina, Hecmary Acosta, Roberto Rosario, Shirley Roldan-Nieves, Arnaldo Rivera-Perez, Luis L. Baez, Rey Salcedo-Rodriguez, Maria R. Arroyo-Moulier, L.P.A., J.R.M., Jimmy Santiago-Diaz, Nydia E. Osorio, Maritza Gonzalez-Ramos, Orlando L. Ribot-Ruiz, Yanell Garcet-Rios, Y.L.G., K.R.O., Domingo Ribot-Ruiz, Widalys Molina-Nieves, A.B.C., M.T.M., Luis Serrano-Rodriguez, Avelys Troche-Ortiz, L.T.S., A.S.T., Francisco J. Reyes, Maria T. Leporte Negron, Jonathan Zheng, Kimberly Zheng, Xavier Zheng, Natalie Emanueli Grerna, Diana Molina Eliezer, S.H., S.S., G.B.M., Edgardo Brito-Baez, Yadira Molina-Corujo, Steven Reyes, Marta Salcedo, Julioa L. Romero-Feliciano, Nydia Mendez-Diaz, Luis Pinero-Rivera, Maria Teresa Nunez-Colon, Cesar L. Iban-Cordero, Melvin Gonzalez, Wanda Yvette Sosa, Cheryll Tidwell-LLabres and C.G.S., Ricardo Castro-Vargas for Eugenio Alemany, Eli Galarza-Rivera for Efrain Santana-Rosario, Jeannette M. Lopez for Scotiabank de Puerto Rico, Hector Robles-Rodriguez, Priscila Medina, Hecmary Acosta, Roberto Rosario, Shirley Roldan-Nieves, Arnaldo Rivera-Perez, Luis L. Baez, Rey Salcedo-Rodriguez, Maria R. Arroyo-Moulier, L.P.A., J.R.M., Jimmy Santiago-Diaz, Nydia E. Osorio, Maritza Gonzalez-Ramos, Orlando L. Ribot-Ruiz, Yanell Garcet-Rios, Y.L.G., K.R.O., Domingo Ribot-Ruiz, Widalys Molina-Nieves, A.B.C., M.T.M., Luis Serrano-Rodriguez, Avelys Troche-Ortiz, L.T.S., A.S.T., Francisco J. Reyes, Maria T. Leporte Negron, Jonathan Zheng, Kimberly Zheng, Xavier Zheng, Natalie Emanueli Grerna, Diana Molina Eliezer, S.H., S.S., G.B.M., Edgardo Brito-Baez, Yadira Molina-Corujo, Steven Reyes, Marta Salcedo, Julioa L. Romero-Feliciano, Nydia Mendez-Diaz, Luis Pinero-Rivera, Maria Teresa Nunez-Colon, Cesar L. Iban-Cordero, Melvin Gonzalez, Wanda Yvette Sosa, Cheryll Tidwell-LLabres, C.G.S., Geovanee Lopez, Rosa A. Carrion, Luis M. Torres Rodriguez, Carla P. Andrades Gonzalez, A.T.A., X.T.A., Luz N. Hernandez-Rivera and Manuel Santana-Hernandez, Jorge J. Lopez-Lopez for CJN Heavy Equipment, Corp., Hector A. Marmol-Lantigua for ACE Insurance Co., Rocio Ramos-Santiago for ACE Insurance Co., Arnaldo Rivera Seda for Municipality of Ceiba, Ivan J. Rodriguez Arsuaga for Universal Insurance Company and Yasmin R. Vazquez Vazquez for Scotiabank of PR. [20-1499] (GAK) [Entered: 05/28/2020 03:33 PM]
May 28, 2020 NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellants are directed to file an appearance form and docketing statement or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Appearance form and docketing statement due 06/11/2020. [20-1499] (GAK) [Entered: 05/28/2020 01:32 PM]
May 7, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FDIC and Federal Deposit Insurance filed by Attorney Duncan N. Stevens. Certificate of service dated 05/07/2020. [20-1499] (DS) [Entered: 05/07/2020 10:44 AM]
May 6, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #158) filed by Appellants A.G.R.M., AECH, Madelyn Aponte Martinez, Jose Vidal Arroyo Rivera, Geraldine Arroyo Serra, Ada Belen Ayala Brenes, Jossie Francheska Colon Perez, Leticia Cruz Millan, Roberto Cruz Millan, E.M.T., Raidza Fragosa Cruz, G.C.L., Domino Garcia Parrilla, Neysa Hernandez Ramirez, Maritza Huertas Perez, J.A.R.M., J.J.C.A., J.L.C.A., J.M.M.P., J.M.S, J.P.R., K.D.C.H., K.M.S., L.B.L., Yadira Leon Diaz, Suheily Maria Maldonado, Maribel Maldonado Camacho, Omar Mendez Rosa, Miguel Angel Mercado Cruz, Manuel Morales Estrada, Carmen Lina Morales Felix, Orlando Morales Rivera, O.M.S., Samuel Ortiz Ortiz, Lydia Esther Perez Maysonet, Ismael Rios Feliciano, Wilmaris Robels Rivas, Jon Paul Rodeiguez Fontanez, Benjamin Rodriguez Melendez, Francesca Anna Rodriguez Morales, Sarah Mercedes Roldan Mercado, Carlos G. Santiago Ayala, Frances T. Serra Morales, Quetcy Evette Soler Santana, Bethmarie Vazquez Rodriguez, Y.I.B.R. and Y.S.P.R..Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Filing fee due 05/20/2020. [20-1499] (GAK) [Entered: 05/06/2020 03:43 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Cruz Millan, et al v. Federal Deposit Insurance, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EFRAIN BURGOS LOPEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN ZHENG
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.S.C., minor represented by Luis Carrion-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.D.G., minor 2 represented by Thais Nahir Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS M. TORRES RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.T.L., minor represented by Jelissa Lomboy Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOEL OLIVO MIRANDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O.M.M., minor 1 represented by Jean Carlos Maldonado and O'Neilly Machado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEAN CARLOS MALDONADO TIBURCIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NYDIA E. OSORIO
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS L. BAEZ
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XAVIER ZHENG
