Bollat Vasquez, et al v. Wolf, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: J.C., LUISA M. VASQUEZ PEREZ DE BOLLAT, ANDRES OSWALDO BOLLAT VASQUEZ, individually and as next friend to Luisa Marisol Vasquez Perez de Bollat, and as father and next friend to A.B., SALOME OLMOS LOPEZ, individually and as next friend to Evila Floridalma Colaj Olmos, and J.C., JOSE M. URIAS MARTINEZ, individually and as next friend to Rosa Maria Martinez de Urias, ROSA M. MARTINEZ DE URIAS, EVILA F. COLAJ OLMOS, A.B., LUISA MARISOL VASQUEZ PEREZ DE BOLLAT, EVILA FLORIDALMA COLAJ OLMOS, ROSA MARIA MARTINEZ DE URIAS and JOSE MANUEL URIAS MARTINEZ, individually and as next friend to Rosa Maria Martinez de Urias
Defendant / Appellant: MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, CHAD F. WOLF, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, PRESIDENT DONALD J. TRUMP, MARK A. MORGAN, Acting Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection, WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General and KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, senior official in charge of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Amicus Curiae: DAVID ROBINSON, JUSTICE CENTER OF SOUTHEAST MASSACHUSETTS, KIDS IN NEED OF DEFENSE, JAMES O'BRIEN, ORGANIZACION MAYA KICHE, HEATHER A. HIGGINBOTTOM, MASSACHUSETTS LAW REFORM INSTITUTE, DANA SHELL SMITH, AMY POPE, NANCY ELY-RAPHEL, DAN RESTREPO, BRAZILIAN WOMEN'S GROUP, GREATER BOSTON LEGAL SERVICES, DENOVO CENTER FOR JUSTICE AND HEALING, THOMAS R. PICKERING, STROBE TALBOTT, ARTURO VALENZUELA, ANNE W. PATTERSON, ANNE C. RICHARD, IMMIGRANT LEGAL ADVOCACY PROJECT, ROBERTA S. JACOBSON, NATIONAL CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES COUNCIL 119, HARVARD IMMIGRATION AND REFUGEE CLINICAL PROGRAM, CHILDREN'S LAW CENTER OF MASSACHUSETTS, INC., DANIEL FELDMAN, CATHOLIC CHARITABLE BUREAU OF THE ARCHDIOCESE OF BOSTON, INC., CHRISTOPHER R. HILL, NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW IMMIGRANT JUSTICE CLINIC, VIKRAM J. SINGH, WENDY R. SHERMAN, CATHOLIC LEGAL IMMIGRATION NETWORK, INC., MASSACHUSETTS IMMIGRANT AND REFUGEE ADVOCACY COALITION, BATHSHEBA CROCKER, CHELSEA COLLABORATIVE, INC., MATTHEW OLSEN, BOSTON COLLEGE LAW SCHOOL IMMIGRATION CLINIC, JEFFREY PRESCOTT, JAMES CLAPPER, JANET NAPOLITANO and BOSTON UNIVERSITY LAW SCHOOL IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS AND HUMAN TRAFFICKING PROGRAM
Case Number: 20-1554
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees A.B., Andres Oswaldo Bollat Vasquez, Evila F. Colaj Olmos, J.C., Rosa M. Martinez de Urias, Salome Olmos Lopez, Jose M. Urias Martinez and Luisa M. Vasquez Perez de Bollat filed by Attorney Adriana Lafaille. Certificate of service dated 06/26/2020. [20-1554] (AL) [Entered: 06/26/2020 01:24 PM]
June 26, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees A.B., Andres Oswaldo Bollat Vasquez, Evila F. Colaj Olmos, J.C., Rosa M. Martinez de Urias, Salome Olmos Lopez, Jose M. Urias Martinez and Luisa M. Vasquez Perez de Bollat filed by Attorney Matthew R. Segal. Certificate of service dated 06/26/2020. [20-1554] (MRS) [Entered: 06/26/2020 01:28 PM]
June 26, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees A.B., Andres Oswaldo Bollat Vasquez, Evila F. Colaj Olmos, J.C., Rosa M. Martinez de Urias, Salome Olmos Lopez, Jose M. Urias Martinez and Luisa M. Vasquez Perez de Bollat filed by Attorney Kristin M. Mulvey. Certificate of service dated 06/26/2020. [20-1554] (KMM) [Entered: 06/26/2020 01:59 PM]
June 26, 2020 APPENDIX tendered by Appellants Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Mark A. Morgan, Donald J. Trump and Chad F. Wolf. Certificate of service dated 06/26/2020. [20-1554] (AR) [Entered: 06/26/2020 04:58 PM]
June 26, 2020 BRIEF tendered by Appellants Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Mark A. Morgan, Donald J. Trump and Chad F. Wolf. [20-1554] (AR) [Entered: 06/26/2020 04:46 PM]
June 23, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees A.B., Andres Oswaldo Bollat Vasquez, Evila F. Colaj Olmos, J.C., Rosa M. Martinez de Urias, Salome Olmos Lopez, Jose M. Urias Martinez and Luisa M. Vasquez Perez de Bollat filed by Attorney Adam J. Kessel. Certificate of service dated 06/23/2020. [20-1554] (AJK) [Entered: 06/23/2020 03:35 PM]
