Duart v. Mici, et al
Plaintiff: JOSEPH C. BOEGGEMAN, MUHAMMAD MAHDI, DEREK GAUGHAN, GARY ALVARADO, THOMAS MCMAHON, RICHARD FELT, CORTNEY PAUL LYNCH, CHRISTOPHER FLADGER, JOHN BEYERS and KENNETH R. STONE
Interested Party: DAVID BAXTER, SEAN MILLIKEN, JOHN TOBIA, DAMION B. PAXTON, PAUL ST. MARTIN, DAVID A. BONACETO, WILLIAM E. ALLEN, CHRISTOPHER CARRASQUILLO, JEFFREY BICKFORD, CHRISTOPHER DENTCH, DAVID A. FORAND, DAVID DONATO, STEVEN E. BOUCHER and MATTHEW SWART
Defendant / Appellee: CAROL A. MICI, Commissioner of the Massachusetts Department of Correction, in Her Official and Individual Capacities, DAVID DUARTE, Superintendent of the Massachusetts Treatment Center, in His Official Capacity Only and LISA A. MITCHELL, Former Superintendent of the Massachusetts Treatment Center, in Her Individual Capacity Only
Plaintiff / Appellant: PETER DUART
Case Number: 20-1558
Filed: June 15, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant Peter Duart. Brief due 11/02/2020 for appellant Peter Duart. No further extension of this deadline should be expected. [20-1558] (CMP) [Entered: 08/05/2020 10:53 AM]
July 31, 2020 Mail returned as undeliverable to Not Party Damion B. Paxton. Copy of Order entered July 7, 2020. Forwarding address unknown. [20-1558] (JMK) [Entered: 08/11/2020 09:26 AM]
July 31, 2020 Mail returned as undeliverable to Not Party Jeffrey Bickford. Copy of Order entered July 7, 2020. Forwarding address unknown. [20-1558] (JMK) [Entered: 08/11/2020 09:25 AM]
July 22, 2020 MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant Peter Duart. Certificate of service dated 07/20/2020. [20-1558] (AL) [Entered: 07/22/2020 03:17 PM]
July 16, 2020 DOCKET sheet sent to appellant. [20-1558] (CMP) [Entered: 07/16/2020 04:44 PM]
July 16, 2020 LETTER sent to Appellant Peter Duart in response to his recent correspondence dated July 13, 2020. [20-1558] (CMP) [Entered: 07/16/2020 04:42 PM]
July 15, 2020 LETTER filed by Appellant Peter Duart requesting document copy. Certificate of service was not included. [20-1558] (CMP) [Entered: 07/15/2020 01:09 PM]
July 15, 2020 AMENDED MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Peter Duart. Certificate of service dated 07/13/2020. [20-1558]. (CMP) [Entered: 07/15/2020 01:06 PM]
July 13, 2020 MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Peter Duart. Certificate of service incomplete. [20-1558] (CMP) [Entered: 07/13/2020 04:00 PM]
July 8, 2020 RESPONSE filed by Appellees David Duarte, Carol A. Mici and Lisa A. Mitchell to motion [ # 6350572-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 07/08/2020. [20-1558] (MPM) [Entered: 07/08/2020 10:02 AM]
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to file a nonconforming principal brief filed by Appellant Peter Duart. [20-1558] (CMP) [Entered: 07/07/2020 04:56 PM]
July 6, 2020 Mail returned as undeliverable to Not Party Damion B. Paxton. Copy of Notice issued June 15, 2020. Forwarding address unknown. [20-1558] (JMK) [Entered: 07/13/2020 10:57 AM]
July 6, 2020 MOTION to compel filed by Appellant Peter Duart. Certificate of service dated 07/01/2020. [20-1558] (CMP) [Entered: 07/06/2020 05:08 PM]
July 6, 2020 MOTION to file a nonconforming brief filed by Appellant Peter Duart. Certificate of service dated 07/01/2020. [20-1558] (CMP) [Entered: 07/06/2020 05:04 PM]
July 2, 2020 Mail returned as undeliverable to Not Party Jeffrey Bickford. Copy of Notice issued June 15, 2020. Forwarding address unknown. [20-1558] (JMK) [Entered: 07/08/2020 12:08 PM]
June 23, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees David Duarte, Carol A. Mici and Lisa A. Mitchell filed by Attorney Mary P. Murray. Certificate of service dated 06/23/2020. [20-1558] (MPM) [Entered: 06/23/2020 02:10 PM]
June 22, 2020 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 08/03/2020 for appellant Peter Duart. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief, and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [20-1558] (MNH) [Entered: 06/22/2020 10:54 AM]
June 15, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #140) filed by Appellant Peter Duart. Fee due 06/29/2020. [20-1558] (MNH) [Entered: 06/15/2020 03:53 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Duart v. Mici, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DAVID BAXTER
Represented By: David Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SEAN MILLIKEN
Represented By: Sean Milliken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JOHN TOBIA
Represented By: John Tobia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DAMION B. PAXTON
Represented By: Damion B. Paxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PAUL ST. MARTIN
Represented By: Paul St. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DAVID A. BONACETO
Represented By: David A. Bonaceto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: WILLIAM E. ALLEN
Represented By: William E. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CHRISTOPHER CARRASQUILLO
Represented By: Christopher Carrasquillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JEFFREY BICKFORD
Represented By: Jeffrey Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CHRISTOPHER DENTCH
Represented By: Christopher Dentch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DAVID A. FORAND
Represented By: David A. Forand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DAVID DONATO
Represented By: David Donato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: STEVEN E. BOUCHER
Represented By: Steven E. Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MATTHEW SWART
Represented By: Matthew Swart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAROL A. MICI, Commissioner of the Massachusetts Department of Correction, in Her Official and Individual Capacities
Represented By: Mary Powers Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID DUARTE, Superintendent of the Massachusetts Treatment Center, in His Official Capacity Only
Represented By: Mary Powers Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LISA A. MITCHELL, Former Superintendent of the Massachusetts Treatment Center, in Her Individual Capacity Only
Represented By: Mary Powers Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH C. BOEGGEMAN
Represented By: Joseph C. Boeggeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MUHAMMAD MAHDI
Represented By: Muhammad Mahdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEREK GAUGHAN
Represented By: Derek Gaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY ALVARADO
Represented By: Gary Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS MCMAHON
Represented By: Thomas McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD FELT
Represented By: Richard Felt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORTNEY PAUL LYNCH
Represented By: Cortney Paul Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER FLADGER
Represented By: Christopher Fladger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN BEYERS
Represented By: John Beyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH R. STONE
Represented By: Kenneth R. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PETER DUART
Represented By: Peter Duart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?