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORLANDO JUNIOR ARAGONES TORRES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUILLERMO M. LUGO ROSARIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VANESSA COLON DELGADO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.D.G., minor 1 represented by Thais Nahir Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICCIA M. BURGOS AVILLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.O.R., minor 1 represented by Jorge Ocasio and Ashley Mercedez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN REYES
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NIXZALYS REINOSA DIAZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.M.P., minor represented by Joseph Morales and Amy Pinero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.O.R., minor 2 represented by Jorge Ocasio and Ashley Mercedez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIRMA PARRILLA BECERRILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.M.C., minor 3 represented by Marisely Cruz Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEX EMANUEL RIVERA RIVERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRIS NATALIA MACIEL LENCINAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GIOVANNI OLIVO OTERO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.R.O., minor 2 represented by Orlando Ribot and Yanell Garcet
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CANDY YAHAIRA DIAZ RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS R. ARENAS VAZQUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMY N. PINERO LOPEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERWIN E. COUVERTIER MENDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRVIN ISMAEL CARRILLO ORTIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EFREN FIGUEROA BENITEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIZZY M. SIERRA ORTIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORGE PEREZ SANTIAGO
Represented By: Jorge Perez Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM D. CUADRADO RAMIREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.B.M., minor represented by Edgardo Brito and Yadira Molina
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY ZHENG
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WANDA YVETTE SOSA
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELVIN GONZALEZ
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.O.C., minor 2 represented by Candy Yahaira Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUZ N. HERNANDEZ-RIVERA
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.M.C., minor 1 represented by Marisely Cruz Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.B.R., minor 1 represented by Luis Jose Burgos and Nixzalys Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA R. ARROYO-MOULIER
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIRLEY ROLDAN-NIEVES
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.P.R., minor represented by Tania Rexach-Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLA P. ANDRADES GONZALEZ
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARMEN G. REYES BERMUDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NELSON J. GERADINO ROLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRALYS SABRINA GARCIA, a/k/a Iralys Sanabria Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ONEILL RODRIGUEZ LAUREANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAFAEL ANTONIO LORA ROSARIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CESAR L. IBAN-CORDERO
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JELISSA LOMBOY MENDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABRAHAM OTERO VIDAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORMA ROSADO RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YADIRA MOLINA-CORUJO
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.O.V., minor represented by Juan Luis Otero and Elisa Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVELYN GARCIA MELENDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS PINERO-RIVERA
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARITZA GONZALEZ-RAMOS
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERTO ROSARIO
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS A. RODRIGUEZ SERRANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA T. LEPORTE NEGRON
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.C.M., minor represented by William Cuadrado and Miriel Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CECILIO REYES MATOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTIABANK DE PUERTO RICO, title holder
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.T.M., minor 2 represented by Dimingo Ribot and Widalys Molina
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.S., minor 2 represented by Diana Molina
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.F.N., minor 1 represented by Mercedes Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.B.C., minor 1 represented by Dimingo Ribot and Widalys Molina
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: X.T.A., minor 2 represented by Luis Torres and Carla Andrades
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUILLERMO LUGO ESPINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TANIA REXACH TORRES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELEISON TIRADO MOLINARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.B.R., minor 2 represented by Luis Jose Burgos and Nixzalys Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEY MERCEDEZ RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.R.O., minor 3 represented by Orlando Ribot and Yanell Garcet