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge: Appellants' Motion to Expedite is resolved as follows: (1) the government shall file its brief and appendix no later than June 26, 2020; (2) plaintiffs shall file their brief on or before July 27, 2020; (3) the government's reply shall be filed no later than fourteen days after plaintiffs file their brief. Motions to extend any of these deadlines will be disfavored. Argument will be scheduled as appropriate. [20-1554] (GRC) [Entered: 06/23/2020 02:14 PM]
June 23, 2020 REPLY filed by Appellants Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Mark A. Morgan, Donald J. Trump and Chad F. Wolf to response [ # 6347416-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 06/23/2020. [20-1554] (AR) [Entered: 06/23/2020 09:36 AM]
June 22, 2020 RESPONSE filed by Appellees A.B., Andres Oswaldo Bollat Vasquez, Evila F. Colaj Olmos, J.C., Rosa M. Martinez de Urias, Salome Olmos Lopez, Jose M. Urias Martinez and Luisa M. Vasquez Perez de Bollat to motion [ # 6347039-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 06/22/2020. [20-1554] (AJK) [Entered: 06/22/2020 05:24 PM]
June 22, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Mark A. Morgan, Donald J. Trump and Chad F. Wolf. Certificate of service dated 06/22/2020. [20-1554] (AR) [Entered: 06/22/2020 10:56 AM]
June 19, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Mark A. Morgan, Donald J. Trump and Chad F. Wolf filed by Attorney Archith Ramkumar. Certificate of service dated 06/19/2020. [20-1554] (AR) [Entered: 06/19/2020 01:39 PM]
June 19, 2020 MOTION to expeditefiled by Appellants Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Mark A. Morgan, Donald J. Trump and Chad F. Wolf. Certificate of service dated 06/19/2020. [20-1554] (AR) [Entered: 06/19/2020 02:38 PM]
June 19, 2020 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Mark A. Morgan, Chad F. Wolf and Donald J. Trump indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 06/19/2020. [20-1554] (AR) [Entered: 06/19/2020 02:43 PM]
June 19, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #49) filed by Appellants Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Mark A. Morgan, Donald J. Trump and Chad F. Wolf. Docketing Statement due 07/06/2020. Transcript Report/Order form due 07/06/2020. Appearance form due 07/06/2020. [20-1554] (AL) [Entered: 06/19/2020 01:26 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Bollat Vasquez, et al v. Wolf, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: J.C.
Represented By: Adam J. Kessel
Represented By: Kristin Marie Mulvey
Represented By: Matthew R. Segal
Represented By: Eda Stark
Represented By: Adriana Lafaille
Represented By: Proshanto Mukherji
Represented By: Jacob B. Pecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LUISA M. VASQUEZ PEREZ DE BOLLAT
Represented By: Adam J. Kessel
Represented By: Kristin Marie Mulvey
Represented By: Matthew R. Segal
Represented By: Eda Stark
Represented By: Adriana Lafaille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANDRES OSWALDO BOLLAT VASQUEZ, individually and as next friend to Luisa Marisol Vasquez Perez de Bollat, and as father and next friend to A.B.
Represented By: Adam J. Kessel
Represented By: Kristin Marie Mulvey
Represented By: Matthew R. Segal
Represented By: Eda Stark
Represented By: Adriana Lafaille
Represented By: Proshanto Mukherji
Represented By: Jacob B. Pecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SALOME OLMOS LOPEZ, individually and as next friend to Evila Floridalma Colaj Olmos, and J.C.
Represented By: Adam J. Kessel
Represented By: Kristin Marie Mulvey
Represented By: Matthew R. Segal
Represented By: Eda Stark
Represented By: Adriana Lafaille
Represented By: Proshanto Mukherji
Represented By: Jacob B. Pecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOSE M. URIAS MARTINEZ, individually and as next friend to Rosa Maria Martinez de Urias
Represented By: Adam J. Kessel
Represented By: Kristin Marie Mulvey
Represented By: Matthew R. Segal
Represented By: Eda Stark
Represented By: Adriana Lafaille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROSA M. MARTINEZ DE URIAS
Represented By: Adam J. Kessel
Represented By: Kristin Marie Mulvey
Represented By: Matthew R. Segal
Represented By: Eda Stark
Represented By: Adriana Lafaille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EVILA F. COLAJ OLMOS
Represented By: Adam J. Kessel
Represented By: Kristin Marie Mulvey
Represented By: Matthew R. Segal
Represented By: Eda Stark
Represented By: Adriana Lafaille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: A.B.
