Montilla, et al v. Federal Nat'l Mortgage Ass'n, et al
Plaintiff: ROSELIA MONTUFAR, on behalf of herself and all others so similarly situated and RUBEN VELASQUEZ, on behalf of themhimself and all others so similarly situated
Defendant: SETERUS, INC. and COOPER, f/k/a Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: NERIS MONTILLA, On behalf of themselves and all others so similarly situated, ROSELIA MONTUFAR, On behalf of themselves and all others so similarly situated, MICHAEL KYRIAKAKIS, RUBEN VELASQUEZ, On behalf of themselves and all others so similarly situated, MICHAEL KYRIAKAKIS, on behalf of himself and all others so similarly situated and NERIS MONTILLA, on behalf of herself and all others so similarly situated
Defendant / Appellee: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, COOPER, FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY and C.I.T. BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 20-1673
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Neris Montilla and Michael Kyriakakis. Brief and Appendix due 10/23/2020 for appellant Michael Kyriakakis and Neris Montilla. [20-1673] (GRC) [Entered: 09/10/2020 05:29 PM]
September 10, 2020 MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Michael Kyriakakis and Neris Montilla. Certificate of service dated 09/10/2020. [20-1673] (TSD) [Entered: 09/10/2020 12:01 PM]
September 4, 2020 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Alison Burton for Federal National Mortgage Association, Ethan Z. Tieger for Federal National Mortgage Association and Federal Housing Finance Agency, Jeffrey C. Ankrom for Mr. Cooper, Chava Brandriss for Seterus, Inc. and Allison J. Schoenthal for Seterus, Inc.. [20-1673] (GRC) [Entered: 09/04/2020 12:31 PM]
August 14, 2020 NOTICE issued. After 08/28/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Alison Burton for Federal National Mortgage Association, Ethan Z. Tieger for Federal National Mortgage Association and Federal Housing Finance Agency, Jeffrey C. Ankrom for Mr. Cooper, Chava Brandriss for Seterus, Inc. and Allison J. Schoenthal for Seterus, Inc.. [20-1673] (GRC) [Entered: 08/14/2020 09:11 AM]
August 14, 2020 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 09/23/2020 for appellant Michael Kyriakakis and Neris Montilla. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-1673] (GRC) [Entered: 08/14/2020 09:04 AM]
August 7, 2020 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Alison Burton for Appellee Federal National Mortgage Association. Copy of Notice issued July 20, 2020. Forwarding address unknown. [20-1673] (JMK) [Entered: 08/11/2020 04:03 PM]
August 3, 2020 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Ethan Z. Tieger for Appellees Federal National Mortgage Association and Federal Housing Finance Agency. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued July 20, 2020. [20-1673] (ATC) [Entered: 08/11/2020 12:20 PM]
August 3, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee C.I.T. Bank, N.A. filed by Attorney Julia B. Strickland. Certificate of service dated 08/03/2020. [20-1673] (JS) [Entered: 08/03/2020 08:05 PM]
August 3, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee C.I.T. Bank, N.A. filed by Attorney Raymond A. Garcia. Certificate of service dated 08/03/2020. [20-1673] (RAG) [Entered: 08/03/2020 08:01 PM]
August 3, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Federal Housing Finance Agency filed by Attorney Michael A.F. Johnson. Certificate of service dated 08/03/2020. [20-1673] (MAJ) [Entered: 08/03/2020 06:02 PM]
August 3, 2020 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Michael Kyriakakis and Neris Montilla indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 08/03/2020. [20-1673] (TSD) [Entered: 08/03/2020 08:33 AM]
August 3, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Michael Kyriakakis and Neris Montilla. Certificate of service dated 08/03/2020. [20-1673] (TSD) [Entered: 08/03/2020 08:31 AM]
August 3, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Michael Kyriakakis and Neris Montilla filed by Attorney Todd S. Dion. Certificate of service dated 08/03/2020. [20-1673] (TSD) [Entered: 08/03/2020 08:28 AM]
July 20, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #42) filed by Appellants Michael Kyriakakis, Neris Montilla, Roselia Montufar and Ruben Velasquez. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 08/03/2020. [20-1673] (GRC) [Entered: 07/20/2020 09:00 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Montilla, et al v. Federal Nat'l Mortgage Ass'n, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NERIS MONTILLA, On behalf of themselves and all others so similarly situated
Represented By: Todd Steven Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROSELIA MONTUFAR, On behalf of themselves and all others so similarly situated
Represented By: Todd Steven Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL KYRIAKAKIS
Represented By: Todd Steven Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RUBEN VELASQUEZ, On behalf of themselves and all others so similarly situated
Represented By: Todd Steven Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL KYRIAKAKIS, on behalf of himself and all others so similarly situated
Represented By: Todd Steven Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NERIS MONTILLA, on behalf of herself and all others so similarly situated
Represented By: Todd Steven Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Noah A. Levine
Represented By: Alison Burton
Represented By: Samuel Craig Bodurtha
Represented By: Ethan Z. Tieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COOPER
Represented By: Krystle Guillory Tadesse
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY
Represented By: Samuel Craig Bodurtha
Represented By: Ethan Z. Tieger
Represented By: Michael A.F. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C.I.T. BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Raymond A. Garcia
Represented By: Julia Strickland
Represented By: Samuel Craig Bodurtha
Represented By: Jeffrey Lewis Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SETERUS, INC.
Represented By: Alexandra G. Watson
Represented By: Allison J. Schoenthal
Represented By: Chava Brandriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPER, f/k/a Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Krystle Guillory Tadesse
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSELIA MONTUFAR, on behalf of herself and all others so similarly situated
Represented By: Todd Steven Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUBEN VELASQUEZ, on behalf of themhimself and all others so similarly situated
Represented By: Todd Steven Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?