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YANELL GARCET-RIOS
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA ISABEL NARVAEZ ORTIZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISEAEL O'NEILL ROSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLAS A. LEBRON MIRANDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.S.C., minor 2 represented by Vanessa Colon Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS M. SANTIAGO HUERTAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.V.N., minor 2 represented by Mercedes Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERLIANN CARRILLO OSIRIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.M.C., minor 2 represented by Marisely Cruz Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARISELY CRUZ RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.G.R., minor represented by Nelson G. Gerardino Narvaez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESUS MENDEZ DIAZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HECTOR ROBLES-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y.L.G., minor 1 represented by Orlando Ribot and Yanell Garcet
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REY SALCEDO-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.H., minor 1 represented by Diana Molina
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.G.S., minor represented by Nelson E. Gerardo Narvaez and Lizzy M Sierra Ortiz
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.L.S., minor represented by Lizzy M. Sierra Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIOA L. ROMERO-FELICIANO
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORGE LUIS OCASIO RIVERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.R.D., minor 1 represented by Candy Yahaira Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN MACKENZIE MARIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.C.C., minor 2 represented by Erwin Couvertier and Jeliann Carrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.S.C., minor 1 represented by Vanessa Colon Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSA IVETTE PARDO RIOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZAISKA ANNETTE ALGARIN CASTRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.M.M., minor 2 represented by Jean Carlos Maldonado and O'Neilly Machado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMIE SANZ ESTRELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NELSON TORRES COLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS JOSE BURGOS VELASQUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.L.R.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.L.S., minor 2 represented by Iralys Sanabria and Blas Lebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.B.R., minor represented by Luz Vanessa Rivera Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSA A. CARRION
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.P.A., minor represented by Maria R. Arroyo-Moulier
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NYDIA MENDEZ-DIAZ
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCEDES NIEVES FRANCIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE R. PACHECO RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOEL PENA UECHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THAIS NAHIR GARCIA RESTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.M.M., minor 2 represented by Juan MacKensie and Iris Maciel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH MORALES PEREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.M.P., minor 2 represented by Glorirma Parrilla Becerrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.M.P., minor 1 represented by Glorirma Parrilla Becerrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.C.C., minor 1 represented by Edwin Couvertier and Jerliann Carrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.L.S., minor 1 represented by Iralys Sanabria and Blas Lebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O'NEILLY MARCHADO ILARRAZA, a/k/a O'Neilly Machado Ilarraza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBA NIDIA CANCEL CARRERO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDGARDO BRITO-BAEZ
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AVELYS TROCHE-ORTIZ
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.T.A., minor 1 represented by Luis Torres and Carla Andrades
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS SERRANO-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCO J. REYES
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS FUENTES LEBRON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA TERESA NUNEZ-COLON
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE LABOY DAVILA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULEYSHA M. CRUZ CRUZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEREIDA CASILLAS CORDERO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y.O.R., minor 1 represented by Carmen Reyes and Abraham Otero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARNALDO RIVERA-PEREZ