Represented By: Adam J. Kessel
Represented By: Kristin Marie Mulvey
Represented By: Matthew R. Segal
Represented By: Eda Stark
Represented By: Adriana Lafaille
Represented By: Proshanto Mukherji
Represented By: Jacob B. Pecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LUISA MARISOL VASQUEZ PEREZ DE BOLLAT
Represented By: Adam J. Kessel
Represented By: Kristin Marie Mulvey
Represented By: Matthew R. Segal
Represented By: Eda Stark
Represented By: Adriana Lafaille
Represented By: Proshanto Mukherji
Represented By: Jacob B. Pecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EVILA FLORIDALMA COLAJ OLMOS
Represented By: Adam J. Kessel
Represented By: Kristin Marie Mulvey
Represented By: Matthew R. Segal
Represented By: Eda Stark
Represented By: Adriana Lafaille
Represented By: Proshanto Mukherji
Represented By: Jacob B. Pecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROSA MARIA MARTINEZ DE URIAS
Represented By: Adam J. Kessel
Represented By: Kristin Marie Mulvey
Represented By: Matthew R. Segal
Represented By: Eda Stark
Represented By: Adriana Lafaille
Represented By: Proshanto Mukherji
Represented By: Jacob B. Pecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOSE MANUEL URIAS MARTINEZ, individually and as next friend to Rosa Maria Martinez de Urias
Represented By: Adam J. Kessel
Represented By: Kristin Marie Mulvey
Represented By: Matthew R. Segal
Represented By: Eda Stark
Represented By: Adriana Lafaille
Represented By: Proshanto Mukherji
Represented By: Jacob B. Pecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MATTHEW T. ALBENCE
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: Erin Brizius
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Represented By: Ricardo J. Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CHAD F. WOLF, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: Erin Brizius
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Represented By: Ricardo J. Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PRESIDENT DONALD J. TRUMP
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: Erin Brizius
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Represented By: Ricardo J. Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARK A. MORGAN, Acting Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: Erin Brizius
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Represented By: Ricardo J. Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: Erin Brizius
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Represented By: Ricardo J. Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, senior official in charge of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: Erin Brizius
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Represented By: Ricardo J. Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DAVID ROBINSON
Represented By: Noah A. Levine
Represented By: Phillip Spector
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Represented By: Robin C. Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JUSTICE CENTER OF SOUTHEAST MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Nancy Jean Kelly
Represented By: John Edward Willshire-Carrera
Represented By: Joshua M. Daniels
Represented By: Sabrineh Ardalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KIDS IN NEED OF DEFENSE
Represented By: Nancy Jean Kelly
Represented By: John Edward Willshire-Carrera
Represented By: Joshua M. Daniels
Represented By: Sabrineh Ardalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JAMES O'BRIEN
Represented By: Noah A. Levine
Represented By: Phillip Spector
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Represented By: Robin C. Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ORGANIZACION MAYA KICHE
Represented By: Nancy Jean Kelly
Represented By: John Edward Willshire-Carrera
Represented By: Joshua M. Daniels
Represented By: Sabrineh Ardalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HEATHER A. HIGGINBOTTOM
Represented By: Noah A. Levine
Represented By: Phillip Spector
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Represented By: Robin C. Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MASSACHUSETTS LAW REFORM INSTITUTE
Represented By: Nancy Jean Kelly
Represented By: John Edward Willshire-Carrera
Represented By: Joshua M. Daniels
Represented By: Sabrineh Ardalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DANA SHELL SMITH
Represented By: Noah A. Levine
Represented By: Phillip Spector
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Represented By: Robin C. Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMY POPE
Represented By: Noah A. Levine
Represented By: Phillip Spector
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Represented By: Robin C. Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NANCY ELY-RAPHEL
Represented By: Noah A. Levine
Represented By: Phillip Spector
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Represented By: Robin C. Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DAN RESTREPO
Represented By: Noah A. Levine
Represented By: Phillip Spector
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Represented By: Robin C. Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRAZILIAN WOMEN'S GROUP
Represented By: Nancy Jean Kelly
Represented By: John Edward Willshire-Carrera
Represented By: Joshua M. Daniels
Represented By: Sabrineh Ardalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GREATER BOSTON LEGAL SERVICES
Represented By: Nancy Jean Kelly
Represented By: John Edward Willshire-Carrera
Represented By: Joshua M. Daniels
Represented By: Sabrineh Ardalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DENOVO CENTER FOR JUSTICE AND HEALING
Represented By: Nancy Jean Kelly
Represented By: John Edward Willshire-Carrera
Represented By: Joshua M. Daniels
Represented By: Sabrineh Ardalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THOMAS R. PICKERING
