Sallaj v. Barr, et al
Petitioner: SHAHDAN SALLAJ
Respondent: MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, Deputy Director and Senior Official Performing the Duties of Director, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, "ICE", CHAD F. WOLF, Acting Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, TODD M. LYONS, Acting Director, Boston Field Office, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General of the United States and DANIEL W. MARTIN, Warden, Wyatt Detention Center
Case Number: 20-1649
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants William P. Barr, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Todd M. Lyons, Matthew T. Albence and Chad F. Wolf. Brief and Appendix due 11/30/2020 for appellant Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Todd M. Lyons, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Chad F. Wolf. We are disinclined to grant a request for further enlargement of this deadline. [20-1649] (GRC) [Entered: 08/31/2020 04:54 PM]
August 28, 2020 ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Todd M. Lyons, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Chad F. Wolf. Certificate of service dated 08/28/2020. [20-1649] (ZAC) [Entered: 08/28/2020 12:24 PM]
August 28, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Todd M. Lyons, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Chad F. Wolf filed by Attorney Zachary A. Cunha. Certificate of service dated 08/28/2020. [20-1649] (ZAC) [Entered: 08/28/2020 12:20 PM]
August 18, 2020 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and appendix due 09/28/2020 for appellant Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Todd M. Lyons, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Chad F. Wolf. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-1649] (RMK) [Entered: 08/18/2020 09:50 AM]
August 18, 2020 NOTICE of filing the following transcripts in district court by Court Reporter Karen Wischnowsky: 04/13/2020, Motion for TRO and Habeas Corpus Petition Hearing (Telephone Motion Hearing); 04/20/2020, Motion for TRO and Habeas Corpus Petition Hearing (Telephone Motion Hearing). In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [20-1649] (RMK) [Entered: 08/18/2020 09:47 AM]
July 31, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Todd M. Lyons, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Chad F. Wolf filed by Attorney Helen H. Lee. Certificate of service dated 07/31/2020. [20-1649] (HL) [Entered: 07/31/2020 07:49 AM]
July 29, 2020 NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file an appearance form or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Appearance form due 08/12/2020. [20-1649] (RMK) [Entered: 07/29/2020 02:44 PM]
July 24, 2020 TRANSCRIPT ordered: 04/13/2020, Telephone Motion Heargin; 04/20/2020, Telephone Motion Hearing. Transcript(s) due 09/22/2020 from Court Reporter Karen Wischnowsky [20-1649] (RMK) [Entered: 07/24/2020 03:23 PM]
July 22, 2020 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Todd M. Lyons, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Chad F. Wolf indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 07/22/2020. [20-1649] (ZAC) [Entered: 07/22/2020 02:00 PM]
July 22, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Todd M. Lyons, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Chad F. Wolf. Certificate of service dated 07/22/2020. [20-1649] (ZAC) [Entered: 07/22/2020 01:58 PM]
July 13, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Not Party Daniel W. Martin filed by Attorney Brian J. Lamoureux. Certificate of service dated 07/13/2020. [20-1649] (BJL) [Entered: 07/13/2020 12:33 PM]
July 8, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Shahdan Sallaj filed by Attorney Justin Conlon. Certificate of service dated 07/08/2020. [20-1649] (JC) [Entered: 07/08/2020 12:33 PM]
July 8, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #27) filed by Appellants Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Todd M. Lyons, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Chad F. Wolf. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 07/22/2020. [20-1649] (MNH) [Entered: 07/08/2020 11:45 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Sallaj v. Barr, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SHAHDAN SALLAJ
Represented By: Justin Conlon
Represented By: Hans Bremer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, Deputy Director and Senior Official Performing the Duties of Director, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Helen Lee
Represented By: Zachary A. Cunha
Represented By: Lauren S. Zurier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, "ICE"
Represented By: Helen Lee
Represented By: Zachary A. Cunha
Represented By: Lauren S. Zurier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHAD F. WOLF, Acting Secretary, Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Helen Lee
Represented By: Zachary A. Cunha
Represented By: Lauren S. Zurier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: TODD M. LYONS, Acting Director, Boston Field Office, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Helen Lee
Represented By: Zachary A. Cunha
Represented By: Lauren S. Zurier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: Helen Lee
Represented By: Zachary A. Cunha
Represented By: Lauren S. Zurier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DANIEL W. MARTIN, Warden, Wyatt Detention Center
Represented By: Brian J. Lamoureux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?