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA ZACHEUS CONDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.S.T., minor 2 represented by Luis Serrano and Avelys Troche
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTA SALCEDO
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEOVANEE LOPEZ
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.R.M., minor 2 represented by Hector Robles and Priscila Medina
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.T.S., minor 1 represented by Luis Serrano and Avelys Troche
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HECMARY ACOSTA
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH M. LOPEZ SIERRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIRIEL D. MERCADO GONZALEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.O.C., minor represented by Joel Olivo Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUZ VANESSA RIVERA MARTINEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMINGO RIBOT-RUIZ
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.R.M., minor 1 represented by Hector Robles and Priscila Medina
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSA I. FERNANDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIMMY SANTIAGO-DIAZ
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.O.R., minor 2 represented by Carmen Reyes and Abraham Otero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN LUIS OTERO VIDAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRISCILA MEDINA
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORLANDO L. RIBOT-RUIZ
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA RIVERA DIAZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NELSON E. GERADINO NAVAEZ, a/k/a Nelson E. Gerardino Narvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.M.M., minor 1 represented by Juan MacKensie and Iris Maciel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WIDALYS MOLINA-NIEVES
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZA JINET VAZQUEZ MARTINEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANA MOLINA ELIEZER
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYLL TIDWELL-LLABRES
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGEL R. MENDEZ RIVERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.V.N., minor 3 represented by Mercedes Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEISCHIE ANN SANTOS FERNANDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATALIE EMANUELI GRERNA
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Calderon-Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANUEL SANTANA-HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Jeannette Lopez de Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS M. CARRION-LOPEZ
Represented By: Miguel Caceres Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MANUEL BATISTA-DE LA ROSA
Represented By: Manuel Batista-De la Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SHIRLEY A. TEJADA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRANCES T. SERRA MORALES
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: O.M.S., minor 3 represented by Orlando Morales and Quetcy Soler
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: G.C.L., minor 2 represented by Manuel Morales and Yadira Leon
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BETHMARIE VAZQUEZ RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: K.D.C.H., minor 1 represented by Roberto Cruz and Neysa Hernandez
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILMARIS ROBELS RIVAS
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: J.P.R., minor represented by Frances Rodriguez Morales
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MIGUEL ANGEL MERCADO CRUZ
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: YADIRA LEON DIAZ
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Y.S.P.R., minor represented by Sarah Mercedes Roldan and Joel Pena
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: J.J.C.A., minor 2 represented by Jon Paul Rodriguez and Madelyn Aponte
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ISMAEL RIOS FELICIANO
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AECH, minor 2 represented by Roberto Cruz and Neysa Hernandez
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LETICIA CRUZ MILLAN
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE VIDAL ARROYO RIVERA
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SAMUEL ORTIZ ORTIZ
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MADELYN APONTE MARTINEZ
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARLOS G. SANTIAGO AYALA
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: J.L.C.A., minor 1 represented by Jon Paul Rodriguez and Madelyn Aponte
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JON PAUL RODEIGUEZ FONTANEZ
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DOMINO GARCIA PARRILLA
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Y.I.B.R., minor represented by Sarah Roldan
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: J.A.R.M., minor 2 represented by Omar Mendiz and Suheily Maldonado
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERTO CRUZ MILLAN
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MANUEL MORALES ESTRADA
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RAIDZA FRAGOSA CRUZ