Represented By: Noah A. Levine
Represented By: Phillip Spector
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Represented By: Robin C. Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STROBE TALBOTT
Represented By: Noah A. Levine
Represented By: Phillip Spector
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Represented By: Robin C. Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ARTURO VALENZUELA
Represented By: Noah A. Levine
Represented By: Phillip Spector
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Represented By: Robin C. Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ANNE W. PATTERSON
Represented By: Noah A. Levine
Represented By: Phillip Spector
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Represented By: Robin C. Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ANNE C. RICHARD
Represented By: Noah A. Levine
Represented By: Phillip Spector
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Represented By: Robin C. Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: IMMIGRANT LEGAL ADVOCACY PROJECT
Represented By: Nancy Jean Kelly
Represented By: John Edward Willshire-Carrera
Represented By: Joshua M. Daniels
Represented By: Sabrineh Ardalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ROBERTA S. JACOBSON
Represented By: Noah A. Levine
Represented By: Phillip Spector
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Represented By: Robin C. Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES COUNCIL 119
Represented By: Muhammad Usman Faridi
Represented By: Roberto L. DiMarco
Represented By: George B. Fleming
Represented By: Jennifer Martin Foster
Represented By: Robert Quirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HARVARD IMMIGRATION AND REFUGEE CLINICAL PROGRAM
Represented By: Nancy Jean Kelly
Represented By: John Edward Willshire-Carrera
Represented By: Joshua M. Daniels
Represented By: Sabrineh Ardalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHILDREN'S LAW CENTER OF MASSACHUSETTS, INC.
Represented By: Nancy Jean Kelly
Represented By: John Edward Willshire-Carrera
Represented By: Joshua M. Daniels
Represented By: Sabrineh Ardalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DANIEL FELDMAN
Represented By: Noah A. Levine
Represented By: Phillip Spector
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Represented By: Robin C. Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CATHOLIC CHARITABLE BUREAU OF THE ARCHDIOCESE OF BOSTON, INC.
Represented By: Nancy Jean Kelly
Represented By: John Edward Willshire-Carrera
Represented By: Joshua M. Daniels
Represented By: Sabrineh Ardalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHRISTOPHER R. HILL
Represented By: Noah A. Levine
Represented By: Phillip Spector
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Represented By: Robin C. Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW IMMIGRANT JUSTICE CLINIC
Represented By: Nancy Jean Kelly
Represented By: John Edward Willshire-Carrera
Represented By: Joshua M. Daniels
Represented By: Sabrineh Ardalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: VIKRAM J. SINGH
Represented By: Noah A. Levine
Represented By: Phillip Spector
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Represented By: Robin C. Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WENDY R. SHERMAN
Represented By: Noah A. Levine
Represented By: Phillip Spector
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Represented By: Robin C. Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CATHOLIC LEGAL IMMIGRATION NETWORK, INC.
Represented By: Nancy Jean Kelly
Represented By: John Edward Willshire-Carrera
Represented By: Joshua M. Daniels
Represented By: Sabrineh Ardalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MASSACHUSETTS IMMIGRANT AND REFUGEE ADVOCACY COALITION
Represented By: Nancy Jean Kelly
Represented By: John Edward Willshire-Carrera
Represented By: Joshua M. Daniels
Represented By: Sabrineh Ardalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BATHSHEBA CROCKER
Represented By: Noah A. Levine
Represented By: Phillip Spector
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Represented By: Robin C. Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHELSEA COLLABORATIVE, INC.
Represented By: Nancy Jean Kelly
Represented By: John Edward Willshire-Carrera
Represented By: Joshua M. Daniels
Represented By: Sabrineh Ardalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MATTHEW OLSEN
Represented By: Noah A. Levine
Represented By: Phillip Spector
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Represented By: Robin C. Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BOSTON COLLEGE LAW SCHOOL IMMIGRATION CLINIC
Represented By: Nancy Jean Kelly
Represented By: John Edward Willshire-Carrera
Represented By: Joshua M. Daniels
Represented By: Sabrineh Ardalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JEFFREY PRESCOTT
Represented By: Noah A. Levine
Represented By: Phillip Spector
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Represented By: Robin C. Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JAMES CLAPPER
Represented By: Noah A. Levine
Represented By: Phillip Spector
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Represented By: Robin C. Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JANET NAPOLITANO
Represented By: Noah A. Levine
Represented By: Phillip Spector
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Represented By: Robin C. Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BOSTON UNIVERSITY LAW SCHOOL IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS AND HUMAN TRAFFICKING PROGRAM
Represented By: Nancy Jean Kelly
Represented By: John Edward Willshire-Carrera
Represented By: Joshua M. Daniels
Represented By: Sabrineh Ardalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?