Celimen Savino, et al v. Souza
Respondent: IMMIGRATION CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, in his official capacity as Deputy DIrector and Senior Official Performing the Duties of the DIrector for U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, THOMAS M. HODGSON, in his official capacity as Bristol County Sheriff, TODD M. LYONS, in his official capacity as Acting Director of the Boston Field Office of Immigration and Customs Enforcement and CHAD F. WOLF, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
Respondent / Appellee: STEVEN J. SOUZA, in his official capacity as Superintendent of the Bristol County House of Corrections, TODD M. LYONS, in his official capacity as Acting Director of the Boston Field Office of Immigrations and Customs Enforcement and CHAD F. WOLF, in his official capacity as Acting Director of the Department of Homeland Security
Petitioner / Appellant: JULIO CESAR MEDEIROS NEVES, and all those similarly situated and MARIA ALEJANDRA CELIMEN SAVINO, and all those similarly situated
Interested Party: RICK RAEMISCH, JULIO MEDEIROS NEVES JUNIO, KARINA ROJAS VARGAS, JUAN ALMANZAR, AUGUSTINE OHENHEN, JUCINEI LIMA, HAYK KHACHATYAN, OSVALDO MOTA, CARLOS SIS DUARTE, AIRES DANIEL BENROS DA GRACA, RANFERI RAMIREZ-MALDANADO, DARCY MCMENAMIN, EDISSON PESANTEZ-ORELLANA, AKEIM THOMAS, EMMANUEL LOPEZ-GONZALEZ, DONOVAN SMITH, GERARDO PORTILLO, DESMOND LEE JOSEPH, HUSSEIN HUSSEIN, DIEGO AMADOR GALINDO, ANGELA DE JESUS CONCEPCION, CESAR VARGAS, ANDREA JOY JAMES, LUCAS VALENTIM, DELAPAZ GABRI, MELCHOR SANTOS-CABRERA, KEITH WILLIAMS, RUBEN POGHOSYAN, GABRIEL CASTILLO-MALPICA, HECTOR JARAMILLO-QUIROZ, THEMBELIHLE BENGU BLOCKER, MARVIN ARREAGA, SRIKALATHAN ROHAN, ESTEBAN JARAMILLO-PEREZ, JOKO THOMAS, THANDOKUHLE MASIMULAR, KAVON MAHADEO, SALIM AL AMIRI, HENRY URBINA RIVAS, KOKOU AZIABO, CORDEL SMITH, JESSE MAINA, FIRDAVS SALAKHIDINOV, GABINO DEL ANGEL MORAN,, CARLOS CARANGUI, ROBSON MARIA DE OLIVEIRA, CARLOS GUTIERREZ-DELEON, JUAN ROJAS-CEBALLOS, VICTOR SANCHEZ-LOPEZ, GERALDO CRUZ SOARES, JHONY BONILLA OCHOA, OSCAR VELASQUEZ-HERNANDEZ, JERVIS VERNON, JOSE BELTRAN-ARAUJO, ARMY SANCHEZ DISLA, PAMLAR FERREIRA, MOHAMAD BASSYOUNI, GEREMIAS LOPEZ RODRIGUEZ, BACILIO BLANCO, LUIS MIRANDA-CASTILLO, JOHN A. HAWKINSON, GERSON MCGLASHIN, VICTOR PEGUERO-VASQUEZ, PASCUAL MONTES-SANTOS, JULIO FIGUEROA-MORALIS, GEORGIOS NIKIFORIDIS, ANTONI KITA TSHIMANGA, KEVIN CORLETO, HARLEN PEREZ, NEVED BAI MANEY LAL, MARCIO DE SAUZA, HUGO CANDELARIO-ECHEGOYEN, OBED VASQUEZ-VASQUEZ, SCHNAIDER PAUL and SANDRO VERA CAMPOVERDE
Case Number: 20-1626
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file a response filed by Appellants Maria Alejandra Celimen Savino and Julio Cesar Medeiros Neves in 20-1626. Certificate of service dated 09/10/2020. [20-1564, 20-1626] (SA) [Entered: 09/10/2020 02:25 PM]
September 4, 2020 MOTION for summary disposition filed by Appellees Maria Alejandra Celimen Savino and Julio Cesar Medeiros Neves in 20-1564, Appellants Maria Alejandra Celimen Savino and Julio Cesar Medeiros Neves in 20-1626. Certificate of service dated 09/04/2020. [20-1564, 20-1626] (FHE) [Entered: 09/04/2020 04:50 PM]
September 1, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Maria Alejandra Celimen Savino and Julio Cesar Medeiros Neves filed by Attorney Philip L. Torrey. Certificate of service dated 09/01/2020. [20-1626] (PLT) [Entered: 09/01/2020 03:15 PM]
September 1, 2020 CROSS-APPEAL briefing schedule set pursuant to F.R.A.P. 28.1. Brief and Appendix due 10/13/2020 for appellant/cross-appellee Steven J. Souza. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-1564, 20-1626] (GRC) [Entered: 09/01/2020 12:15 PM]
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: The parties have filed cross-appeals in No. 1:20-cv-10617-WGY (D. Mass.). Pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28.1, it is hereby ordered that respondent Steven J. Souza be deemed the appellant/cross-appellee (Appellant) and that petitioners Maria Alejandra Celimen Savino and Julio Cesar Medeiros Neves be deemed the appellees/cross-appellants (Appellees). The parties are directed to use the above caption on all future filings related to these cases. The briefing schedule set in No. 20-1564 is vacated. A briefing schedule will be set once the record on appeal, including all necessary transcripts, is complete in No. 20-1626. [20-1564, 20-1626] (GRC) [Entered: 09/01/2020 12:03 PM]
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Upon consideration, attorney Felicia Ellsworth's motion to withdraw as counsel for Appellants Maria Alejandra Celimen Savino and Julio Cesar Medeiros Neves is allowed. Appellants shall continue to be represented by their remaining counsel of record, attorney Sameer Ahmed. [20-1626] (GRC) [Entered: 09/01/2020 11:50 AM]
August 31, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Not Parties Matthew T. Albence, Thomas M. Hodgson, ICE, Todd M. Lyons, Chad F. Wolf and Appellee Steven J. Souza filed by Attorney Christina Parascandola. Certificate of service dated 08/31/2020. [20-1626] (CP) [Entered: 08/31/2020 03:58 PM]
August 25, 2020 MOTION for Attorney Felicia Ellsworth to withdraw as counsel filed by Appellants Maria Alejandra Celimen Savino and Julio Cesar Medeiros Neves. Certificate of service dated 08/25/2020. [20-1626] (FHE) [Entered: 08/25/2020 03:19 PM]