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GERALDINE ARROYO SERRA
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: L.B.L., minor 1 represented by Maniel Morales and Yadira Leon
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ADA BELEN AYALA BRENES
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ORLANDO MORALES RIVERA
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARITZA HUERTAS PEREZ
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SARAH MERCEDES ROLDAN MERCADO
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LYDIA ESTHER PEREZ MAYSONET
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARIBEL MALDONADO CAMACHO
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: J.M.S, minor 1 represented by Orlando Morales and Quetcy Soler
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: QUETCY EVETTE SOLER SANTANA
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NEYSA HERNANDEZ RAMIREZ
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: K.M.S., minor 2 represented by Orlando Morales and Quetcy Soler
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: OMAR MENDEZ ROSA
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRANCESCA ANNA RODRIGUEZ MORALES
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: A.G.R.M., minor 1 represented by Omar Mendez and Suheily Maldonado
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSSIE FRANCHESKA COLON PEREZ
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: E.M.T., minor 3 represented by Manuel Morales and Yadira Leon
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARMEN LINA MORALES FELIX
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SUHEILY MARIA MALDONADO
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BENJAMIN RODRIGUEZ MELENDEZ
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: J.M.M.P., minor represented by Miguel Mercado-Cruz
Represented By: Damaris Delgado-Vega
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MULTINATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Maria Eugenia Calderon-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HF ENGINEERING CONSULTING GROUP, PSC
Represented By: Luis Gabriel Martinez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G2 CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT LLC
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EUGENIO ALEMANY
Represented By: Ricardo Castro-Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EFRAIN SANTANA-ROSARIO
Represented By: Eli Galarza-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.Q.D.M., PSC
Represented By: Nelson N. Cordova-Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTONIO HERNANDEZ CRUZ
Represented By: Luis Gabriel Martinez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.C.R.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTIABANK OF PR, mortgage creditor
Represented By: Yasmin R. Vazquez Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAUTISTA REO PR CORP.
Represented By: Antonio L. Roig-Lorenzo
Represented By: Omayra Sepulveda-Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TECNICIA DESIGN GROUP, PSC, a/k/a Teknica Design
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRAZAS DE CEIBA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: Rocio Ramos-Santiago
Represented By: Hector A. Marmol-Lantigua
Represented By: Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUNICIPALITY OF CEIBA
Represented By: Arnaldo Rivera Seda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JORGE L. ROBERT
Represented By: Nelson N. Cordova-Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSTRUCCIONES YAMALI, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWIN DISAL DEL LA MOTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLACK POINT MANAGEMENT LLC
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Sergio A. Ramirez-de-Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVELYN TORRES-GONZALEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JORGE GONZALES-FUENTES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EUGENIO ALEMANY & ASOCIADOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANTERINI CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EURO ENGINEERING CONTRACTOR, INC.
Represented By: Juan Carlos Berrios-Albino
Represented By: Rebeca Barnes-Rosich
Represented By: Sonia Samara Sierra-Sepulveda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANCO POPULAR DE PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Luis F. Juarbe Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CJN HEAVY EQUIPMENT, CORP.
Represented By: Jorge J. Lopez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOMMY FIGUEROA-ROSARIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Roberto del Toro Morales
Represented By: Ivan J. Rodriguez Arsuaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLACK POINT PR LLC
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE
Represented By: Russell Del Toro-Parra III
Represented By: Manuel Fernandez-Bared
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, as receiver for Doral Bank
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Sandell
Represented By: Duncan Stevens
Represented By: Russell Del Toro-Parra III
Represented By: Manuel Fernandez-Bared
Represented By: J. Scott Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?