August 24, 2020 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Maria Alejandra Celimen Savino and Julio Cesar Medeiros Neves indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 08/24/2020. [20-1626] (SA) [Entered: 08/24/2020 04:05 PM]
August 24, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Maria Alejandra Celimen Savino and Julio Cesar Medeiros Neves. Certificate of service dated 08/24/2020. [20-1626] (SA) [Entered: 08/24/2020 04:02 PM]
August 24, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Maria Alejandra Celimen Savino and Julio Cesar Medeiros Neves filed by Attorney Sameer Ahmed. Certificate of service dated 08/24/2020. [20-1626] (SA) [Entered: 08/24/2020 11:26 AM]
August 20, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Maria Alejandra Celimen Savino filed by Attorney Sameer Ahmed. Certificate of service dated 08/20/2020. [20-1626] (SA) [Entered: 08/20/2020 12:55 PM]
August 4, 2020 NOTICE of filing the following transcript in district court by Court Reporter Richard Henry Romanow in 20-1564, 20-1626: 06/03/2020, Preliminary Injunction Hearing. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [20-1564, 20-1626] (MNH) [Entered: 08/04/2020 10:42 AM]
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file opening forms filed by Appellants Maria Alejandra Celimen Savino and Julio Cesar Medeiros Neves. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript report/order form due 08/27/2020. [20-1626] (GRC) [Entered: 07/28/2020 05:36 PM]
July 27, 2020 MOTION to extend time to file an appearance form, docketing statement and transcript report/order form filed by Appellants Maria Alejandra Celimen Savino and Julio Cesar Medeiros Neves. Certificate of service dated 07/27/2020. [20-1626] (FHE) [Entered: 07/27/2020 03:40 PM]
July 27, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Maria Alejandra Celimen Savino and Julio Cesar Medeiros Neves filed by Attorney Felicia H. Ellsworth. Certificate of service dated 07/27/2020. [20-1626] (FHE) [Entered: 07/27/2020 03:35 PM]
July 15, 2020 MOTION to remove docket access restrictions filed by Not Party John A. Hawkinson. Certificate of service dated 07/15/2020. [20-1626] (GRC) [Entered: 07/17/2020 09:11 AM]
July 14, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #229) filed by Appellants Maria Alejandra Celimen Savino and Julio Cesar Medeiros Neves. Appearance form. Docketing Statement and Transcript Report/Order form due 07/28/2020. [20-1626] (GRC) [Entered: 07/14/2020 11:34 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Celimen Savino, et al v. Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: IMMIGRATION CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, in his official capacity as Deputy DIrector and Senior Official Performing the Duties of the DIrector for U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THOMAS M. HODGSON, in his official capacity as Bristol County Sheriff
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: TODD M. LYONS, in his official capacity as Acting Director of the Boston Field Office of Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHAD F. WOLF, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: STEVEN J. SOUZA, in his official capacity as Superintendent of the Bristol County House of Corrections
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Represented By: Christina Parascandola
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: TODD M. LYONS, in his official capacity as Acting Director of the Boston Field Office of Immigrations and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: CHAD F. WOLF, in his official capacity as Acting Director of the Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JULIO CESAR MEDEIROS NEVES, and all those similarly situated
Represented By: Michael J. Brown
Represented By: Gary B. Howell-Walton
Represented By: John Joseph Butts
Represented By: Reena Parikh
Represented By: Vinita Ferrera
Represented By: Annaleigh Elizabeth Curtis
Represented By: Nicole M. Fontaine Dooley
Represented By: Muneer I. Ahmad
Represented By: Michael J. Wishnie
Represented By: Mikayla C. Foster
Represented By: Ivan Espinoza-Madrigal
Represented By: Felicia H. Ellsworth
Represented By: Lisa Pirozzolo
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Represented By: Elizabeth E. Driscoll
Represented By: Rama S. Attreya
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Represented By: Lauren A. Sampson
Represented By: Philip L. Torrey
Represented By: Sameer Ahmed
Represented By: Gary Barrington Howell-Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: MARIA ALEJANDRA CELIMEN SAVINO, and all those similarly situated
Represented By: Michael J. Brown
Represented By: Gary B. Howell-Walton
Represented By: John Joseph Butts
Represented By: Reena Parikh
Represented By: Vinita Ferrera
Represented By: Annaleigh Elizabeth Curtis
Represented By: Nicole M. Fontaine Dooley
Represented By: Muneer I. Ahmad
Represented By: Michael J. Wishnie
Represented By: Mikayla C. Foster
Represented By: Ivan Espinoza-Madrigal
Represented By: Felicia H. Ellsworth
Represented By: Lisa Pirozzolo
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Represented By: Elizabeth E. Driscoll
Represented By: Rama S. Attreya
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Represented By: Lauren A. Sampson
Represented By: Philip L. Torrey
Represented By: Sameer Ahmed
Represented By: Gary Barrington Howell-Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: RICK RAEMISCH
Represented By: William W. Fick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JULIO MEDEIROS NEVES JUNIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: KARINA ROJAS VARGAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JUAN ALMANZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AUGUSTINE OHENHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JUCINEI LIMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: HAYK KHACHATYAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: OSVALDO MOTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CARLOS SIS DUARTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AIRES DANIEL BENROS DA GRACA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: RANFERI RAMIREZ-MALDANADO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DARCY MCMENAMIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: EDISSON PESANTEZ-ORELLANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AKEIM THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: EMMANUEL LOPEZ-GONZALEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DONOVAN SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: GERARDO PORTILLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DESMOND LEE JOSEPH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: HUSSEIN HUSSEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DIEGO AMADOR GALINDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ANGELA DE JESUS CONCEPCION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CESAR VARGAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ANDREA JOY JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: LUCAS VALENTIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DELAPAZ GABRI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MELCHOR SANTOS-CABRERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: KEITH WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: RUBEN POGHOSYAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: GABRIEL CASTILLO-MALPICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: HECTOR JARAMILLO-QUIROZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: THEMBELIHLE BENGU BLOCKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MARVIN ARREAGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SRIKALATHAN ROHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ESTEBAN JARAMILLO-PEREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JOKO THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: THANDOKUHLE MASIMULAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: KAVON MAHADEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SALIM AL AMIRI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: HENRY URBINA RIVAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: KOKOU AZIABO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CORDEL SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JESSE MAINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FIRDAVS SALAKHIDINOV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: GABINO DEL ANGEL MORAN,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CARLOS CARANGUI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ROBSON MARIA DE OLIVEIRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CARLOS GUTIERREZ-DELEON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JUAN ROJAS-CEBALLOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: VICTOR SANCHEZ-LOPEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: GERALDO CRUZ SOARES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JHONY BONILLA OCHOA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: OSCAR VELASQUEZ-HERNANDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JERVIS VERNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JOSE BELTRAN-ARAUJO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ARMY SANCHEZ DISLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PAMLAR FERREIRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MOHAMAD BASSYOUNI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: GEREMIAS LOPEZ RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: BACILIO BLANCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: LUIS MIRANDA-CASTILLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JOHN A. HAWKINSON
Represented By: John A. Hawkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: GERSON MCGLASHIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: VICTOR PEGUERO-VASQUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PASCUAL MONTES-SANTOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JULIO FIGUEROA-MORALIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: GEORGIOS NIKIFORIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ANTONI KITA TSHIMANGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: KEVIN CORLETO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: HARLEN PEREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NEVED BAI MANEY LAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MARCIO DE SAUZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: HUGO CANDELARIO-ECHEGOYEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: OBED VASQUEZ-VASQUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SCHNAIDER PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SANDRO VERA CAMPOVERDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?